Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 29 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 29 Week
» 7641 Month
» 74503 Year
» 1739879 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

168


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
28/01/1957 To Service 59073   NEW 51A Darlington
04/02/1957 To Service 59074   NEW 51A Darlington
11/02/1957 To Service 59075   NEW 51A Darlington
15/02/1957 To Service 59076   NEW 51A Darlington
28/02/1957 To Service 59077   NEW 51A Darlington
28/02/1957 To Service 59079   NEW 51A Darlington
06/03/1957 To Service 59080   NEW 51A Darlington
14/03/1957 To Service 59081   NEW 51A Darlington
19/03/1957 To Service 59078   NEW 51A Darlington
25/03/1957 To Service 59082   NEW 51A Darlington
29/03/1957 To Service 59083   NEW 51A Darlington
04/04/1957 To Service 59084   NEW 51A Darlington
12/04/1957 To Service 59085   NEW 51A Darlington
17/06/1968 Condemned 59051 SGosfo     COND
28/09/1986 Condemned 59083 51A Darlington   COND
28/09/1986 Condemned 59094 SGosfo     COND
20/09/1987 Reallocation 59082 51A Darlington ED Eastfield
27/09/1987 Reallocation 59078 51A Darlington NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 59113 SGosfo   NL Neville Hill
01/06/1988 Condemned 59112 SGosfo     COND
09/09/1988 Condemned 59052 SGosfo     COND
09/09/1988 Condemned 59075 51A Darlington   COND