WD "WD/8" Class 2-8-0
Class | WD (Orig) | WD (7xxxx) | NS | KCR | LNER (1946) | BR (1st BR) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WD/8 | 800 | 70800 | 3044 | 63044 | 90044 | 03/1944 | 66C 66B 51B 51B 50A 50D 53E 50B W |
Hamilton (West) Motherwell Newport (Teeside) Newport (Teeside) York (North) Starbeck Goole Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
20/01/1950 04/03/1950 03/09/1950 23/09/1950 24/07/1954 12/11/1955 19/09/1959 30/11/1963 01/12/1966 |
01/12/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 801 | 70801 | 90312 | 03/1944 | SPM MC 84C 81F 86A 86C 81C 81E 86A 87F 9G W |
St Philips Marsh Melton Constable Banbury Oxford Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Southall Didcot Ebbw Junction (Newport) Llanelli Gorton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/04/1951 19/05/1951 01/11/1952 08/09/1956 06/10/1956 26/03/1960 25/03/1961 20/05/1961 07/10/1961 20/05/1962 21/12/1963 |
21/12/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 802 | 70802 | 90313 | 03/1944 | 65D 65A 65A 84C 84C 84C 81C 84C 41F 41D W |
Dawsholm Eastfield Eastfield Banbury Banbury Banbury Southall Banbury Mexborough Canklow Withdrawn |
14/07/1951 11/08/1951 09/09/1951 31/12/1951 09/02/1952 29/02/1952 24/04/1954 19/04/1958 02/12/1962 28/09/1963 25/04/1964 |
25/04/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 803 | 70803 | 4301 | 03/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | ||||
WD/8 | 804 | 70804 | 3045 | 63045 | 90045 | 03/1944 | NPT 54D 54B 50B 50A W |
Newport (Teeside) Consett Tyne Dock Neville Hill York (North) Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 18/04/1953 19/02/1955 20/07/1957 12/12/1959 27/10/1965 |
27/10/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 805 | 70805 | 23 | 03/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1959 | 20/08/1959 | ||||
WD/8 | 806 | 70806 | 4302 | 03/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1949 | 05/1949 | ||||
WD/8 | 807 | 70807 | 90314 | 03/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 24/04/1965 | 24/04/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 808 | 70808 | 90315 | 03/1944 | CNYD 87F 87A 87A 86G 85E 84C 8B 24J 26B 9K 9J 36C W |
Croes Newydd Llanelli Neath (Court Sart) Neath (Court Sart) Pontypool Road Gloucester Barnwood Banbury Warrington Dallam Lancaster Green Ayre Agecroft Bolton Agecroft Frodingham Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 15/07/1950 29/12/1951 31/01/1952 09/10/1954 23/04/1960 18/06/1960 30/08/1962 19/01/1963 24/08/1963 14/09/1963 18/07/1964 12/09/1964 21/11/1965 |
21/11/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 809 | 70809 | 90316 | 03/1944 | 25G 25E 26C 26F 26A 24J 27B 24D 24J 8L 9K 8F 40E W |
Farnley Junction (Re-instd) Sowerby Bridge Bolton Belle Vue Newton Heath Lancaster Green Ayre Aintree Lower Darwen Lancaster Green Ayre Aintree Bolton Springs Branch (Wigan) Colwick Withdrawn |
14/01/1950 04/10/1952 18/04/1953 08/10/1955 21/04/1956 12/07/1958 10/01/1959 17/06/1961 12/01/1963 18/01/1964 15/02/1964 29/02/1964 12/09/1964 26/12/1965 |
26/12/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 810 | 70810 | 3046 | 63046 | 90046 | 03/1944 | 18B 9G W |
Westhouses Gorton Withdrawn |
08/10/1960 30/06/1962 23/03/1963 |
23/03/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 811 | 70811 | 90317 | 03/1944 | RED 6B 8D 6C 8F W |
Redhill Mold Junction Widnes Birkenhead Mollington Street Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/08/1948 13/10/1951 15/08/1959 07/11/1959 09/04/1960 13/03/1965 |
13/03/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 812 | 70812 | 4303 | 03/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1957 | 11/1957 | ||||
WD/8 | 813 | 70813 | 3047 | 63047 | 90047 | 03/1944 | HLS 53A 53A 50A 51A 56A W |
Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates York (North) Darlington Wakefield Withdrawn |
29/08/1948 25/11/1950 30/11/1950 20/06/1953 16/06/1956 11/10/1958 08/06/1967 |
08/06/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 814 | 70814 | 90318 | 03/1944 | 25G 55E 55D 55E W |
Farnley Junction (Re-instd) Normanton Royston Normanton Withdrawn |
31/12/1949 07/11/1959 09/10/1965 28/01/1967 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 815 | 70815 | 3048 | 63048 | 90048 | 03/1944 | SKN 51C 51L W |
Stockton West Hartlepool Thornaby Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 12/11/1955 01/08/1959 06/05/1963 |
06/05/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 816 | 70816 | 3049 | 63049 | 90049 | 04/1944 | 64A 64A 68A 65A 65D 62C W |
St Margarets St Margarets Carlisle Kingmoor Eastfield Dawsholm Dunfermline Upper Withdrawn |
25/11/1950 30/11/1950 12/06/1954 27/11/1954 30/12/1961 21/04/1962 16/09/1963 |
16/09/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 817 | 70817 | 90319 | 04/1944 | 67C 67C 67D 67C 62A W |
Ayr Ayr Ardrossan Ayr Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
24/03/1951 31/03/1951 11/03/1961 08/09/1962 30/11/1963 13/06/1964 |
13/06/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 818 | 70818 | 3050 | 63050 | 90050 | 04/1944 | 31B 31B 38A 34E W |
March March Colwick New England Withdrawn |
18/10/1952 01/11/1952 14/02/1953 20/02/1960 18/05/1963 |
18/05/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 819 | 70819 | 4304 | 04/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1956 | 10/1956 | ||||
WD/8 | 820 | 70820 | 28 | 04/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1957 | 27/08/1957 | ||||
WD/8 | 821 | 70821 | 3051 | 63051 | 90051 | 04/1944 | 38E 38A 38A 40E 41D 40E W |
Woodford Halse Colwick Colwick Langwith Junction Canklow Colwick Withdrawn |
25/06/1950 22/10/1950 25/11/1950 19/06/1954 20/06/1959 12/09/1959 03/10/1965 |
03/10/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 822 | 70822 | 3052 | 63052 | 90052 | 04/1944 | HLS 53A 53C 53C 38B 40B 40B 38D 38A 38A 41G 41F 41D W |
Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Springhead Annesley Immingham Immingham Staveley (G.C.) Colwick Colwick Barnsley Mexborough Canklow Withdrawn |
29/08/1948 11/02/1950 21/05/1950 30/06/1950 21/04/1951 08/09/1951 22/09/1951 29/12/1951 19/01/1952 26/01/1952 09/05/1959 20/06/1959 26/01/1963 05/03/1964 |
05/03/1964 | ||
WD/8 | 823 | 70823 | 3053 | 63053 | 90053 | 04/1944 | 36A 36B 38A 40B 36C W |
Doncaster Mexborough Colwick Immingham Frodingham Withdrawn |
24/10/1953 19/06/1954 18/02/1956 16/04/1960 15/10/1960 04/07/1965 |
04/07/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 824 | 70824 | 3054 | 63054 | 90054 | 04/1944 | 54D 54B 50D 56A 56F 56A 55D 55E W |
Consett Tyne Dock Starbeck Wakefield Low Moor Wakefield Royston Normanton Withdrawn |
18/04/1953 19/02/1955 20/07/1957 19/09/1959 29/12/1962 11/01/1964 16/07/1966 08/10/1966 21/01/1967 |
21/01/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 825 | 70825 | 90320 | 04/1944 | 65D 66A W |
Dawsholm Polmadie Withdrawn |
06/07/1957 10/05/1958 16/07/1962 |
16/07/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 826 | 70826 | 3055 | 63055 | 90055 | 05/1944 | IMM 31B 40B 40E 41H 41J 34E 40B W |
Immingham March Immingham Langwith Junction Staveley (G.C.) Langwith Junction New England Immingham Withdrawn |
30/05/1948 30/06/1950 24/10/1953 20/08/1955 19/07/1958 27/02/1960 07/05/1960 29/09/1962 14/03/1965 |
14/03/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 827 | 70827 | 3056 | 63056 | 90056 | 05/1944 | CLK NEV YK 51A 56A 56A 52G W |
Colwick Neville Hill York (North) Darlington Wakefield Wakefield Sunderland Withdrawn |
28/02/1948 29/08/1948 13/08/1949 16/06/1956 11/10/1958 11/09/1965 31/12/1966 03/05/1967 |
03/05/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 828 | 70828 | 3057 | 63057 | 90057 | 05/1944 | HLS HLD YK HLD 51A 52H 50B 50D W |
Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates York (North) Hull Dairycoates Darlington Tyne Dock Hull Dairycoates Goole Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 12/02/1949 17/09/1949 10/12/1949 20/06/1959 08/12/1962 21/12/1963 31/12/1966 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 829 | 70829 | 90321 | 05/1944 | 25E 25D 25D 56A 52G W |
Sowerby Bridge Mirfield Mirfield Wakefield Sunderland Withdrawn |
24/06/1950 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 14/06/1958 31/12/1966 01/07/1967 |
01/07/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 830 | 70830 | 3058 | 63058 | 90058 | 05/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 28/12/1963 | 28/12/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 831 | 70831 | 3059 | 63059 | 90059 | 05/1944 | 36A 36A 36C W |
Doncaster Doncaster Frodingham Withdrawn |
19/01/1952 26/01/1952 22/03/1952 04/04/1965 |
04/04/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 832 | 70832 | 3060 | 63060 | 90060 | 05/1944 | MAR 36A 31B 66A 65D 66A S W |
March Doncaster March Polmadie Dawsholm Polmadie Stored Withdrawn |
12/09/1948 27/09/1953 16/09/1956 23/03/1957 20/06/1957 08/01/1958 25/09/1961 11/06/1962 |
11/06/1962 | ||
WD/8 | 833 | 70833 | 90322 | 05/1944 | 25B 25G 56D 56F 56D 56A W |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Farnley Junction Mirfield Low Moor Mirfield Wakefield Withdrawn |
26/01/1952 23/02/1952 20/06/1959 23/01/1960 16/09/1961 11/01/1964 17/08/1964 |
17/08/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 834 | 70834 | 90323 | 05/1944 | CLK 86A 86A 86J 84G 86E 86C 84C 86A 9G W |
Colwick Ebbw Junction (Newport) Ebbw Junction (Newport) Aberdare Shrewsbury Severn Tunnel Junction Cardiff Canton Banbury Ebbw Junction (Newport) Gorton Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 01/12/1951 31/12/1951 01/11/1952 21/03/1953 16/05/1953 08/10/1955 05/11/1960 03/12/1960 20/05/1962 04/1964 |
04/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 835 | 70835 | 4305 | 05/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1953 | 12/1953 | ||||
WD/8 | 836 | 70836 | 90324 | 05/1944 | SPM 87K 26C 26B 26B W |
St Philips Marsh Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Bolton Agecroft Agecroft Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 04/1964 |
04/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 837 | 70837 | 3061 | 63061 | 90061 | 05/1944 | NPT HTN YK DAR 53A 53C 51A 56A 51C W |
Newport (Teeside) Heaton York (North) Darlington Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Darlington Wakefield West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
03/12/1945 13/04/1947 06/02/1949 13/02/1949 19/08/1951 21/03/1954 08/06/1958 14/09/1958 03/12/1966 27/06/1967 |
27/06/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 838 | 70838 | 90325 | 05/1944 | 25G 25B W |
Farnley Junction (Re-instd) Huddersfield Hillhouse Withdrawn |
14/01/1950 21/02/1953 13/09/1965 |
13/09/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 839 | 70839 | 90326 | 05/1944 | YK 25G 25D 25D 56A W |
York (North) Farnley Junction Mirfield Mirfield Wakefield Withdrawn |
29/05/1948 29/04/1950 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 14/06/1958 11/11/1963 |
11/11/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 840 | 70840 | 3062 | 63062 | 90062 | 05/1944 | 30A W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
06/02/1955 07/01/1960 |
07/01/1960 | ||
WD/8 | 841 | 70841 | 3063 | 63063 | 90063 | 05/1944 | CAR 35C 31B 36A W |
Carlisle Canal Spital Bridge March Doncaster Withdrawn |
27/03/1948 13/08/1950 31/01/1960 18/09/1960 17/04/1966 |
17/04/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 842 | 70842 | 3064 | 63064 | 90064 | 05/1944 | IMM 31B 36A 38A 41G 41F 41D W |
Immingham March Doncaster Colwick Barnsley Mexborough Canklow Withdrawn |
05/06/1948 30/06/1950 24/10/1953 29/01/1956 09/05/1959 20/06/1959 08/12/1962 15/01/1964 |
15/01/1964 | ||
WD/8 | 843 | 70843 | 90327 | 06/1944 | DID 84G 84G 26A 24J 27B 24B 9K 8L W |
Didcot Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Newton Heath Lancaster Green Ayre Aintree Rose Grove Bolton Aintree Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/09/1950 30/09/1950 31/12/1950 12/07/1958 10/01/1959 15/09/1962 25/01/1964 22/08/1964 16/01/1965 |
16/01/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 844 | 70844 | 3065 | 63065 | 90065 | 06/1944 | CLK WFD 2G 2G W |
Colwick (on loan) Woodford Halse Woodford Halse (on loan) Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
04/01/1946 26/10/1946 01/02/1958 23/02/1958 28/03/1964 |
28/03/1964 | ||
WD/8 | 845 | 70845 | 90328 | 06/1944 | 26A 26F 26A W |
Newton Heath Patricroft Newton Heath Withdrawn |
31/01/1959 15/09/1962 05/01/1963 09/05/1964 |
09/05/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 846 | 70846 | 3066 | 63066 | 90066 | 06/1944 | IMM 31B 36A 36B 38A 38E W |
Immingham March Doncaster Mexborough Colwick Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
05/06/1948 18/06/1950 27/09/1953 13/06/1954 29/01/1956 10/02/1957 25/05/1963 |
24/05/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 847 | 70847 | 3067 | 63067 | 90067 | 06/1944 | NPT HTN SKN 51C W |
Newport (Teeside) (on loan) Heaton Stockton West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
12/12/1945 13/04/1947 06/02/1949 14/08/1955 05/10/1964 |
05/10/1964 | ||
WD/8 | 848 | 70848 | 3068 | 63068 | 90068 | 06/1944 | CLK GOR CLK ANN CLK NEV NPT 50A 56A 56F 56D 56A W |
Colwick (on loan) Gorton Colwick Annesley Colwick Neville Hill Newport (Teeside) York (North) Wakefield Low Moor Mirfield Wakefield Withdrawn |
22/11/1945 18/08/1946 20/10/1946 01/02/1948 23/05/1948 29/08/1948 07/08/1949 16/06/1957 01/11/1959 08/11/1959 10/09/1961 05/01/1964 10/07/1966 |
10/07/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 849 | 70849 | 90329 | 06/1944 | 25E 56A W |
Sowerby Bridge Wakefield Withdrawn |
16/06/1956 14/09/1963 27/09/1965 |
27/09/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 850 | 70850 | 90330 | 06/1944 | GRA 38A 38A 38D 38D 38A 38A 36B 41D 36A W |
Grantham Colwick Colwick Staveley (G.C.) Staveley (G.C.) Colwick Colwick Mexborough Canklow Doncaster Withdrawn |
09/04/1949 21/05/1950 31/05/1950 29/10/1950 25/11/1950 07/07/1951 21/07/1951 14/02/1953 28/09/1963 19/06/1965 19/12/1965 |
19/12/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 851 | 70851 | 90331 | 06/1944 | 26E 26F 26A W |
Lees (Oldham) Patricroft Newton Heath Withdrawn |
23/09/1961 15/09/1962 09/02/1963 30/11/1963 |
30/11/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 852 | 70852 | 3071 | 63071 | 90071 | 06/1944 | 64A 64A 66B 66B 66C 66B 62C W |
St Margarets St Margarets Motherwell Motherwell Hamilton (West) Motherwell Dunfermline Upper Withdrawn |
25/11/1950 30/11/1950 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 04/08/1956 27/09/1958 03/08/1963 22/04/1967 |
22/04/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 853 | 70853 | 90332 | 06/1944 | 91M 91M W 55E |
To London Midland Region To London Midland Region Withdrawn Normanton |
10/06/1950 17/06/1950 21/01/1967 28/01/1967 |
21/01/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 854 | 70854 | 3069 | 63069 | 90069 | 06/1944 | ANN CLK ANN CLK NEV YK 91W 40B 84G 86G 86A 86C 81C 36A 41D 41H 41J W |
Annesley Colwick Annesley Colwick Neville Hill York (North) To Western Region / GWR Immingham Shrewsbury Pontypool Road Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Southall Doncaster Canklow Staveley (G.C.) Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
29/06/1947 15/11/1947 14/02/1948 29/05/1948 04/09/1948 13/08/1949 31/08/1951 08/09/1951 21/02/1953 06/11/1954 01/01/1955 31/10/1959 06/10/1962 02/12/1962 26/01/1963 03/04/1965 19/06/1965 30/01/1966 |
30/01/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 855 | 70855 | 4306 | 06/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1955 | 12/1955 | ||||
WD/8 | 856 | 70856 | 4307 | 06/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | ||||
WD/8 | 857 | 70857 | 90333 | 07/1944 | 24A 25A 56F 56D 56A W |
Accrington Wakefield Low Moor Mirfield Wakefield Withdrawn |
21/05/1949 20/08/1949 15/11/1958 16/09/1961 07/03/1964 25/10/1965 |
25/10/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 858 | 70858 | 3072 | 63072 | 90072 | 07/1944 | 53A 53A 51L 50D W |
Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Thornaby Goole Withdrawn |
20/01/1951 31/01/1951 06/02/1960 31/08/1963 27/12/1965 |
27/12/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 859 | 70859 | 90334 | 07/1944 | 55E 55C W |
Normanton Farnley Junction Withdrawn |
20/07/1957 24/01/1959 18/11/1963 |
18/11/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 860 | 70860 | 90335 | 07/1944 | 24A 24C 24F W |
Accrington Lostock Hall Fleetwood Withdrawn |
21/05/1949 29/10/1949 10/02/1962 09/11/1963 |
09/11/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 861 | 70861 | 4308 | 07/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | ||||
WD/8 | 862 | 70862 | 4309 | 07/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1957 | 07/1957 | ||||
WD/8 | 863 | 70863 | 4310 | 07/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1958 | 02/1958 | ||||
WD/8 | 864 | 70864 | 90336 | 07/1944 | 25G 55D 56A W |
Farnley Junction (Re-instd) Royston Wakefield Withdrawn |
14/01/1950 20/06/1959 26/10/1963 09/01/1966 |
09/01/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 865 | 70865 | 90337 | 08/1944 | 25A 55E 55D 55E W |
Wakefield (Re-instd) Normanton Royston Normanton Withdrawn |
16/07/1949 20/07/1957 09/10/1965 08/10/1966 09/01/1967 |
09/01/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 866 | 70866 | 90338 | 08/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 16/11/1963 | 16/11/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 867 | 70867 | 90339 | 08/1944 | 51C W |
West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
08/10/1966 01/07/1967 |
01/07/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 868 | 70868 | 4311 | 08/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | ||||
WD/8 | 869 | 70869 | 4312 | 08/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1956 | 03/1956 | ||||
WD/8 | 870 | 70870 | 3073 | 63073 | 90073 | 08/1944 | ANN CLK 34E 36A W |
Annesley Colwick New England Doncaster Withdrawn |
14/02/1948 26/06/1948 12/12/1959 13/04/1963 27/02/1966 |
27/02/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 871 | 70871 | 90340 | 08/1944 | 36B 31B 36A 41E W |
Mexborough March Doncaster Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
25/02/1950 22/09/1956 21/10/1961 11/01/1964 11/07/1965 |
11/07/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 872 | 70872 | 3074 | 63074 | 90074 | 08/1944 | 51L 52H 56A 52G 51C W |
Thornaby Tyne Dock Wakefield Sunderland West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
14/06/1958 08/12/1962 21/12/1963 05/11/1966 25/03/1967 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 873 | 70873 | 4313 | 08/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1954 | 01/1954 | ||||
WD/8 | 874 | 70874 | 90341 | 08/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 15/07/1965 | 15/07/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 875 | 70875 | 90342 | 08/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 07/11/1965 | 07/11/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 876 | 70876 | 90343 | 08/1944 | SPM 87K 26B 26C 26C 27B W |
St Philips Marsh Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Agecroft Bolton Bolton Aintree Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 23/04/1955 21/12/1963 |
21/12/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 877 | 70877 | 90344 | 08/1944 | 91E 51C W |
To Eastern Region (on loan) West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
25/07/1947 22/10/1955 20/11/1964 |
20/11/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 878 | 70878 | 90345 | 08/1944 | BTN BA BTN 91M 55D 55E 56A W |
Brighton (on loan) Bricklayers Arms Brighton To London Midland Region Royston Normanton Wakefield Withdrawn |
04/11/1947 08/01/1949 30/06/1949 17/06/1950 14/09/1963 13/06/1964 09/10/1965 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 879 | 70879 | 4314 | 09/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | ||||
WD/8 | 7000 | 77000 | 90101 | 25/01/1943 | 91W PDN 26A 25A 27B W |
To Western Region / GWR (on loan) Old Oak Common Newton Heath Wakefield Aintree Withdrawn |
16/07/1947 30/06/1948 31/12/1950 01/12/1951 19/06/1954 16/05/1964 |
16/05/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7001 | 77001 | 90102 | 05/02/1943 | NA 26B 27D 26C W |
Newton Abbot Agecroft Wigan Central (L&Y) Bolton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 02/12/1950 23/02/1957 20/04/1957 12/10/1963 |
12/10/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7002 | 77002 | 3001 | 63001 | 90001 | 02/1943 | 53A 53A 38B 40B 40B 38A 31B 36A 40E 36A W |
Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Annesley Immingham Immingham Colwick March Doncaster Colwick Doncaster Withdrawn |
20/01/1951 31/01/1951 21/04/1951 08/09/1951 22/09/1951 29/12/1951 24/08/1957 24/09/1960 09/10/1965 13/11/1965 17/04/1966 |
17/04/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 7003 | 77003 | 90103 | 02/1943 | CLK W |
Colwick Withdrawn |
13/08/1949 21/11/1965 |
21/11/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7004 | 77004 | 90104 | 02/1943 | MEX 31B 36B 38A W |
Mexborough March Mexborough Colwick Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 03/11/1951 14/02/1953 18/02/1956 12/02/1966 |
12/02/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7005 | 77005 | 90105 | 17/02/1943 | PDN 26A W |
Old Oak Common Newton Heath Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/12/1950 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7006 | 77006 | 90106 | 02/1943 | NWE 33B 31B 33A 33B 34E W |
New England Tilbury March Plaistow Tilbury New England Withdrawn |
13/08/1949 12/04/1958 27/06/1959 10/10/1959 07/11/1959 02/12/1961 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7007 | 77007 | 90107 | 02/1943 | BTN RED HIT 91M 25D 27B W |
Brighton (on loan) Redhill Hither Green To London Midland Region Mirfield Aintree Withdrawn |
07/11/1947 03/05/1949 04/02/1950 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 14/08/1954 16/11/1963 |
16/11/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7008 | 77008 | 90108 | 02/1943 | 36A 36A 35A 36A 68A 68A 36A 36A 31B 36A 36E 36C W |
Doncaster Doncaster New England Doncaster Carlisle Kingmoor Carlisle Kingmoor Doncaster Doncaster March Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Frodingham Withdrawn |
02/06/1951 23/06/1951 22/03/1952 19/04/1952 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 15/11/1952 13/12/1952 22/09/1956 16/03/1957 06/02/1960 05/11/1960 01/08/1965 |
01/08/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7009 | 77009 | 3000 | 63000 | 90000 | 02/1943 | 34E 36C W |
New England Frodingham Withdrawn |
21/02/1959 29/09/1962 06/06/1965 |
06/06/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 7010 | 77010 | 90109 | 04/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1964 | 04/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7011 | 77011 | 4533 | 05/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1957 | 10/1957 | ||||
WD/8 | 7012 | 77012 | 90110 | 03/1943 | OXY 84G 84G 26C 26C 9K 9J W |
Oxley Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Bolton Bolton Bolton Agecroft Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/08/1950 31/08/1950 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 14/09/1963 19/10/1963 07/03/1964 |
07/03/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7013 | 77013 | 90111 | 03/1943 | YK CLK 31B 31B 36C 36C W |
York (North) Colwick March March Frodingham Frodingham Withdrawn |
29/05/1948 04/09/1948 08/10/1950 21/10/1950 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 06/04/1964 |
06/04/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7014 | 77014 | 90112 | 26/03/1943 | OXY 26F 24C 24D 24A 25D 56A 52G W |
Oxley Lees (Oldham) Lostock Hall Lower Darwen Accrington Mirfield Wakefield Sunderland Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 30/04/1949 14/05/1949 13/10/1951 14/06/1952 03/12/1955 14/06/1958 03/12/1966 10/01/1967 |
10/01/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7015 | 77015 | 90113 | 03/1943 | PDN 84G 84G 6C 26A 56E 56A W |
Old Oak Common Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Birkenhead Mollington Street Newton Heath Sowerby Bridge Wakefield Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/08/1950 31/08/1950 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 14/12/1957 11/01/1964 04/09/1966 |
04/09/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7016 | 77016 | 90114 | 03/1943 | STM 66B 66B 65D 65A 65F W |
St Margarets Motherwell Motherwell Dawsholm Eastfield Grangemouth Withdrawn |
04/12/1948 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 01/12/1951 19/01/1963 30/11/1963 07/07/1964 |
07/07/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7017 | 77017 | 90115 | 03/1943 | STV 38A 36C W |
Staveley (G.C.) Colwick Frodingham Withdrawn |
26/02/1949 23/07/1955 22/10/1960 09/05/1965 |
09/05/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7018 | 77018 | 90116 | 03/1943 | 51A 56A 51C W |
Darlington Wakefield West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
14/06/1958 11/10/1958 03/12/1966 27/06/1967 |
27/06/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7019 | 77019 | 90117 | 03/1943 | 62A W |
Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
22/12/1956 20/01/1967 |
20/01/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7020 | 77020 | 90118 | 03/1943 | MEX IMM IMM 31B 36B 36B 38A W |
Mexborough (on loan) Immingham Immingham March Mexborough Mexborough Colwick Withdrawn |
18/11/1947 30/11/1949 03/12/1949 30/06/1950 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 18/02/1956 25/11/1963 |
25/11/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7021 | 77021 | 3002 | 63002 | 90002 | 03/1943 | HSY CLK 38D 38D 38A 38A 36A W |
Hornsey Colwick Staveley (G.C.) Staveley (G.C.) Colwick Colwick Doncaster Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 18/09/1948 20/01/1951 31/01/1951 29/09/1951 20/10/1951 01/01/1966 17/04/1966 |
17/04/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 7022 | 77022 | 90119 | 03/1943 | 31B 36B 36B 38A 31B 36A 41F 36C W |
March Mexborough Mexborough Colwick March Doncaster Mexborough Frodingham Withdrawn |
18/06/1950 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 18/02/1956 24/03/1956 16/03/1957 19/07/1958 25/08/1962 17/01/1965 |
17/01/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7023 | 77023 | 90120 | 03/1943 | 38A 36C W |
Colwick Frodingham Withdrawn |
18/02/1956 22/10/1960 04/04/1965 |
04/04/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7024 | 77024 | 90121 | 03/1943 | 27B 27B 27D 26C 41J 41H 41E W |
Aintree Aintree Wigan Central (L&Y) Bolton Langwith Junction Staveley (G.C.) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/09/1951 08/09/1951 28/11/1953 06/02/1960 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 20/06/1965 |
20/06/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7025 | 77025 | 90122 | 04/1943 | 24B 38A 38A 8B 26G 26G 26A 56E 56A W |
Rose Grove (Re-instd) Colwick Colwick Warrington Dallam Belle Vue Belle Vue Newton Heath Sowerby Bridge Wakefield Withdrawn |
24/12/1949 25/11/1950 30/11/1950 08/09/1951 26/01/1952 23/02/1952 21/04/1956 20/10/1956 11/01/1964 27/09/1965 |
27/09/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7026 | 77026 | 90123 | 04/1943 | OXY 84G 84G 26A 26D 26B 26E 9D 8L 10H 10F W |
