105
BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
50249 | 09/04/1978 | ||||
50371 | 18/02/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | 18/02/1957 | |
50372 | 21/02/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | 21/02/1957 | |
50373 | 26/02/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | 26/02/1957 | |
50374 | 04/03/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | 04/03/1957 | |
50375 | 11/03/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | 11/03/1957 | |
50376 | 18/03/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | 18/03/1957 | |
50377 | 22/03/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | 22/03/1957 | |
50378 | 11/04/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | 11/04/1957 | |
50379 | 17/04/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | 17/04/1957 | |
50380 | 26/04/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | 26/04/1957 | |
50381 | 01/05/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | 01/05/1957 | |
50382 | 06/05/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | 06/05/1957 | |
50383 | 13/05/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | 13/05/1957 | |
50384 | 21/05/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | 21/05/1957 | |
50385 | 31/05/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | 31/05/1957 | |
50386 | 31/05/1957 | 53C NR |
Hull Springhead (New) Norwich Thorpe |
31/05/1957 26/07/1981 |
|
50387 | 27/06/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | 27/06/1957 | |
50388 | 05/07/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | 05/07/1957 | |
50389 | 05/07/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | 05/07/1957 | |
50390 | |||||
50391 | |||||
50392 | |||||
50393 | |||||
50394 | |||||
50752 | |||||
50753 | |||||
50754 | |||||
50755 | |||||
50756 | |||||
50757 | |||||
50758 | |||||
50759 | |||||
50760 | |||||
50761 | |||||
50762 | |||||
50763 | |||||
50764 | |||||
50765 | |||||
50766 | |||||
50767 | |||||
50768 | |||||
50769 | |||||
50770 | 05/06/1981 | ||||
50771 | |||||
50772 | |||||
50773 | |||||
50774 | W | Withdrawn | 22/02/1969 | 22/02/1969 | |
50775 | W | Withdrawn | 25/05/1969 | 25/05/1969 | |
50776 | |||||
50777 | |||||
50778 | |||||
50779 | |||||
50780 | W | Withdrawn | 25/05/1969 | 25/05/1969 | |
50781 | |||||
50782 | 05/06/1981 | ||||
50783 | W | Withdrawn | 24/02/1962 | 24/02/1962 | |
50784 | |||||
50785 | |||||
50786 | |||||
50787 | |||||
50788 | |||||
50789 | |||||
50790 | |||||
50791 | |||||
50792 | |||||
50793 | |||||
50794 | |||||
50795 | |||||
50796 | |||||
50797 | |||||
50798 | |||||
50799 | W | Withdrawn | 22/02/1969 | 22/02/1969 | |
50800 | |||||
50801 | |||||
50802 | |||||
50803 | 05/06/1981 | ||||
50804 | |||||
50805 | |||||
50806 | |||||
50807 | |||||
50808 | 07/10/1961 | ||||
50809 | |||||
50810 | |||||
50811 | W | Withdrawn | 19/04/1969 | 19/04/1969 | |
50812 | |||||
50813 | W | Withdrawn | 25/05/1969 | 25/05/1969 | |
50814 | |||||
50815 | |||||
50816 | W | Withdrawn | 25/05/1969 | 25/05/1969 | |
50817 | W | Withdrawn | 31/01/1970 | 31/01/1970 | |
51254 | 31/05/1958 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 31/05/1958 | |
51255 | 31/05/1958 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 31/05/1958 | |
51256 | 06/06/1958 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 06/06/1958 | |
51257 | 06/06/1958 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 06/06/1958 | |
51258 | 12/06/1958 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 12/06/1958 | |
51259 | 19/06/1958 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 19/06/1958 | |
51260 | 19/06/1958 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 19/06/1958 | |
51261 | 26/06/1958 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 26/06/1958 | |
51262 | 26/06/1958 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 26/06/1958 | |
51263 | 01/07/1958 | 40A W |
Lincoln (New) Withdrawn |
01/07/1958 28/09/1986 |
28/09/1986 |
51264 | 17/07/1958 | 31A W |
Cambridge (New) Withdrawn |
17/07/1958 16/04/1967 |
16/04/1967 |
51265 | 23/07/1958 | 31A | Cambridge (New) | 23/07/1958 | |
51266 | 29/07/1958 | 31A | Cambridge (New) | 29/07/1958 | |
51267 | 29/07/1958 | 31A | Cambridge (New) | 29/07/1958 | |
51268 | 29/07/1958 | 31A W |
Cambridge (New) Withdrawn |
29/07/1958 21/12/1986 |
21/12/1986 |
51269 | 01/08/1958 | 31A | Cambridge (New) | 01/08/1958 | |
