06 0-4-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
19/06/1958 | To Service | 2410 | NEW | 60A | Inverness | ||
31/07/1958 | To Service | 2411 | NEW | 60A | Inverness | ||
18/09/1958 | To Service | 2412 | NEW | 60A | Inverness | ||
08/10/1958 | To Service | 2413 | NEW | 60A | Inverness | ||
24/10/1958 | To Service | 2414 | NEW | 61C | Keith | ||
06/11/1958 | To Service | 2415 | NEW | 61C | Keith | ||
29/11/1958 | To Service | 2416 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
11/12/1958 | To Service | 2417 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
09/01/1959 | To Service | 2418 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
26/01/1959 | To Service | 2419 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
14/02/1959 | To Service | 2420 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
24/02/1959 | To Service | 2421 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
20/03/1959 | To Service | 2422 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
09/04/1959 | To Service | 2423 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
29/04/1959 | To Service | 2424 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
09/05/1959 | Reallocation | 2423 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 60A | Inverness | |
11/11/1959 | To Service | 2425 | NEW | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
25/11/1959 | To Service | 2426 | NEW | 66B | Motherwell | ||
07/12/1959 | To Service | 2427 | NEW | 66B | Motherwell | ||
21/12/1959 | To Service | 2428 | NEW | 66B | Motherwell | ||
13/01/1960 | To Service | 2429 | NEW | 66B | Motherwell | ||
25/01/1960 | To Service | 2430 | NEW | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
09/02/1960 | To Service | 2431 | NEW | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
22/02/1960 | To Service | 2432 | NEW | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
07/03/1960 | To Service | 2433 | NEW | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
28/03/1960 | To Service | 2434 | NEW | 67C | Ayr | ||
06/04/1960 | To Service | 2435 | NEW | 67C | Ayr | ||
09/04/1960 | Reallocation | 2427 | 66B | Motherwell | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | |
09/04/1960 | Reallocation | 2428 | 66B | Motherwell | 66A | Polmadie | |
09/04/1960 | Reallocation | 2432 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | 66A | Polmadie | |
20/04/1960 | To Service | 2436 | NEW | 67C | Ayr | ||
11/05/1960 | To Service | 2437 | NEW | 67C | Ayr | ||
30/05/1960 | To Service | 2438 | NEW | 67C | Ayr | ||
04/06/1960 | Reallocation | 2430 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | 66B | Motherwell | |
04/06/1960 | Reallocation | 2431 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | 66B | Motherwell | |
04/06/1960 | Reallocation | 2433 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | 66A | Polmadie | |
21/06/1960 | To Service | 2439 | NEW | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
11/07/1960 | To Service | 2440 | NEW | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
17/08/1960 | To Service | 2441 | NEW | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
05/09/1960 | To Service | 2442 | NEW | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
28/09/1960 | To Service | 2443 | NEW | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
31/10/1960 | To Service | 2444 | NEW | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
11/03/1961 | Reallocation | 2428 | 66A | Polmadie | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | |
08/04/1961 | Reallocation | 2426 | 66B | Motherwell | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | |
08/04/1961 | Reallocation | 2431 | 66B | Motherwell | 66A | Polmadie | |
06/05/1961 | Reallocation | 2429 | 66B | Motherwell | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | |
01/07/1961 | Reallocation | 2414 | 61C | Keith | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
01/07/1961 | Reallocation | 2415 | 61C | Keith | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
26/08/1961 | Reallocation | 2442 | 67A | Corkerhill | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 2442 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | 67A | Corkerhill | |
24/03/1962 | Reallocation | 2444 | 67A | Corkerhill | 66A | Polmadie | |
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 2429 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | 66A | Polmadie | |
08/09/1962 | Reallocation | 2444 | 66A | Polmadie | 66B | Motherwell | |
24/11/1962 | Reallocation | 2444 | 66B | Motherwell | 60A | Inverness | |
16/02/1963 | Reallocation | 2441 | 67A | Corkerhill | 66C | Hamilton (West) | |
16/03/1963 | Reallocation | 2430 | 66B | Motherwell | 66C | Hamilton (West) | |
11/05/1963 | Reallocation | 2438 | 67C | Ayr | 67A | Corkerhill | |
05/10/1963 | Reallocation | 2411 | 60A | Inverness | 63A | Perth South | |
05/10/1963 | Reallocation | 2412 | 60A | Inverness | 63A | Perth South | |
25/01/1964 | Reallocation | 2444 | 60A | Inverness | 63A | Perth South | |
30/05/1964 | Reallocation | 2428 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | 66C | Hamilton (West) | |
30/05/1964 | Reallocation | 2443 | 67A | Corkerhill | 66C | Hamilton (West) | |