Oxley Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Newton Heath Bury Agecroft Lees (Oldham) Newton Heath Aintree Lower Darwen Rose Grove Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/09/1950 30/09/1950 31/12/1950 29/12/1951 05/10/1957 28/12/1957 18/04/1964 04/07/1964 25/07/1964 07/11/1964 27/03/1965 |
27/03/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7027 | 77027 | 90124 | 08/04/1943 | STJ 25A 25D 25D 56A W |
Severn Tunnel Junction Wakefield (Re-instd) Mirfield Mirfield Wakefield Withdrawn |
31/05/1948 18/06/1949 03/03/1951 24/03/1951 14/06/1958 21/06/1965 |
21/06/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7028 | 77028 | 90125 | 04/1943 | 91W OXY 66B 91W 84B 84B 86A 86C 8B 27B 8F 10D 16E 10D W |
To Western Region / GWR (on loan) Oxley Motherwell (on loan) To Western Region / GWR Oxley Oxley Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Warrington Dallam Aintree Springs Branch (Wigan) Lostock Hall Kirkby in Ashfield Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
25/03/1947 15/06/1947 26/01/1950 02/09/1951 08/09/1951 30/09/1951 31/10/1951 06/11/1954 30/08/1962 19/01/1963 13/07/1963 14/09/1963 21/12/1963 18/04/1964 17/07/1965 |
17/07/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7029 | 77029 | 90126 | 04/1943 | 38A 38A 8B 26G 26G 26A 56F 51A 56D 56A 56D 56B 56A W |
Colwick Colwick Warrington Dallam Belle Vue Belle Vue Newton Heath Low Moor Darlington Mirfield Wakefield Mirfield Ardsley Wakefield Withdrawn |
25/11/1950 30/11/1950 08/09/1951 26/01/1952 23/02/1952 21/04/1956 20/10/1956 14/06/1958 11/10/1958 26/11/1960 17/06/1961 07/07/1962 06/11/1965 03/01/1967 |
03/01/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7030 | 77030 | 90127 | 04/1943 | HIT 27B 27B 25A 27B 25G 55D W |
Hither Green Aintree Aintree Wakefield Aintree Farnley Junction Royston Withdrawn |
04/02/1950 16/06/1951 27/06/1951 11/08/1951 19/06/1954 21/04/1956 14/10/1961 26/10/1964 |
26/10/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7031 | 77031 | 90128 | 04/1943 | 65A 65F W |
Eastfield Grangemouth Withdrawn |
04/07/1959 30/12/1961 05/11/1962 |
05/11/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7032 | 77032 | 90129 | 04/1943 | CLK 31B 30A 34B 34E 40B W |
Colwick March Stratford Hornsey New England Immingham Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 23/01/1954 18/04/1959 30/04/1960 17/06/1961 29/09/1962 06/1964 |
06/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7033 | 77033 | 3004 | 63004 | 90004 | 04/1943 | 66A 62A W |
Polmadie Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
04/06/1960 24/02/1962 28/12/1963 |
28/12/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 7034 | 77034 | 90130 | 04/1943 | 36B 38A 34E 36E 40E W |
Mexborough Colwick New England Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Colwick Withdrawn |
10/11/1951 18/02/1956 07/05/1960 13/04/1963 19/06/1965 17/10/1965 |
17/10/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7035 | 77035 | 90131 | 04/1943 | 40B 36E W |
Immingham Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
24/10/1953 28/09/1963 21/03/1965 |
21/03/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7036 | 77036 | 90132 | 04/1943 | 51L 50D W |
Thornaby Goole Withdrawn |
14/06/1958 24/08/1963 10/04/1967 |
10/04/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7037 | 77037 | 90133 | 04/1943 | IMM 36C 36C W |
Immingham Frodingham Frodingham Withdrawn |
12/06/1948 26/05/1951 23/06/1951 17/10/1965 |
17/10/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7038 | 77038 | 4534 | 04/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1955 | 06/1955 | ||||
WD/8 | 7039 | 77039 | 90134 | 05/1943 | 66A 65D 65B W |
Polmadie Dawsholm St Rollox (Balornock) Withdrawn |
23/02/1952 21/10/1961 30/12/1961 30/07/1962 |
30/07/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7040 | 77040 | 90135 | 09/05/1943 | OXY BHD 24D 24D 25C 51A 56D 56A 56D 56B 56A 52G W |
Oxley Birkenhead Mollington Street Lower Darwen Lower Darwen Goole Darlington Mirfield Wakefield Mirfield Ardsley Wakefield Sunderland Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 30/04/1948 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 29/11/1952 14/06/1958 07/11/1959 24/12/1960 17/06/1961 07/03/1964 17/07/1965 31/12/1966 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7041 | 77041 | 90136 | 05/1943 | 41F 41D W |
Mexborough Canklow Withdrawn |
19/07/1958 08/12/1962 11/04/1965 |
11/04/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7042 | 77042 | 90137 | 05/1943 | CLK WFD WFD W |
Colwick Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 07/1949 23/07/1949 22/12/1962 |
22/12/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7043 | 77043 | 4325 | 05/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1954 | 12/1954 | ||||
WD/8 | 7044 | 77044 | 90138 | 05/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 28/03/1964 | 28/03/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7045 | 77045 | 4326 | 05/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1954 | 09/1954 | ||||
WD/8 | 7046 | 77046 | 3005 | 63005 | 90005 | 05/1943 | 31B 36A 36B 38A 36E W |
March Doncaster Mexborough Colwick Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
30/06/1950 24/10/1953 19/06/1954 18/02/1956 28/09/1963 25/04/1965 |
25/04/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 7047 | 77047 | 90139 | 05/1943 | CLK WFD WFD CLK 38D 38A 41F 41D W |
Colwick Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Colwick Staveley (G.C.) Colwick Mexborough Canklow Withdrawn |
18/09/1948 07/1949 23/07/1949 28/01/1950 10/11/1951 29/12/1951 19/07/1958 08/12/1962 02/05/1965 |
02/05/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7048 | 77048 | 90140 | 05/1943 | 38A 38A 8B 26G 26G 26A 26E 26F 8D 8F 26B W |
Colwick Colwick Warrington Dallam Belle Vue Belle Vue Newton Heath Lees (Oldham) Patricroft Widnes Springs Branch (Wigan) Agecroft Withdrawn |
25/11/1950 30/11/1950 08/09/1951 26/01/1952 23/02/1952 21/04/1956 30/11/1957 15/09/1962 19/01/1963 16/03/1963 08/06/1963 19/09/1964 |
19/09/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7049 | 77049 | 90141 | 21/05/1943 | OXY OXY 25A 25A 27B 26E 26F 8D 27B W |
Oxley (on loan) Oxley Wakefield Wakefield Aintree Lees (Oldham) Patricroft Widnes Aintree Withdrawn |
22/10/1946 15/06/1947 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 19/06/1954 28/12/1957 15/09/1962 12/01/1963 19/01/1963 22/02/1964 |
22/02/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7050 | 77050 | 90521 | 05/1943 | MEX 41D 41E W |
Mexborough Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
13/08/1949 07/03/1964 21/03/1964 11/10/1964 |
11/10/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7051 | 77051 | 90522 | 05/1943 | COL 31B 30A 31A 33B 31B 36A 36E W |
Colchester March Stratford Cambridge Tilbury March Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
08/05/1948 20/10/1951 03/12/1960 25/03/1961 22/04/1961 17/06/1961 28/10/1961 09/03/1963 02/05/1965 |
02/05/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7052 | 77052 | 90523 | 05/1943 | 63A 91X 91X 26A 26A W |
Perth South To Scottish Region To Scottish Region Newton Heath Newton Heath Withdrawn |
25/03/1950 24/04/1950 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 01/09/1951 08/09/1951 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7053 | 77053 | 90524 | 05/1943 | CDF PPRD 85A 85A 85B 85B 86C 18B 2F W |
Cardiff Canton Pontypool Road Worcester Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Gloucester Horton Road Cardiff Canton Westhouses Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/07/1948 21/04/1951 19/05/1951 08/09/1951 30/09/1951 21/02/1953 18/07/1959 03/10/1959 25/05/1963 |
25/05/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7054 | 77054 | 90525 | 05/1943 | 26A 26E W 9D |
Newton Heath (Re-instd) Lees (Oldham) Withdrawn Newton Heath |
03/12/1949 14/06/1958 04/1964 18/04/1964 |
04/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7055 | 77055 | 90526 | 05/1943 | HLD NEV STV 35A 35A 30A 33A 33A W |
Hull Dairycoates Neville Hill Staveley (G.C.) New England New England Stratford Plaistow Plaistow Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 16/04/1949 13/08/1949 16/02/1952 23/02/1952 19/02/1955 19/03/1955 14/05/1955 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7056 | 77056 | 90527 | 05/1943 | 91M 91M 25G 25B 25G 84G 25G 27B W |
To London Midland Region To London Midland Region Farnley Junction Huddersfield Hillhouse Farnley Junction Shrewsbury Farnley Junction Aintree Withdrawn |
10/06/1950 17/06/1950 26/01/1952 23/02/1952 21/02/1953 08/08/1953 03/10/1953 21/04/1956 11/05/1963 |
11/05/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7057 | 77057 | 90528 | 06/1943 | CLK NWE NWE 38A 35A 35C 31B 30A 36A 36E 40E W |
Colwick New England New England Colwick New England Spital Bridge March Stratford Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Colwick Withdrawn |
18/09/1948 26/11/1949 30/11/1949 18/02/1956 24/03/1956 09/11/1957 06/02/1960 03/12/1960 23/09/1961 09/03/1963 19/06/1965 26/09/1965 |
26/09/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7058 | 77058 | 90529 | 06/1943 | OXF 81C 87G 87F 86A 41F 41D 41E 41J W |
Oxford Southall Carmarthen Llanelli Ebbw Junction (Newport) Mexborough Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/06/1956 22/03/1958 18/06/1960 16/06/1962 02/12/1962 07/03/1964 21/03/1964 09/10/1965 14/11/1965 |
14/11/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7059 | 77059 | 90530 | 06/1943 | 63A 91X 91X 26A 26A 26F 26A W |
Perth South To Scottish Region To Scottish Region Newton Heath Newton Heath Patricroft Newton Heath Withdrawn |
25/03/1950 24/04/1950 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 01/09/1951 08/09/1951 27/02/1960 05/01/1963 18/05/1963 |
18/05/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7060 | 77060 | 90531 | 06/1943 | 25E 25C 25C W |
Sowerby Bridge Goole Goole Withdrawn |
24/06/1950 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 02/09/1963 |
02/09/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7061 | 77061 | 90532 | 06/1943 | CLK 38E 38E 38D 38A 38A 2E 6B 6F 6B 8D W |
Colwick Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Staveley (G.C.) Colwick Colwick Northampton Mold Junction Bidston Mold Junction Widnes Withdrawn |
18/09/1948 29/09/1951 20/10/1951 17/05/1952 06/09/1952 20/09/1952 24/04/1954 20/04/1957 25/07/1959 15/08/1959 28/04/1962 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7062 | 77062 | 90533 | 06/1943 | BA 26A 9J 9G 8L 36E 40E W |
Bricklayers Arms Newton Heath Agecroft Gorton Aintree Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Colwick Withdrawn |
12/03/1949 11/08/1951 15/02/1964 17/10/1964 13/02/1965 17/04/1965 19/06/1965 12/02/1966 |
12/02/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7063 | 77063 | 90534 | 06/1943 | 62C W |
Dunfermline Upper Withdrawn |
19/01/1963 27/10/1966 |
27/10/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7064 | 77064 | 90535 | 06/1943 | OXY 84G 6C 26A 27B 8F 10D W |
Oxley Shrewsbury Birkenhead Mollington Street Newton Heath Aintree Springs Branch (Wigan) Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 17/06/1950 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 03/12/1955 13/07/1963 14/09/1963 17/10/1964 |
17/10/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7065 | 77065 | 4327 | 06/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1956 | 05/1956 | ||||
WD/8 | 7066 | 77066 | 90536 | 06/1943 | 66A 61B W |
Polmadie Aberdeen Ferryhill Withdrawn |
19/04/1952 24/03/1962 08/1963 |
08/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7067 | 77067 | 90537 | 06/1943 | MEX 36A 31B 36A 36C 36A W |
Mexborough Doncaster March Doncaster Frodingham Doncaster Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 03/11/1951 22/09/1956 16/03/1957 26/11/1960 06/11/1965 27/02/1966 |
27/02/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7068 | 77068 | 90538 | 06/1943 | MEX 36A 36A 31B 36A 40B 36A W |
Mexborough (on loan) Doncaster Doncaster March Doncaster Immingham Doncaster Withdrawn |
10/11/1947 02/06/1951 23/06/1951 22/09/1956 16/03/1957 06/11/1965 12/02/1966 17/04/1966 |
17/04/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7069 | 77069 | 4329 | 07/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1957 | 11/1957 | ||||
WD/8 | 7070 | 77070 | 90539 | 07/1943 | 65F W |
Grangemouth Withdrawn |
19/12/1959 29/11/1963 |
29/11/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7071 | 77071 | 90540 | 07/1943 | 36C 36C W |
Frodingham Frodingham Withdrawn |
24/03/1951 31/03/1951 04/07/1965 |
04/07/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7072 | 77072 | 90541 | 07/1943 | 10F W |
Rose Grove Withdrawn |
07/11/1964 08/05/1965 |
08/05/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7073 | 77073 | 90542 | 07/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 08/07/1963 | 08/07/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7074 | 77074 | 90543 | 07/1943 | 25D 50A 56A W |
Mirfield York (North) Wakefield Withdrawn |
17/06/1950 14/06/1958 07/11/1959 22/02/1965 |
22/02/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7075 | 77075 | 90544 | 07/1943 | CLK 86A 86A 81C 36C 41F 41D 41E W |
Colwick Ebbw Junction (Newport) Ebbw Junction (Newport) Southall Frodingham Mexborough Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 01/12/1951 31/12/1951 03/11/1962 02/12/1962 26/01/1963 07/03/1964 21/03/1964 11/06/1964 |
11/06/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7076 | 77076 | 90545 | 07/1943 | 64A 38A 40E 40E W |
St Margarets Colwick Langwith Junction Colwick Withdrawn |
23/02/1952 19/09/1953 19/06/1954 07/05/1960 03/10/1965 |
03/10/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7077 | 77077 | 90546 | 07/1943 | OXY 87K 26B W |
Oxley Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Agecroft Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 20/05/1950 02/12/1950 08/02/1964 |
08/02/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7078 | 77078 | 90547 | 07/1943 | 64A 62C W |
St Margarets Dunfermline Upper Withdrawn |
04/10/1952 25/12/1954 27/10/1966 |
27/10/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7079 | 77079 | 90548 | 08/1943 | OXY 84G 26A 26F 26A W |
Oxley Shrewsbury Newton Heath Patricroft Newton Heath Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 15/07/1950 31/12/1950 14/04/1962 05/01/1963 04/1964 |
04/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7080 | 77080 | 90549 | 08/1943 | 65D 66A 67C 67D 67C W |
Dawsholm Polmadie Ayr Ardrossan Ayr Withdrawn |
06/08/1950 02/08/1958 22/10/1960 11/03/1961 21/04/1962 17/12/1962 |
17/12/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7081 | 77081 | 90550 | 08/1943 | 31B 36A 36C W |
March Doncaster Frodingham Withdrawn |
03/11/1951 16/03/1957 06/02/1960 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7082 | 77082 | 4331 | 08/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1955 | 04/1955 | ||||
WD/8 | 7083 | 77083 | 3101 | 63101 | 90422 | 08/1943 | COL MAR 36C 36C W |
Colchester March Frodingham Frodingham Withdrawn |
10/04/1948 24/04/1948 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 06/06/1965 |
06/06/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 7084 | 77084 | 4401 | 08/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | ||||
WD/8 | 7085 | 77085 | 90551 | 08/1943 | CLK ANN CLK 38D 38D 35A 35A 30A 36A 36E 36C 36A W |
Colwick Annesley Colwick Staveley (G.C.) Staveley (G.C.) New England New England Stratford Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Frodingham Doncaster Withdrawn |
28/02/1948 30/10/1948 29/01/1949 13/10/1951 20/10/1951 16/02/1952 23/02/1952 19/02/1955 22/10/1960 11/05/1963 19/06/1965 06/11/1965 17/04/1966 |
17/04/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7086 | 77086 | 90552 | 08/1943 | 26A 26A 26G 26A 27B W |
Newton Heath Newton Heath Belle Vue Newton Heath Aintree Withdrawn |
18/08/1951 08/09/1951 23/02/1952 21/04/1956 22/11/1958 04/1964 |
04/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7087 | 77087 | 90553 | 08/1943 | 65F W |
Grangemouth Withdrawn |
19/01/1963 18/10/1965 |
18/10/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7088 | 77088 | 90554 | 08/1943 | 35A 35A 40E 40E W |
New England New England Langwith Junction Colwick Withdrawn |
27/08/1950 23/09/1950 22/01/1955 07/05/1960 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7089 | 77089 | 90555 | 08/1943 | CAR 24A 24A 26D 26B W |
Carlisle Canal Accrington Accrington Bury Agecroft Withdrawn |
27/03/1948 01/09/1951 08/09/1951 29/12/1951 22/06/1963 06/06/1964 |
06/06/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7090 | 77090 | 90556 | 08/1943 | 91M 26B 25A 24F 24C 24D W |
To London Midland Region Agecroft Wakefield Fleetwood Lostock Hall Lower Darwen Withdrawn |
27/06/1951 11/08/1951 06/10/1951 24/03/1956 23/02/1957 23/09/1961 20/03/1965 |
20/03/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7091 | 77091 | 3102 | 63102 | 90423 | 08/1943 | YK DAR 53A 53A 8B 6B 7A 6B 38A 2E 6B 8D 8F 40E W |
York (North) Darlington Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Warrington Dallam Mold Junction Llandudno Junction Mold Junction Colwick Northampton Mold Junction Widnes Springs Branch (Wigan) Colwick Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 19/02/1949 08/09/1951 22/09/1951 16/02/1952 23/02/1952 22/03/1952 19/04/1952 17/05/1952 24/04/1954 20/04/1957 25/07/1959 16/03/1963 12/09/1964 26/12/1965 |
26/12/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 7092 | 77092 | 90557 | 08/1943 | 24B 24B 41D 36A W |
Rose Grove Rose Grove Canklow Doncaster Withdrawn |
03/12/1949 24/12/1949 12/09/1964 19/06/1965 26/09/1965 |
26/09/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7093 | 77093 | 3103 | 63103 | 90424 | 08/1943 | NEV YK 50C 50A 51B 50A W |
Neville Hill York (North) Selby York (North) Newport (Teeside) York (North) Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 13/08/1949 20/06/1953 19/06/1954 16/06/1956 20/07/1957 09/12/1963 |
09/12/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 7094 | 77094 | 90558 | 09/1943 | 26A 26B 9G 41D 41J W |
Newton Heath Agecroft Gorton Canklow Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
11/08/1951 22/11/1958 01/06/1963 12/09/1964 19/06/1965 14/11/1965 |
14/11/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7095 | 77095 | 90559 | 09/1943 | NWE 31B 32A 31B 30A 31B 36A W |
New England March Norwich Thorpe March Stratford March Doncaster Withdrawn |
13/08/1949 19/10/1957 11/04/1959 06/02/1960 03/12/1960 17/06/1961 28/10/1961 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7096 | 77096 | 90560 | 09/1943 | 64A 62C 65F 62C 52G 62C W |
St Margarets Dunfermline Upper Grangemouth Dunfermline Upper Sunderland Dunfermline Upper Withdrawn |
04/10/1952 27/11/1954 19/01/1963 04/12/1965 31/12/1966 25/02/1967 22/04/1967 |
22/04/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7097 | 77097 | 90561 | 09/1943 | OXY 84G 26A 27D 26A 8L 8F W |
Oxley Shrewsbury Newton Heath Wigan Central (L&Y) Newton Heath Aintree Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 15/07/1950 31/12/1950 24/01/1959 06/02/1960 11/07/1964 25/07/1964 27/03/1965 |
27/03/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7098 | 77098 | 90562 | 09/1943 | 25D 91M 25D 25G W |
Mirfield To London Midland Region Mirfield Farnley Junction Withdrawn |
24/02/1951 14/03/1951 31/03/1951 03/10/1953 12/11/1962 |
12/11/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7099 | 77099 | 90563 | 09/1943 | PPRD 84G 84D 84G 82B 18B 2F 16D 1G 8L W |
Pontypool Road Shrewsbury Leamington Shrewsbury St Philips Marsh Westhouses Woodford Halse Nottingham Woodford Halse Aintree Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/02/1953 03/10/1953 24/04/1954 06/11/1954 18/07/1959 05/12/1959 08/02/1964 18/04/1964 25/04/1964 07/08/1965 |
07/08/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7100 | 77100 | 3104 | 63104 | 90425 | 09/1943 | 36C 36C W |
Frodingham Frodingham Withdrawn |
24/03/1951 31/03/1951 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | ||
WD/8 | 7101 | 77101 | 90564 | 09/1943 | 91M 26B 24C 26B 9G 9P 9G W |
To London Midland Region Agecroft Lostock Hall Agecroft Gorton Lees (Oldham) Gorton Withdrawn |
27/06/1951 11/08/1951 18/06/1960 07/10/1961 01/06/1963 21/09/1963 15/02/1964 25/04/1964 |
25/04/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7102 | 77102 | 90565 | 09/1943 | OXY 86C 85E 86A 81C 81E 84C 81C W |
Oxley Cardiff Canton Gloucester Barnwood Ebbw Junction (Newport) Southall Didcot Banbury Southall Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 17/05/1952 28/11/1959 16/07/1960 03/12/1960 25/03/1961 22/04/1961 07/10/1961 12/11/1962 |
12/11/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7103 | 77103 | 90566 | 09/1943 | 6B 6C 8B 8G W |
Mold Junction Birkenhead Mollington Street Warrington Dallam Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
20/10/1951 11/11/1961 15/09/1962 19/01/1963 11/07/1964 |
11/07/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7104 | 77104 | 90567 | 09/1943 | 53A 8B 6B 38A 40E 31B 36A 41F 41D 41E W |
Hull Dairycoates Warrington Dallam Mold Junction Colwick Langwith Junction March Doncaster Mexborough Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
11/02/1950 16/02/1952 23/02/1952 17/05/1952 19/06/1954 21/07/1956 16/03/1957 19/07/1958 07/03/1964 14/03/1964 15/11/1964 |
15/11/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7105 | 77105 | 4334 | 09/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1958 | 02/1958 | ||||
WD/8 | 7106 | 77106 | 90568 | 09/1943 | STJ 26A 26D 26F 26A W |
Severn Tunnel Junction Newton Heath Bury Patricroft Newton Heath Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/12/1950 28/11/1953 14/01/1961 12/01/1963 18/01/1964 |
18/01/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7107 | 77107 | 90569 | 09/1943 | 64A 64A 31B 31B 36A 40B W |
St Margarets St Margarets March March Doncaster Immingham Withdrawn |
25/11/1950 30/11/1950 17/02/1952 22/03/1952 16/03/1957 10/07/1965 31/10/1965 |
31/10/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7108 | 77108 | 90570 | 10/1943 | 27B 27B 27B 27D 26A 26F 2F 16E 1G W |
Aintree Aintree Aintree Wigan Central (L&Y) Newton Heath Patricroft Woodford Halse Kirkby in Ashfield Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
02/06/1951 16/06/1951 27/06/1951 28/11/1953 06/02/1960 27/02/1960 02/02/1963 01/02/1964 18/04/1964 25/04/1964 |
25/04/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7109 | 77109 | 4402 | 10/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1958 | 02/1958 | ||||
WD/8 | 7110 | 77110 | 3105 | 63105 | 90426 | 10/1943 | NPT 51L 51C 56A 56B W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby West Hartlepool Wakefield Ardsley Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 14/06/1958 24/02/1962 21/04/1962 25/01/1964 01/03/1965 |
01/03/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 7111 | 77111 | 90571 | 10/1943 | HLD YK HLD HLD 53C 53C 53A 50A W |
Hull Dairycoates York (North) Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates York (North) Withdrawn |
26/03/1949 17/09/1949 12/1949 10/12/1949 21/05/1950 30/06/1950 15/11/1958 16/09/1961 18/11/1963 |
18/11/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7112 | 77112 | 3106 | 63106 | 90427 | 10/1943 | 53A 53A 53C 53C 53A 50D W |
Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Goole Withdrawn |
05/05/1951 19/05/1951 14/07/1951 21/07/1951 06/12/1958 30/11/1963 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 7113 | 77113 | 3107 | 63107 | 90428 | 10/1943 | COL MAR 36A W |
Colchester March Doncaster Withdrawn |
03/04/1948 08/05/1948 13/04/1963 02/01/1966 |
02/01/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 7114 | 77114 | 4403 | 10/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1957 | 08/1957 | ||||
WD/8 | 7115 | 77115 | 90572 | 10/1943 | CHR 84C 84C 86C 81C 86C 81C 41F 41E 41J W |
Chester West Banbury Banbury Cardiff Canton Southall Cardiff Canton Southall Mexborough Staveley (Barrow Hill) Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 14/06/1952 30/06/1952 12/07/1952 11/07/1959 08/08/1959 06/10/1962 02/12/1962 25/01/1964 09/10/1965 10/02/1966 |
10/02/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7116 | 77116 | 90573 | 10/1943 | SPM 86A 86E 86J 81F 85B 86C 81C 36C 41F 41D 41E W |
St Philips Marsh Ebbw Junction (Newport) Severn Tunnel Junction Aberdare Oxford Gloucester Horton Road Cardiff Canton Southall Frodingham Mexborough Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/10/1951 17/05/1952 01/11/1952 21/03/1953 16/05/1953 04/10/1958 06/10/1962 02/12/1962 26/01/1963 07/03/1964 14/03/1964 15/08/1965 |
15/08/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7117 | 77117 | 4335 | 10/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1956 | 08/1956 | ||||
WD/8 | 7118 | 77118 | 90574 | 10/1943 | CLK 38E 38E W |
Colwick Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
04/12/1948 09/06/1951 23/06/1951 15/02/1964 |
15/02/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7119 | 77119 | 90575 | 10/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 16/07/1962 | 16/07/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7120 | 77120 | 90576 | 10/1943 | 26A 27B 24B W |
Newton Heath Aintree Rose Grove Withdrawn |
28/11/1953 09/04/1960 04/08/1962 23/03/1963 |
23/03/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7121 | 77121 | 90577 | 10/1943 | 40E 40E 40A 36E W |
Langwith Junction Colwick Lincoln Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
22/01/1955 07/05/1960 03/12/1960 28/09/1963 02/05/1965 |
02/05/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7122 | 77122 | 90578 | 10/1943 | FEL 91M 25D 50A W |
Feltham (on loan) To London Midland Region Mirfield York (North) Withdrawn |
18/11/1947 17/06/1950 24/06/1950 14/06/1958 09/12/1963 |
09/12/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7123 | 77123 | 90579 | 10/1943 | NPT 82C 82C MC 84C 86C 81C 41F 41D W |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) Swindon Swindon Melton Constable Banbury Cardiff Canton Southall Mexborough Canklow Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/01/1951 28/02/1951 21/04/1951 19/05/1951 13/08/1955 06/10/1962 02/12/1962 07/03/1964 21/02/1965 |
21/02/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7124 | 77124 | 90580 | 10/1943 | 36B 41D 36A W |
Mexborough Canklow Doncaster Withdrawn |
14/02/1953 07/03/1964 20/06/1964 08/08/1965 |
08/08/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7125 | 77125 | 10/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1945 | 08/1945 | |||||
WD/8 | 7126 | 77126 | 90581 | 10/1943 | 36B 25E 25A W |
Mexborough Sowerby Bridge Wakefield Withdrawn |
31/03/1951 21/02/1953 08/08/1953 23/11/1964 |
23/11/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7127 | 77127 | 90582 | 11/1943 | 36B 36A 36A 36B 36B W |
Mexborough Doncaster Doncaster Mexborough Mexborough Withdrawn |
24/03/1951 02/06/1951 23/06/1951 20/09/1952 04/10/1952 01/03/1964 |
01/03/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7128 | 77128 | 90583 | 11/1943 | MEX 40B 36E W |
Mexborough Immingham Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 29/12/1951 28/09/1963 18/04/1964 |
18/04/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7129 | 77129 | 90584 | 11/1943 | 27D 26A 24H 24C 24B 9K 8L W |
