Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 978 Today
» 1042 Yesterday
» 7495 Week
» 7495 Month
» 74357 Year
» 1739733 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

170


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
30/11/1968 Condemned 59307       COND
22/02/1969 Condemned 59322       COND
12/07/1969 Condemned 59308       COND
12/07/1969 Condemned 59309       COND
12/07/1969 Condemned 59310       COND
12/07/1969 Condemned 59311       COND
12/07/1969 Condemned 59312       COND
12/07/1969 Condemned 59313       COND
12/07/1969 Condemned 59316       COND
12/07/1969 Condemned 59317       COND
12/07/1969 Condemned 59318       COND
12/07/1969 Condemned 59319       COND
12/07/1969 Condemned 59323       COND
12/07/1969 Condemned 59324       COND
12/07/1969 Condemned 59325       COND
24/05/1970 Condemned 59314       COND
24/05/1970 Condemned 59315       COND