Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 18 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 18 Week
» 7630 Month
» 74492 Year
» 1739868 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

166


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
06/06/1958 To Service 59209   NEW 51A Darlington
26/06/1958 To Service 59211   NEW 51A Darlington
18/07/1958 To Service 59214   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
25/07/1958 To Service 59215   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
19/08/1958 To Service 59216   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
28/08/1958 To Service 59217   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
05/09/1958 To Service 59218   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
12/09/1958 To Service 59219   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
19/09/1958 To Service 59220   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
25/09/1958 To Service 59221   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
18/10/1958 To Service 59224   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
25/10/1958 To Service 59225   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
04/11/1958 To Service 59226   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
13/11/1958 To Service 59227   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
26/11/1958 To Service 59228   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
04/12/1958 To Service 59229   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
18/12/1958 To Service 59240   NEW 50A York (North)
29/12/1958 To Service 59241   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
15/01/1959 To Service 59242   NEW 50B Neville Hill
12/03/1959 To Service 59244   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
09/03/1963 Condemned 59222 SGosfo     COND
09/07/1984 Condemned 59227 53C Hull Springhead   COND
18/01/1988 Condemned 59225 53C Hull Springhead   COND