Wigan Central (L&Y) Newton Heath Hellifield Lostock Hall Rose Grove Bolton Aintree Withdrawn |
09/10/1954 22/02/1958 12/07/1958 29/11/1958 11/08/1962 25/01/1964 29/02/1964 05/09/1964 |
05/09/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7130 | 77130 | 90585 | 11/1943 | PDN 68A 68A 91W 81A 81A 86A 84C 8F 9G 8F W |
Old Oak Common Carlisle Kingmoor Carlisle Kingmoor To Western Region / GWR Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Ebbw Junction (Newport) Banbury Springs Branch (Wigan) Gorton Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 25/11/1950 30/11/1950 31/08/1951 08/09/1951 30/09/1951 31/10/1951 21/05/1955 15/07/1962 06/04/1963 01/06/1963 03/1965 |
03/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7131 | 77131 | 3108 | 63108 | 90429 | 11/1943 | HLS 56A W |
Hull Springhead Wakefield Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 21/09/1957 24/04/1967 |
24/04/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 7132 | 77132 | 4404 | 11/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | ||||
WD/8 | 7133 | 77133 | 3109 | 63109 | 90430 | 11/1943 | YK TDK 53A 53A 51E 51A 56A 55E W |
York (North) Tyne Dock Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Stockton Darlington Wakefield Normanton Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 19/02/1949 08/09/1951 22/09/1951 14/06/1958 20/06/1959 26/01/1963 15/07/1967 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 7134 | 77134 | 4405 | 11/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1954 | 12/1954 | ||||
WD/8 | 7135 | 77135 | 90586 | 11/1943 | HLS 53A 53C 53C 53A W |
Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
15/05/1948 11/02/1950 21/05/1950 30/06/1950 06/12/1958 13/02/1966 |
13/02/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7136 | 77136 | 3110 | 63110 | 90431 | 11/1943 | COL MAR COL 31B 40B 40E W |
Colchester March Colchester March Immingham Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
03/04/1948 08/05/1948 24/07/1948 20/10/1951 24/10/1953 20/08/1955 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | ||
WD/8 | 7137 | 77137 | 4406 | 11/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1956 | 10/1956 | ||||
WD/8 | 7138 | 77138 | 90587 | 11/1943 | MEX 41D 41J W |
Mexborough Canklow Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 07/03/1964 09/10/1965 14/11/1965 |
14/11/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7139 | 77139 | 4407 | 11/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1953 | 12/1953 | ||||
WD/8 | 7140 | 77140 | 4408 | 11/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | ||||
WD/8 | 7141 | 77141 | 90588 | 11/1943 | 55G 51L 51C W |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Thornaby West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
06/04/1963 28/12/1963 31/10/1964 12/02/1967 |
12/02/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7142 | 77142 | 90589 | 11/1943 | SPM 84G 84G 26A 26B 26E 26A 26F 26A 2F 16E 1G W |
St Philips Marsh Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Newton Heath Agecroft Lees (Oldham) Newton Heath Patricroft Newton Heath Woodford Halse Kirkby in Ashfield Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/09/1950 30/09/1950 31/12/1950 05/10/1957 28/12/1957 14/06/1958 14/04/1962 05/01/1963 19/01/1963 15/02/1964 18/04/1964 25/04/1964 |
25/04/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7143 | 77143 | 4338 | 11/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | ||||
WD/8 | 7144 | 77144 | 90590 | 12/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 01/03/1964 | 01/03/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7145 | 77145 | 90591 | 12/1943 | 55G 55D W |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Royston Withdrawn |
18/02/1961 31/03/1962 12/11/1962 |
12/11/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7146 | 77146 | 3111 | 63111 | 90432 | 12/1943 | 53A 53A 8B 6B 38A W |
Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Warrington Dallam Mold Junction Colwick Withdrawn |
13/10/1951 20/10/1951 16/02/1952 23/02/1952 17/05/1952 03/10/1965 |
03/10/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 7147 | 77147 | 90592 | 12/1943 | 24D W |
Lower Darwen Withdrawn |
17/06/1961 06/06/1964 |
06/06/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7148 | 77148 | 90593 | 12/1943 | 25E 25D 25D 51A 51L 51C W |
Sowerby Bridge Mirfield Mirfield Darlington Thornaby West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
24/06/1950 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 14/06/1958 03/10/1959 30/05/1964 24/07/1966 |
24/07/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7149 | 77149 | 90594 | 12/1943 | MEX 40B 40E 40E W |
Mexborough Immingham Langwith Junction Colwick Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 29/12/1951 20/08/1955 07/05/1960 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7150 | 77150 | 90142 | 05/1943 | FEL HIT 27B 27B 27B 25A 27B 26G 26A 26B 40B W |
Feltham (on loan) Hither Green Aintree Aintree Aintree Wakefield Aintree Belle Vue Newton Heath Agecroft Immingham Withdrawn |
18/11/1947 04/02/1950 09/06/1951 16/06/1951 27/06/1951 11/08/1951 19/06/1954 26/02/1955 21/04/1956 06/05/1961 12/09/1964 12/12/1965 |
12/12/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7151 | 77151 | 90143 | 25/05/1943 | OXY OXY BHD 24B 24B W |
Oxley (on loan) Oxley Birkenhead Mollington Street Rose Grove Rose Grove Withdrawn |
13/09/1946 15/06/1947 30/04/1948 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 30/05/1964 |
30/05/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7152 | 77152 | 90144 | 05/1943 | MEX 38A 31B 36A W |
Mexborough (on loan) Colwick March Doncaster Withdrawn |
14/11/1947 18/02/1956 24/03/1956 16/03/1957 12/1963 |
12/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7153 | 77153 | 4479 | 05/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1953 | 03/1953 | ||||
WD/8 | 7154 | 77154 | 4480 | 05/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1956 | 12/1956 | ||||
WD/8 | 7155 | 77155 | 90145 | 06/1943 | 31B 31B 40B 41D 41J W |
March March Immingham Canklow Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
17/02/1952 22/03/1952 24/10/1953 12/09/1959 29/04/1961 23/06/1964 |
23/06/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7156 | 77156 | 4481 | 06/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | ||||
WD/8 | 7157 | 77157 | 90146 | 06/1943 | MEX 38A 34E 36E W |
Mexborough (on loan) Colwick New England Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
14/11/1947 18/02/1956 07/05/1960 13/04/1963 13/06/1965 |
13/06/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7158 | 77158 | 4409 | 06/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | ||||
WD/8 | 7159 | 77159 | 4410 | 06/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1955 | 09/1955 | ||||
WD/8 | 7160 | 77160 | 90147 | 06/1943 | 25D 38A 38A 6B 6B 5C 6B 8D 9G 8G 8F W |
Mirfield Colwick Colwick Mold Junction Mold Junction Stafford Mold Junction Widnes Gorton Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
21/10/1950 25/11/1950 30/11/1950 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 27/02/1960 21/05/1960 28/04/1962 23/03/1963 01/06/1963 06/07/1963 04/1964 |
04/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7161 | 77161 | 90148 | 06/1943 | LA 83A 86C 84G 84C 85C 84F 8F 8G 10H 41E 40E 36C 36A W |
Laira Newton Abbot Cardiff Canton Shrewsbury Banbury Gloucester Barnwood Stourbridge Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Lower Darwen Staveley (Barrow Hill) Colwick Frodingham Doncaster Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/07/1952 24/04/1954 13/07/1957 22/03/1958 30/12/1961 24/02/1962 15/07/1962 13/03/1965 24/04/1965 12/06/1965 09/10/1965 01/01/1966 05/03/1966 27/03/1966 |
27/03/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7162 | 77162 | 90149 | 06/1943 | 84K 84K 86A 85B 86A 86C 81C 41F 41D 41J W |
Chester West Chester West Ebbw Junction (Newport) Gloucester Horton Road Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Southall Mexborough Canklow Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
01/12/1951 31/12/1951 31/01/1952 16/05/1953 04/10/1958 31/10/1959 06/10/1962 02/12/1962 22/02/1964 19/06/1965 23/01/1966 |
23/01/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7163 | 77163 | 90150 | 06/1943 | MEX 38A 31B 36A W |
Mexborough (on loan) Colwick March Doncaster Withdrawn |
05/11/1947 18/02/1956 24/03/1956 07/10/1961 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7164 | 77164 | 90151 | 06/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 18/05/1963 | 18/05/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7165 | 77165 | 90152 | 06/1943 | OXY 25G 91W 84B 84B 81C 18B 9G 10H W |
Oxley Farnley Junction To Western Region / GWR Oxley Oxley Southall Westhouses Gorton Lower Darwen Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 14/01/1950 31/08/1951 08/09/1951 30/09/1951 03/11/1951 18/07/1959 23/06/1962 28/11/1964 22/05/1965 |
22/05/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7166 | 77166 | 90153 | 06/1943 | MEX 38A 41F 41D 41J W |
Mexborough (on loan) Colwick Mexborough Canklow Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
24/11/1947 18/02/1956 19/07/1958 08/12/1962 19/06/1965 10/02/1966 |
10/02/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7167 | 77167 | 90154 | 06/1943 | MEX 38A 34E 36A W |
Mexborough Colwick New England Doncaster Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 17/05/1952 12/12/1959 28/09/1963 17/04/1966 |
17/04/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7168 | 77168 | 4340 | 06/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1954 | 09/1954 | ||||
WD/8 | 7169 | 77169 | 90155 | 06/1943 | 91E 51A 56A W |
To Eastern Region (on loan) Darlington Wakefield Withdrawn |
14/07/1947 20/06/1959 26/01/1963 09/01/1967 |
09/01/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7170 | 77170 | 90156 | 06/1943 | NWE 35C 35A 31B 30A 34B 36A W |
New England Spital Bridge New England March Stratford Hornsey Doncaster Withdrawn |
13/08/1949 19/12/1953 24/03/1956 14/12/1957 18/04/1959 30/04/1960 17/06/1961 17/04/1966 |
17/04/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7171 | 77171 | 90157 | 06/1943 | 25A 25A 38A 38A 38D 38D 38A 6B 8D 12H 6C 8D 8F W |
Wakefield Wakefield Colwick Colwick Staveley (G.C.) Staveley (G.C.) Colwick Mold Junction Widnes Tebay Birkenhead Mollington Street Widnes Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
02/07/1949 16/07/1949 25/11/1950 30/11/1950 18/02/1951 24/03/1951 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 25/07/1959 25/03/1961 16/06/1962 15/09/1962 23/03/1963 04/07/1964 |
04/07/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7172 | 77172 | 4341 | 06/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1955 | 04/1955 | ||||
WD/8 | 7173 | 77173 | 90158 | 07/1943 | MAR NWE 36E 36A W |
March (on loan) New England Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Doncaster Withdrawn |
24/11/1947 18/09/1948 09/11/1963 19/06/1965 19/12/1965 |
19/12/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7174 | 77174 | 90159 | 07/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 16/11/1963 | 16/11/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7175 | 77175 | 90160 | 07/1943 | HLS 53A 53A 50D 56A W |
Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Goole Wakefield Withdrawn |
15/05/1948 25/11/1950 30/11/1950 13/02/1960 25/07/1964 08/06/1967 |
08/06/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7176 | 77176 | 90161 | 07/1943 | MEX 86K 38A 40B 36C W |
Mexborough (on loan) Abergavenny Colwick Immingham Frodingham Withdrawn |
08/11/1947 31/03/1952 18/02/1956 16/04/1960 15/10/1960 07/02/1964 |
07/02/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7177 | 77177 | 4343 | 07/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1954 | 01/1954 | ||||
WD/8 | 7178 | 77178 | 90162 | 07/1943 | IMM 35A 35A 38A 40E 41D 40B 41D W |
Immingham New England New England Colwick Langwith Junction Canklow Immingham Canklow Withdrawn |
12/06/1948 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 25/07/1953 22/01/1955 20/06/1959 12/09/1959 09/01/1960 24/02/1964 |
24/02/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7179 | 77179 | 90163 | 07/1943 | 25A 25A 38A 38A 8B 26G 26G 26A W |
Wakefield Wakefield Colwick Colwick Warrington Dallam Belle Vue Belle Vue Newton Heath Withdrawn |
02/07/1949 16/07/1949 25/11/1950 30/11/1950 08/09/1951 26/01/1952 23/02/1952 24/03/1956 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7180 | 77180 | 90164 | 07/1943 | 27B 27B 27B 25A 27B 24B 9G 41J W |
Aintree Aintree Aintree Wakefield Aintree Rose Grove Gorton Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
23/06/1951 27/06/1951 17/07/1951 11/08/1951 19/06/1954 15/09/1962 11/04/1964 12/09/1964 11/04/1965 |
11/04/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7181 | 77181 | 90165 | 07/1943 | ANN CLK NWE 36C 41F 36A W |
Annesley Colwick New England Frodingham Mexborough Doncaster Withdrawn |
30/10/1948 04/12/1948 18/06/1949 29/09/1962 26/01/1963 28/09/1963 25/04/1964 |
25/04/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7182 | 77182 | 90166 | 07/1943 | MEX 38A 40B 36C W |
Mexborough (on loan) Colwick Immingham Frodingham Withdrawn |
13/11/1947 18/02/1956 16/04/1960 15/10/1960 09/05/1965 |
09/05/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7183 | 77183 | 4485 | 07/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1947 | 01/1947 | ||||
WD/8 | 7184 | 77184 | 90167 | 07/1943 | PDN 86A 86G 86G 87G 87F 86C W |
Old Oak Common Ebbw Junction (Newport) Pontypool Road Pontypool Road Carmarthen Llanelli Hereford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 17/06/1950 31/12/1950 31/01/1951 22/03/1958 18/06/1960 10/09/1960 31/03/1962 |
29/03/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7185 | 77185 | 90168 | 08/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 22/08/1966 | 22/08/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7186 | 77186 | 90169 | 08/1943 | 91E NWE 87G 40E 36E 36A W |
To Eastern Region (on loan) New England Carmarthen Colwick Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Doncaster Withdrawn |
31/07/1947 18/09/1948 22/03/1958 23/06/1962 28/09/1963 19/06/1965 22/08/1965 |
22/08/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7187 | 77187 | 90170 | 08/1943 | 68A 21B 8G 26B W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Bescot Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Agecroft Withdrawn |
12/06/1954 03/09/1960 10/09/1960 08/06/1963 07/1963 |
07/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7188 | 77188 | 4535 | 08/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1954 | 09/1954 | ||||
WD/8 | 7189 | 77189 | 4486 | 08/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1954 | 09/1954 | ||||
WD/8 | 7190 | 77190 | 4536 | 08/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1956 | 03/1956 | ||||
WD/8 | 7191 | 77191 | 4487 | 08/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1955 | 06/1955 | ||||
WD/8 | 7192 | 77192 | 90171 | 08/1943 | 24A 24B 24B W |
Accrington Rose Grove Rose Grove Withdrawn |
29/10/1949 03/12/1949 24/12/1949 03/07/1965 |
03/07/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7193 | 77193 | 4530 | 08/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1956 | 10/1956 | ||||
WD/8 | 7194 | 77194 | 4531 | 08/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1955 | 05/1955 | ||||
WD/8 | 7195 | 77195 | 90172 | 09/1943 | 51A 66A 51A 50B 50D W |
Darlington Polmadie Darlington Hull Dairycoates Goole Withdrawn |
20/06/1959 16/03/1963 29/06/1963 31/08/1963 30/11/1963 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7196 | 77196 | 90173 | 08/1943 | LA 26A 26A 26A 6C 6B 6C 8F 8F W |
Laira Newton Heath Newton Heath Newton Heath Birkenhead Mollington Street Mold Junction Birkenhead Mollington Street Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/01/1951 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 31/10/1953 04/12/1954 25/02/1956 09/04/1960 13/07/1963 11/07/1964 |
11/07/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7197 | 77197 | 4532 | 08/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1956 | 05/1956 | ||||
WD/8 | 7198 | 77198 | 90174 | 08/1943 | 81C 81C W |
Southall Southall Withdrawn |
14/06/1952 30/06/1952 12/11/1962 |
12/11/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7199 | 77199 | 90175 | 09/1943 | 40B W |
Immingham Withdrawn |
24/10/1953 04/1965 |
04/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7200 | 77200 | 90176 | 08/1943 | SPM 84G 84G 82B 18B 9G W |
St Philips Marsh Shrewsbury Shrewsbury St Philips Marsh Westhouses Gorton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 05/11/1955 02/11/1957 25/01/1958 18/07/1959 30/06/1962 16/02/1963 |
16/02/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7201 | 77201 | 90177 | 08/1943 | 62C W |
Dunfermline Upper Withdrawn |
27/11/1954 06/1963 |
06/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7202 | 77202 | 90178 | 08/1943 | OXY 38A 38A 6B 6B 8D 24L 8G 36C W |
Oxley Colwick Colwick Mold Junction Mold Junction Widnes Carnforth Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Frodingham Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 25/11/1950 30/11/1950 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 25/07/1959 06/02/1960 17/09/1960 29/05/1965 27/02/1966 |
27/02/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7203 | 77203 | 90179 | 08/1943 | WOS 85A 86E 86E 86G 86A 85A 87F 9G W |
Worcester Worcester Severn Tunnel Junction Severn Tunnel Junction Pontypool Road Ebbw Junction (Newport) Worcester Llanelli Gorton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 30/04/1951 19/04/1952 17/05/1952 21/03/1953 01/01/1955 13/07/1957 18/06/1960 20/05/1962 25/04/1964 |
25/04/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7204 | 77204 | 90180 | 08/1943 | 40B W |
Immingham Withdrawn |
29/09/1962 14/03/1965 |
14/03/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7205 | 77205 | 90181 | 09/1943 | 25B 25E 24B W |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Sowerby Bridge Rose Grove Withdrawn |
17/06/1950 23/02/1952 08/08/1953 08/05/1965 |
08/05/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7206 | 77206 | 90182 | 09/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 28/12/1963 | 28/12/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7207 | 77207 | 90183 | 09/1943 | 26F 26A 8F 36C W |
Patricroft Newton Heath Springs Branch (Wigan) Frodingham Withdrawn |
23/01/1960 12/01/1963 07/12/1963 29/05/1965 29/08/1965 |
29/08/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7208 | 77208 | 90184 | 09/1943 | 91E 51A 56D W |
To Eastern Region (on loan) Darlington Mirfield Withdrawn |
14/07/1947 20/06/1959 07/11/1959 05/10/1964 |
05/10/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7209 | 77209 | 90185 | 09/1943 | WFD CLK 38E 38A 38A 34E 40B W |
Woodford Halse Colwick Woodford Halse Colwick Colwick New England Immingham Withdrawn |
14/01/1950 28/01/1950 18/03/1950 22/10/1950 25/11/1950 07/05/1960 29/09/1962 14/03/1965 |
14/03/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7210 | 77210 | 90186 | 09/1943 | NA 26B 25C W |
Newton Abbot Agecroft Goole Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 02/12/1950 29/11/1952 22/08/1963 |
22/08/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7211 | 77211 | 3012 | 63012 | 90012 | 09/1943 | SKN 51C 50A 55E W |
Stockton West Hartlepool York (North) Normanton Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 20/08/1955 20/07/1957 21/09/1957 24/02/1964 |
24/02/1964 | ||
WD/8 | 7212 | 77212 | 90187 | 09/1943 | 38A 38A 38E 38E 38A 6B 6B 24L 16E 10A 8G 10H 40E 36A W |
Colwick Colwick Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Colwick Mold Junction Mold Junction Carnforth Kirkby in Ashfield Carnforth Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Lower Darwen Colwick Doncaster Withdrawn |
25/11/1950 30/11/1950 06/10/1951 20/10/1951 27/10/1951 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 25/03/1961 21/12/1963 18/04/1964 25/04/1964 13/06/1964 12/06/1965 01/01/1966 27/02/1966 |
27/02/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7213 | 77213 | 3013 | 63013 | 90013 | 09/1943 | 36C 36C 36A W |
Frodingham Frodingham Doncaster Withdrawn |
24/03/1951 31/03/1951 05/03/1966 17/04/1966 |
17/04/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 7214 | 77214 | 90188 | 09/1943 | NA 86C 86C 86A 86A 86C 86C 84C 86A 41F 41E W |
Newton Abbot Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Ebbw Junction (Newport) Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Banbury Ebbw Junction (Newport) Mexborough Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 28/02/1951 31/03/1951 16/06/1951 30/06/1951 11/08/1951 31/08/1951 05/11/1960 31/12/1960 02/12/1962 25/01/1964 11/04/1965 |
11/04/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7215 | 77215 | 90189 | 09/1943 | 38A 36C 41E 41J W |
Colwick Frodingham Staveley (Barrow Hill) Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
18/02/1956 20/02/1960 11/01/1964 09/10/1965 14/11/1965 |
14/11/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7216 | 77216 | 4412 | 09/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1954 | 01/1954 | ||||
WD/8 | 7217 | 77217 | 4488 | 09/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1955 | 04/1955 | ||||
WD/8 | 7218 | 77218 | 90190 | 09/1943 | MEX 41F 41D 41J 41E 40E 40B W |
Mexborough Mexborough Canklow Langwith Junction Staveley (Barrow Hill) Colwick Immingham Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 26/01/1963 07/03/1964 25/07/1964 16/01/1965 09/10/1965 01/01/1966 10/02/1966 |
10/02/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7219 | 77219 | 4489 | 09/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1954 | 12/1954 | ||||
WD/8 | 7220 | 77220 | 3014 | 63014 | 90014 | 09/1943 | HLD NEV NPT 51L 51A 51C W |
Hull Dairycoates Neville Hill Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Darlington West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 16/04/1949 13/08/1949 14/06/1958 18/06/1960 26/03/1966 24/04/1967 |
24/04/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 7221 | 77221 | 90191 | 09/1943 | 31B W |
March Withdrawn |
14/12/1957 05/02/1960 |
05/02/1960 | ||||
WD/8 | 7222 | 77222 | 90192 | 09/1943 | 84C 84C 86C 86G 6C 8D 8F W |
Banbury Banbury Cardiff Canton Pontypool Road Birkenhead Mollington Street Widnes Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/12/1951 31/12/1951 12/07/1952 09/10/1954 26/02/1961 15/09/1962 23/03/1963 04/05/1963 |
04/05/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7223 | 77223 | 3020 | 63020 | 90020 | 10/1943 | 61B 62A W |
Aberdeen Ferryhill Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
23/02/1952 16/05/1953 06/1967 |
06/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 7224 | 77224 | 4414 | 10/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | ||||
WD/8 | 7225 | 77225 | 90193 | 10/1943 | 65D 62A W |
Dawsholm Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
14/07/1951 11/08/1962 19/08/1963 |
19/08/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7226 | 77226 | 90194 | 10/1943 | 91M 6B 26D 26E W |
To London Midland Region Mold Junction Bury Lees (Oldham) Withdrawn |
30/11/1950 06/10/1951 29/12/1951 17/12/1960 21/03/1964 |
21/03/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7227 | 77227 | 90195 | 10/1943 | MEX 36A W |
Mexborough (on loan) Doncaster Withdrawn |
08/11/1947 25/08/1962 03/10/1965 |
03/10/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7228 | 77228 | 90196 | 10/1943 | MEX 33A 33B W |
Mexborough (on loan) Plaistow Tilbury Withdrawn |
19/11/1947 14/05/1955 07/11/1959 05/09/1962 |
05/09/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7229 | 77229 | 90197 | 10/1943 | 38A 38A 8B 26G 26G 26A W |
Colwick Colwick Warrington Dallam Belle Vue Belle Vue Newton Heath Withdrawn |
25/11/1950 30/11/1950 08/09/1951 26/01/1952 23/02/1952 21/04/1956 04/1964 |
04/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7230 | 77230 | 90198 | 10/1943 | 65D 66A 61A 66A 67D 67C W |
Dawsholm Polmadie Kittybrewster Polmadie Ardrossan Ayr Withdrawn |
31/08/1957 02/08/1958 24/02/1962 24/03/1962 21/04/1962 21/04/1962 17/12/1962 |
17/12/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7231 | 77231 | 90199 | 10/1943 | 62A 65F 66A 65A 65F 62C W |
Thornton Junction Grangemouth Polmadie Eastfield Grangemouth Dunfermline Upper Withdrawn |
07/08/1954 29/10/1955 02/08/1958 19/01/1963 30/11/1963 25/12/1965 24/11/1966 |
24/11/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7232 | 77232 | 90200 | 10/1943 | YK 51A 50A 56A 56F 56E 56A 52G W |
York (North) Darlington York (North) Wakefield Low Moor Sowerby Bridge Wakefield Sunderland Withdrawn |
13/08/1949 16/06/1956 31/01/1959 07/11/1959 14/11/1959 17/06/1961 11/01/1964 10/09/1966 01/07/1967 |
01/07/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7233 | 77233 | 3021 | 63021 | 90021 | 10/1943 | ANN CLK HLD YK HLD HLD 50A 51A 50A 55E W |
Annesley Colwick Hull Dairycoates York (North) Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates York (North) Darlington York (North) Normanton Withdrawn |
07/02/1948 17/04/1948 04/09/1948 17/09/1949 12/1949 10/12/1949 17/12/1955 16/06/1956 20/07/1957 21/09/1957 12/11/1962 |
12/11/1962 | ||
WD/8 | 7234 | 77234 | 90201 | 10/1943 | OXY 86E 86E 86C 81E 86A 9G W |
Oxley Severn Tunnel Junction Severn Tunnel Junction Cardiff Canton Didcot Ebbw Junction (Newport) Gorton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/08/1950 31/08/1950 26/03/1955 25/03/1961 15/07/1961 20/05/1962 11/07/1964 |
11/07/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7235 | 77235 | 90202 | 10/1943 | CLK 38D 38D 38A 38A 41D W |
Colwick Staveley (G.C.) Staveley (G.C.) Colwick Colwick Canklow Withdrawn |
04/12/1948 14/04/1951 21/04/1951 05/05/1951 19/05/1951 20/02/1960 11/04/1965 |
11/04/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7236 | 77236 | 3022 | 63022 | 90022 | 10/1943 | HLD YK HLD 51A 51A 53A 53A 51L W |
Hull Dairycoates York (North) Hull Dairycoates Darlington Darlington Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Thornaby Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 17/09/1949 10/12/1949 20/01/1951 31/01/1951 08/09/1951 22/09/1951 06/02/1960 31/10/1962 |
31/10/1962 | ||
WD/8 | 7237 | 77237 | 90203 | 10/1943 | 31B 31B 40B 31B 36A 41F 41D 36A W |
March March Immingham March Doncaster Mexborough Canklow Doncaster Withdrawn |
17/02/1952 22/03/1952 24/10/1953 22/09/1956 16/03/1957 19/07/1958 25/05/1963 19/06/1965 17/10/1965 |
17/10/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7238 | 77238 | 10/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1945 | 08/1945 | |||||
WD/8 | 7239 | 77239 | 90204 | 10/1943 | 38A 38A 8B 26G 26G 27B 10H W |
Colwick Colwick Warrington Dallam Belle Vue Belle Vue Aintree Lower Darwen Withdrawn |
25/11/1950 30/11/1950 08/09/1951 26/01/1952 23/02/1952 01/01/1955 03/04/1965 19/06/1965 |
19/06/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7240 | 77240 | 4417 | 10/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1954 | 11/1954 | ||||
WD/8 | 7241 | 77241 | 90205 | 01/1943 | NA 26C 26D 16E 9M W |
Newton Abbot Bolton Bury Kirkby in Ashfield Bury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/12/1950 27/03/1954 21/12/1963 25/01/1964 07/03/1964 |
