Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 81 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3499 Week
» 28333 Month
» 62665 Year
» 1728041 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

170


Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
30/11/1968 Derby
12/07/1969 Derby
12/07/1969 Derby
12/07/1969 Derby
12/07/1969 Derby
12/07/1969 Derby
12/07/1969 Derby
24/05/1970 Newton Heath
24/05/1970 Newton Heath
12/07/1969 Derby
12/07/1969 Derby
12/07/1969 Derby
12/07/1969 Derby
22/02/1969 Derby
12/07/1969 Derby
12/07/1969 Derby
12/07/1969 Derby