06 0-4-0
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (Tops) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D2410 | 19/06/1958 | 60A 66C 65A W |
Inverness (New) Hamilton (West) Eastfield Withdrawn |
19/06/1958 27/06/1964 27/01/1968 02/1969 |
02/1969 | |
D2411 | 31/07/1958 | 60A 63A 62B 67C W |
Inverness (New) Perth South Dundee Tay Bridge Ayr Withdrawn |
31/07/1958 05/10/1963 04/12/1965 25/03/1967 15/06/1968 |
15/06/1968 | |
D2412 | 18/09/1958 | 60A 63A 62B W |
Inverness (New) Perth South Dundee Tay Bridge Withdrawn |
18/09/1958 05/10/1963 04/12/1965 15/06/1968 |
15/06/1968 | |
D2413 | 06001 | 08/10/1958 | 60A 62C 64H 65F 65A W |
Inverness (New) Dunfermline Upper Leith Central Grangemouth Eastfield Withdrawn |
08/10/1958 25/06/1966 26/08/1967 29/04/1972 05/08/1972 04/09/1976 06/09/1976 |
06/09/1976 |
D2414 | 06002 | 24/10/1958 | 61C 61A 62B 62C 62C |
Keith (New) Kittybrewster Dundee Tay Bridge Dunfermline Townhill Dunfermline Townhill |
24/10/1958 01/07/1961 29/01/1966 06/02/1971 28/10/1972 06/09/1981 |
11/09/1981 |
D2415 | 06/11/1958 | 61C 61A 62B 64H W |
Keith (New) Kittybrewster Dundee Tay Bridge Leith Central Withdrawn |
06/11/1958 01/07/1961 29/01/1966 27/05/1967 15/06/1968 |
15/06/1968 | |
D2416 | 29/11/1958 | 61A 62C 64H 62B W |
Kittybrewster (New) Dunfermline Upper Leith Central Dundee West Withdrawn |
29/11/1958 30/04/1966 27/05/1967 26/02/1972 19/11/1972 |
19/11/1972 | |
D2417 | 11/12/1958 | 61A 62C 64H W |
Kittybrewster (New) Dunfermline Upper Leith Central Withdrawn |
11/12/1958 30/04/1966 27/05/1967 15/06/1968 |
15/06/1968 | |
D2418 | 09/01/1959 | 61A 64H W |
Kittybrewster (New) Leith Central Withdrawn |
09/01/1959 27/05/1967 15/12/1968 |
15/12/1968 | |
D2419 | 26/01/1959 | 61A 64H W |
Kittybrewster (New) Leith Central Withdrawn |
26/01/1959 27/05/1967 25/01/1969 |
25/01/1969 | |
D2420 | 06003 | 14/02/1959 | 61A 61B 66A 65A W |
Kittybrewster (New) Aberdeen Ferryhill Polmadie Eastfield Withdrawn |
14/02/1959 30/09/1967 03/07/1971 01/04/1972 01/02/1981 |
01/02/1981 |
D2421 | 06004 | 24/02/1959 | 61A 61B 65A DT HN DE DT W |
Kittybrewster (New) Aberdeen Ferryhill Eastfield Dunfermline Townhill Hamilton (West) Dundee West Dunfermline Townhill Withdrawn |
24/02/1959 30/09/1967 25/01/1969 28/12/1974 01/03/1975 26/07/1975 06/1977 19/03/1979 |
19/03/1979 |
D2422 | 06005 | 20/03/1959 | 61A 60A 65A 62B W |
Kittybrewster (New) Inverness Eastfield Dundee West Withdrawn |
20/03/1959 30/01/1965 24/06/1967 28/06/1969 06/10/1980 |
06/10/1980 |
D2423 | 06006 | 09/04/1959 | 61A 60A 61B DE W |
Kittybrewster (New) Inverness Aberdeen Ferryhill Dundee West Withdrawn |
09/04/1959 09/05/1959 03/07/1971 06/1977 09/06/1980 |
09/06/1980 |
D2424 | 29/04/1959 | 61A 60A 65F 65A W |
Kittybrewster (New) Inverness Grangemouth Eastfield Withdrawn |
29/04/1959 30/01/1965 24/06/1967 05/08/1972 19/11/1972 |
19/11/1972 | |
D2425 | 11/11/1959 | 66D 65A W |
Greenock Ladyburn (New) Eastfield Withdrawn |
11/11/1959 24/02/1968 08/06/1968 |
08/06/1968 | |
D2426 | 06007 | 25/11/1959 | 66B 66D 65A 62A R 62C 62B 62C W |
Motherwell (New) Greenock Ladyburn Eastfield Thornton Junction Reinstated Dunfermline Townhill Dundee West Dunfermline Townhill Withdrawn |
25/11/1959 08/04/1961 24/02/1968 27/04/1968 30/01/1969 11/03/1969 26/02/1972 24/02/1973 24/03/1973 06/1977 26/09/1977 |
26/09/1977 |
D2427 | 07/12/1959 | 66B 66D 66A 65A W |
