Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 50 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 50 Week
» 7662 Month
» 74524 Year
» 1739900 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

168


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
59049 17/10/1956 64.43
59050 17/10/1956 64.43
59051 23/10/1956 17/06/1968 11.67 64.42
59052 09/11/1956 09/09/1988 31.83 64.37
59053 09/11/1956 64.37
59054 21/11/1956 64.34
59055 30/11/1956 64.31
59073 28/01/1957 Darlington 64.15
59074 04/02/1957 Darlington 64.13
59075 11/02/1957 Darlington 09/09/1988 31.58 64.11
59076 15/02/1957 Darlington 64.10
59077 28/02/1957 Darlington 64.07
59078 19/03/1957 Darlington 64.01
59079 28/02/1957 Darlington 64.07
59080 06/03/1957 Darlington 64.05
59081 14/03/1957 Darlington 64.03
59082 25/03/1957 Darlington 64.00
59083 29/03/1957 Darlington 28/09/1986 Hull Botanic Gardens 29.5 63.99
59084 04/04/1957 Darlington 63.97
59085 12/04/1957 Darlington 63.95
59092 17/09/1957 63.52
59093 24/09/1957 63.50
59094 01/10/1957 28/09/1986 Hull Botanic Gardens 28.92 63.48
59095 08/10/1957 63.46
59096 15/10/1957 63.44
59097 22/10/1957 63.42
59112 05/11/1957 01/06/1988 Ayr 30.58 63.38
59113 12/11/1957 63.36