Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 73 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5548 Week
» 5548 Month
» 72410 Year
» 1737786 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

167


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
59245 02/10/1958 ED (New)
Eastfield
02/10/1958
04/10/1987
59246 01/10/1958 53C
NL
Hull Springhead (New)
Neville Hill
01/10/1958
04/10/1987
59247 01/10/1958 53C
W
Hull Springhead (New)
Withdrawn
01/10/1958
03/02/1985
03/02/1985
59248 02/10/1958 ED (New)
Eastfield
02/10/1958
04/10/1987
59249 08/10/1958 NL (New)
Neville Hill
08/10/1958
04/10/1987
59250 16/10/1958 NL (New)
Neville Hill
16/10/1958
13/09/1987