51270 | 01/08/1958 | 31A | Cambridge (New) | 01/08/1958 | |
51271 | 08/08/1958 | 31A W |
Cambridge (New) Withdrawn |
08/08/1958 28/09/1986 |
28/09/1986 |
51272 | 03/09/1958 | 31A | Cambridge (New) | 03/09/1958 | |
51273 | 03/09/1958 | 31A | Cambridge (New) | 03/09/1958 | |
51274 | 09/09/1958 | 31A | Cambridge (New) | 09/09/1958 | |
51275 | 12/09/1958 | 31A | Cambridge (New) | 12/09/1958 | |
51276 | 19/09/1958 | 31A | Cambridge (New) | 19/09/1958 | |
51277 | 24/09/1958 | 31A W |
Cambridge (New) Withdrawn |
24/09/1958 19/05/1985 |
19/05/1985 |
51278 | 26/09/1958 | 31A | Cambridge (New) | 26/09/1958 | |
51279 | 03/10/1958 | 31A W |
Cambridge (New) Withdrawn |
03/10/1958 19/05/1985 |
19/05/1985 |
51280 | 03/10/1958 | 31A | Cambridge (New) | 03/10/1958 | |
51281 | 10/10/1958 | 31A | Cambridge (New) | 10/10/1958 | |
51282 | 17/10/1958 | 31A | Cambridge (New) | 17/10/1958 | |
51283 | 17/10/1958 | 31A | Cambridge (New) | 17/10/1958 | |
51284 | 29/10/1958 | 31A W |
Cambridge (New) Withdrawn |
29/10/1958 10/05/1987 |
10/05/1987 |
51285 | 29/10/1958 | 31A | Cambridge (New) | 29/10/1958 | |
51286 | 05/11/1958 | 31A | Cambridge (New) | 05/11/1958 | |
51287 | 05/11/1958 | 31A | Cambridge (New) | 05/11/1958 | |
51288 | 12/11/1958 | 31A | Cambridge (New) | 12/11/1958 | |
51289 | 23/11/1958 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 23/11/1958 | |
51290 | 23/11/1958 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 23/11/1958 | |
51291 | 29/11/1958 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 29/11/1958 | |
51292 | 06/12/1958 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 06/12/1958 | |
51293 | 06/12/1958 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 06/12/1958 | |
51294 | 13/12/1958 | 40A W |
Lincoln (New) Withdrawn |
13/12/1958 21/12/1986 |
21/12/1986 |
51295 | 18/12/1958 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 18/12/1958 | |
51296 | 31/12/1958 | 31A | Cambridge (New) | 31/12/1958 | |
51297 | 05/01/1959 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 05/01/1959 | |
51298 | 05/01/1959 | 31A W |
Cambridge (New) Withdrawn |
05/01/1959 28/09/1986 |
28/09/1986 |
51299 | 15/01/1959 | 31A GF W |
Cambridge (New) South Gosforth Withdrawn |
15/01/1959 31/12/1977 10/05/1987 |
10/05/1987 |
51300 | 21/01/1959 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 21/01/1959 | |
51301 | 29/01/1959 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 29/01/1959 | |
51471 | 09/02/1959 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 09/02/1959 | |
51472 | 09/02/1959 | 40A W |
Lincoln (New) Withdrawn |
09/02/1959 28/09/1986 |
28/09/1986 |
51473 | 14/02/1959 | 61A W |
Kittybrewster (New) Withdrawn |
14/02/1959 25/11/1982 |
25/11/1982 |
51474 | 21/02/1959 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 21/02/1959 | |
51475 | 21/02/1959 | 61A W |
Kittybrewster (New) Withdrawn |
21/02/1959 25/11/1982 |
25/11/1982 |
51476 | 16/03/1959 | 61A W |
Kittybrewster (New) Withdrawn |
16/03/1959 25/11/1982 |
25/11/1982 |
51477 | 16/03/1959 | 61A W |
Kittybrewster (New) Withdrawn |
16/03/1959 25/11/1982 |
25/11/1982 |
51478 | 16/03/1959 | 61A NR W |
Kittybrewster (New) Norwich Thorpe Withdrawn |
16/03/1959 26/07/1981 12/04/1987 |
12/04/1987 |
51479 | 16/03/1959 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 16/03/1959 | |
51480 | 16/03/1959 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 16/03/1959 | |
51481 | 20/03/1959 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 20/03/1959 | |
51482 | 01/04/1959 | 61A NR |
Kittybrewster (New) Norwich Thorpe |
01/04/1959 26/07/1981 |
|
51483 | 01/04/1959 | 61A W |
Kittybrewster (New) Withdrawn |
01/04/1959 25/11/1982 |
25/11/1982 |
51484 | 01/04/1959 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 01/04/1959 | |
51485 | 08/04/1959 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 08/04/1959 | |
51486 | 20/04/1959 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 20/04/1959 | 09/04/1978 |
51487 | 20/04/1959 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 20/04/1959 | 09/04/1978 |
51488 | 20/04/1959 | 61A W |
Kittybrewster (New) Withdrawn |
20/04/1959 02/12/1967 |
02/12/1967 |
51489 | 05/05/1959 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 05/05/1959 | |
51490 | |||||
51491 | 09/04/1978 | ||||
51492 | |||||
51493 | NR | Norwich Thorpe | 26/07/1981 | ||
51494 |