BR
Database
Complete BR Locomotive Database 1948-1997
Home
Guestbook
Contact
Links
Preferences
Menu
Locomotives
Build Dates
Withdrawals
Names
Snapshots
Regional
Locomotives
Workings
ReClassifications
Pilot Scheme
Prototypes
Preservation
Diesels
Electrics
Steam
Classes
Steam
Standards
GWR
1850-1947
Barry
Brecon & Merthyr Junction
Burry Port & Gwendraeth Valley
Cambrian
Cardiff
Midland & South Western Junction
Powlesland & Mason
Port Talbot
Rhymney
Swansea Harbour Trust
Taff Vale
Vale of Rheidol
SR
1923-1947
London South Western
London, Brighton & South Coast
South Eastern & Chatham
LNER
LNER Designs 1923-1947
Great Central
Great Eastern
Great Northern
Great North of Scotland
Hull and Barnsley
Midland and Great Northern
North British
North Eastern
LMS
LMS Designs 1923-1947
Caledonian
Furness
Glasgow & South Western
Highland
London & North Western
London, Tilbury & Southend
Lancashire & Yorkshire
Maryport & Carlisle
Midland
North Staffordshire
Somerset & Dorset
ex WD
by Wheels
2 Driver Tank Engines
2-2-4T
2 Driver Tender Engines
2-2-2
4 Coupled Tank Engines
0-4-0T
0-4-0ST
0-4-2T
0-4-2ST
0-4-4T
2-4-0T
2-4-0WT
2-4-2T
4-4-0T
4-4-2T
4-4-4T
4 Coupled Tender Engines
0-4-0
0-4-2
0-4-4
2-4-0
2-4-2
4-4-0
4-4-2
4-4-4
6 Coupled Tank Engines
0-6-0T
0-6-0PT
0-6-0ST
0-6-2T
0-6-2ST
0-6-4T
2-6-0T
2-6-2T
2-6-4T
4-6-0T
4-6-2T
4-6-4T
6 Coupled Tender Engines
0-6-0
0-6-2
0-6-4
2-6-0
2-6-2
2-6-4
4-6-0
4-6-2
4-6-4
8 Coupled Tank Engines
0-8-0T
0-8-2T
0-8-4T
2-8-0T
2-8-2T
8 Coupled Tender Engines
0-8-0
0-8-2
0-8-4
2-8-0
2-8-2
10 Coupled Tank Engines
0-10-0T
10 Coupled Tender Engines
0-10-0
2-10-0
Special
0-6-6-0T
2-6-6-2T
2-8-8-2T
Diesel
Shunters
Type 1
Type 2
Type 3
Type 4
Type 5
Electric
25KV A.C
1500V D.C
750V D.C
Multiple Units
Steam Railmotors
GWR Railmotors
LNER Railmotors
LMS Railmotors
Diesel Multiple Units
GWR Railcars
LNER Railcars
1st Generation DMU's
2nd Generation DMU's
DEMU's
Pullman
HST
Electric Multiple Units
25KV A.C
1500V D.C
750V D.C
Sites
Depots
Builders
Locomotive Works
Scrapyards
People
Chief Mechanical Engineers
Management
Miscellaneous
Companies
British Railways
GWR & Constituents
Taff Vale
Rhymney
Cambrian
Barry
Cardiff Railway
SR & Constituents
LSWR
LBSCR
SECR
LNER & Constituents
GER
GCR
GNR
MGNR
NER
NBR
GNSR
ex LMS
MR
LNWR
LYR
LTSR
S&DJR
G&SWR
CR
HR
Timelines
Line Closures
Workings
Events
News Stories
Miscellaneous
Reports
Wheel Arrangements
Background Images
On This Day ...
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.
?
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 688 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 5841 Week
» 99075 Month
» 559016 Year
» 4998453 Total
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(
Free MySQL Counter
)
175
Summary
Gallery
Fleet
Alloc
Names
Cycle
Snap
Mods
Stats
Hist
Day2Day
Formations
Preservation
BR
Built
Depot Name
From
Date Withdrawn
59000
59001
59002
59003
59004
59005
59006
59007
01/06/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
01/06/1957
59008
01/06/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
01/06/1957
59009
24/08/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
24/08/1957
59010
01/06/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
01/06/1957
59011
01/06/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
01/06/1957
59012
29/06/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
29/06/1957
59013
15/06/1959
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
15/06/1959
59014
08/06/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
08/06/1957
59015
08/06/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
08/06/1957
59016
17/08/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
17/08/1957
59017
01/06/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
01/06/1957
59018
15/06/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
15/06/1957
59019
22/06/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
22/06/1957
59020
24/08/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
24/08/1957
59021
20/07/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
20/07/1957
59022
03/08/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
03/08/1957
59023
29/06/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
29/06/1957
59024
31/08/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
31/08/1957
59025
10/08/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
10/08/1957
59026
10/08/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
10/08/1957
59027
17/08/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
17/08/1957
59028
24/08/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
24/08/1957
59029
28/09/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
28/09/1957
59030
05/10/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
05/10/1957
59031
05/10/1957
91W
To Western Region / GWR
(New)
05/10/1957
59326
59327
W
Withdrawn
30/12/1968
30/12/1968
59328
59329
59330
59331
59332
59333
59334
59335
59336
59337
59338
59339
59340
59341
59342
59343
59344
09/09/1988
59345
59346
59347
59348
59349
59350
59351
59352
59353
59354
59355
59356
W
Withdrawn
16/12/1986
16/12/1986
59357
13/09/1987
59358
59359
59360
59361
59362
59363
59364
59365
59366
59367
59368
59369
59370
W
Withdrawn
30/12/1968
30/12/1968
59371
59372
NH
Newton Heath
11/10/1987
59373
W
Withdrawn
16/12/1986
16/12/1986
59374
59375
19/06/1988
59376
59438
59439
59440
59441
59442
TS
Tyseley
04/10/1987
59443
59444
TS
Tyseley
04/10/1987
59445
TS
Tyseley
04/10/1987
59446
TS
Tyseley
04/10/1987
59448
TS
Tyseley
04/10/1987