27/06/1964 | Reallocation | 2410 | 60A | Inverness | 66C | Hamilton (West) | |
30/01/1965 | Reallocation | 2422 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 60A | Inverness | |
30/01/1965 | Reallocation | 2424 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 60A | Inverness | |
27/02/1965 | Reallocation | 2436 | 67C | Ayr | 67B | Hurlford | |
27/02/1965 | Reallocation | 2443 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | 67B | Hurlford | |
04/12/1965 | Reallocation | 2411 | 63A | Perth South | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
04/12/1965 | Reallocation | 2412 | 63A | Perth South | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
04/12/1965 | Reallocation | 2444 | 63A | Perth South | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
29/01/1966 | Reallocation | 2414 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
29/01/1966 | Reallocation | 2415 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
30/04/1966 | Reallocation | 2416 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | |
30/04/1966 | Reallocation | 2417 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | |
25/06/1966 | Reallocation | 2413 | 60A | Inverness | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | |
26/11/1966 | Reallocation | 2436 | 67B | Hurlford | 67C | Ayr | |
26/11/1966 | Reallocation | 2443 | 67B | Hurlford | 67C | Ayr | |
01/03/1967 | Condemned | 2441 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | COND | ||
25/03/1967 | Reallocation | 2411 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 67C | Ayr | |
25/03/1967 | Reallocation | 2444 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 67C | Ayr | |
29/04/1967 | Reallocation | 2434 | 67C | Ayr | 67F | Stranraer | |
27/05/1967 | Reallocation | 2415 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 64H | Leith Central | |
27/05/1967 | Reallocation | 2416 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | 64H | Leith Central | |
27/05/1967 | Reallocation | 2417 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | 64H | Leith Central | |
27/05/1967 | Reallocation | 2418 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 64H | Leith Central | |
27/05/1967 | Reallocation | 2419 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 64H | Leith Central | |
24/06/1967 | Reallocation | 2422 | 60A | Inverness | 65A | Eastfield | |
24/06/1967 | Reallocation | 2424 | 60A | Inverness | 65F | Grangemouth | |
26/08/1967 | Reallocation | 2413 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | 64H | Leith Central | |
26/08/1967 | Reallocation | 2439 | 67A | Corkerhill | 65A | Eastfield | |
26/08/1967 | Reallocation | 2440 | 67A | Corkerhill | 65A | Eastfield | |
30/09/1967 | Reallocation | 2420 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
30/09/1967 | Reallocation | 2421 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
30/09/1967 | Reallocation | 2432 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
30/09/1967 | Reallocation | 2436 | 67C | Ayr | 65A | Eastfield | |
30/09/1967 | Reallocation | 2444 | 67C | Ayr | 65F | Grangemouth | |
27/01/1968 | Reallocation | 2410 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | 65A | Eastfield | |
27/01/1968 | Reallocation | 2435 | 67C | Ayr | 65F | Grangemouth | |
24/02/1968 | Reallocation | 2425 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | 65A | Eastfield | |
24/02/1968 | Reallocation | 2426 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | 65A | Eastfield | |
24/02/1968 | Reallocation | 2427 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | 66A | Polmadie | |
24/02/1968 | Reallocation | 2435 | 65F | Grangemouth | 64B | Haymarket | |
24/02/1968 | Reallocation | 2443 | 67C | Ayr | 64B | Haymarket | |
30/03/1968 | Reallocation | 2434 | 67F | Stranraer | 67C | Ayr | |
27/04/1968 | Reallocation | 2426 | 65A | Eastfield | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
27/04/1968 | Reallocation | 2430 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
27/04/1968 | Reallocation | 2437 | 67C | Ayr | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
27/04/1968 | Reallocation | 2439 | 65A | Eastfield | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
27/04/1968 | Reallocation | 2440 | 65A | Eastfield | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
01/06/1968 | Reallocation | 2427 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/06/1968 | Reallocation | 2428 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | 66A | Polmadie | |
01/06/1968 | Reallocation | 2438 | 67A | Corkerhill | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
01/06/1968 | Reallocation | 2442 | 67A | Corkerhill | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
08/06/1968 | Condemned | 2425 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
15/06/1968 | Condemned | 2411 | 67C | Ayr | COND | ||
15/06/1968 | Condemned | 2412 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
15/06/1968 | Condemned | 2415 | 64H | Leith Central | COND | ||
15/06/1968 | Condemned | 2417 | 64H | Leith Central | COND | ||
15/06/1968 | Condemned | 2428 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
