172
BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
59032 | 24/08/1957 | To Western Region / GWR | 66.64 | |||||||
59033 | 31/08/1957 | To Western Region / GWR | 66.62 | |||||||
59034 | 31/08/1957 | To Western Region / GWR | 66.62 | |||||||
59035 | 31/08/1957 | To Western Region / GWR | 66.62 | |||||||
59036 | 07/09/1957 | To Western Region / GWR | 66.60 | |||||||
59037 | 14/09/1957 | To Western Region / GWR | 66.58 | |||||||
59038 | 14/09/1957 | To Western Region / GWR | 66.58 | |||||||
59039 | 14/09/1957 | To Western Region / GWR | 66.58 | |||||||
59040 | 21/09/1957 | To Western Region / GWR | 66.56 | |||||||
59041 | 19/10/1957 | To Western Region / GWR | 66.48 |