07/03/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7242 | 77242 | 90206 | 01/1943 | 24A 24A 26C 26C W |
Accrington Accrington Bolton Bolton Withdrawn |
03/12/1949 24/12/1949 14/07/1951 17/07/1951 27/04/1963 |
27/04/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7243 | 77243 | 3027 | 63027 | 90027 | 01/1943 | ANN CLK NEV NPT 51L W |
Annesley Colwick Neville Hill Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
14/02/1948 17/04/1948 04/09/1948 13/08/1949 14/06/1958 27/05/1963 |
27/05/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 7244 | 77244 | 4418 | 11/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1957 | 10/1957 | ||||
WD/8 | 7245 | 77245 | 4419 | 11/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1954 | 01/1954 | ||||
WD/8 | 7246 | 77246 | 4420 | 11/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1954 | 12/1954 | ||||
WD/8 | 7247 | 77247 | 90207 | 01/1943 | SPM 81C 81C 87G 87F 9G 10F W |
St Philips Marsh Southall Southall Carmarthen Llanelli Gorton Rose Grove Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 14/07/1951 31/07/1951 22/03/1958 18/06/1960 20/05/1962 13/02/1965 22/05/1965 |
22/05/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7248 | 77248 | 90208 | 01/1943 | NEV NWE 38A 38E 31B 36A W |
Neville Hill New England Colwick Woodford Halse March Doncaster Withdrawn |
16/04/1949 13/08/1949 24/04/1954 18/02/1956 22/09/1956 07/10/1961 01/01/1964 |
01/01/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7249 | 77249 | 90209 | 01/1943 | MEX 41J W |
Mexborough (on loan) Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
05/11/1947 05/01/1963 06/1964 |
06/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7250 | 77250 | 3028 | 63028 | 90028 | 01/1943 | STR NWE 31B 30A 41F W |
Stratford New England March Stratford Mexborough Withdrawn |
08/10/1949 21/01/1950 19/10/1957 18/04/1959 07/05/1960 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | ||
WD/8 | 7251 | 77251 | 3029 | 63029 | 90029 | 01/1943 | COL 31B 40B W |
Colchester March Immingham Withdrawn |
24/04/1948 20/10/1951 24/10/1953 04/07/1965 |
04/07/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 7252 | 77252 | 90210 | 01/1943 | 53A 53A 50A 51A 56E 56A 52G 51C W |
Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates York (North) Darlington Sowerby Bridge Wakefield Sunderland West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
04/02/1951 17/02/1951 17/12/1955 16/06/1956 11/10/1958 11/01/1964 10/09/1966 25/03/1967 01/07/1967 |
01/07/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7253 | 77253 | 90211 | 01/1943 | 41D 36A W |
Canklow Doncaster Withdrawn |
25/05/1963 19/06/1965 18/07/1965 |
18/07/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7254 | 77254 | 3030 | 63030 | 90030 | 01/1943 | 53A 53A 50A 50B 50D W |
Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates York (North) Hull Dairycoates Goole Withdrawn |
05/05/1951 19/05/1951 16/09/1961 27/03/1965 06/11/1965 17/04/1967 |
17/04/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 7255 | 77255 | 90212 | 01/1943 | SPM 25A 91M 38A 38A 6B 6B 6C 24L 24K 8G 36C W |
St Philips Marsh Wakefield (Re-instd) To London Midland Region Colwick Colwick Mold Junction Mold Junction Birkenhead Mollington Street Carnforth Preston Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Frodingham Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 18/06/1949 30/06/1949 25/11/1950 30/11/1950 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 03/11/1956 09/01/1960 27/08/1960 10/09/1960 29/05/1965 15/08/1965 |
15/08/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7256 | 77256 | 90213 | 01/1943 | HIT 25C 50B W |
Hither Green Goole Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
04/02/1950 11/08/1951 13/06/1964 13/02/1966 |
13/02/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7257 | 77257 | 90214 | 01/1943 | OXY 8F 18B 9G W |
Oxley Springs Branch (Wigan) Westhouses Gorton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/04/1960 02/07/1960 23/06/1962 07/03/1964 |
07/03/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7258 | 77258 | 90215 | 01/1943 | GRA 38A 38A 34E 40B W |
Grantham Colwick Colwick New England Immingham Withdrawn |
09/04/1949 21/05/1950 31/05/1950 07/05/1960 29/09/1962 04/1965 |
04/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7259 | 77259 | 90216 | 02/1943 | 25G 26B 27B W |
Farnley Junction Agecroft Aintree Withdrawn |
11/08/1951 23/02/1952 22/03/1952 07/1964 |
07/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7260 | 77260 | 90217 | 02/1943 | HLS 53A 53C 53A 50A W |
Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates York (North) Withdrawn |
15/05/1948 11/02/1950 30/06/1950 15/11/1958 16/09/1961 21/06/1965 |
21/06/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7261 | 77261 | 90218 | 02/1943 | CLK 38E 16A 1G W |
Colwick Woodford Halse Toton Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
04/12/1948 18/03/1950 21/12/1963 18/04/1964 25/04/1964 |
25/04/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7262 | 77262 | 4421 | 12/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | ||||
WD/8 | 7263 | 77263 | 90346 | 06/1944 | NWE 40B 38D 38A 38A 38E 16A 1G 9D 8L 10F 41E 40E W |
New England Immingham Staveley (G.C.) Colwick Colwick Woodford Halse Toton Woodford Halse Newton Heath Aintree Rose Grove Staveley (Barrow Hill) Colwick Withdrawn |
13/08/1949 22/09/1951 29/12/1951 14/06/1952 21/06/1952 17/11/1956 21/12/1963 18/04/1964 25/04/1964 13/06/1964 08/05/1965 12/06/1965 09/10/1965 24/10/1965 |
24/10/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7264 | 77264 | 4346 | 07/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1953 | 12/1953 | ||||
WD/8 | 7265 | 77265 | 3070 | 63070 | 90070 | 06/1944 | CLK NWE 31B 31B 36C 36C W |
Colwick New England March March Frodingham Frodingham Withdrawn |
13/11/1948 04/12/1948 08/10/1950 21/10/1950 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 21/02/1965 |
21/02/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 7266 | 77266 | 4347 | 07/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1957 | 04/1957 | ||||
WD/8 | 7267 | 77267 | 4348 | 07/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1955 | 11/1955 | ||||
WD/8 | 7268 | 77268 | 22 | 07/1944 | S W |
Stored Withdrawn |
05/1956 08/1957 |
27/08/1957 | ||||
WD/8 | 7269 | 77269 | 27 | 07/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1962 | 03/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7270 | 77270 | 90347 | 07/1944 | 91M 91M 56A 50A 51C W |
To London Midland Region To London Midland Region Wakefield York (North) West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
10/06/1950 17/06/1950 09/10/1965 04/12/1965 08/10/1966 24/05/1967 |
24/05/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7271 | 77271 | 90348 | 07/1944 | 24A 25D 56A 52G W |
Accrington Mirfield Wakefield Sunderland Withdrawn |
19/04/1952 03/12/1955 14/06/1958 05/11/1966 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7272 | 77272 | 3075 | 63075 | 90075 | 08/1944 | IMM 31B 31B 38A 34E 40B 36C 36A W |
Immingham March March Colwick New England Immingham Frodingham Doncaster Withdrawn |
05/06/1948 08/10/1950 21/10/1950 24/10/1953 20/02/1960 29/09/1962 11/09/1965 05/03/1966 17/04/1966 |
17/04/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 7273 | 77273 | 4349 | 08/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | ||||
WD/8 | 7274 | 77274 | 90349 | 08/1944 | 36E W |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
09/11/1963 13/06/1965 |
13/06/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7275 | 77275 | 4422 | 08/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1956 | 12/1956 | ||||
WD/8 | 7276 | 77276 | 3076 | 63076 | 90076 | 08/1944 | YK DAR 51B 51L 56A 55E 51C W |
York (North) Darlington Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Wakefield Normanton West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 19/02/1949 30/06/1950 14/06/1958 28/03/1959 15/07/1967 12/08/1967 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 7277 | 77277 | 3077 | 63077 | 90077 | 08/1944 | 65D 66A 66E 61B W |
Dawsholm Polmadie Carstairs Aberdeen Ferryhill Withdrawn |
31/08/1957 02/08/1958 08/04/1961 01/07/1961 06/05/1963 |
06/05/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 7278 | 77278 | 90350 | 08/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 22/08/1966 | 22/08/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7279 | 77279 | 3078 | 63078 | 90078 | 08/1944 | YK DAR 53A 53A 50A 52G W |
York (North) Darlington Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates York (North) Sunderland Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 19/02/1949 08/09/1951 22/09/1951 16/09/1961 05/11/1966 27/11/1966 |
27/11/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 7280 | 77280 | 90351 | 08/1944 | 56D 56F 56D 56A 55E W |
Mirfield Low Moor Mirfield Wakefield Normanton Withdrawn |
20/06/1959 23/01/1960 12/09/1964 28/01/1967 15/07/1967 22/09/1967 |
22/09/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7281 | 77281 | 3079 | 63079 | 90079 | 08/1944 | NWE 31B 36A 36C W |
New England March Doncaster Frodingham Withdrawn |
18/06/1949 23/01/1954 24/09/1960 18/11/1961 17/01/1964 |
17/01/1964 | ||
WD/8 | 7282 | 77282 | 4350 | 08/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | ||||
WD/8 | 7283 | 77283 | 90352 | 08/1944 | 53A 53A 53C 53A 50D W |
Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Goole Withdrawn |
08/09/1951 22/09/1951 22/10/1955 06/12/1958 22/04/1967 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7284 | 77284 | 3080 | 63080 | 90080 | 08/1944 | 9G 8L 9G 10F 40E 36C W |
Gorton Aintree Gorton Rose Grove Colwick Frodingham Withdrawn |
29/09/1962 12/12/1964 26/12/1964 09/01/1965 12/06/1965 01/01/1966 27/02/1966 |
27/02/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 7285 | 77285 | 90353 | 08/1944 | 25A W |
Wakefield (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
16/07/1949 22/02/1965 |
22/02/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7286 | 77286 | 90354 | 08/1944 | SR 75B 25E 26B W |
To Southern Region (on loan) Redhill Sowerby Bridge Agecroft Withdrawn |
24/07/1947 05/02/1951 11/08/1951 08/08/1953 10/10/1964 |
10/10/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7287 | 77287 | 4351 | 08/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1954 | 01/1954 | ||||
WD/8 | 7288 | 77288 | 90355 | 08/1944 | EXE 86E 86C 81C W |
Exeter Severn Tunnel Junction Cardiff Canton Southall Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 15/07/1950 08/10/1955 16/06/1956 12/11/1962 |
12/11/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7289 | 77289 | 90356 | 08/1944 | SPM 86A 84G 81C W |
St Philips Marsh Ebbw Junction (Newport) Shrewsbury Southall Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 05/09/1953 31/10/1953 25/01/1958 12/11/1962 |
12/11/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7290 | 77290 | 3081 | 63081 | 90081 | 08/1944 | 51L 50D W |
Thornaby Goole Withdrawn |
14/06/1958 31/08/1963 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 7291 | 77291 | 90357 | 09/1944 | RDG 91M 55E 56A 52G W |
Reading (S.R.) To London Midland Region Normanton Wakefield Sunderland Withdrawn |
31/05/1948 30/06/1949 20/07/1957 09/10/1965 10/09/1966 13/09/1966 |
13/09/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7292 | 77292 | 90358 | 09/1944 | CLK 38D 38D 38A 38A 36B 41D W |
Colwick Staveley (G.C.) Staveley (G.C.) Colwick Colwick Mexborough Canklow Withdrawn |
04/12/1948 29/10/1950 25/11/1950 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 14/02/1953 05/01/1963 25/11/1963 |
25/11/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7293 | 77293 | 4352 | 09/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | ||||
WD/8 | 7294 | 77294 | 90359 | 09/1944 | LA 26B 26D 26B W |
Laira Agecroft Bury Agecroft Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 02/12/1950 04/10/1952 05/10/1957 19/09/1964 |
19/09/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7295 | 77295 | 4353 | 09/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1957 | 04/1957 | ||||
WD/8 | 7296 | 77296 | 90360 | 09/1944 | SR RED 26A 25E 56A 55E 51C W |
To Southern Region (on loan) Redhill Newton Heath Sowerby Bridge Wakefield Normanton West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
06/07/1947 01/08/1948 11/08/1951 11/08/1956 14/09/1963 15/07/1967 12/08/1967 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7297 | 77297 | 90361 | 09/1944 | OXY 25A 91M 56B 56A 52G W |
Oxley Wakefield (Re-instd) To London Midland Region Ardsley Wakefield Sunderland Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 18/06/1949 30/06/1949 18/06/1960 11/09/1965 31/12/1966 24/04/1967 |
24/04/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7298 | 77298 | 3082 | 63082 | 90082 | 09/1944 | SKN 53C 53C 50B 51E 51A 66A 51A 51L 51C W |
Stockton Hull Springhead Hull Springhead Neville Hill Stockton Darlington Polmadie Darlington Thornaby West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 14/06/1952 21/06/1952 22/10/1955 14/12/1957 20/06/1959 16/03/1963 29/06/1963 25/01/1964 23/05/1964 24/07/1966 |
24/07/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 7299 | 77299 | 90362 | 09/1944 | 25A 55E 55G 55E W |
Wakefield (Re-instd) Normanton Huddersfield Hillhouse Normanton Withdrawn |
18/06/1949 20/07/1957 27/03/1965 28/01/1967 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7300 | 77300 | 3003 | 63003 | 90003 | 03/1943 | 40B 36E 36A 41J W |
Immingham Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Doncaster Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
24/10/1953 22/07/1961 02/12/1961 09/03/1963 25/06/1964 |
25/06/1964 | ||
WD/8 | 7301 | 77301 | 4423 | 04/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1954 | 12/1954 | ||||
WD/8 | 7302 | 77302 | 90219 | 04/1943 | 26A 26A 26D 27B 24B W |
Newton Heath Newton Heath Bury Aintree Rose Grove Withdrawn |
01/09/1951 08/09/1951 21/03/1953 12/11/1960 15/09/1962 16/05/1964 |
16/05/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7303 | 77303 | 90220 | 04/1943 | 36A 35A 36A 36B 41D 41E 41J W |
Doncaster New England Doncaster Mexborough Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
03/11/1951 22/03/1952 19/04/1952 19/06/1954 25/05/1963 19/06/1965 09/10/1965 14/11/1965 |
14/11/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7304 | 77304 | 4355 | 04/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1956 | 07/1956 | ||||
WD/8 | 7305 | 77305 | 90221 | 04/1943 | 91E 40B W |
To Eastern Region (on loan) Immingham Withdrawn |
31/07/1947 24/10/1953 31/01/1965 |
31/01/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7306 | 77306 | 90222 | 04/1943 | 26A 26A 26F 26B 10F 8L W |
Newton Heath Newton Heath Patricroft Agecroft Rose Grove Aintree Withdrawn |
01/09/1951 08/09/1951 27/02/1960 05/01/1963 17/10/1964 24/10/1964 07/08/1965 |
07/08/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7307 | 77307 | 90223 | 04/1943 | MEX 40A 40B 34E 40A 36E W 36C |
Mexborough Lincoln Immingham New England Lincoln Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn Frodingham |
04/09/1948 29/12/1951 18/04/1953 21/02/1959 29/09/1962 28/09/1963 03/1965 19/06/1965 |
03/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7308 | 77308 | 4356 | 04/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1956 | 12/1956 | ||||
WD/8 | 7309 | 77309 | 90224 | 05/1943 | 40B 36E 36A 41J W |
Immingham Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Doncaster Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
24/10/1953 22/07/1961 02/12/1961 09/03/1963 24/03/1964 |
24/03/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7310 | 77310 | 90225 | 05/1943 | NEA 87F 87F 82D 86A 86A 87F 86A 41F 36A 41E W |
Neath (Court Sart) Llanelli Llanelli Westbury Ebbw Junction (Newport) Ebbw Junction (Newport) Llanelli Ebbw Junction (Newport) Mexborough Doncaster Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/12/1950 31/01/1951 28/02/1951 16/06/1951 30/06/1951 18/06/1960 10/09/1960 02/12/1962 28/09/1963 16/01/1965 11/04/1965 |
11/04/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7311 | 77311 | 90226 | 05/1943 | 26A 26A 25E 26A 26D 26E 26D W |
Newton Heath Newton Heath Sowerby Bridge Newton Heath Bury Lees (Oldham) Bury Withdrawn |
19/05/1951 27/06/1951 06/10/1951 27/10/1951 28/11/1953 14/11/1959 28/11/1959 21/12/1963 |
21/12/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7312 | 77312 | 90227 | 05/1943 | 6C 6B 8D 6B 6C 8B 26D 26C 41J 41H 41E W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Mold Junction Widnes Mold Junction Birkenhead Mollington Street Warrington Dallam Bury Bolton Langwith Junction Staveley (G.C.) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
31/10/1953 27/02/1954 25/07/1959 15/08/1959 28/04/1962 22/09/1962 16/03/1963 18/05/1963 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 26/09/1965 |
26/09/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7313 | 77313 | 90228 | 05/1943 | 12A 25C W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Goole Withdrawn |
19/06/1949 16/07/1949 01/07/1950 02/09/1963 |
02/09/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7314 | 77314 | 90229 | 05/1943 | 62C W |
Dunfermline Upper Withdrawn |
06/07/1963 02/09/1966 |
02/09/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7315 | 77315 | 90230 | 05/1943 | 50B 50A 56A 56B 51C W |
Neville Hill York (North) Wakefield Ardsley West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
14/12/1957 14/06/1958 07/11/1959 26/08/1961 06/11/1965 24/05/1967 |
24/05/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7316 | 77316 | 3006 | 63006 | 90006 | 05/1943 | HLD YK HLD HLD W |
Hull Dairycoates York (North) Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
23/07/1949 17/09/1949 12/1949 10/12/1949 02/09/1963 |
02/09/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 7317 | 77317 | 90231 | 05/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 17/08/1963 | 17/08/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7318 | 77318 | 3007 | 63007 | 90007 | 05/1943 | HLS 53A 53C 53A 53A 8B 6B 38A 38E 38A 38D 36C W |
Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Warrington Dallam Mold Junction Colwick Woodford Halse Colwick Staveley (G.C.) Frodingham Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 11/02/1950 30/06/1950 24/09/1950 21/10/1950 16/02/1952 23/02/1952 17/05/1952 13/12/1952 17/01/1953 21/01/1956 06/02/1960 11/07/1965 |
11/07/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 7319 | 77319 | 90232 | 05/1943 | 36C W |
Frodingham Withdrawn |
25/07/1953 02/01/1966 |
02/01/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7320 | 77320 | 90233 | 06/1943 | HLS 53A 53C 53C 53A 51A 51L 56D 56E 56A 56D 56A W |
Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Darlington Thornaby Mirfield Sowerby Bridge Wakefield Mirfield Wakefield Withdrawn |
15/05/1948 21/04/1951 13/10/1951 20/10/1951 06/12/1958 20/06/1959 03/10/1959 07/11/1959 18/06/1960 11/01/1964 26/02/1966 28/01/1967 24/05/1967 |
24/05/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7321 | 77321 | 90234 | 06/1943 | 27B 27B 25A 27B 66A 65F W |
Aintree Aintree Wakefield Aintree Polmadie Grangemouth Withdrawn |
16/06/1951 27/06/1951 11/08/1951 16/06/1956 13/04/1957 11/08/1962 29/11/1963 |
29/11/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7322 | 77322 | 3008 | 63008 | 90008 | 06/1943 | HLS YK HLD HLD 52D 52D 53A 53A W |
Hull Springhead York (North) Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Tweedmouth Tweedmouth Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 17/09/1949 12/1949 10/12/1949 23/12/1950 31/12/1950 05/05/1951 19/05/1951 10/04/1967 |
10/04/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 7323 | 77323 | 90235 | 06/1943 | YK 53A 53A 8B 6B 38A 36A W |
York (North) Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Warrington Dallam Mold Junction Colwick Doncaster Withdrawn |
13/08/1949 13/10/1951 20/10/1951 16/02/1952 23/02/1952 17/05/1952 22/10/1960 03/10/1965 |
03/10/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7324 | 77324 | 90236 | 06/1943 | 25A 25A 26A 25E 50A 56A 56F 56D 56B 56A 55E W |
Wakefield Wakefield Newton Heath Sowerby Bridge York (North) Wakefield Low Moor Mirfield Ardsley Wakefield Normanton Withdrawn |
01/09/1951 08/09/1951 16/06/1956 11/08/1956 14/06/1958 07/11/1959 14/11/1959 16/09/1961 07/07/1962 06/11/1965 15/07/1967 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7325 | 77325 | 90237 | 06/1943 | SPM 25C 25A 6C 6B 2F 16A 1G W |
St Philips Marsh Goole Wakefield Birkenhead Mollington Street Mold Junction Market Harborough Toton Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 13/10/1951 01/12/1951 31/10/1953 27/02/1954 22/03/1958 21/12/1963 25/01/1964 25/01/1964 |
25/01/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7326 | 77326 | 90238 | 06/1943 | SPM 86C 18B 9G W |
St Philips Marsh Cardiff Canton Westhouses Gorton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/10/1951 18/07/1959 23/06/1962 16/03/1963 |
16/03/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7327 | 77327 | 90239 | 06/1943 | NWE 36C W |
New England Frodingham Withdrawn |
12/11/1949 29/09/1962 25/11/1963 |
25/11/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7328 | 77328 | 90240 | 06/1943 | 51B 51L 56B 50B W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Ardsley Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
14/12/1957 14/06/1958 23/06/1962 06/11/1965 09/01/1967 |
09/01/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7329 | 77329 | 90241 | 06/1943 | 40E 36C W |
Colwick Frodingham Withdrawn |
12/06/1965 01/01/1966 09/01/1966 |
09/01/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7330 | 77330 | 90242 | 06/1943 | 25A 25A 38A 38A 6B 6B 8D 9G 8F 10C 8L 40B W |
Wakefield Wakefield Colwick Colwick Mold Junction Mold Junction Widnes Gorton Springs Branch (Wigan) Fleetwood Aintree Immingham Withdrawn |
02/07/1949 16/07/1949 25/11/1950 30/11/1950 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 25/07/1959 23/03/1963 01/06/1963 16/11/1963 14/12/1963 12/09/1964 19/09/1965 |
19/09/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7331 | 77331 | 4359 | 06/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | ||||
WD/8 | 7332 | 77332 | 90243 | 07/1943 | 25B 55C 55D 55E W |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Farnley Junction Royston Normanton Withdrawn |
16/06/1956 25/04/1959 20/06/1959 12/09/1964 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7333 | 77333 | 4491 | 07/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | ||||
WD/8 | 7334 | 77334 | 90244 | 07/1943 | CLK NWE NWE 38A 35A 33B 31B 33A 33B W |
Colwick New England New England Colwick New England Tilbury March Plaistow Tilbury Withdrawn |
04/12/1948 26/11/1949 30/11/1949 18/02/1956 24/03/1956 10/05/1958 04/07/1959 10/10/1959 07/11/1959 09/08/1962 |
09/08/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7335 | 77335 | 90245 | 07/1943 | 26A 26A 27B W |
Newton Heath Newton Heath Aintree Withdrawn |
26/05/1951 16/06/1951 12/12/1959 04/1964 |
04/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7336 | 77336 | 3009 | 63009 | 90009 | 07/1943 | HLS HLD YK HLD 52G W |
Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates York (North) Hull Dairycoates Sunderland Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 12/02/1949 17/09/1949 10/12/1949 15/07/1967 01/09/1967 |
01/09/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 7337 | 77337 | 07/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 1965 | 1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 7338 | 77338 | 90246 | 07/1943 | CLK MEX 35A 36E W |
Colwick Mexborough New England Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 24/12/1949 03/11/1951 09/11/1963 04/1965 |
04/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7339 | 77339 | 3010 | 63010 | 90010 | 07/1943 | HLS 53A 53C 53C 91W 40B 84G 84D 84G 82B 18B 9G W |
Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Springhead To Western Region / GWR Immingham Shrewsbury Leamington Shrewsbury St Philips Marsh Westhouses Gorton Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 11/02/1950 21/05/1950 30/06/1950 31/08/1951 08/09/1951 03/10/1953 27/03/1954 14/07/1956 25/01/1958 18/07/1959 30/06/1962 06/02/1965 |
06/02/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 7340 | 77340 | 90247 | 08/1943 | 73C 27B 27B 27B 25A 55E W |
Hither Green Aintree Aintree Aintree Wakefield Normanton Withdrawn |
05/02/1951 23/06/1951 27/06/1951 17/07/1951 11/08/1951 19/10/1957 12/11/1962 |
12/11/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7341 | 77341 | 4361 | 08/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | ||||
WD/8 | 7342 | 77342 | 90248 | 08/1943 | STM 26A 26A 26F 26A 9K 8L 36C W |
St Margarets Newton Heath Newton Heath Patricroft Newton Heath Bolton Aintree Frodingham Withdrawn |
04/12/1948 01/09/1951 08/09/1951 15/09/1962 05/01/1963 14/03/1964 03/10/1964 17/04/1965 07/11/1965 |
07/11/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7343 | 77343 | 3011 | 63011 | 90011 | 08/1943 | HLS HLD YK HLD 53C 53A 51A 51C W |
Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates York (North) Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Darlington West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 12/02/1949 17/09/1949 10/12/1949 21/05/1950 06/12/1958 20/06/1959 26/03/1966 05/06/1966 |
05/06/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 7344 | 77344 | 4492 | 08/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | ||||
WD/8 | 7345 | 77345 | 4424 | 08/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | ||||
WD/8 | 7346 | 77346 | 4425 | 08/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | ||||
WD/8 | 7347 | 77347 | 4426 | 08/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | ||||
WD/8 | 7348 | 77348 | 90249 | 08/1943 | 25B 55E W |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Normanton Withdrawn |
16/06/1956 07/11/1959 23/12/1963 |
23/12/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7349 | 77349 | 4427 | 08/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | ||||
WD/8 | 7350 | 77350 | 90250 | 08/1943 | MEX W |
Mexborough (on loan) Withdrawn |
04/11/1947 24/03/1963 |
24/03/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7351 | 77351 | 90251 | 08/1943 | NWE GRA 38A 38A 82B 82B 81F 18B 2F 18B 9G W |
New England Grantham Colwick Colwick St Philips Marsh St Philips Marsh Oxford Westhouses Woodford Halse Westhouses Gorton Withdrawn |
18/09/1948 29/01/1949 31/05/1950 04/06/1950 19/04/1952 17/05/1952 16/06/1956 18/07/1959 19/09/1959 05/12/1959 30/06/1962 11/05/1963 |
11/05/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7352 | 77352 | 90252 | 09/1943 | 36A W |
Doncaster Withdrawn |
28/09/1963 26/09/1965 |
26/09/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7353 | 77353 | 90253 | 09/1943 | MEX 31B 35A W |
Mexborough March New England Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 18/06/1950 20/08/1950 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7354 | 77354 | 3015 | 63015 | 90015 | 09/1943 | 36B 38A 34E W |
Mexborough Colwick New England Withdrawn |
14/02/1953 18/02/1956 21/02/1959 18/05/1963 |
18/05/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 7355 | 77355 | 90254 | 09/1943 | 26B 26B 26B 25G 55E 55D 55C 55D 55E 56A 50A 51C W |
