Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 40 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 40 Week
» 7652 Month
» 74514 Year
» 1739890 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

170


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
59307 W Withdrawn 30/11/1968 30/11/1968
59308 W Withdrawn 12/07/1969 12/07/1969
59309 W Withdrawn 12/07/1969 12/07/1969
59310 W Withdrawn 12/07/1969 12/07/1969
59311 W Withdrawn 12/07/1969 12/07/1969
59312 W Withdrawn 12/07/1969 12/07/1969
59313 W Withdrawn 12/07/1969 12/07/1969
59314 W Withdrawn 24/05/1970 24/05/1970
59315 W Withdrawn 24/05/1970 24/05/1970
59316 W Withdrawn 12/07/1969 12/07/1969
59317 W Withdrawn 12/07/1969 12/07/1969
59318 W Withdrawn 12/07/1969 12/07/1969
59319 W Withdrawn 12/07/1969 12/07/1969
59320
59321
59322 W Withdrawn 22/02/1969 22/02/1969
59323 W Withdrawn 12/07/1969 12/07/1969
59324 W Withdrawn 12/07/1969 12/07/1969
59325 W Withdrawn 12/07/1969 12/07/1969