Motherwell (New) Greenock Ladyburn Polmadie Eastfield Withdrawn |
07/12/1959 09/04/1960 24/02/1968 01/06/1968 30/09/1969 |
30/09/1969 | |
D2428 | 21/12/1959 | 66B 66A 66D 66C 66A W |
Motherwell (New) Polmadie Greenock Ladyburn Hamilton (West) Polmadie Withdrawn |
21/12/1959 09/04/1960 11/03/1961 30/05/1964 01/06/1968 15/06/1968 |
15/06/1968 | |
D2429 | 13/01/1960 | 66B 66D 66A 62B W |
Motherwell (New) Greenock Ladyburn Polmadie Dundee West Withdrawn |
13/01/1960 06/05/1961 11/08/1962 31/08/1968 26/04/1969 |
26/04/1969 | |
D2430 | 25/01/1960 | 66C 66B 66C 62A W |
Hamilton (West) (New) Motherwell Hamilton (West) Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
25/01/1960 04/06/1960 16/03/1963 27/04/1968 15/06/1968 |
15/06/1968 | |
D2431 | 09/02/1960 | 66C 66B 66A W |
Hamilton (West) (New) Motherwell Polmadie Withdrawn |
09/02/1960 04/06/1960 08/04/1961 26/11/1971 |
26/11/1971 | |
D2432 | 22/02/1960 | 66C 66A 65A W |
Hamilton (West) (New) Polmadie Eastfield Withdrawn |
22/02/1960 09/04/1960 30/09/1967 15/12/1968 |
15/12/1968 | |
D2433 | 07/03/1960 | 66C 66A 65A W |
Hamilton (West) (New) Polmadie Eastfield Withdrawn |
07/03/1960 04/06/1960 01/04/1972 18/06/1972 |
18/06/1972 | |
D2434 | 28/03/1960 | 67C 67F 67C 65A W |
Ayr (New) Stranraer Ayr Eastfield Withdrawn |
28/03/1960 29/04/1967 30/03/1968 29/06/1968 07/1969 |
07/1969 | |
D2435 | 06/04/1960 | 67C 65F 64B 64H W |
Ayr (New) Grangemouth Haymarket Leith Central Withdrawn |
06/04/1960 27/01/1968 24/02/1968 27/07/1968 26/11/1971 |
26/11/1971 | |
D2436 | 20/04/1960 | 67C 67B 67C 65A W |
Ayr (New) Hurlford Ayr Eastfield Withdrawn |
20/04/1960 27/02/1965 26/11/1966 30/09/1967 26/11/1971 |
26/11/1971 | |
D2437 | 06008 | 11/05/1960 | 67C 62A 62C W |
Ayr (New) Thornton Junction Dunfermline Townhill Withdrawn |
11/05/1960 27/04/1968 01/08/1970 06/10/1980 |
06/10/1980 |
D2438 | 30/05/1960 | 67C 67A 62A 62C W |
Ayr (New) Corkerhill Thornton Junction Dunfermline Townhill Withdrawn |
30/05/1960 11/05/1963 01/06/1968 01/08/1970 19/11/1972 |
19/11/1972 | |
D2439 | 21/06/1960 | 67A 65A 62A 62C W |
Corkerhill (New) Eastfield Thornton Junction Dunfermline Townhill Withdrawn |
21/06/1960 26/08/1967 27/04/1968 01/08/1970 26/11/1971 |
26/11/1971 | |
D2440 | 06009 | 11/07/1960 | 67A 65A 62A 62C W |
Corkerhill (New) Eastfield Thornton Junction Dunfermline Townhill Withdrawn |
11/07/1960 26/08/1967 27/04/1968 01/08/1970 30/08/1975 |
30/08/1975 |
D2441 | 17/08/1960 | 67A 66C W |
Corkerhill (New) Hamilton (West) Withdrawn |
17/08/1960 16/02/1963 01/03/1967 |
01/03/1967 | |
D2442 | 05/09/1960 | 67A 66D 67A 62A 62C W |
Corkerhill (New) Greenock Ladyburn Corkerhill Thornton Junction Dunfermline Townhill Withdrawn |
05/09/1960 26/08/1961 21/10/1961 01/06/1968 01/08/1970 01/11/1972 |
01/11/1972 | |
D2443 | 28/09/1960 | 67A 66C 67B 67C 64B 64H 62C 62B W |
Corkerhill (New) Hamilton (West) Hurlford Ayr Haymarket Leith Central Dunfermline Townhill Dundee West Withdrawn |
28/09/1960 30/05/1964 27/02/1965 26/11/1966 24/02/1968 28/12/1968 06/02/1971 30/10/1971 18/06/1972 |
18/06/1972 | |
D2444 | 06010 | 31/10/1960 | 67A 66A 66B 60A 63A 62B 67C 65F 62B 61B DE W |
Corkerhill (New) Polmadie Motherwell Inverness Perth South Dundee Tay Bridge Ayr Grangemouth Dundee West Aberdeen Ferryhill Dundee West Withdrawn |
31/10/1960 24/03/1962 08/09/1962 24/11/1962 25/01/1964 04/12/1965 25/03/1967 30/09/1967 05/08/1972 24/02/1973 29/12/1973 14/06/1975 |
14/06/1975 |