Agecroft Agecroft Agecroft Farnley Junction Normanton Royston Farnley Junction Royston Normanton Wakefield York (North) West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
09/06/1951 16/06/1951 27/06/1951 21/04/1956 07/11/1959 01/09/1962 13/07/1963 14/12/1963 13/06/1964 09/10/1965 04/12/1965 08/10/1966 31/01/1967 |
31/01/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7356 | 77356 | 90255 | 09/1943 | 31B 36A W |
March Doncaster Withdrawn |
22/09/1956 16/03/1957 26/12/1965 |
26/12/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7357 | 77357 | 3016 | 63016 | 90016 | 09/1943 | 51L 56A 51A 52H 56A 51C 50B 50D W |
Thornaby Wakefield Darlington Tyne Dock Wakefield West Hartlepool Hull Dairycoates Goole Withdrawn |
14/06/1958 28/03/1959 18/06/1960 08/12/1962 21/12/1963 27/02/1965 26/03/1966 31/12/1966 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 7358 | 77358 | 90256 | 09/1943 | GRA NWE 25A 33A 33B W |
Grantham New England Wakefield Plaistow Tilbury Withdrawn |
29/01/1949 11/06/1949 15/09/1951 23/07/1955 07/11/1959 27/08/1962 |
27/08/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7359 | 77359 | 90257 | 09/1943 | 25D 91M 25D 6C 6B 8D 6C 8F W |
Mirfield To London Midland Region Mirfield Birkenhead Mollington Street Mold Junction Widnes Birkenhead Mollington Street Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
24/02/1951 14/03/1951 31/03/1951 31/10/1953 27/02/1954 25/07/1959 07/11/1959 09/04/1960 07/1964 |
07/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7360 | 77360 | 3017 | 63017 | 90017 | 09/1943 | DEE 62C W |
Dundee Tay Bridge Dunfermline Upper Withdrawn |
01/10/1949 06/10/1951 16/09/1963 |
16/09/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 7361 | 77361 | 4428 | 09/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1957 | 11/1957 | ||||
WD/8 | 7362 | 77362 | 90258 | 09/1943 | 24C 41J 41H 41E 41J W |
Lostock Hall Langwith Junction Staveley (G.C.) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
23/02/1952 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 09/10/1965 23/01/1966 |
23/01/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7363 | 77363 | 3018 | 63018 | 90018 | 09/1943 | 30A 31B 36A W |
Stratford March Doncaster Withdrawn |
25/02/1961 17/06/1961 07/10/1961 17/04/1966 |
17/04/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 7364 | 77364 | 90259 | 09/1943 | NWE 40E 40E W |
New England Langwith Junction Colwick Withdrawn |
13/11/1948 22/01/1955 07/05/1960 03/10/1965 |
03/10/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7365 | 77365 | 90260 | 09/1943 | 25A 25A 25C W |
Wakefield Wakefield Goole Withdrawn |
01/09/1951 08/09/1951 10/09/1955 02/09/1963 |
02/09/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7366 | 77366 | 4429 | 09/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1954 | 01/1954 | ||||
WD/8 | 7367 | 77367 | 3019 | 63019 | 90019 | 09/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 17/12/1963 | 17/12/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 7368 | 77368 | 90261 | 09/1943 | 86A 84G 84D 84C 84F 8F 26B 10F 10H W |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) Shrewsbury Leamington Banbury Stourbridge Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Agecroft Rose Grove Lower Darwen Withdrawn |
17/06/1950 31/10/1953 14/07/1956 05/09/1959 24/02/1962 15/07/1962 01/06/1963 17/10/1964 07/11/1964 10/07/1965 |
10/07/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7369 | 77369 | 3023 | 63023 | 90023 | 10/1943 | 31F 33B W |
Spital Bridge Tilbury Withdrawn |
26/12/1959 06/02/1960 05/09/1962 |
05/09/1962 | ||
WD/8 | 7370 | 77370 | 3024 | 63024 | 90024 | 10/1943 | 36A 36B 38A 34E 36C W |
Doncaster Mexborough Colwick New England Frodingham Withdrawn |
24/10/1953 18/06/1955 18/02/1956 20/02/1960 29/09/1962 27/02/1966 |
27/02/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 7371 | 77371 | 90262 | 10/1943 | 25C 50B W |
Goole Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/07/1950 30/11/1963 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7372 | 77372 | 90263 | 10/1943 | CLK ANN CLK WFD WFD 38D 38E 38E 38A 40B 40E W |
Colwick Annesley Colwick Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Staveley (G.C.) Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Colwick Immingham Colwick Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 30/10/1948 29/01/1949 07/1949 23/07/1949 29/11/1952 13/12/1952 27/12/1952 16/05/1953 13/12/1958 15/08/1959 05/01/1964 |
05/01/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7373 | 77373 | 3025 | 63025 | 90025 | 10/1943 | ANN CLK 38B 38B 40B 40B 38A 36C W |
Annesley Colwick Annesley Annesley Immingham Immingham Colwick Frodingham Withdrawn |
14/02/1948 29/05/1948 20/01/1951 31/01/1951 08/09/1951 22/09/1951 25/07/1953 22/10/1960 01/08/1965 |
01/08/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 7374 | 77374 | 90264 | 10/1943 | 10D W |
Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
18/01/1964 29/08/1964 |
29/08/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7375 | 77375 | 90265 | 10/1943 | 26A 26A 25A 25A 25B 53C 53E 50B W |
Newton Heath Newton Heath Wakefield Wakefield Huddersfield Hillhouse Hull Springhead Goole Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/09/1951 08/09/1951 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 16/06/1956 12/04/1958 14/06/1958 30/11/1963 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7376 | 77376 | 4526 | 10/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | ||||
WD/8 | 7377 | 77377 | 4527 | 10/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1955 | 09/1955 | ||||
WD/8 | 7378 | 77378 | 90266 | 10/1943 | RDG LA 24A 24C 24B 9G 41J 41H 41E W |
Reading (W.R.) Laira Accrington Lostock Hall Rose Grove Gorton Langwith Junction Staveley (G.C.) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 30/10/1948 03/12/1955 20/04/1957 11/08/1962 09/05/1964 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 25/07/1965 |
25/07/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7379 | 77379 | 90267 | 10/1943 | SR 73C 73C 6B 24A 25G 27B 24B 26C 8L W |
To Southern Region (on loan) Hither Green Hither Green Mold Junction Accrington Farnley Junction Aintree Rose Grove Bolton Aintree Withdrawn |
25/07/1947 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 01/12/1951 29/12/1951 26/01/1952 23/02/1952 04/10/1952 18/04/1953 03/10/1964 13/03/1965 |
13/03/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7380 | 77380 | 90268 | 10/1943 | CDF PPRD 86B 86B 81C 84C 85C 84F 8F 26B 9G 10H W |
Cardiff Canton Pontypool Road Newport Pill Newport Pill Southall Banbury Gloucester Barnwood Stourbridge Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Agecroft Gorton Lower Darwen Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/07/1948 31/12/1950 31/01/1951 30/04/1951 11/07/1959 30/12/1961 24/02/1962 15/07/1962 01/06/1963 10/10/1964 28/11/1964 10/04/1965 |
10/04/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7381 | 77381 | 90269 | 10/1943 | 38A 34E W |
Colwick New England Withdrawn |
24/07/1954 21/02/1959 18/05/1963 |
18/05/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7382 | 77382 | 3026 | 63026 | 90026 | 10/1943 | HLD HLS HLD HLD 54B 53A 54B 54B 50B 50A W |
Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Tyne Dock Hull Dairycoates Tyne Dock Tyne Dock Neville Hill York (North) Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 17/09/1949 12/1949 10/12/1949 25/02/1950 04/02/1951 11/02/1951 17/02/1951 20/07/1957 12/12/1959 09/12/1963 |
09/12/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 7383 | 77383 | 4430 | 10/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1954 | 09/1954 | ||||
WD/8 | 7384 | 77384 | 4431 | 10/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1957 | 07/1957 | ||||
WD/8 | 7385 | 77385 | 3031 | 63031 | 90031 | 11/1943 | 36C 36C 34E W |
Frodingham Frodingham New England Withdrawn |
07/07/1951 21/07/1951 11/11/1961 18/05/1963 |
18/05/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 7386 | 77386 | 90270 | 11/1943 | MEX 36A 36A 36B 34E W |
Mexborough (on loan) Doncaster Doncaster Mexborough New England Withdrawn |
19/11/1947 02/06/1951 23/06/1951 18/06/1955 11/11/1961 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7387 | 77387 | 4432 | 11/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | ||||
WD/8 | 7388 | 77388 | 90271 | 11/1943 | NA 26C 26C 26C 26E 26A 8L 10F 41J W |
Newton Abbot Bolton Bolton Bolton Lees (Oldham) Newton Heath Aintree Rose Grove Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/01/1951 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 28/12/1957 14/06/1958 04/07/1964 25/07/1964 12/09/1964 18/07/1965 |
18/07/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7389 | 77389 | 4433 | 11/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1955 | 06/1955 | ||||
WD/8 | 7390 | 77390 | 90272 | 11/1943 | HLD YK HLD HLD 54B 53A 53A 50D W |
Hull Dairycoates York (North) Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Tyne Dock Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Goole Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 17/09/1949 12/1949 10/12/1949 25/02/1950 11/02/1951 17/02/1951 20/05/1967 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7391 | 77391 | 3032 | 63032 | 90032 | 11/1943 | 31B 31B 36C 36C W |
March March Frodingham Frodingham Withdrawn |
08/10/1950 21/10/1950 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 27/02/1966 |
27/02/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 7392 | 77392 | 90273 | 11/1943 | 51L 50D W |
Thornaby Goole Withdrawn |
14/06/1958 24/08/1963 25/10/1965 |
25/10/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7393 | 77393 | 90274 | 16/11/1943 | 9G 8L 36C W |
Gorton Aintree Frodingham Withdrawn |
09/05/1964 26/12/1964 17/04/1965 02/01/1966 |
02/01/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7394 | 77394 | 90275 | 11/1943 | MEX IMM IMM 31B 40B 40E W |
Mexborough (on loan) Immingham Immingham March Immingham Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
10/11/1947 30/11/1949 03/12/1949 30/06/1950 24/10/1953 20/08/1955 04/07/1965 |
04/07/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7395 | 77395 | 90276 | 11/1943 | 38A 38D 41J 41H 41D W |
Colwick Staveley (G.C.) Langwith Junction Staveley (G.C.) Canklow Withdrawn |
24/07/1954 21/01/1956 27/02/1960 26/03/1960 02/04/1960 28/02/1965 |
28/02/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7396 | 77396 | 4493 | 11/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | ||||
WD/8 | 7397 | 77397 | 3033 | 63033 | 90033 | 11/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 25/05/1963 | 25/05/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 7398 | 77398 | 90277 | 11/1943 | 25E 25A 25A 25B 27D 24C 36A W |
Sowerby Bridge Wakefield Wakefield Huddersfield Hillhouse Wigan Central (L&Y) Lostock Hall Doncaster Withdrawn |
29/07/1950 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 16/06/1956 08/09/1956 06/10/1956 12/09/1964 31/10/1965 |
31/10/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7399 | 77399 | 90278 | 11/1943 | DFU 24A 24A 25G 27B W |
Dunfermline Upper Accrington Accrington Farnley Junction Aintree Withdrawn |
05/11/1949 01/09/1951 08/09/1951 26/01/1952 23/02/1952 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7400 | 77400 | 4434 | 11/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1957 | 11/1957 | ||||
WD/8 | 7401 | 77401 | 90279 | 12/1943 | NWE 31B 36A W |
New England March Doncaster Withdrawn |
18/09/1948 14/12/1957 07/10/1961 27/06/1965 |
27/06/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7402 | 77402 | 90280 | 12/1943 | 31B 31B 40B 36E 36C W |
March March Immingham Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Frodingham Withdrawn |
26/05/1951 23/06/1951 24/10/1953 28/09/1963 19/06/1965 05/09/1965 |
05/09/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7403 | 77403 | 4435 | 12/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1957 | 02/1957 | ||||
WD/8 | 7404 | 77404 | 90281 | 12/1943 | 91M 56D 56E 56A W |
To London Midland Region Mirfield Sowerby Bridge Wakefield Withdrawn |
08/07/1950 20/06/1959 18/06/1960 11/01/1964 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7405 | 77405 | 4436 | 12/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1954 | 12/1954 | ||||
WD/8 | 7406 | 77406 | 90282 | 12/1943 | 27B 27B 40E W |
Aintree Aintree Colwick Withdrawn |
01/09/1951 08/09/1951 12/09/1964 10/01/1965 |
10/01/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7407 | 77407 | 90283 | 14/12/1943 | NEA 26A 27B 8F 36C W |
Neath (Court Sart) Newton Heath Aintree Springs Branch (Wigan) Frodingham Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 28/11/1953 11/08/1956 25/07/1964 12/09/1964 03/10/1965 |
03/10/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7408 | 77408 | 90284 | 12/1943 | OXY 81C 81C 85A 85A 84B 84B 82B 81C 82B 81F 18B 9G 8L W |
Oxley Southall Southall Worcester Worcester Oxley Oxley St Philips Marsh Southall St Philips Marsh Oxford Westhouses Gorton Aintree Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/08/1951 31/08/1951 08/09/1951 30/09/1951 19/04/1952 17/05/1952 03/10/1953 04/12/1954 26/03/1955 16/06/1956 18/07/1959 30/06/1962 12/12/1964 06/03/1965 |
06/03/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7409 | 77409 | 4437 | 12/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1955 | 03/1955 | ||||
WD/8 | 7410 | 77410 | 3034 | 63034 | 90034 | 12/1943 | 33B W |
Tilbury Withdrawn |
10/05/1958 05/09/1962 |
05/09/1962 | ||
WD/8 | 7411 | 77411 | 90285 | 12/1943 | 40B 36E W |
Immingham Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
29/12/1951 28/09/1963 13/06/1965 |
13/06/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7412 | 77412 | 3035 | 63035 | 90035 | 12/1943 | 40B 36C W |
Immingham Frodingham Withdrawn |
24/10/1953 11/09/1965 27/02/1966 |
27/02/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 7413 | 77413 | 90286 | 12/1943 | 36A W |
Doncaster Withdrawn |
10/12/1960 15/08/1962 |
15/08/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7414 | 77414 | 90287 | 12/1943 | NWE 38A 40E 40E W |
New England Colwick Langwith Junction Colwick Withdrawn |
18/09/1948 24/11/1951 19/06/1954 07/05/1960 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7415 | 77415 | 90288 | 12/1943 | MAR NWE 38A 40B 40E 36C W |
March (on loan) New England Colwick Immingham Colwick Frodingham Withdrawn |
28/11/1947 18/09/1948 25/07/1953 16/04/1960 13/08/1960 15/10/1960 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7416 | 77416 | 90289 | 12/1943 | 26A 26A 24J 26A 8L 10F W |
Newton Heath Newton Heath Lancaster Green Ayre Newton Heath Aintree Rose Grove Withdrawn |
25/08/1951 08/09/1951 12/07/1958 04/10/1958 04/07/1964 25/07/1964 21/11/1964 |
21/11/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7417 | 77417 | 4438 | 01/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1955 | 11/1955 | ||||
WD/8 | 7418 | 77418 | 90290 | 01/1944 | 31B 36A 36A 35A 36A 36B 41J 41D W |
March Doncaster Doncaster New England Doncaster Mexborough Langwith Junction Canklow Withdrawn |
03/11/1951 19/01/1952 26/01/1952 22/03/1952 19/04/1952 19/06/1954 07/05/1960 13/08/1960 02/05/1965 |
02/05/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7419 | 77419 | 90291 | 01/1944 | DFU STM 64A 26A 26A 10F W |
Dunfermline Upper St Margarets St Margarets Newton Heath Newton Heath Rose Grove Withdrawn |
05/11/1949 26/11/1949 24/12/1949 01/09/1951 08/09/1951 04/07/1964 06/02/1965 |
06/02/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7420 | 77420 | 3036 | 63036 | 90036 | 01/1944 | ANN CLK 38D 38D 38A 38A 40B 40E W |
Annesley Colwick Staveley (G.C.) Staveley (G.C.) Colwick Colwick Immingham Colwick Withdrawn |
07/02/1948 29/05/1948 20/01/1951 31/01/1951 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 13/09/1958 22/10/1960 19/12/1965 |
19/12/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 7421 | 77421 | 90292 | 01/1944 | SPM 26B 9G 41J W |
St Philips Marsh Agecroft Gorton Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/06/1956 01/06/1963 12/09/1964 17/10/1965 |
17/10/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7422 | 77422 | 3037 | 63037 | 90037 | 01/1944 | 36A 38A 40B 36A W |
Doncaster Colwick Immingham Doncaster Withdrawn |
24/10/1953 18/02/1956 01/01/1966 12/02/1966 17/04/1966 |
17/04/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 7423 | 77423 | 3038 | 63038 | 90038 | 01/1944 | 38A W |
Colwick Withdrawn |
19/09/1953 01/08/1965 |
01/08/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 7424 | 77424 | 90293 | 01/1944 | 12A DFU 31B 31B 31B 36A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Dunfermline Upper March March March Doncaster Withdrawn |
19/06/1949 16/07/1949 05/11/1949 10/02/1952 16/02/1952 22/03/1952 07/10/1961 26/09/1965 |
26/09/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7425 | 77425 | 90294 | 01/1944 | COL MAR 40B W |
Colchester March Immingham Withdrawn |
13/03/1948 08/05/1948 24/10/1953 11/07/1965 |
11/07/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7426 | 77426 | 90295 | 01/1944 | 24C 24B 41E 40E W |
Lostock Hall Rose Grove Staveley (Barrow Hill) Colwick Withdrawn |
16/04/1949 10/02/1962 12/06/1965 09/10/1965 02/01/1966 |
02/01/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7427 | 77427 | 3039 | 63039 | 90039 | 01/1944 | 65D 65F 65D 66A 62C W |
Dawsholm Grangemouth Dawsholm Polmadie Dunfermline Upper Withdrawn |
13/04/1957 11/05/1957 12/04/1958 02/08/1958 07/09/1963 02/09/1966 |
02/09/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 7428 | 77428 | 90296 | 01/1944 | 31B 31B 38A 36A W |
March March Colwick Doncaster Withdrawn |
26/05/1951 23/06/1951 24/10/1953 22/10/1960 08/08/1965 |
08/08/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7429 | 77429 | 90297 | 01/1944 | LLY 26C 27B 24D 24B 10D W |
Llanelli Bolton Aintree Lower Darwen Rose Grove Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/12/1950 09/04/1960 17/06/1961 06/04/1963 18/01/1964 05/09/1964 |
05/09/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7430 | 77430 | 3040 | 63040 | 90040 | 01/1944 | 16D 1G 10F W |
Nottingham Woodford Halse Rose Grove Withdrawn |
21/12/1963 18/04/1964 25/04/1964 31/07/1965 |
31/07/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 7431 | 77431 | 90298 | 01/1944 | 31B 31B 31B 40B 31B 30A 31B 30A 33B W |
March March March Immingham March Stratford March Stratford Tilbury Withdrawn |
10/02/1952 16/02/1952 22/03/1952 24/10/1953 22/09/1956 16/02/1957 15/11/1958 20/12/1958 23/01/1960 06/08/1962 |
06/08/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7432 | 77432 | 90299 | 02/1944 | MAR NWE STV 38E 16A 1G W |
March (on loan) New England Staveley (G.C.) Woodford Halse Toton Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
28/11/1947 18/09/1948 26/02/1949 22/01/1955 14/03/1964 18/04/1964 25/04/1964 |
25/04/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7433 | 77433 | 90300 | 02/1944 | 25C 25C 56D 56A W |
Goole Goole Mirfield Wakefield Withdrawn |
06/09/1950 09/09/1950 20/06/1959 11/01/1964 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7434 | 77434 | 90301 | 02/1944 | 36A 36A 41F 41J 41H 41J W |
Doncaster Doncaster Mexborough Langwith Junction Staveley (G.C.) Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
02/06/1951 23/06/1951 19/07/1958 07/05/1960 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 26/09/1965 |
26/09/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7435 | 77435 | 3041 | 63041 | 90041 | 02/1944 | 62C W |
Dunfermline Upper Withdrawn |
30/04/1966 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 7436 | 77436 | 90302 | 02/1944 | 40B 40E W |
Immingham Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
24/10/1953 20/08/1955 18/08/1964 |
18/08/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7437 | 77437 | 3042 | 63042 | 90042 | 02/1944 | 36A 31B 33B 36A W |
Doncaster March Tilbury Doncaster Withdrawn |
24/10/1953 22/09/1956 30/01/1960 01/07/1961 10/01/1965 |
10/01/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 7438 | 77438 | 4371 | 02/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1955 | 04/1955 | ||||
WD/8 | 7439 | 77439 | 90303 | 02/1944 | CLK W |
Colwick Withdrawn |
13/08/1949 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7440 | 77440 | 90304 | 02/1944 | COL 31B 36B 34E 40E W |
Colchester March Mexborough New England Colwick Withdrawn |
08/05/1948 20/10/1951 14/02/1953 11/11/1961 23/06/1962 07/09/1964 |
07/09/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7441 | 77441 | 90305 | 02/1944 | NWE 36A 36A 31B 36A W |
New England Doncaster Doncaster March Doncaster Withdrawn |
13/08/1949 19/01/1952 26/01/1952 22/09/1956 14/10/1961 06/03/1966 |
06/03/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7442 | 77442 | 90306 | 02/1944 | 64A 64A 24A 24A 25G 26B 26E 26B 8L 10F 41E W |
St Margarets St Margarets Accrington Accrington Farnley Junction Agecroft Lees (Oldham) Agecroft Aintree Rose Grove Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
25/11/1950 30/11/1950 01/09/1951 08/09/1951 26/01/1952 23/02/1952 28/12/1957 07/10/1961 10/10/1964 08/05/1965 12/06/1965 27/06/1965 |
27/06/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7443 | 77443 | 90307 | 02/1944 | 26B W |
Agecroft Withdrawn |
02/12/1950 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7444 | 77444 | 90308 | 02/1944 | SR 91M 25E 26D 25G 55G W |
To Southern Region (on loan) To London Midland Region Sowerby Bridge Bury Farnley Junction Huddersfield Hillhouse Withdrawn |
25/07/1947 17/06/1950 23/02/1952 08/08/1953 04/12/1954 14/01/1961 12/11/1962 |
12/11/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7445 | 77445 | 90309 | 02/1944 | HLD YK HLD TDK 50A 55E 51A 66A 51A 51C W |
Hull Dairycoates York (North) Hull Dairycoates Tyne Dock York (North) Normanton Darlington Polmadie Darlington West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 17/09/1949 10/12/1949 29/01/1950 20/07/1957 21/09/1957 17/06/1961 16/03/1963 29/06/1963 26/03/1966 01/07/1967 |
01/07/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7446 | 77446 | 4372 | 02/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1956 | 05/1956 | ||||
WD/8 | 7447 | 77447 | 90310 | 02/1944 | 25E 56F 56D W |
Sowerby Bridge Low Moor Mirfield Withdrawn |
16/06/1956 29/12/1962 12/09/1964 19/12/1966 |
19/12/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7448 | 77448 | 3043 | 63043 | 90043 | 03/1944 | ANN CLK 38E 38E 38A 40E W |
Annesley Colwick Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Colwick Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 14/05/1949 29/09/1951 20/10/1951 17/05/1952 19/06/1954 12/12/1965 |
12/12/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 7449 | 77449 | 90311 | 03/1944 | 41D W |
Canklow Withdrawn |
05/01/1963 18/08/1964 |
18/08/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7450 | 77450 | 30 | 12/1943 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1957 | 08/1957 | ||||
WD/8 | 7451 | 77451 | 90595 | 12/1943 | 24H 24J W |
Hellifield Lancaster Green Ayre Withdrawn |
29/11/1958 10/01/1959 08/02/1964 |
08/02/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7452 | 77452 | 90596 | 12/1943 | 36C 65D 66A 61B 62A W |
Frodingham Dawsholm Polmadie Aberdeen Ferryhill Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
25/07/1953 13/04/1957 10/05/1958 07/09/1963 30/04/1966 04/04/1967 |
04/04/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7453 | 77453 | 90597 | 12/1943 | 36C W |
Frodingham Withdrawn |
12/11/1955 08/07/1963 |
08/07/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7454 | 77454 | 90598 | 12/1943 | 36C W |
Frodingham Withdrawn |
12/11/1955 25/02/1964 |
25/02/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7455 | 77455 | 90599 | 12/1943 | 27D 26B 27B W |
Wigan Central (L&Y) Agecroft Aintree Withdrawn |
09/10/1954 06/02/1960 20/02/1960 25/07/1964 |
25/07/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7456 | 77456 | 90600 | 12/1943 | DEE 62C 65F 62C 62A W |
Dundee Tay Bridge Dunfermline Upper Grangemouth Dunfermline Upper Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
29/05/1948 13/04/1957 19/01/1963 04/12/1965 25/12/1965 08/1966 |
08/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7457 | 77457 | 90601 | 12/1943 | 36C W |
Frodingham Withdrawn |
19/02/1955 06/06/1965 |
06/06/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7458 | 77458 | 90602 | 12/1943 | 36A 36C W |
Doncaster Frodingham Withdrawn |
16/03/1957 26/11/1960 10/01/1965 |
10/01/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7459 | 77459 | 90603 | 12/1943 | 50A 51B 51L W |
York (North) Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Withdrawn |
24/07/1954 16/06/1956 14/06/1958 12/02/1962 |
12/02/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7460 | 77460 | 90604 | 12/1943 | 27B 27B 27B 25A 38A W |
Aintree Aintree Aintree Wakefield Colwick Withdrawn |
02/06/1951 16/06/1951 27/06/1951 01/12/1951 29/12/1951 28/12/1963 |
28/12/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7461 | 77461 | 90605 | 12/1943 | 51L 55D 55E W |
Thornaby Royston Normanton Withdrawn |
14/06/1958 27/06/1959 28/01/1967 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7462 | 77462 | 90606 | 12/1943 | STV 38A 38A 6B 6B 6C 8G 40E W |
Staveley (G.C.) Colwick Colwick Mold Junction Mold Junction Birkenhead Mollington Street Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Colwick Withdrawn |
13/08/1949 05/05/1951 19/05/1951 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 18/06/1960 15/09/1962 12/09/1964 12/02/1966 |
12/02/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7463 | 77463 | 90607 | 12/1943 | 55E 56A W |
Normanton Wakefield Withdrawn |
20/07/1957 19/10/1957 06/11/1962 |
06/11/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7464 | 77464 | 90608 | 12/1943 | MAR 36A 41F W |
March (on loan) Doncaster Mexborough Withdrawn |
23/11/1947 16/03/1957 19/07/1958 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7465 | 77465 | 90609 | 01/1944 | YK 53A 53A W |
York (North) Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
13/08/1949 08/09/1951 22/09/1951 17/08/1963 |
17/08/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7466 | 77466 | 90610 | 01/1944 | 26C 26C 26B 26B 24A 25A 55E 55D 56A W |
Bolton Bolton Agecroft Agecroft Accrington Wakefield Normanton Royston Wakefield Withdrawn |
04/08/1951 11/08/1951 10/11/1951 01/12/1951 19/04/1952 31/10/1953 20/07/1957 14/01/1961 26/10/1963 12/05/1967 |
12/05/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7467 | 77467 | 90611 | 01/1944 | 50A 55D 56A 55E W |
York (North) Royston Wakefield Normanton Withdrawn |
20/07/1957 18/04/1959 26/10/1963 15/07/1967 17/08/1967 |
17/08/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7468 | 77468 | 90612 | 01/1944 | HLS MEX W |
Hull Springhead Mexborough Withdrawn |
15/05/1948 04/09/1948 01/03/1964 |
01/03/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7469 | 77469 | 90613 | 01/1944 | 36C W |
Frodingham Withdrawn |
13/04/1963 30/05/1965 |
30/05/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7470 | 77470 | 90614 | 01/1944 | 65F W |
Grangemouth Withdrawn |
19/01/1963 29/11/1963 |
29/11/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7471 | 77471 | 90615 | 01/1944 | 55D 55E W |
Royston Normanton Withdrawn |
16/07/1966 28/01/1967 30/09/1967 |
30/09/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7472 | 77472 | 4375 | 01/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1954 | 01/1954 | ||||
