Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 49 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 49 Week
» 7661 Month
» 74523 Year
» 1739899 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

174


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
59469 BR Bristol Bath Road 29/03/1988
59470 BR Bristol Bath Road 04/10/1987
59471 19/06/1988
59472     13/09/1987
59473
59474 W Withdrawn 16/12/1986 16/12/1986
59475
59476
59477     04/10/1987
59478 TS Tyseley 04/10/1987
59479 BR Bristol Bath Road 04/10/1987
59480      
59481      
59482      
59483