15/06/1968 | Condemned | 2430 | 62A | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
29/06/1968 | Reallocation | 2434 | 67C | Ayr | 65A | Eastfield | |
27/07/1968 | Reallocation | 2435 | 64B | Haymarket | 64H | Leith Central | |
31/08/1968 | Reallocation | 2429 | 66A | Polmadie | 62B | Dundee West | |
15/12/1968 | Condemned | 2418 | 64H | Leith Central | COND | ||
15/12/1968 | Condemned | 2432 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
28/12/1968 | Reallocation | 2443 | 64B | Haymarket | 64H | Leith Central | |
25/01/1969 | Condemned | 2419 | 64H | Leith Central | COND | ||
25/01/1969 | Reallocation | 2421 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 65A | Eastfield | |
02/1969 | Condemned | 2410 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
11/03/1969 | Reallocation | 2426 | 98W | 64H | Leith Central | ||
26/04/1969 | Condemned | 2429 | 62B | Dundee West | COND | ||
28/06/1969 | Reallocation | 2422 | 65A | Eastfield | 62B | Dundee West | |
07/1969 | Condemned | 2434 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
30/09/1969 | Condemned | 2427 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
01/08/1970 | Reallocation | 2437 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | |
01/08/1970 | Reallocation | 2438 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | |
01/08/1970 | Reallocation | 2439 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | |
01/08/1970 | Reallocation | 2440 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | |
01/08/1970 | Reallocation | 2442 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | |
06/02/1971 | Reallocation | 2414 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | |
06/02/1971 | Reallocation | 2443 | 64H | Leith Central | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | |
03/07/1971 | Reallocation | 2420 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 66A | Polmadie | |
03/07/1971 | Reallocation | 2423 | 60A | Inverness | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
30/10/1971 | Reallocation | 2443 | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | 62B | Dundee West | |
26/11/1971 | Condemned | 2431 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
26/11/1971 | Condemned | 2435 | 64H | Leith Central | COND | ||
26/11/1971 | Condemned | 2436 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
26/11/1971 | Condemned | 2439 | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | COND | ||
26/02/1972 | Reallocation | 2416 | 64H | Leith Central | 62B | Dundee West | |
26/02/1972 | Reallocation | 2426 | 64H | Leith Central | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 2420 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 2433 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
29/04/1972 | Reallocation | 2413 | 64H | Leith Central | 65F | Grangemouth | |
18/06/1972 | Condemned | 2433 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
18/06/1972 | Condemned | 2443 | 62B | Dundee West | COND | ||
05/08/1972 | Reallocation | 2413 | 65F | Grangemouth | 65A | Eastfield | |
05/08/1972 | Reallocation | 2424 | 65F | Grangemouth | 65A | Eastfield | |
05/08/1972 | Reallocation | 2444 | 65F | Grangemouth | 62B | Dundee West | |
28/10/1972 | Reallocation | 2414 | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | |
01/11/1972 | Condemned | 2442 | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | COND | ||
19/11/1972 | Condemned | 2416 | 62B | Dundee West | COND | ||
19/11/1972 | Condemned | 2424 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
19/11/1972 | Condemned | 2438 | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | COND | ||
24/02/1973 | Reallocation | 2426 | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | 62B | Dundee West | |
24/02/1973 | Reallocation | 2444 | 62B | Dundee West | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
24/03/1973 | Reallocation | 2426 | 62B | Dundee West | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | |
29/12/1973 | Reallocation | 2444 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | DE | Dundee West | |
28/12/1974 | Reallocation | 06004 | 65A | Eastfield | DT | Dunfermline Townhill | |
01/03/1975 | Reallocation | 06004 | DT | Dunfermline Townhill | HN | Hamilton (West) | |
14/06/1975 | Condemned | 06010 | DE | Dundee West | COND | ||
26/07/1975 | Reallocation | 06004 | HN | Hamilton (West) | DE | Dundee West | |
30/08/1975 | Condemned | 06009 | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | COND | ||
06/09/1976 | Condemned | 06001 | 98S | COND | |||
06/1977 | Reallocation | 06004 | DE | Dundee West | DT | Dunfermline Townhill | |
06/1977 | Reallocation | 06006 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | DE | Dundee West | |
26/09/1977 | Condemned | 06007 | 98S | COND | |||
19/03/1979 | Condemned | 06004 | DT | Dunfermline Townhill | COND | ||
09/06/1980 | Condemned | 06006 | DE | Dundee West | COND | ||
06/10/1980 | Condemned | 06005 | 62B | Dundee West | COND | ||
06/10/1980 | Condemned | 06008 | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | COND | ||
01/02/1981 | Condemned | 06003 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
11/09/1981 | Condemned | 06002 | 98W | COND |