WD/8 | 7473 | 77473 | 3112 | 63112 | 90433 | 01/1944 | 38A 38E 16A 1G W |
Colwick Woodford Halse Toton Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
24/10/1953 18/02/1956 21/12/1963 18/04/1964 25/04/1964 |
25/04/1964 | ||
WD/8 | 7474 | 77474 | 3113 | 63113 | 90434 | 01/1944 | NPT 51L 52H 51C W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Tyne Dock West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 14/06/1958 22/06/1963 19/06/1965 27/06/1967 |
27/06/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 7475 | 77475 | 4439 | 01/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1957 | 12/1957 | ||||
WD/8 | 7476 | 77476 | 90616 | 01/1944 | 66A W |
Polmadie Withdrawn |
23/02/1952 11/06/1962 |
11/06/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7477 | 77477 | 4440 | 01/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1957 | 07/1957 | ||||
WD/8 | 7478 | 77478 | 26 | 01/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1963 | 05/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7479 | 77479 | 90617 | 01/1944 | 55E W |
Normanton Withdrawn |
20/07/1957 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7480 | 77480 | 90618 | 02/1944 | CLK MEX 38A 40E 38A 38A 34E 40B W |
Colwick Mexborough Colwick Langwith Junction Colwick Colwick New England Immingham Withdrawn |
13/08/1949 24/12/1949 17/05/1952 27/12/1952 27/12/1952 17/01/1953 07/05/1960 29/09/1962 13/05/1964 |
13/05/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 7481 | 77481 | 90619 | 02/1944 | 91M 56A W |
To London Midland Region Wakefield Withdrawn |
17/06/1950 09/10/1965 25/10/1965 |
25/10/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7482 | 77482 | 90620 | 02/1944 | 25D 25D 25A 25A W |
Mirfield Mirfield Wakefield Wakefield Withdrawn |
21/10/1950 04/11/1950 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 08/06/1967 |
08/06/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7483 | 77483 | 4441 | 02/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1956 | 12/1956 | ||||
WD/8 | 7484 | 77484 | 90621 | 02/1944 | 25E 25E 24B 25B 51C W |
Sowerby Bridge Sowerby Bridge Rose Grove Huddersfield Hillhouse West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
02/06/1951 16/06/1951 08/08/1953 28/11/1953 28/11/1964 16/11/1965 |
16/11/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7485 | 77485 | 90622 | 02/1944 | AFD 91M 25D 56A W |
Ashford To London Midland Region Mirfield Wakefield Withdrawn |
30/06/1949 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 11/01/1964 04/09/1966 |
04/09/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 7486 | 77486 | 3114 | 63114 | 90435 | 02/1944 | 53A 53A 51B 51B 51L 50D 50B W |
Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Newport (Teeside) Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Goole Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
25/11/1950 30/11/1950 15/11/1952 29/11/1952 14/06/1958 24/02/1962 14/04/1962 02/09/1963 |
02/09/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 7487 | 77487 | 3115 | 63115 | 90436 | 02/1944 | 65D W |
Dawsholm Withdrawn |
01/11/1952 11/06/1962 |
11/06/1962 | ||
WD/8 | 7488 | 77488 | 90623 | 02/1944 | 91E 53C 53C 53A 50A W |
To Eastern Region (on loan) Hull Springhead Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates York (North) Withdrawn |
16/07/1947 14/06/1952 21/06/1952 06/12/1958 16/09/1961 09/12/1963 |
09/12/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7489 | 77489 | 90624 | 02/1944 | LLY 25B W |
Llanelli Huddersfield Hillhouse Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 16/06/1956 16/12/1963 |
16/12/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 7490 | 77490 | 25 | 02/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1957 | 08/1957 | ||||
WD/8 | 7491 | 77491 | 3116 | 63116 | 90437 | 02/1944 | ANN CLK 36A W |
Annesley Colwick Doncaster Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 21/05/1949 01/01/1966 17/04/1966 |
17/04/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 7492 | 77492 | 90625 | 02/1944 | 50A 56A 56B 56A W |
York (North) Wakefield Ardsley Wakefield Withdrawn |
20/07/1957 21/09/1957 07/07/1962 06/11/1965 05/1967 |
05/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7493 | 77493 | 3117 | 63117 | 90438 | 02/1944 | MAR NWE 31B 35A 35A 40B 40E 40E W |
March New England March New England New England Immingham Langwith Junction Colwick Withdrawn |
18/09/1948 31/12/1949 20/08/1950 27/08/1950 23/09/1950 19/10/1957 09/11/1957 07/05/1960 03/10/1965 |
03/10/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 7494 | 77494 | 90626 | 02/1944 | 26F 24C 26D 26B 9G 10H W |
Lees (Oldham) Lostock Hall Bury Agecroft Gorton Lower Darwen Withdrawn |
30/04/1949 14/05/1949 14/06/1952 12/11/1960 08/06/1963 28/11/1964 27/03/1965 |
27/03/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7495 | 77495 | 4376 | 02/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1954 | 09/1954 | ||||
WD/8 | 7496 | 77496 | 3118 | 63118 | 90439 | 03/1944 | 36C W |
Frodingham Withdrawn |
13/04/1963 07/11/1965 |
07/11/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 7497 | 77497 | 90627 | 03/1944 | 53A 53A 51C W |
Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
08/09/1951 22/09/1951 15/07/1967 08/1967 |
08/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7498 | 77498 | 3119 | 63119 | 90440 | 03/1944 | 65D 8F W |
Dawsholm Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
06/08/1950 21/07/1962 17/08/1963 |
17/08/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 7499 | 77499 | 90628 | 03/1944 | CLK 66B 66B 62C 62A W |
Colwick Motherwell Motherwell Dunfermline Upper Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 22/01/1950 05/06/1950 17/06/1950 07/09/1963 27/06/1964 20/01/1967 |
20/01/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 7500 | 77500 | 4377 | 03/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | ||||
WD/8 | 7501 | 77501 | 3120 | 63120 | 90441 | 03/1944 | 62A W |
Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
23/02/1952 19/10/1966 |
19/10/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 7502 | 77502 | 3121 | 63121 | 90442 | 03/1944 | MAR 40B 33A 33B 36A 41J W |
March Immingham Plaistow Tilbury Doncaster Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
18/09/1948 24/10/1953 14/05/1955 15/11/1958 02/12/1961 09/03/1963 04/04/1965 |
04/04/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 7503 | 77503 | 90629 | 03/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 26/09/1965 | 26/09/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 7504 | 77504 | 3122 | 63122 | 90443 | 03/1944 | 31B 30A 33A 40B W |
March Stratford Plaistow Immingham Withdrawn |
20/10/1951 19/02/1955 19/03/1955 14/05/1955 27/06/1965 |
27/06/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 7505 | 77505 | 3123 | 63123 | 90444 | 03/1944 | 62A W |
Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
06/07/1963 20/01/1967 |
20/01/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 7506 | 77506 | 3124 | 63124 | 90445 | 03/1944 | TDK 50A 56A 51A 51L 51C W |
Tyne Dock York (North) Wakefield Darlington Thornaby West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
13/11/1948 20/07/1957 07/11/1959 18/06/1960 25/01/1964 23/05/1964 24/07/1966 |
24/07/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 7507 | 77507 | 3125 | 63125 | 90446 | 03/1944 | 51L W |
Thornaby Withdrawn |
14/06/1958 18/11/1963 |
18/11/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 7508 | 77508 | 90630 | 03/1944 | SPM WES 86G 86A 86A 86C 86C 81C W |
St Philips Marsh Westbury Pontypool Road Ebbw Junction (Newport) Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Southall Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/12/1949 30/04/1951 16/06/1951 30/06/1951 11/08/1951 31/08/1951 16/06/1956 12/11/1962 |
12/11/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 7509 | 77509 | 24 | 03/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1957 | 08/1957 | ||||
WD/8 | 8510 | 78510 | 90363 | 09/1944 | 55E 56A W |
Normanton Wakefield Withdrawn |
20/07/1957 08/02/1958 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 8511 | 78511 | 4378 | 09/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1955 | 04/1955 | ||||
WD/8 | 8512 | 78512 | 90364 | 08/09/1944 | 26D 26D 9K 9G 10F 36A 40B W |
Bury Bury Bolton Gorton Rose Grove Doncaster Immingham Withdrawn |
03/12/1949 24/12/1949 21/12/1963 26/09/1964 16/01/1965 12/06/1965 06/11/1965 05/12/1965 |
05/12/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 8513 | 78513 | 3083 | 63083 | 90083 | 09/1944 | 40B 31B W |
Immingham March Withdrawn |
24/10/1953 22/09/1956 28/12/1959 |
28/12/1959 | ||
WD/8 | 8514 | 78514 | 90365 | 09/1944 | WFD WFD 16A 1G 9G 36A W |
Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Toton Woodford Halse Gorton Doncaster Withdrawn |
07/1949 23/07/1949 21/12/1963 18/04/1964 25/04/1964 12/09/1964 20/06/1965 |
20/06/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 8515 | 78515 | 3084 | 63084 | 90084 | 09/1944 | 41E W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
16/01/1965 06/06/1965 |
06/06/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 8516 | 78516 | 3085 | 63085 | 90085 | 09/1944 | COL 31B 36B 38A 38D 41J 41D 41E W |
Colchester March Mexborough Colwick Staveley (G.C.) Langwith Junction Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
24/04/1948 20/10/1951 14/02/1953 18/02/1956 17/11/1956 27/02/1960 26/03/1960 25/01/1964 16/05/1965 |
16/05/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 8517 | 78517 | 4379 | 09/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1957 | 07/1957 | ||||
WD/8 | 78518 | 4380 | 09/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | |||||
WD/8 | 78519 | 4494 | 09/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1956 | 07/1956 | |||||
WD/8 | 78520 | 3086 | 63086 | 90086 | 09/1944 | SKN 51G 51L 52H W |
Stockton Haverton Hill Thornaby Tyne Dock Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 11/10/1958 20/06/1959 16/03/1963 12/08/1963 |
12/08/1963 | |||
WD/8 | 78521 | 90366 | 09/1944 | 91W 84G 84G 26A W |
To Western Region / GWR (on loan) Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Newton Heath Withdrawn |
15/07/1947 12/08/1950 31/08/1950 31/12/1950 18/01/1964 |
18/01/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 78522 | 90367 | 10/1944 | RDG CLK NWE 24F 26C 9G 10F 41E 40E 36C W |
Reading (W.R.) Colwick New England Fleetwood Bolton Gorton Rose Grove Staveley (Barrow Hill) Colwick Frodingham Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 28/08/1948 18/09/1948 10/02/1962 20/04/1963 03/10/1964 09/01/1965 12/06/1965 09/10/1965 25/12/1965 27/02/1966 |
27/02/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 78523 | 4381 | 10/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1956 | 05/1956 | |||||
WD/8 | 78524 | 4382 | 10/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1954 | 02/1954 | |||||
WD/8 | 78525 | 90368 | 10/1944 | 41D 41E W |
Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
12/09/1959 25/01/1964 20/06/1965 |
20/06/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 78526 | 90369 | 10/1944 | YK CLK 38E 38E 38A 38A 2E 6C 8B 24L 16D 10A 8F 36A W |
York (North) Colwick Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Colwick Colwick Northampton Birkenhead Mollington Street Warrington Dallam Carnforth Nottingham Carnforth Springs Branch (Wigan) Doncaster Withdrawn |
29/05/1948 04/09/1948 12/07/1952 19/07/1952 06/09/1952 20/09/1952 24/04/1954 20/04/1957 15/09/1962 16/03/1963 21/12/1963 18/04/1964 25/04/1964 12/09/1964 17/04/1966 |
17/04/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 78527 | 3089 | 63089 | 90089 | 10/1944 | NPT 51G 51G 53A 53A 56A W |
Newport (Teeside) Haverton Hill Haverton Hill Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Wakefield Withdrawn |
04/12/1948 24/09/1950 21/10/1950 08/09/1951 22/09/1951 21/09/1957 09/01/1967 |
09/01/1967 | |||
WD/8 | 78528 | 3090 | 63090 | 90090 | 10/1944 | NPT 51L 52H W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Tyne Dock Withdrawn |
04/12/1948 14/06/1958 16/03/1963 30/05/1963 |
30/05/1963 | |||
WD/8 | 78529 | 4383 | 10/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1973 | 01/1973 | |||||
WD/8 | 78530 | 4384 | 11/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1955 | 11/1955 | |||||
WD/8 | 78531 | 90408 | 01/1945 | SR 27B 27B 26D 16E 9M W |
To Southern Region (on loan) Aintree Aintree Bury Kirkby in Ashfield Bury Withdrawn |
03/07/1947 16/06/1951 27/06/1951 14/06/1952 21/12/1963 28/03/1964 28/03/1964 |
28/03/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 78532 | 90409 | 01/1945 | YK HLD 50A 51B 51L 56B 56A W |
York (North) Hull Dairycoates York (North) Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Ardsley Wakefield Withdrawn |
17/09/1949 10/12/1949 17/12/1955 16/06/1956 14/06/1958 23/06/1962 17/07/1965 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 78533 | 4442 | 01/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1954 | 01/1954 | |||||
WD/8 | 78534 | 3098 | 63098 | 90098 | 01/1945 | 51L 51A W |
Thornaby Darlington Withdrawn |
14/06/1958 04/05/1963 10/11/1964 |
10/11/1964 | |||
WD/8 | 78535 | 4443 | 02/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1955 | 09/1955 | |||||
WD/8 | 78536 | 4385 | 02/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1956 | 03/1956 | |||||
WD/8 | 78537 | 90410 | 02/1945 | 41D 41E 40E 36C 36A W |
Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Colwick Frodingham Doncaster Withdrawn |
07/03/1964 19/06/1965 09/10/1965 13/11/1965 05/03/1966 17/04/1966 |
17/04/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 78538 | 90411 | 02/1945 | YK CLK 38B 38B 38A 38A 38E 38E 38A 31B 38A 40E 41D 40B 41D 41J W |
York (North) Colwick Annesley Annesley Colwick Colwick Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Colwick March Colwick Langwith Junction Canklow Immingham Canklow Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
29/05/1948 13/08/1949 20/01/1951 31/01/1951 30/06/1951 21/07/1951 29/09/1951 20/10/1951 19/04/1952 23/01/1954 24/04/1954 19/06/1954 20/06/1959 12/09/1959 09/01/1960 13/08/1960 18/08/1964 |
18/08/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 78539 | 4444 | 02/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1954 | 12/1954 | |||||
WD/8 | 78540 | 3099 | 63099 | 90099 | 02/1945 | YK 53A 53A 50D W |
York (North) Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Goole Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 08/09/1951 22/09/1951 30/11/1963 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | |||
WD/8 | 78541 | 90412 | 02/1945 | 25E 56A W |
Sowerby Bridge Wakefield Withdrawn |
24/03/1956 14/09/1963 26/10/1964 |
26/10/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 78542 | 90413 | 02/1945 | 91W 84G 84G 26A 26D 26B 24C 26D 24F 8L 40E W |
To Western Region / GWR (on loan) Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Newton Heath Bury Agecroft Lostock Hall Bury Fleetwood Aintree Colwick Withdrawn |
14/11/1947 09/09/1950 30/09/1950 31/12/1950 29/12/1951 27/03/1954 23/02/1957 23/09/1961 15/09/1962 14/12/1963 12/09/1964 12/02/1966 |
12/02/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 78543 | 90414 | 02/1945 | PPRD CDF PPRD 41D W |
Pontypool Road Cardiff Canton Pontypool Road Canklow Withdrawn |
10/07/1948 14/10/1948 30/10/1948 29/08/1959 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |||||
WD/8 | 78544 | 90415 | 02/1945 | 25A W |
Wakefield (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
18/06/1949 15/01/1967 |
15/01/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 78545 | 4445 | 02/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1953 | 03/1953 | |||||
WD/8 | 78546 | 90416 | 02/1945 | 24A 24A 26C 26C 27B W |
Accrington Accrington Bolton Bolton Aintree Withdrawn |
03/12/1949 24/12/1949 04/08/1951 11/08/1951 01/01/1955 04/1964 |
04/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 78547 | 4495 | 02/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | |||||
WD/8 | 78548 | 4446 | 02/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | |||||
WD/8 | 78549 | 4447 | 02/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | |||||
WD/8 | 78550 | 3100 | 63100 | 90100 | 03/1945 | NEV YK 53A 56A 56B W |
Neville Hill York (North) Hull Dairycoates Wakefield Ardsley Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 13/08/1949 20/10/1956 21/09/1957 07/07/1962 13/01/1964 |
13/01/1964 | |||
WD/8 | 78551 | 90417 | 03/1945 | 52G W |
Sunderland Withdrawn |
05/11/1966 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 78552 | 4448 | 03/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1957 | 07/1957 | |||||
WD/8 | 78553 | 90418 | 03/1945 | CLK STV 38A 38D 41J 41B 41J W |
Colwick Staveley (G.C.) Colwick Staveley (G.C.) Langwith Junction Sheffield Grimesthorpe Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 31/12/1949 23/07/1955 21/01/1956 27/02/1960 16/04/1960 29/04/1961 16/01/1966 |
16/01/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 78554 | 90419 | 03/1945 | 26D 26D 9K 8L 41E W |
Bury Bury Bolton Aintree Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
03/12/1949 24/12/1949 21/12/1963 22/08/1964 12/09/1964 11/04/1965 |
11/04/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 78555 | 4386 | 03/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1955 | 04/1955 | |||||
WD/8 | 78556 | 90420 | 03/1945 | 24B 24B W |
Rose Grove Rose Grove Withdrawn |
03/12/1949 24/12/1949 06/1965 |
06/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 78557 | 4387 | 03/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | |||||
WD/8 | 78558 | 4480 | 03/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | |||||
WD/8 | 78559 | 90421 | 03/1945 | 36A 41E 36A W |
Doncaster Staveley (Barrow Hill) Doncaster Withdrawn |
28/09/1963 11/01/1964 20/06/1964 01/08/1965 |
01/08/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 78560 | 90370 | 09/1944 | 25A 52G W |
Wakefield (Re-instd) Sunderland Withdrawn |
18/06/1949 03/12/1966 15/05/1967 |
15/05/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 78561 | 90371 | 09/1944 | 26F 26A W |
Patricroft Newton Heath Withdrawn |
14/01/1961 12/01/1963 25/04/1964 |
25/04/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 78562 | 3087 | 63087 | 90087 | 09/1944 | 40B 40E 41H 36C W |
Immingham Langwith Junction Staveley (G.C.) Frodingham Withdrawn |
24/10/1953 23/04/1955 19/07/1958 06/02/1960 25/10/1962 |
25/10/1962 | |||
WD/8 | 78563 | 90372 | 09/1944 | 26B 36A W |
Agecroft Doncaster Withdrawn |
21/04/1956 12/09/1964 19/12/1965 |
19/12/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 78564 | 90373 | 09/1944 | 51L 51A 56A W |
Thornaby Darlington Wakefield Withdrawn |
14/06/1958 18/06/1960 26/01/1963 11/09/1966 |
11/09/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 78565 | 3088 | 63088 | 90088 | 09/1944 | CLK NWE 40B 40E W |
Colwick New England Immingham Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
28/08/1948 18/09/1948 19/10/1957 09/11/1957 25/07/1965 |
25/07/1965 | |||
WD/8 | 78566 | 4450 | 10/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1955 | 04/1955 | |||||
WD/8 | 78567 | 4388 | 10/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1958 | 02/1958 | |||||
WD/8 | 78568 | 90374 | 10/1944 | 24D 24A 24B 24A 24B W |
Lower Darwen Accrington Rose Grove Accrington Rose Grove Withdrawn |
22/10/1949 03/12/1955 23/01/1960 06/02/1960 04/03/1961 28/03/1964 |
28/03/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 78569 | 90375 | 10/1944 | 25D 27B 24D W |
Mirfield Aintree Lower Darwen Withdrawn |
02/12/1950 27/03/1954 17/06/1961 04/07/1964 |
04/07/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 78570 | 3091 | 63091 | 90091 | 10/1944 | 51L 50B 50D W |
Thornaby Hull Dairycoates Goole Withdrawn |
14/06/1958 24/08/1963 30/11/1963 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | |||
WD/8 | 78571 | 4389 | 10/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1954 | 01/1954 | |||||
WD/8 | 78572 | 90376 | 10/1944 | 26A 26A W |
Newton Heath Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/09/1951 08/09/1951 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |||||
WD/8 | 78573 | 4390 | 10/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | |||||
WD/8 | 78574 | 4391 | 10/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1957 | 02/1957 | |||||
WD/8 | 78575 | 90377 | 10/1944 | 51A 51L 55D 55E 55D W |
Darlington Thornaby Royston Normanton Royston Withdrawn |
20/06/1959 03/10/1959 01/12/1962 28/12/1963 27/03/1965 13/02/1966 |
13/02/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 78576 | 4392 | 10/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | |||||
WD/8 | 78577 | 3092 | 63092 | 90092 | 10/1944 | SKN 51C 66A 51C 50B 50D 50B W |
Stockton West Hartlepool Polmadie West Hartlepool Hull Dairycoates Goole Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 20/08/1955 16/03/1963 29/06/1963 31/08/1963 30/11/1963 13/06/1964 11/10/1965 |
11/10/1965 | |||
WD/8 | 78578 | 90378 | 10/1944 | YK HLD HLD 53C 53C 53A 53A 53C 53A 53C 53A 52G W |
York (North) Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Sunderland Withdrawn |
17/09/1949 12/1949 10/12/1949 21/05/1950 30/06/1950 24/09/1950 21/10/1950 19/01/1957 08/02/1958 10/05/1958 06/12/1958 15/07/1967 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 78579 | 4393 | 10/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | |||||
WD/8 | 78580 | 90379 | 10/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 21/03/1966 | 21/03/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 78581 | 90380 | 01/1944 | 56D W |
Mirfield Withdrawn |
26/02/1966 20/03/1966 |
20/03/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 78582 | 3093 | 63093 | 90093 | 01/1944 | 33B 31B 33A 33B W |
Tilbury March Plaistow Tilbury Withdrawn |
10/05/1958 27/06/1959 10/10/1959 07/11/1959 27/08/1962 |
27/08/1962 | |||
WD/8 | 78583 | 90381 | 01/1944 | 27B 36C W |
Aintree Frodingham Withdrawn |
25/02/1956 17/04/1965 24/10/1965 |
24/10/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 78584 | 3094 | 63094 | 90094 | 01/1944 | HLS 53E W |
Hull Springhead Goole Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 15/11/1958 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | |||
WD/8 | 78585 | 90382 | 01/1944 | HLS HLD HLD 51G 51G 53A 53A 56A 52G W |
Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Haverton Hill Haverton Hill Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Wakefield Sunderland Withdrawn |
17/09/1949 12/1949 10/12/1949 24/09/1950 21/10/1950 08/09/1951 22/09/1951 21/09/1957 31/12/1966 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 78586 | 4451 | 11/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1955 | 12/1955 | |||||
WD/8 | 78587 | 90383 | 01/1944 | NWE 36B 31B 31B 36B 36B 36A 36A 40B 40E 41E W |
New England Mexborough March March Mexborough Mexborough Doncaster Doncaster Immingham Colwick Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
13/08/1949 25/02/1950 27/09/1950 21/10/1950 11/02/1951 17/02/1951 02/06/1951 23/06/1951 16/02/1957 22/10/1960 16/01/1965 18/04/1965 |
18/04/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 78588 | 90384 | 01/1944 | 38A 41F 41D 41E 40E 36C W |
Colwick Mexborough Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Colwick Frodingham Withdrawn |
24/10/1953 19/07/1958 22/02/1964 19/06/1965 09/10/1965 01/01/1966 27/02/1966 |
27/02/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 78589 | 4496 | 11/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | |||||
WD/8 | 78590 | 90385 | 01/1944 | 25E 25A 25A 25B 25A W |
Sowerby Bridge Wakefield Wakefield Huddersfield Hillhouse Wakefield Withdrawn |
29/07/1950 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 08/10/1955 31/12/1955 02/1967 |
02/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 78591 | 3095 | 63095 | 90095 | 01/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 15/06/1963 | 15/06/1963 | |||
WD/8 | 78592 | 90386 | 01/1944 | 66B 66B 66C 66B 61B 62C 52G 62C W |
Motherwell Motherwell Hamilton (West) Motherwell Aberdeen Ferryhill Dunfermline Upper Sunderland Dunfermline Upper Withdrawn |
22/01/1950 05/06/1950 17/06/1950 18/04/1953 27/09/1958 08/06/1963 08/06/1963 31/12/1966 25/02/1967 22/04/1967 |
22/04/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 78593 | 4394 | 11/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1956 | 07/1956 | |||||
WD/8 | 78594 | 90387 | 01/1944 | 65D 66A W |
Dawsholm Polmadie Withdrawn |
13/04/1957 18/01/1958 02/08/1962 |
02/08/1962 | |||||
WD/8 | 78595 | 90388 | 01/1944 | 10F W |
Rose Grove Withdrawn |
04/07/1964 11/07/1964 |
11/07/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 78596 | 90389 | 01/1944 | SR HIT 26A 26A 10F W |
To Southern Region (on loan) Hither Green Newton Heath Newton Heath Rose Grove Withdrawn |
03/07/1947 01/04/1948 18/08/1951 08/09/1951 04/07/1964 31/10/1964 |
31/10/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 78597 | 90390 | 01/1944 | 26A 27B 26A 25E 26A 26F 26A 9G 8G 36C W |
Newton Heath Aintree Newton Heath Sowerby Bridge Newton Heath Patricroft Newton Heath Gorton Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Frodingham Withdrawn |
19/05/1951 16/06/1951 27/06/1951 06/10/1951 27/10/1951 15/09/1962 05/01/1963 04/01/1964 14/03/1964 29/05/1965 19/09/1965 |
19/09/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 78598 | 90391 | 02/1944 | CLK 38D 41D W |
Colwick Staveley (G.C.) Canklow Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 21/01/1956 05/12/1959 30/08/1962 |
30/08/1962 | |||||
WD/8 | 78599 | 90392 | 02/1944 | 38A 2E 6C 8B 24L 9G 10C 9G W |
Colwick Northampton Birkenhead Mollington Street Warrington Dallam Carnforth Gorton Fleetwood Gorton Withdrawn |
24/10/1953 24/04/1954 20/04/1957 15/09/1962 16/03/1963 06/07/1963 09/11/1963 30/11/1963 05/12/1964 |
05/12/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 78600 | 90393 | 02/1944 | 91E 40B 40E W |
To Eastern Region (on loan) Immingham Colwick Withdrawn |
28/07/1947 24/10/1953 22/10/1960 22/08/1965 |
22/08/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 78601 | 90394 | 02/1944 | HLD NEV STV 38A 40B W |
Hull Dairycoates Neville Hill Staveley (G.C.) Colwick Immingham Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 16/04/1949 13/08/1949 23/07/1955 16/04/1960 21/04/1964 |
21/04/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 78602 | 90395 | 02/1944 | 55D 55E 56A 50A W 52G |
Royston Normanton Wakefield York (North) Withdrawn Sunderland |
30/01/1960 28/12/1963 09/10/1965 04/12/1965 28/10/1966 05/11/1966 |
28/10/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 78603 | 3096 | 63096 | 90096 | 02/1944 | NWE 36A W |
New England Doncaster Withdrawn |
21/01/1950 13/04/1963 19/09/1965 |
19/09/1965 | |||
WD/8 | 78604 | 90396 | 02/1944 | OXY 25A 91M W |
Oxley Wakefield (Re-instd) To London Midland Region Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 18/06/1949 30/06/1949 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 78605 | 90397 | 02/1944 | 25C 25A 25F 51A 51G 51L 56D 56F 56D 56A W |
Goole Wakefield Low Moor Darlington Haverton Hill Thornaby Mirfield Low Moor Mirfield Wakefield Withdrawn |
04/12/1954 01/01/1955 16/06/1956 14/06/1958 15/11/1958 20/06/1959 07/11/1959 23/01/1960 12/09/1964 28/01/1967 11/05/1967 |
11/05/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 78606 | 90398 | 02/1944 | 26D 24B 9P 9D 10H 41J W |
