Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 89 Today
» 1070 Yesterday
» 89 Week
» 89 Month
» 66951 Year
» 1732327 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

167


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
59245 02/10/1958 62.45
59246 01/10/1958 Hull Springhead 62.46
59247 01/10/1958 Hull Springhead 03/02/1985 Hull Botanic Gardens 26.33 62.46
59248 02/10/1958 62.45
59249 08/10/1958 62.44
59250 16/10/1958 62.42