BR
Database
Complete BR Locomotive Database 1948-1997
Home
Guestbook
Contact
Links
Preferences
Menu
Locomotives
Build Dates
Withdrawals
Names
Snapshots
Regional
Locomotives
Workings
ReClassifications
Pilot Scheme
Prototypes
Preservation
Diesels
Electrics
Steam
Classes
Steam
Standards
GWR
1850-1947
Barry
Brecon & Merthyr Junction
Burry Port & Gwendraeth Valley
Cambrian
Cardiff
Midland & South Western Junction
Powlesland & Mason
Port Talbot
Rhymney
Swansea Harbour Trust
Taff Vale
Vale of Rheidol
SR
1923-1947
London South Western
London, Brighton & South Coast
South Eastern & Chatham
LNER
LNER Designs 1923-1947
Great Central
Great Eastern
Great Northern
Great North of Scotland
Hull and Barnsley
Midland and Great Northern
North British
North Eastern
LMS
LMS Designs 1923-1947
Caledonian
Furness
Glasgow & South Western
Highland
London & North Western
London, Tilbury & Southend
Lancashire & Yorkshire
Maryport & Carlisle
Midland
North Staffordshire
Somerset & Dorset
ex WD
by Wheels
2 Driver Tank Engines
2-2-4T
2 Driver Tender Engines
2-2-2
4 Coupled Tank Engines
0-4-0T
0-4-0ST
0-4-2T
0-4-2ST
0-4-4T
2-4-0T
2-4-0WT
2-4-2T
4-4-0T
4-4-2T
4-4-4T
4 Coupled Tender Engines
0-4-0
0-4-2
0-4-4
2-4-0
2-4-2
4-4-0
4-4-2
4-4-4
6 Coupled Tank Engines
0-6-0T
0-6-0PT
0-6-0ST
0-6-2T
0-6-2ST
0-6-4T
2-6-0T
2-6-2T
2-6-4T
4-6-0T
4-6-2T
4-6-4T
6 Coupled Tender Engines
0-6-0
0-6-2
0-6-4
2-6-0
2-6-2
2-6-4
4-6-0
4-6-2
4-6-4
8 Coupled Tank Engines
0-8-0T
0-8-2T
0-8-4T
2-8-0T
2-8-2T
8 Coupled Tender Engines
0-8-0
0-8-2
0-8-4
2-8-0
2-8-2
10 Coupled Tank Engines
0-10-0T
10 Coupled Tender Engines
0-10-0
2-10-0
Special
0-6-6-0T
2-6-6-2T
2-8-8-2T
Diesel
Shunters
Type 1
Type 2
Type 3
Type 4
Type 5
Electric
25KV A.C
1500V D.C
750V D.C
Multiple Units
Steam Railmotors
GWR Railmotors
LNER Railmotors
LMS Railmotors
Diesel Multiple Units
GWR Railcars
LNER Railcars
1st Generation DMU's
2nd Generation DMU's
DEMU's
Pullman
HST
Electric Multiple Units
25KV A.C
1500V D.C
750V D.C
Sites
Depots
Builders
Locomotive Works
Scrapyards
People
Chief Mechanical Engineers
Management
Miscellaneous
Companies
British Railways
GWR & Constituents
Taff Vale
Rhymney
Cambrian
Barry
Cardiff Railway
SR & Constituents
LSWR
LBSCR
SECR
LNER & Constituents
GER
GCR
GNR
MGNR
NER
NBR
GNSR
ex LMS
MR
LNWR
LYR
LTSR
S&DJR
G&SWR
CR
HR
Timelines
Line Closures
Workings
Events
News Stories
Miscellaneous
Reports
Wheel Arrangements
Background Images
On This Day ...
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.
?
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 778 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 5931 Week
» 99165 Month
» 559106 Year
» 4998543 Total
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(
Free MySQL Counter
)
175
Summary
Gallery
Fleet
Alloc
Names
Cycle
Snap
Mods
Stats
Hist
Day2Day
Formations
Preservation
BR
Date To Service
Depot Delivered To
Date Withdrawn
Depot Withdrawn From
Svc Age (Yrs)
Fate
Where
When
Tot Age (Yrs)
Name
59000
59001
59002
59003
59004
59005
59006
59007
01/06/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.94
59008
01/06/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.94
59009
24/08/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.71
59010
01/06/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.94
59011
01/06/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.94
59012
29/06/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.86
59013
15/06/1959
To Western Region / GWR
65.90
59014
08/06/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.92
59015
08/06/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.92
59016
17/08/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.73
59017
01/06/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.94
59018
15/06/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.90
59019
22/06/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.88
59020
24/08/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.71
59021
20/07/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.80
59022
03/08/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.76
59023
29/06/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.86
59024
31/08/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.69
59025
10/08/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.75
59026
10/08/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.75
59027
17/08/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.73
59028
24/08/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.71
59029
28/09/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.61
59030
05/10/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.59
59031
05/10/1957
To Western Region / GWR
67.59
59326
59327
30/12/1968
Cardiff Canton
59328
59329
59330
59331
59332
59333
59334
59335
59336
59337
59338
59339
59340
59341
59342
59343
59344
09/09/1988
Tyseley
59345
59346
59347
59348
59349
59350
59351
59352
59353
59354
59355
59356
16/12/1986
Cardiff Canton
59357
59358
59359
59360
59361
59362
59363
59364
59365
59366
59367
59368
59369
59370
30/12/1968
Cardiff Canton
59371
59372
59373
16/12/1986
Cardiff Canton
59374
59375
19/06/1988
Tyseley
59376
59438
59439
59440
59441
59442
59443
59444
59445
59446
59448