Bury Rose Grove Lees (Oldham) Newton Heath Lower Darwen Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
23/09/1961 11/08/1962 04/04/1964 18/04/1964 04/07/1964 12/09/1964 04/07/1965 |
04/07/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 78607 | 90399 | 16/12/1944 | 24A 26F 26A 8L 8F W |
Accrington Patricroft Newton Heath Aintree Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
19/04/1952 09/01/1960 05/01/1963 11/07/1964 25/07/1964 27/03/1965 |
27/03/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 78608 | 3097 | 63097 | 90097 | 02/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 05/08/1963 | 05/08/1963 | |||
WD/8 | 78609 | 90400 | 02/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 02/12/1963 | 02/12/1963 | |||||
WD/8 | 78610 | 90401 | 02/1944 | 41D 41H 41J W |
Canklow Staveley (G.C.) Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
22/02/1964 03/04/1965 19/06/1965 14/11/1965 |
14/11/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 78611 | 4452 | 12/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1957 | 10/1957 | |||||
WD/8 | 78612 | 90402 | 02/1944 | 24A 26C 26C 26E 9G W |
Accrington Bolton Bolton Lees (Oldham) Gorton Withdrawn |
21/05/1949 14/07/1951 17/07/1951 28/12/1957 15/02/1964 28/03/1964 |
28/03/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 78613 | 4453 | 12/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1953 | 12/1953 | |||||
WD/8 | 78614 | 90403 | 02/1944 | NEV STV 38E 9G 16D W 9G |
Neville Hill Staveley (G.C.) Woodford Halse Gorton Nottingham Withdrawn Gorton |
16/04/1949 13/08/1949 22/01/1955 29/09/1962 21/12/1963 04/1964 02/05/1964 |
04/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 78615 | 90404 | 01/1945 | 25C 25A W |
Goole Wakefield Withdrawn |
28/01/1956 25/02/1956 08/06/1967 |
08/06/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 78616 | 90405 | 01/1945 | 91E 50A 56A 51A 56B 56A 55E W |
To Eastern Region (on loan) York (North) Wakefield Darlington Ardsley Wakefield Normanton Withdrawn |
02/07/1947 20/07/1957 07/11/1959 18/06/1960 09/12/1961 11/09/1965 15/07/1967 30/09/1967 |
30/09/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 78617 | 4395 | 01/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | |||||
WD/8 | 78618 | 4454 | 01/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1954 | 01/1954 | |||||
WD/8 | 78619 | 4497 | 01/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1955 | 09/1955 | |||||
WD/8 | 78620 | 4396 | 01/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1956 | 10/1956 | |||||
WD/8 | 78621 | 90406 | 01/1945 | 25E 25A 25A 25F 51A 51L 50D W |
Sowerby Bridge Wakefield Wakefield Low Moor Darlington Thornaby Goole Withdrawn |
22/07/1950 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 16/06/1956 14/06/1958 03/10/1959 31/08/1963 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 78622 | 4397 | 01/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1954 | 01/1954 | |||||
WD/8 | 78623 | 4455 | 01/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | |||||
WD/8 | 78624 | 90407 | 01/1945 | 55D 56A W |
Royston Wakefield Withdrawn |
14/10/1961 26/10/1963 12/05/1967 |
12/05/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 8625 | 78625 | 3126 | 63126 | 90447 | 03/1944 | CAR 35C 31B 36A W |
Carlisle Canal Spital Bridge March Doncaster Withdrawn |
27/03/1948 13/08/1950 06/02/1960 28/10/1961 18/11/1963 |
18/11/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 8626 | 78626 | 90631 | 03/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 15/01/1967 | 15/01/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 8627 | 78627 | 3127 | 63127 | 90448 | 03/1944 | ANN CLK 38E 38E 16A 1G 9J 10F 36A 40B W |
Annesley Colwick Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Toton Woodford Halse Agecroft Rose Grove Doncaster Immingham Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 14/05/1949 09/06/1951 23/06/1951 14/03/1964 18/04/1964 25/04/1964 17/10/1964 12/06/1965 06/11/1965 05/12/1965 |
05/12/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 8628 | 78628 | 3128 | 63128 | 90449 | 03/1944 | YK DAR 53A 53A 8B 6B 38A 40E W |
York (North) Darlington Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Warrington Dallam Mold Junction Colwick Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 19/02/1949 08/09/1951 22/09/1951 16/02/1952 23/02/1952 17/05/1952 19/06/1954 16/01/1966 |
16/01/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 8629 | 78629 | 90632 | 03/1944 | 24A 26C 26C 26B 26B 8F 8L W |
Accrington Bolton Bolton Agecroft Agecroft Springs Branch (Wigan) Aintree Withdrawn |
21/05/1949 14/07/1951 17/07/1951 10/11/1951 01/12/1951 17/10/1964 30/01/1965 08/05/1965 |
08/05/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 8630 | 78630 | 3129 | 63129 | 90450 | 03/1944 | YK HLD YK HLD HLD 51A 51A 53A 53A W |
York (North) Hull Dairycoates York (North) Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Darlington Darlington Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 26/03/1949 17/09/1949 12/1949 10/12/1949 20/01/1951 31/01/1951 25/08/1951 22/09/1951 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 8631 | 78631 | 4398 | 04/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1956 | 12/1956 | ||||
WD/8 | 8632 | 78632 | 90633 | 04/1944 | PDN CDF 25C 56A 56F W |
Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Goole Wakefield Low Moor Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/07/1948 16/06/1956 20/10/1956 28/01/1967 12/07/1967 |
12/07/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 8633 | 78633 | 3130 | 63130 | 90451 | 04/1944 | 51L 50D W |
Thornaby Goole Withdrawn |
14/06/1958 31/08/1963 23/12/1966 |
23/12/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 8634 | 78634 | 3131 | 63131 | 90452 | 04/1944 | 51L 52H 50B W |
Thornaby Tyne Dock Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
14/06/1958 22/06/1963 21/12/1963 21/06/1965 |
21/06/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 8635 | 78635 | 3132 | 63132 | 90453 | 04/1944 | MAR 40B 31B 36A 36C W |
March Immingham March Doncaster Frodingham Withdrawn |
18/09/1948 24/10/1953 22/09/1956 16/03/1957 18/11/1961 04/10/1963 |
04/10/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 8636 | 78636 | 4399 | 04/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1954 | 09/1954 | ||||
WD/8 | 8637 | 78637 | 90634 | 04/1944 | 91E 38A 38A 38D W |
To Eastern Region (on loan) Colwick Colwick Staveley (G.C.) Withdrawn |
28/07/1947 09/06/1951 23/06/1951 10/11/1951 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 8638 | 78638 | 90635 | 04/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 06/01/1964 | 06/01/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 8639 | 78639 | 3133 | 63133 | 90454 | 04/1944 | 36E W |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
09/11/1963 13/06/1965 |
13/06/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 8640 | 78640 | 4500 | 04/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | ||||
WD/8 | 8641 | 78641 | 3134 | 63134 | 90455 | 04/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 10/09/1962 | 10/09/1962 | ||
WD/8 | 8642 | 78642 | 3135 | 63135 | 90456 | 04/1944 | IMM 36C 36C W |
Immingham Frodingham Frodingham Withdrawn |
05/06/1948 26/05/1951 23/06/1951 27/02/1966 |
27/02/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 8643 | 78643 | 90636 | 04/1944 | CLK ANN CLK 36A 31B 36A W |
Colwick Annesley Colwick Doncaster March Doncaster Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 30/10/1948 21/05/1949 13/11/1954 22/09/1956 16/03/1957 17/04/1966 |
17/04/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 8644 | 78644 | 90637 | 04/1944 | 55E W |
Normanton Withdrawn |
20/07/1957 12/11/1962 |
12/11/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 8645 | 78645 | 3136 | 63136 | 90457 | 05/1944 | YK NPT 50D 56D 56A W |
York (North) Newport (Teeside) Starbeck Mirfield Wakefield Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 19/02/1949 16/02/1957 19/09/1959 11/01/1964 05/01/1966 |
05/01/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 8646 | 78646 | 3137 | 63137 | 90458 | 05/1944 | TDK 53A 53A 50D W |
Tyne Dock Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Goole Withdrawn |
13/11/1948 08/09/1951 22/09/1951 20/05/1967 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 8647 | 78647 | 4501 | 05/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | ||||
WD/8 | 8648 | 78648 | 3138 | 63138 | 90459 | 05/1944 | YK NPT 51L 52H 51C W |
York (North) Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Tyne Dock West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 19/02/1949 14/06/1958 22/06/1963 19/06/1965 19/06/1967 |
19/06/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 8649 | 78649 | 3139 | 63139 | 90460 | 05/1944 | IMM 35A 35A 40B 38D 38A 40B 40A 36E W |
Immingham New England New England Immingham Staveley (G.C.) Colwick Immingham Lincoln Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
05/06/1948 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 22/09/1951 29/12/1951 23/07/1955 13/09/1958 03/12/1960 28/09/1963 13/06/1965 |
13/06/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 8650 | 78650 | 90638 | 05/1944 | CLK 38E 38A 38A 38E 38E W |
Colwick Woodford Halse Colwick Colwick Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 25/06/1950 22/10/1950 25/11/1950 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 22/12/1962 |
22/12/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 8651 | 78651 | 3140 | 63140 | 90461 | 05/1944 | 51L 50D W |
Thornaby Goole Withdrawn |
14/06/1958 24/02/1962 02/09/1963 |
02/09/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 8652 | 78652 | 90639 | 05/1944 | 25C 25A W |
Goole Wakefield Withdrawn |
31/10/1953 27/02/1954 05/01/1967 |
05/01/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 8653 | 78653 | 3141 | 63141 | 90462 | 05/1944 | 51L 50B W |
Thornaby Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
14/06/1958 24/08/1963 23/01/1967 |
23/01/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 8654 | 78654 | 3142 | 63142 | 90463 | 05/1944 | 67C 67D W |
Ayr Ardrossan Withdrawn |
25/10/1958 11/02/1961 14/11/1963 |
14/11/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 8655 | 78655 | 3143 | 63143 | 90464 | 05/1944 | 12A 64A 68A 8G W |
Carlisle Kingmoor St Margarets Carlisle Kingmoor Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
16/07/1949 03/10/1953 12/06/1954 17/09/1960 21/03/1964 |
21/03/1964 | ||
WD/8 | 8656 | 78656 | 3144 | 63144 | 90465 | 05/1944 | 51L 56B 55E W |
Thornaby Ardsley Normanton Withdrawn |
14/06/1958 23/06/1962 06/11/1965 21/01/1967 |
21/01/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 8657 | 78657 | 4502 | 05/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1956 | 12/1956 | ||||
WD/8 | 8658 | 78658 | 90640 | 05/1944 | 66A 65D 66A 65F 61B 62A W |
Polmadie Dawsholm Polmadie Grangemouth Aberdeen Ferryhill Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
13/04/1957 06/07/1957 02/08/1958 11/08/1962 29/09/1962 30/04/1966 09/08/1966 |
09/08/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 8659 | 78659 | 31 | 05/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1957 | 08/1957 | ||||
WD/8 | 8660 | 78660 | 21 | 05/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1957 | 08/1957 | ||||
WD/8 | 8661 | 78661 | 3145 | 63145 | 90466 | 05/1944 | 84B 84K 84B 84G 84D 84G 84C 81C 8B 26C 40E W |
Oxley Chester West Oxley Shrewsbury Leamington Shrewsbury Banbury Southall Warrington Dallam Bolton Colwick Withdrawn |
26/01/1952 29/02/1952 11/07/1953 05/09/1953 03/10/1953 27/03/1954 16/07/1955 21/02/1959 30/08/1962 19/01/1963 12/09/1964 26/12/1965 |
26/12/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 8662 | 78662 | 3146 | 63146 | 90467 | 05/1944 | NPT 53C 53C 50B 50A W |
Newport (Teeside) Hull Springhead Hull Springhead Neville Hill York (North) Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 08/09/1951 22/09/1951 22/10/1955 20/06/1959 18/11/1963 |
18/11/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 8663 | 78663 | 3147 | 63147 | 90468 | 06/1944 | 66B 66B 66C 66B 62A W |
Motherwell Motherwell Hamilton (West) Motherwell Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
16/06/1951 14/07/1951 17/05/1952 27/09/1958 07/09/1963 22/04/1967 |
22/04/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 8664 | 78664 | 3148 | 63148 | 90469 | 06/1944 | 36A 31B 36A 36C W |
Doncaster March Doncaster Frodingham Withdrawn |
19/09/1953 22/09/1956 16/03/1957 19/07/1958 08/11/1964 |
08/11/1964 | ||
WD/8 | 8665 | 78665 | 3149 | 63149 | 90470 | 06/1944 | HLS 53A 53C 53C 56A 56E 56A W |
Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Springhead Wakefield Sowerby Bridge Wakefield Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 11/02/1950 21/05/1950 30/06/1950 21/09/1957 07/03/1959 11/01/1964 21/12/1966 |
21/12/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 8666 | 78666 | 90641 | 06/1944 | SR RED 26A 26C 8L W |
To Southern Region (on loan) Redhill Newton Heath Bolton Aintree Withdrawn |
15/07/1947 01/08/1948 11/08/1951 18/04/1953 03/10/1964 07/08/1965 |
07/08/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 8667 | 78667 | 3150 | 63150 | 90471 | 06/1944 | COL 31B 40B 41D 41E 40E 36C 36A W |
Colchester March Immingham Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Colwick Frodingham Doncaster Withdrawn |
10/04/1948 20/10/1951 24/10/1953 12/09/1959 19/06/1965 09/10/1965 13/11/1965 05/03/1966 17/04/1966 |
17/04/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 8668 | 78668 | 3151 | 63151 | 90472 | 06/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 28/12/1963 | 28/12/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 8669 | 78669 | 4503 | 06/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1954 | 09/1954 | ||||
WD/8 | 8670 | 78670 | 3152 | 63152 | 90473 | 06/1944 | PDN 38A W |
Old Oak Common Colwick Withdrawn |
22/03/1948 24/10/1953 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | ||
WD/8 | 8671 | 78671 | 90642 | 06/1944 | LA 25B 25A 25D 56A 56B 56A 55D 55E W |
Laira Huddersfield Hillhouse Wakefield Mirfield Wakefield Ardsley Wakefield Royston Normanton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 30/09/1950 24/12/1960 26/08/1961 11/09/1965 16/07/1966 28/01/1967 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 8672 | 78672 | 90643 | 06/1944 | 25A 27B W |
Wakefield (Re-instd) Aintree Withdrawn |
18/06/1949 25/09/1954 08/02/1964 |
08/02/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 8673 | 78673 | 3153 | 63153 | 90474 | 06/1944 | IMM 38E 8L 41E W |
Immingham Woodford Halse Aintree Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
05/06/1948 24/10/1953 25/04/1964 12/09/1964 18/07/1965 |
18/07/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 8674 | 78674 | 3154 | 63154 | 90475 | 06/1944 | 51A 51B 50A 50D W |
Darlington Newport (Teeside) York (North) Goole Withdrawn |
14/05/1955 23/07/1955 20/07/1957 18/06/1960 13/08/1963 |
13/08/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 8675 | 78675 | 90644 | 06/1944 | 56B 55E W |
Ardsley Normanton Withdrawn |
18/06/1960 06/11/1965 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 8676 | 78676 | 3155 | 63155 | 90476 | 06/1944 | COL MAR 38A 36A W |
Colchester March Colwick Doncaster Withdrawn |
10/04/1948 15/05/1948 25/07/1953 22/10/1960 11/07/1965 |
11/07/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 8677 | 78677 | 3156 | 63156 | 90477 | 06/1944 | COL 31B 40B 31B 36A 40B 36A W |
Colchester March Immingham March Doncaster Immingham Doncaster Withdrawn |
03/04/1948 20/10/1951 24/10/1953 22/09/1956 28/10/1961 06/11/1965 12/02/1966 20/03/1966 |
20/03/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 8678 | 78678 | 06/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1945 | 06/1945 | |||||
WD/8 | 8679 | 78679 | 3157 | 63157 | 90478 | 06/1944 | ANN CLK YK HLD YK HLD HLD 53C 53C 53E 50B 51C W |
Annesley Colwick York (North) Hull Dairycoates York (North) Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Springhead Goole Hull Dairycoates West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
14/02/1948 29/05/1948 04/09/1948 26/03/1949 17/09/1949 12/1949 10/12/1949 21/05/1950 30/06/1950 22/11/1958 30/11/1963 15/07/1967 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 8680 | 78680 | 3158 | 63158 | 90479 | 06/1944 | TWD 53A 53A 51G 51L 51C 50B W |
Tweedmouth Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Haverton Hill Thornaby West Hartlepool Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 05/05/1951 19/05/1951 14/06/1958 20/06/1959 01/06/1963 26/03/1966 11/09/1966 |
11/09/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 8681 | 78681 | 90645 | 06/1944 | 55D W |
Royston Withdrawn |
14/12/1963 21/01/1967 |
21/01/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 8682 | 78682 | 90646 | 07/1944 | IMM 36C W |
Immingham Frodingham Withdrawn |
12/06/1948 19/05/1951 05/05/1964 |
05/05/1964 | ||||
WD/8 | 8683 | 78683 | 90647 | 07/1944 | IMM 35A 35A 36C 36C W |
Immingham New England New England Frodingham Frodingham Withdrawn |
12/06/1948 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 07/07/1951 21/07/1951 07/03/1965 |
07/03/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 8684 | 78684 | 90648 | 07/1944 | YK CLK 38E 38E 38A 40B 40E 40B 36C W |
York (North) Colwick Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Colwick Immingham Colwick Immingham Frodingham Withdrawn |
29/05/1948 04/09/1948 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 16/05/1953 13/09/1958 15/08/1959 13/08/1960 15/10/1960 30/08/1962 |
30/08/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 8685 | 78685 | 90649 | 07/1944 | 55G W 55D |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Withdrawn Royston |
20/06/1959 21/01/1967 28/01/1967 |
21/01/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 8686 | 78686 | 3159 | 63159 | 90480 | 07/1944 | 30A 34B 36A W |
Stratford Hornsey Doncaster Withdrawn |
18/04/1959 09/04/1960 17/06/1961 01/08/1965 |
01/08/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 8687 | 78687 | 3160 | 63160 | 90481 | 07/1944 | 51L 56D 56B 55E 55D W |
Thornaby Mirfield Ardsley Normanton Royston Withdrawn |
14/06/1958 10/03/1962 07/07/1962 06/11/1965 18/06/1966 02/10/1966 |
02/10/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 8688 | 78688 | 90650 | 07/1944 | AFD 91M 25B 25D 25G 55D 55E 55D 55E W |
Ashford To London Midland Region Huddersfield Hillhouse Mirfield Farnley Junction Royston Normanton Royston Normanton Withdrawn |
30/06/1949 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 21/02/1953 03/10/1953 12/11/1960 08/02/1964 27/03/1965 28/01/1967 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 8689 | 78689 | 90651 | 07/1944 | 25A W |
Wakefield (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
16/07/1949 02/10/1966 |
02/10/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 8690 | 78690 | 3161 | 63161 | 90482 | 07/1944 | TDK 53A 53A 53C 53A 56A 51C W |
Tyne Dock Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Wakefield West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
13/11/1948 08/09/1951 22/09/1951 19/01/1957 06/12/1958 25/07/1964 08/10/1966 12/07/1967 |
12/07/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 8691 | 78691 | 3162 | 63162 | 90483 | 07/1944 | TWD HLD YK HLD 91W 40B 84G 84D 84C 41J W |
Tweedmouth Hull Dairycoates York (North) Hull Dairycoates To Western Region / GWR Immingham Shrewsbury Leamington Banbury Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 23/07/1949 17/09/1949 10/12/1949 31/08/1951 08/09/1951 03/10/1953 24/04/1954 05/09/1959 02/12/1962 02/03/1964 |
02/03/1964 | ||
WD/8 | 8692 | 78692 | 3163 | 63163 | 90484 | 07/1944 | 38E 38E 31B 30A 36A W |
Woodford Halse Woodford Halse March Stratford Doncaster Withdrawn |
09/06/1951 23/06/1951 22/09/1956 03/12/1960 01/07/1961 13/03/1966 |
13/03/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 8693 | 78693 | 4505 | 07/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1947 | 01/1947 | ||||
WD/8 | 8694 | 78694 | 29 | 07/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1963 | 03/1963 | ||||
WD/8 | 8695 | 78695 | 90652 | 07/1944 | OXY CHR 25B 25A 55E W |
Oxley Chester West Huddersfield Hillhouse Wakefield Normanton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 07/08/1948 31/12/1955 28/01/1956 20/07/1957 11/09/1966 |
11/09/1966 | ||||
WD/8 | 8696 | 78696 | 3164 | 63164 | 90485 | 08/1944 | TDK 50F 50F 50A 50A 91W 40B 84C 81C 85B 85B 85A 87G 81D 81C 86C 85E 86C 84C 41F 41D W |
Tyne Dock Malton Malton York (North) York (North) To Western Region / GWR Immingham Banbury Southall Gloucester Horton Road Gloucester Horton Road Worcester Carmarthen Reading (W.R.) Southall Cardiff Canton Gloucester Barnwood Cardiff Canton Banbury Mexborough Canklow Withdrawn |
13/11/1948 11/02/1951 17/02/1951 16/06/1951 23/06/1951 31/08/1951 08/09/1951 31/01/1952 01/11/1952 20/04/1957 18/05/1957 13/07/1957 22/03/1958 28/11/1959 30/01/1960 27/02/1960 23/04/1960 18/06/1960 04/11/1961 02/12/1962 07/03/1964 09/08/1964 |
09/08/1964 | ||
WD/8 | 8697 | 78697 | 3165 | 63165 | 90486 | 08/1944 | 38D 38E 16D 1G 9K 8L W |
Staveley (G.C.) Woodford Halse Nottingham Woodford Halse Bolton Aintree Withdrawn |
29/11/1952 27/12/1952 01/02/1964 18/04/1964 25/04/1964 03/10/1964 03/04/1965 |
03/04/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 8698 | 78698 | 3166 | 63166 | 90487 | 08/1944 | NPT 50A 55E W |
Newport (Teeside) York (North) Normanton Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 20/07/1957 21/09/1957 26/08/1963 |
26/08/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 8699 | 78699 | 3167 | 63167 | 90488 | 08/1944 | NEV NPT 51L 55D W |
Neville Hill Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Royston Withdrawn |
13/11/1948 13/08/1949 14/06/1958 18/04/1959 07/12/1964 |
07/12/1964 | ||
WD/8 | 8700 | 78700 | 90653 | 08/1944 | MEX 31B 31B 36B 36B 33A 33B W |
Mexborough (on loan) March March Mexborough Mexborough Plaistow Tilbury Withdrawn |
18/11/1947 27/09/1950 21/10/1950 11/02/1951 17/02/1951 14/05/1955 07/11/1959 05/09/1962 |
05/09/1962 | ||||
WD/8 | 8701 | 78701 | 4506 | 08/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1955 | 06/1955 | ||||
WD/8 | 8702 | 78702 | 3168 | 63168 | 90489 | 08/1944 | 65A 65D 65F 62C W |
Eastfield Dawsholm Grangemouth Dunfermline Upper Withdrawn |
27/11/1954 30/12/1961 30/11/1963 04/12/1965 22/04/1967 |
22/04/1967 | ||
WD/8 | 8703 | 78703 | 3169 | 63169 | 90490 | 08/1944 | NWE 36C 36C 34E 40B W |
New England Frodingham Frodingham New England Immingham Withdrawn |
18/09/1948 07/07/1951 21/07/1951 11/11/1961 29/09/1962 18/02/1964 |
18/02/1964 | ||
WD/8 | 8704 | 78704 | 90654 | 08/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 24/06/1967 | 24/06/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 8705 | 78705 | 90655 | 08/1944 | HIT 91M 56D 56A 56D 56A W |
Hither Green To London Midland Region Mirfield Wakefield Mirfield Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/04/1948 17/06/1950 20/10/1956 24/12/1960 17/06/1961 28/01/1967 24/04/1967 |
24/04/1967 | ||||
WD/8 | 8706 | 78706 | 3170 | 63170 | 90491 | 08/1944 | CLK 38E 31B 36A 41F 41D 41E W |
Colwick Woodford Halse March Doncaster Mexborough Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
18/09/1948 18/02/1956 22/09/1956 16/03/1957 19/07/1958 07/03/1964 21/03/1964 26/09/1965 |
26/09/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 8707 | 78707 | 3171 | 63171 | 90492 | 08/1944 | 38B 38B 40B 40B 40E 40E W |
Annesley Annesley Immingham Immingham Langwith Junction Colwick Withdrawn |
20/01/1951 31/01/1951 08/09/1951 22/09/1951 23/04/1955 07/05/1960 17/10/1965 |
17/10/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 8708 | 78708 | 3172 | 63172 | 90493 | 08/1944 | DFU STM 66B 66B 65D 8F 36C W |
Dunfermline Upper St Margarets Motherwell Motherwell Dawsholm Springs Branch (Wigan) Frodingham Withdrawn |
05/11/1949 26/11/1949 16/06/1951 14/07/1951 01/12/1951 21/07/1962 17/04/1965 27/02/1966 |
27/02/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 8709 | 78709 | 3173 | 63173 | 90494 | 08/1944 | 33B 36A W |
Tilbury Doncaster Withdrawn |
12/04/1958 02/12/1961 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | ||
WD/8 | 8710 | 78710 | 3174 | 63174 | 90495 | 08/1944 | CLK NWE 36B W |
Colwick New England Mexborough Withdrawn |
13/11/1948 04/12/1948 10/11/1951 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | ||
WD/8 | 8711 | 78711 | 3175 | 63175 | 90496 | 08/1944 | 38A 36A 41E W |
Colwick Doncaster Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
19/09/1953 22/10/1960 16/01/1965 11/04/1965 |
11/04/1965 | ||
WD/8 | 8712 | 78712 | 3176 | 63176 | 90497 | 08/1944 | HLS 56A W |
Hull Springhead Wakefield Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 14/12/1957 25/03/1963 |
25/03/1963 | ||
WD/8 | 8713 | 78713 | 3177 | 63177 | 90498 | 09/1944 | 64A 36A 36B 31B 30A 31B 30A 36A 36C W |
St Margarets Doncaster Mexborough March Stratford March Stratford Doncaster Frodingham Withdrawn |
04/10/1952 19/09/1953 19/06/1954 22/09/1956 16/02/1957 15/11/1958 20/12/1958 22/10/1960 25/09/1965 27/02/1966 |
27/02/1966 | ||
WD/8 | 8714 | 78714 | 90656 | 09/1944 | OXY W |
Oxley Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/02/1965 |
01/02/1965 | ||||
WD/8 | 78715 | 90657 | 09/1944 | 35A 40B 40E W |
New England Immingham Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
20/08/1950 19/10/1957 09/11/1957 07/09/1962 |
07/09/1962 | |||||
WD/8 | 78716 | 3178 | 63178 | 90499 | 09/1944 | 38E 38A 41F W |
Woodford Halse Colwick Mexborough Withdrawn |
27/10/1951 10/11/1951 19/07/1958 12/1963 |
12/1963 | |||
WD/8 | 78717 | 90658 | 09/1944 | LA 24F 10F 41D 41J W |
Laira Fleetwood Rose Grove Canklow Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 15/09/1962 14/12/1963 12/09/1964 19/06/1965 14/11/1965 |
14/11/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 78718 | 3179 | 63179 | 90500 | 09/1944 | NWE 50A 51B 51L 52H W |
New England York (North) Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Tyne Dock Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 20/06/1953 16/06/1956 14/06/1958 16/03/1963 12/08/1963 |
12/08/1963 | |||
WD/8 | 79177 | 3180 | 63180 | 90501 | 09/1944 | CAR 35C 31B 30A 31A 33B 31B 36A 36E 36C 36A W |
Carlisle Canal Spital Bridge March Stratford Cambridge Tilbury March Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Frodingham Doncaster Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 13/08/1950 06/02/1960 03/12/1960 25/03/1961 22/04/1961 17/06/1961 28/10/1961 09/03/1963 19/06/1965 06/11/1965 07/11/1965 |
07/11/1965 | |||
WD/8 | 79178 | 90659 | 09/1944 | NWE 38A 35A W |
New England Colwick New England Withdrawn |
21/01/1950 17/12/1955 21/01/1956 18/05/1963 |
18/05/1963 | |||||
WD/8 | 79179 | 4456 | 09/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1965 | 05/1956 | |||||
WD/8 | 79180 | 3181 | 63181 | 90502 | 09/1944 | MAR 36B 36B 35A 40E 41H 34B 34E W |
March Mexborough Mexborough New England Langwith Junction Staveley (G.C.) Hornsey New England Withdrawn |
18/09/1948 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 03/11/1951 22/01/1955 19/07/1958 16/01/1960 06/02/1960 18/05/1963 |
18/05/1963 | |||
WD/8 | 79181 | 90660 | 09/1944 | 40B 40E 30A 34B 34E 40B W |
Immingham Langwith Junction Stratford Hornsey New England Immingham Withdrawn |
