Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 67 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5542 Week
» 5542 Month
» 72404 Year
» 1737780 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

167


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
01/10/1958 To Service 59246   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
01/10/1958 To Service 59247   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
03/02/1985 Condemned 59247 53C Hull Springhead   COND
13/09/1987 Reallocation 59250 SGosfo   NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 59245 SGosfo   ED Eastfield
04/10/1987 Reallocation 59246 53C Hull Springhead NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 59248 SGosfo   ED Eastfield
04/10/1987 Reallocation 59249 SGosfo   NL Neville Hill