Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 87 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5562 Week
» 5562 Month
» 72424 Year
» 1737800 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

168


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
59049 17/10/1956   (New) 17/10/1956
59050 17/10/1956   (New) 17/10/1956
59051 23/10/1956 W (New)
Withdrawn
23/10/1956
17/06/1968
17/06/1968
59052 09/11/1956   (New) 09/11/1956 09/09/1988
59053 09/11/1956   (New) 09/11/1956
59054 21/11/1956   (New) 21/11/1956
59055 30/11/1956   (New) 30/11/1956
59073 28/01/1957 51A Darlington (New) 28/01/1957
59074 04/02/1957 51A Darlington (New) 04/02/1957
59075 11/02/1957 51A Darlington (New) 11/02/1957 09/09/1988
59076 15/02/1957 51A Darlington (New) 15/02/1957
59077 28/02/1957 51A Darlington (New) 28/02/1957
59078 19/03/1957 51A
NL
Darlington (New)
Neville Hill
19/03/1957
27/09/1987
59079 28/02/1957 51A Darlington (New) 28/02/1957
59080 06/03/1957 51A Darlington (New) 06/03/1957
59081 14/03/1957 51A Darlington (New) 14/03/1957
59082 25/03/1957 51A
ED
Darlington (New)
Eastfield
25/03/1957
20/09/1987
59083 29/03/1957 51A
W
Darlington (New)
Withdrawn
29/03/1957
28/09/1986
28/09/1986
59084 04/04/1957 51A Darlington (New) 04/04/1957
59085 12/04/1957 51A Darlington (New) 12/04/1957
59092 17/09/1957   (New) 17/09/1957
59093 24/09/1957   (New) 24/09/1957
59094 01/10/1957 W (New)
Withdrawn
01/10/1957
28/09/1986
28/09/1986
59095 08/10/1957   (New) 08/10/1957
59096 15/10/1957   (New) 15/10/1957
59097 22/10/1957   (New) 22/10/1957
59112 05/11/1957   (New) 05/11/1957 01/06/1988
59113 12/11/1957 NL (New)
Neville Hill
12/11/1957
04/10/1987