24/10/1953 20/08/1955 17/12/1955 16/04/1960 17/06/1961 29/09/1962 18/07/1965 |
18/07/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 79182 | 90661 | 09/1944 | HLD HLD HLD 53C 53C 51G 55D 55E W |
Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Springhead Haverton Hill Royston Normanton Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 12/1949 10/12/1949 21/05/1950 30/06/1950 14/06/1958 18/04/1959 26/09/1959 23/12/1963 |
23/12/1963 | |||||
WD/8 | 79183 | 4507 | 09/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1954 | 09/1954 | |||||
WD/8 | 79184 | 90662 | 09/1944 | 34E 40B W |
New England Immingham Withdrawn |
07/05/1960 29/09/1962 29/08/1965 |
29/08/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 79185 | 3182 | 63182 | 90503 | 09/1944 | NPT 50A 56A 53C 53A 51L 55C 55D 55E W |
Newport (Teeside) York (North) Wakefield Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Thornaby Farnley Junction Royston Normanton Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 20/07/1957 21/09/1957 14/12/1957 06/12/1958 06/02/1960 01/12/1962 14/12/1963 08/10/1966 21/01/1967 |
21/01/1967 | |||
WD/8 | 79186 | 90663 | 09/1944 | YK HLD 53C 53C 50B 50A W |
York (North) Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Springhead Neville Hill York (North) Withdrawn |
17/09/1949 10/12/1949 14/07/1951 21/07/1951 22/10/1955 20/06/1959 13/04/1964 |
13/04/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 79187 | 3183 | 63183 | 90504 | 09/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 11/05/1963 | 11/05/1963 | |||
WD/8 | 79188 | 4508 | 09/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1956 | 10/1956 | |||||
WD/8 | 79189 | 10/1944 | ||||||||||
WD/8 | 79190 | 90664 | 10/1944 | 56D 55D 55E 56A W |
Mirfield Royston Normanton Wakefield Withdrawn |
20/06/1959 27/06/1959 26/09/1959 09/10/1965 31/10/1966 |
31/10/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 79191 | 3184 | 63184 | 90505 | 10/1944 | ANN CLK THJ 12A 66B 66B 68A 68A 67C 67D W |
Annesley Colwick Thornton Junction Carlisle Kingmoor Motherwell Motherwell Carlisle Kingmoor Carlisle Kingmoor Ayr Ardrossan Withdrawn |
14/02/1948 29/05/1948 29/01/1949 16/07/1949 04/09/1950 23/09/1950 25/11/1950 30/11/1950 26/01/1952 11/02/1961 11/06/1962 |
11/06/1962 | |||
WD/8 | 79192 | 3185 | 63185 | 90506 | 10/1944 | 36A 36B 36A 40B W |
Doncaster Mexborough Doncaster Immingham Withdrawn |
24/10/1953 19/06/1954 10/12/1960 06/11/1965 16/01/1966 |
16/01/1966 | |||
WD/8 | 79193 | 4510 | 10/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1957 | 07/1957 | |||||
WD/8 | 79194 | 90665 | 10/1944 | NWE 36C 40E W |
New England Frodingham Colwick Withdrawn |
21/01/1950 29/09/1962 24/07/1965 19/12/1965 |
19/12/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 79195 | 90666 | 10/1944 | 25G 55G W |
Farnley Junction Huddersfield Hillhouse Withdrawn |
31/12/1950 20/06/1959 12/11/1962 |
12/11/1962 | |||||
WD/8 | 79196 | 90667 | 10/1944 | 25A 6C 6B 2F 8F W |
Wakefield (Re-instd) Birkenhead Mollington Street Mold Junction Market Harborough Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
16/07/1949 31/10/1953 27/02/1954 22/03/1958 14/03/1959 04/1964 |
04/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 79197 | 4512 | 10/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1954 | 01/1954 | |||||
WD/8 | 79198 | 90668 | 10/1944 | 30A 33A 40B 41D 41E W |
Stratford Plaistow Immingham Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
19/02/1955 19/03/1955 14/05/1955 07/03/1964 14/03/1964 18/04/1965 |
18/04/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 79199 | 90669 | 10/1944 | SR 26A 26F 2F 16E 1G 8F 36E 36C 40E W |
To Southern Region (on loan) Newton Heath Patricroft Woodford Halse Kirkby in Ashfield Woodford Halse Springs Branch (Wigan) Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Frodingham Colwick Withdrawn |
16/07/1947 11/08/1951 09/01/1960 19/01/1963 01/02/1964 18/04/1964 25/04/1964 17/04/1965 19/06/1965 24/07/1965 12/02/1966 |
12/02/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 79200 | 3186 | 63186 | 90507 | 10/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 29/06/1963 | 29/06/1963 | |||
WD/8 | 79201 | 4457 | 10/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | |||||
WD/8 | 79202 | 90670 | 10/1944 | 91E 50A 50C 53A 50D W |
To Eastern Region (on loan) York (North) Selby Hull Dairycoates Goole Withdrawn |
22/07/1947 20/08/1950 22/05/1954 20/10/1956 20/05/1967 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 79203 | 90671 | 10/1944 | 27B 27B 27D 26E W |
Aintree Aintree Wigan Central (L&Y) Lees (Oldham) Withdrawn |
28/07/1951 11/08/1951 28/11/1953 18/05/1957 07/09/1963 |
07/09/1963 | |||||
WD/8 | 79204 | 90672 | 10/1944 | 38A 38E 16D 1G W |
Colwick Woodford Halse Nottingham Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
28/04/1951 19/05/1951 21/12/1963 18/04/1964 25/04/1964 |
25/04/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 79205 | 90673 | 10/1944 | 55E W |
Normanton Withdrawn |
20/07/1957 16/03/1964 |
16/03/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 79206 | 90674 | 11/1944 | 91E 53A 53A 8B 6B 38A 36A 38A 36A 40B 40E W |
To Eastern Region (on loan) Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Warrington Dallam Mold Junction Colwick Doncaster Colwick Doncaster Immingham Colwick Withdrawn |
14/07/1947 05/05/1951 19/05/1951 16/02/1952 23/02/1952 17/05/1952 13/11/1954 18/02/1956 24/03/1956 16/02/1957 22/10/1960 01/08/1965 |
01/08/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 79207 | 90675 | 11/1944 | 63A 91X 26A 26A 27B 26A 24C 36A W |
Perth South To Scottish Region Newton Heath Newton Heath Aintree Newton Heath Lostock Hall Doncaster Withdrawn |
25/03/1950 24/04/1950 17/06/1950 01/09/1951 08/09/1951 03/12/1955 22/02/1958 07/02/1959 12/09/1964 17/04/1966 |
17/04/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 79208 | 90676 | 11/1944 | 86A 86A 83A 86A 87F 9G W |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) Ebbw Junction (Newport) Newton Abbot Ebbw Junction (Newport) Llanelli Gorton Withdrawn |
01/12/1951 31/12/1951 01/11/1952 22/05/1954 07/10/1961 20/05/1962 25/01/1964 |
25/01/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 79209 | 90677 | 11/1944 | HLS HLD HLD 53C 53C 53A 53C 53A 51C W |
Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
17/09/1949 12/1949 10/12/1949 21/05/1950 30/06/1950 08/02/1958 10/05/1958 06/12/1958 15/07/1967 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 79210 | 90678 | 11/1944 | 25D 25D 56A 56D 56A W |
Mirfield Mirfield Wakefield Mirfield Wakefield Withdrawn |
31/03/1951 19/05/1951 26/11/1960 17/06/1961 11/01/1964 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 79211 | 3187 | 63187 | 90508 | 11/1944 | COL 31B 40B 40E 30A 41F W |
Colchester March Immingham Langwith Junction Stratford Mexborough Withdrawn |
03/04/1948 20/10/1951 24/10/1953 23/04/1955 17/12/1955 14/05/1960 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |||
WD/8 | 79212 | 4513 | 11/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1953 | 12/1953 | |||||
WD/8 | 79213 | 90679 | 11/1944 | 25C 25A 25C 25A 56D W |
Goole Wakefield Goole Wakefield Mirfield Withdrawn |
31/10/1953 27/02/1954 28/01/1956 25/02/1956 26/02/1966 04/09/1966 |
04/09/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 79214 | 90680 | 11/1944 | W 55D |
Withdrawn Royston |
21/01/1967 28/01/1967 |
21/01/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 79215 | 90681 | 11/1944 | 24F 10F W |
Fleetwood Rose Grove Withdrawn |
10/02/1962 14/12/1963 03/07/1965 |
03/07/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 79216 | 3188 | 63188 | 90509 | 11/1944 | 8F 41E W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
14/03/1959 12/09/1964 22/08/1965 |
22/08/1965 | |||
WD/8 | 79217 | 4458 | 11/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1956 | 03/1956 | |||||
WD/8 | 79218 | 4514 | 11/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1956 | 12/1956 | |||||
WD/8 | 79219 | 90682 | 11/1944 | OXY 55E W |
Oxley Normanton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 08/02/1958 30/09/1967 |
30/09/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 79220 | 90683 | 11/1944 | NWE 31B 36A W |
New England March Doncaster Withdrawn |
13/08/1949 14/12/1957 17/12/1960 27/02/1966 |
27/02/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 79221 | 90684 | 11/1944 | 55D 56A W |
Royston Wakefield Withdrawn |
14/10/1961 26/10/1963 09/01/1967 |
09/01/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 79222 | 4515 | 11/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1956 | 10/1956 | |||||
WD/8 | 79223 | 4516 | 11/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1954 | 03/1954 | |||||
WD/8 | 79224 | 90685 | 11/1944 | OXY 84D 84K 84K 84D 84D 86A 86A 85B 86C 85E 86A 81C 36A 41D W |
Oxley Leamington Chester West Chester West Leamington Leamington Ebbw Junction (Newport) Ebbw Junction (Newport) Gloucester Horton Road Cardiff Canton Gloucester Barnwood Ebbw Junction (Newport) Southall Doncaster Canklow Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 15/07/1950 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 31/01/1951 28/02/1951 16/06/1951 30/06/1951 21/03/1953 04/10/1958 28/11/1959 18/06/1960 05/11/1960 02/12/1962 26/01/1963 22/11/1964 |
22/11/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 79225 | 90686 | 12/1944 | OXY CHR 8F 9G 8F W |
Oxley Chester West Springs Branch (Wigan) Gorton Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 07/08/1948 09/04/1960 30/03/1963 01/06/1963 03/04/1965 |
03/04/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 79226 | 90687 | 12/1944 | BRD 24B 24B 27B 27B 8F 8L 36A W |
Bristol Bath Road Rose Grove Rose Grove Aintree Aintree Springs Branch (Wigan) Aintree Doncaster Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 26/05/1951 16/06/1951 25/07/1964 22/08/1964 12/09/1964 02/01/1966 |
02/01/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 79227 | 90688 | 12/1944 | HLD YK HLD 53C 53A 50D W |
Hull Dairycoates York (North) Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Goole Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 17/09/1949 10/12/1949 30/06/1950 06/12/1958 20/05/1967 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 79228 | 90689 | 12/1944 | 24F 9K 8L 36E 36C 40E W |
Fleetwood Bolton Aintree Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Frodingham Colwick Withdrawn |
10/02/1962 28/12/1963 03/10/1964 17/04/1965 19/06/1965 24/07/1965 12/02/1966 |
12/02/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 79229 | 90690 | 12/1944 | 66A 66B W |
Polmadie Motherwell Withdrawn |
16/01/1960 16/06/1962 10/09/1962 |
10/09/1962 | |||||
WD/8 | 79230 | 4459 | 12/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1955 | 12/1955 | |||||
WD/8 | 79231 | 4460 | 12/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1955 | 04/1955 | |||||
WD/8 | 79232 | 90691 | 12/1944 | GLO 85A 85A 85B 85B 86G 85B 86C 84C W |
Gloucester Horton Road Worcester Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Gloucester Horton Road Pontypool Road Gloucester Horton Road Cardiff Canton Banbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 17/10/1950 31/10/1950 08/09/1951 30/09/1951 18/04/1953 16/05/1953 04/10/1958 05/11/1960 31/05/1962 |
24/05/1962 | |||||
WD/8 | 79233 | 90692 | 12/1944 | 56B 56E W |
Ardsley Sowerby Bridge Withdrawn |
12/11/1960 17/06/1961 09/12/1963 |
09/12/1963 | |||||
WD/8 | 79234 | 90693 | 15/12/1944 | PDN PDN 66B 66B 82B 91W 82B 82B 87F 87F 87A 86C 84C 81C W |
Old Oak Common (on loan) Old Oak Common Motherwell (on loan) Motherwell (on loan) St Philips Marsh To Western Region / GWR St Philips Marsh St Philips Marsh Llanelli Llanelli Neath (Court Sart) Cardiff Canton Banbury Southall Withdrawn |
26/03/1947 15/06/1947 23/01/1950 21/05/1950 24/08/1951 31/08/1951 08/09/1951 30/09/1951 09/08/1952 31/08/1952 01/11/1952 09/10/1954 28/01/1961 07/10/1961 12/11/1962 |
12/11/1962 | |||||
WD/8 | 79235 | 90694 | 12/1944 | 25B 25B W 55D |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Huddersfield Hillhouse Withdrawn Royston |
03/12/1949 24/12/1949 21/01/1967 28/01/1967 |
21/01/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 79236 | 3189 | 63189 | 90510 | 12/1944 | MAR 40B 40E W |
March Immingham Colwick Withdrawn |
18/09/1948 24/10/1953 22/10/1960 04/07/1965 |
04/07/1965 | |||
WD/8 | 79237 | 32 | 12/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1959 | 08/1959 | |||||
WD/8 | 79238 | 4498 | 12/1944 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1956 | 05/1956 | |||||
WD/8 | 79239 | 90695 | 12/1944 | YK HLD HLD 51G 51G 53A 53A 51C W |
York (North) Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Haverton Hill Haverton Hill Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
17/09/1949 12/1949 10/12/1949 24/09/1950 21/10/1950 08/09/1951 22/09/1951 15/07/1967 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 79240 | 3190 | 63190 | 90511 | 12/1944 | 50A 53C 53A 55D 56A W |
York (North) Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Royston Wakefield Withdrawn |
20/08/1950 18/04/1953 06/12/1958 06/02/1960 26/10/1963 08/06/1964 |
08/06/1964 | |||
WD/8 | 79241 | 3191 | 63191 | 90512 | 12/1944 | NWE 36C W |
New England Frodingham Withdrawn |
26/11/1949 19/09/1953 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |||
WD/8 | 79242 | 90696 | 12/1944 | 31B 36A 36A 31B 31B 36A 36A 31B 36A 36C W |
March Doncaster Doncaster March March Doncaster Doncaster March Doncaster Frodingham Withdrawn |
03/11/1951 19/01/1952 26/01/1952 01/11/1952 15/11/1952 29/11/1952 13/12/1952 22/09/1956 16/03/1957 06/02/1960 29/07/1963 |
29/07/1963 | |||||
WD/8 | 79243 | 90697 | 01/1945 | CLK 38E 38E 16A 1G 9D 8F 41D 41E 41J W |
Colwick Woodford Halse Woodford Halse Toton Woodford Halse Newton Heath Springs Branch (Wigan) Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
04/09/1948 29/09/1951 20/10/1951 21/12/1963 18/04/1964 25/04/1964 08/08/1964 12/09/1964 19/06/1965 09/10/1965 14/11/1965 |
14/11/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 79244 | 90698 | 01/1945 | 56B 56G 56F 51A 51L 56D 56F 56A 52G W |
Ardsley Bradford Hammerton Street Low Moor Darlington Thornaby Mirfield Low Moor Wakefield Sunderland Withdrawn |
09/11/1957 08/01/1958 08/02/1958 14/06/1958 01/08/1959 07/11/1959 29/12/1962 11/01/1964 31/12/1966 05/07/1967 |
05/07/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 79245 | 3192 | 63192 | 90513 | 01/1945 | THJ 12A DFU 62A W |
Thornton Junction Carlisle Kingmoor Dunfermline Upper Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
29/01/1949 19/06/1949 16/07/1949 05/11/1949 24/12/1955 16/07/1962 |
16/07/1962 | |||
WD/8 | 79246 | 4499 | 01/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | |||||
WD/8 | 79247 | 3193 | 63193 | 90514 | 01/1945 | 33B 31B 33A 33B 34E 36E 40E 36C W |
Tilbury March Plaistow Tilbury New England Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Colwick Frodingham Withdrawn |
10/05/1958 27/06/1959 10/10/1959 07/11/1959 02/12/1961 09/11/1963 19/06/1965 01/01/1966 23/01/1966 |
23/01/1966 | |||
WD/8 | 79248 | 4461 | 01/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | |||||
WD/8 | 79249 | 4462 | 01/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1954 | 09/1954 | |||||
WD/8 | 79250 | 01/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 1957 | 1957 | ||||||
WD/8 | 79251 | 3194 | 63194 | 90515 | 01/1945 | 62C W |
Dunfermline Upper Withdrawn |
19/01/1963 22/11/1965 |
22/11/1965 | |||
WD/8 | 79252 | 4463 | 01/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1955 | 04/1955 | |||||
WD/8 | 79253 | 3195 | 63195 | 90516 | 01/1945 | 16A 1G 9D 8L 36C 36A W |
Toton Woodford Halse Newton Heath Aintree Frodingham Doncaster Withdrawn |
21/12/1963 18/04/1964 25/04/1964 19/09/1964 17/04/1965 06/11/1965 21/11/1965 |
21/11/1965 | |||
WD/8 | 79254 | 90699 | 01/1945 | 55D 55E W |
Royston Normanton Withdrawn |
14/12/1963 11/04/1964 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 79255 | 4517 | 01/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1954 | 01/1954 | |||||
WD/8 | 79256 | 4518 | 01/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1954 | 01/1954 | |||||
WD/8 | 79257 | 4464 | 01/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1973 | 01/1973 | |||||
WD/8 | 79258 | 4465 | 01/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1954 | 09/1954 | |||||
WD/8 | 79259 | 90700 | 01/1945 | 41D W |
Canklow Withdrawn |
05/01/1963 14/02/1964 |
14/02/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 79260 | 4466 | 01/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1956 | 10/1956 | |||||
WD/8 | 79261 | 90701 | 01/1945 | SPM WES 83E 83B 86A 86A 86C 86C 86C 87A 84G 86G 18B 2F W |
St Philips Marsh Westbury St Blazey Taunton Ebbw Junction (Newport) Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Neath (Court Sart) Shrewsbury Pontypool Road Westhouses Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/12/1949 28/02/1951 31/03/1951 16/06/1951 30/06/1951 11/08/1951 31/08/1951 31/10/1951 21/02/1953 18/04/1953 25/01/1958 18/07/1959 19/09/1959 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 | |||||
WD/8 | 79262 | 90702 | 02/1945 | 8B 6B 8F 24K 8G 8L 8G 36C W |
Warrington Dallam Mold Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Preston Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Aintree Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Frodingham Withdrawn |
08/09/1951 26/01/1952 02/04/1960 27/08/1960 10/09/1960 19/10/1963 25/07/1964 29/05/1965 01/08/1965 |
01/08/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 79263 | 90703 | 02/1945 | 91E CLK 34E 40E W |
To Eastern Region (on loan) Colwick New England Colwick Withdrawn |
03/07/1947 04/09/1948 07/05/1960 23/06/1962 11/07/1965 |
11/07/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 79264 | 90704 | 02/1945 | 53A 53A 53C 53C 53A 53E 50B 50D W |
Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Hull Springhead Hull Dairycoates Goole Hull Dairycoates Goole Withdrawn |
25/11/1950 30/11/1950 13/10/1951 20/10/1951 03/11/1951 07/11/1959 30/11/1963 31/12/1966 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 79265 | 90705 | 02/1945 | 62A 66A 66B 61B 62A W |
Thornton Junction Polmadie Motherwell Aberdeen Ferryhill Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
22/12/1956 16/01/1960 16/06/1962 05/10/1963 28/12/1963 23/07/1964 |
23/07/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 79266 | 90706 | 02/1945 | 26A 24H 24J 21B 24J 8L 41E 40E W |
Newton Heath (Re-instd) Hellifield Lancaster Green Ayre Bescot Lancaster Green Ayre Aintree Staveley (Barrow Hill) Colwick Withdrawn |
03/12/1949 12/07/1958 10/01/1959 03/09/1960 10/09/1960 30/05/1964 12/06/1965 09/10/1965 12/02/1966 |
12/02/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 79267 | 4467 | 02/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1955 | 04/1955 | |||||
WD/8 | 79268 | 90707 | 02/1945 | 25E 25D 25D 56A 56D 56A W |
Sowerby Bridge Mirfield Mirfield Wakefield Mirfield Wakefield Withdrawn |
29/07/1950 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 24/12/1960 17/06/1961 11/01/1964 05/01/1967 |
05/01/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 79269 | 90708 | 02/1945 | 26A 26E W 9D |
Newton Heath (Re-instd) Lees (Oldham) Withdrawn Newton Heath |
03/12/1949 14/06/1958 04/1964 18/04/1964 |
04/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 79270 | 4468 | 02/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1954 | 12/1954 | |||||
WD/8 | 79271 | 90709 | 02/1945 | 31B 31B 36B 36B 35A 33A 35A 31B 36A W |
March March Mexborough Mexborough New England Plaistow New England March Doncaster Withdrawn |
27/09/1950 21/10/1950 11/02/1951 17/02/1951 03/11/1951 19/03/1955 23/07/1955 19/10/1957 24/12/1960 17/04/1966 |
17/04/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 79272 | 90710 | 02/1945 | 25A W |
Wakefield (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
16/07/1949 05/02/1965 |
05/02/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 79273 | 90711 | 02/1945 | 25G 56B 56F 56A 56F W |
Farnley Junction (Re-instd) Ardsley Low Moor Wakefield Low Moor Withdrawn |
17/06/1950 09/11/1957 14/06/1958 10/09/1966 05/11/1966 06/01/1967 |
06/01/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 79274 | 90712 | 02/1945 | 26C 27B W |
Bolton Aintree Withdrawn |
31/12/1950 11/08/1956 07/1964 |
07/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 79275 | 90713 | 02/1945 | 24A 24A 26C 26C 26B 26B 24C W |
Accrington Accrington Bolton Bolton Agecroft Agecroft Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
03/12/1949 24/12/1949 14/07/1951 17/07/1951 10/11/1951 01/12/1951 18/06/1960 26/10/1963 |
26/10/1963 | |||||
WD/8 | 79276 | 90714 | 02/1945 | 36A 36C W |
Doncaster Frodingham Withdrawn |
03/11/1951 22/03/1952 13/12/1964 |
13/12/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 79277 | 4469 | 03/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1955 | 11/1955 | |||||
WD/8 | 79278 | 90715 | 03/1945 | 91W 84G 84G 26A W |
To Western Region / GWR (on loan) Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Newton Heath Withdrawn |
28/11/1947 09/09/1950 30/09/1950 31/12/1950 09/05/1964 |
09/05/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 79279 | 90716 | 03/1945 | 84G 84C 18B 9G W |
Shrewsbury Banbury Westhouses Gorton Withdrawn |
21/03/1953 23/04/1955 18/07/1959 30/06/1962 12/10/1963 |
12/10/1963 | |||||
WD/8 | 79280 | 90717 | 03/1945 | HLS CLK 34E 40E 36E W |
Hull Springhead Colwick New England Colwick Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
15/05/1948 04/09/1948 07/05/1960 23/06/1962 28/09/1963 21/03/1964 |
21/03/1964 | |||||
WD/8 | 79281 | 90718 | 03/1945 | 6B 6B 26D 26E 9D 8L 36E 36A W |
Mold Junction Mold Junction Bury Lees (Oldham) Newton Heath Aintree Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Doncaster Withdrawn |
22/09/1951 06/10/1951 29/12/1951 28/11/1959 18/04/1964 19/09/1964 17/04/1965 19/06/1965 27/02/1966 |
27/02/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 79282 | 90719 | 03/1945 | 41D 41H 41J W |
Canklow Staveley (G.C.) Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
29/08/1959 03/04/1965 19/06/1965 10/02/1966 |
10/02/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 79283 | 90720 | 03/1945 | 26F 24C W |
Lees (Oldham) Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
30/04/1949 14/05/1949 17/07/1965 |
17/07/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 79284 | 4470 | 03/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | |||||
WD/8 | 79285 | 3196 | 63196 | 90517 | 03/1945 | 50A 51B 51L 50A W |
York (North) Newport (Teeside) Thornaby York (North) Withdrawn |
24/07/1954 16/06/1956 14/06/1958 01/12/1962 15/05/1966 |
15/05/1966 | |||
WD/8 | 79286 | 4519 | 03/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | |||||
WD/8 | 79287 | 4471 | 03/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1956 | 05/1956 | |||||
WD/8 | 79288 | 3197 | 63197 | 90518 | 03/1945 | NEV YK 50D 50A W |
Neville Hill York (North) Starbeck York (North) Withdrawn |
13/11/1948 13/08/1949 12/11/1955 19/09/1959 16/02/1966 |
16/02/1966 | |||
WD/8 | 79289 | 4472 | 03/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1954 | 12/1954 | |||||
WD/8 | 79290 | 4473 | 03/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | |||||
WD/8 | 79291 | 4474 | 03/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1956 | 08/1956 | |||||
WD/8 | 79292 | 4520 | 03/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | |||||
WD/8 | 79293 | 4521 | 03/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | |||||
WD/8 | 79294 | 90721 | 03/1945 | 25E 25E 25D 25D 56F 56A 55D 55E W |
Sowerby Bridge Sowerby Bridge Mirfield Mirfield Low Moor Wakefield Royston Normanton Withdrawn |
02/09/1950 09/09/1950 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 24/02/1962 11/01/1964 16/07/1966 08/10/1966 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 79295 | 4522 | 04/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | |||||
WD/8 | 79296 | 4523 | 04/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1949 | 11/1949 | |||||
WD/8 | 79297 | 4524 | 04/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | |||||
WD/8 | 79298 | 90722 | 04/1945 | 55E W |
Normanton Withdrawn |
20/07/1957 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | |||||
WD/8 | 79299 | 4525 | 04/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1951 | 08/1951 | |||||
WD/8 | 79300 | 4475 | 04/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1953 | 09/1953 | |||||
WD/8 | 79301 | 90723 | 04/1945 | SPM 25B 25A 25D 25D 56F 52H 56F 56A W |
St Philips Marsh Huddersfield Hillhouse Wakefield Mirfield Mirfield Low Moor Tyne Dock Low Moor Wakefield Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 24/02/1962 24/10/1964 30/01/1965 10/09/1966 18/11/1966 |
18/11/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 79302 | 90724 | 04/1945 | 25E 25A 25A 27B 24B 9K 8F 8L W |
Sowerby Bridge Wakefield Wakefield Aintree Rose Grove Bolton Springs Branch (Wigan) Aintree Withdrawn |
22/07/1950 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 31/12/1955 15/09/1962 25/01/1964 18/07/1964 30/01/1965 05/06/1965 |
05/06/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 79303 | 90725 | 04/1945 | 26C 24F 9J 8F 10F W |
Bolton Fleetwood Agecroft Springs Branch (Wigan) Rose Grove Withdrawn |
18/04/1953 15/09/1962 21/03/1964 17/10/1964 07/11/1964 07/08/1965 |
07/08/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 79304 | 90726 | 04/1945 | 25E 25G 25G W |
Sowerby Bridge Farnley Junction Farnley Junction Withdrawn |
09/09/1950 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 12/11/1962 |
12/11/1962 | |||||
WD/8 | 79305 | 3198 | 63198 | 90519 | 04/1945 | 38A 41G 41F 41D 41E W |
Colwick Barnsley Mexborough Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
24/04/1954 09/05/1959 20/06/1959 07/03/1964 21/03/1964 21/09/1964 |
21/09/1964 | |||
WD/8 | 79306 | 90727 | 04/1945 | DEE 64A 62C 67C 62A W |
Dundee Tay Bridge St Margarets Dunfermline Upper Ayr Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
01/10/1949 04/10/1952 27/11/1954 19/01/1963 30/11/1963 08/1965 |
08/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 79307 | 90728 | 04/1945 | 25E 25G 25G W |
Sowerby Bridge Farnley Junction Farnley Junction Withdrawn |
05/08/1950 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 09/12/1963 |
09/12/1963 | |||||
WD/8 | 79308 | 3199 | 63199 | 90520 | 05/1945 | 16A 1G 9D 8L 9D 8L W |
Toton Woodford Halse Newton Heath Aintree Newton Heath Aintree Withdrawn |
21/12/1963 18/04/1964 25/04/1964 11/07/1964 29/08/1964 19/09/1964 06/02/1965 |
06/02/1965 | |||
WD/8 | 79309 | 90729 | 05/1945 | SPM 26C W |
St Philips Marsh Bolton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 18/04/1953 06/04/1963 |
06/04/1963 | |||||
WD/8 | 79310 | 90730 | 05/1945 | NWE 36C 41E W |
New England Frodingham Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
13/08/1949 29/09/1962 11/01/1964 03/10/1965 |
03/10/1965 | |||||
WD/8 | 79311 | 90731 | 05/1945 | 25D 25D 56B 56F 56A W |
Mirfield Mirfield Ardsley Low Moor Wakefield Withdrawn |
30/09/1950 07/10/1950 07/03/1964 19/06/1965 05/11/1966 13/11/1966 |
13/11/1966 | |||||
WD/8 | 79312 | 90732 | 05/1945 | MAR COL 31B 36A 36C W |
March (on loan) Colchester March Doncaster Frodingham Withdrawn |
22/11/1947 08/05/1948 20/10/1951 16/03/1957 06/02/1960 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 |