Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 271 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5802 Week
» 30636 Month
» 64968 Year
» 1730344 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

105


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
50249
50371 18/02/1957 Hull Springhead 64.07
50372 21/02/1957 Hull Springhead 64.06
50373 26/02/1957 Hull Springhead 64.05
50374 04/03/1957 Hull Springhead 64.03
50375 11/03/1957 Hull Springhead 64.01
50376 18/03/1957 Hull Springhead 63.99
50377 22/03/1957 Hull Springhead 63.98
50378 11/04/1957 Hull Springhead 63.93
50379 17/04/1957 Hull Springhead 63.91
50380 26/04/1957 Hull Springhead 63.88
50381 01/05/1957 Hull Springhead 63.87
50382 06/05/1957 Hull Springhead 63.86
50383 13/05/1957 Hull Springhead 63.84
50384 21/05/1957 Hull Springhead 63.82
50385 31/05/1957 Hull Springhead 63.79
50386 31/05/1957 Hull Springhead 63.79
50387 27/06/1957 Hull Springhead 63.72
50388 05/07/1957 Hull Springhead 63.69
50389 05/07/1957 Hull Springhead 63.69
50390
50391
50392
50393
50394
50752
50753
50754
50755
50756
50757
50758
50759
50760
50761
50762
50763
50764
50765
50766
50767
50768
50769
50770
50771
50772
50773
50774 22/02/1969 Derby
50775 25/05/1969 Norwich Thorpe
50776
50777
50778
50779
50780 25/05/1969 Norwich Thorpe
50781
50782
50783 24/02/1962
50784
50785
50786
50787
50788
50789
50790
50791
50792
50793
50794
50795
50796
50797
50798
50799 22/02/1969 Derby
50800
50801
50802
50803
50804
50805
50806
50807
50808 07/10/1961
50809
50810
50811 19/04/1969 Newton Heath
50812
50813 25/05/1969 Norwich Thorpe
50814
50815
50816 25/05/1969 Norwich Thorpe
50817 31/01/1970 Newton Heath
51254 31/05/1958 Lincoln 62.79
51255 31/05/1958 Lincoln 62.79
51256 06/06/1958 Lincoln 62.77
51257 06/06/1958 Lincoln 62.77
51258 12/06/1958 Lincoln 62.76
51259 19/06/1958 Lincoln 62.74
51260 19/06/1958 Lincoln 62.74
51261 26/06/1958 Lincoln 62.72
51262 26/06/1958 Lincoln 62.72
51263 01/07/1958 Lincoln 28/09/1986 Lincoln 28.17 62.70
51264 17/07/1958 Cambridge 16/04/1967 8.75 62.66
51265 23/07/1958 Cambridge 62.64
51266 29/07/1958 Cambridge 62.63
51267 29/07/1958 Cambridge 62.63
51268 29/07/1958 Cambridge 21/12/1986 Ayr 28.42 62.63
51269 01/08/1958 Cambridge 62.62
51270 01/08/1958 Cambridge 62.62
51271 08/08/1958 Cambridge 28/09/1986 Lincoln 28.08 62.60
51272 03/09/1958 Cambridge 62.53
51273 03/09/1958 Cambridge 62.53
51274 09/09/1958 Cambridge 62.51
51275 12/09/1958 Cambridge 62.50
51276 19/09/1958 Cambridge 62.48
51277 24/09/1958 Cambridge 19/05/1985 Norwich Thorpe 26.67 62.47
51278 26/09/1958 Cambridge 62.47
51279 03/10/1958 Cambridge 19/05/1985 Lincoln 26.58 62.45
51280 03/10/1958 Cambridge 62.45
51281 10/10/1958 Cambridge 62.43
51282 17/10/1958 Cambridge 62.41
51283 17/10/1958 Cambridge 62.41
51284 29/10/1958 Cambridge 10/05/1987 Lincoln 28.58 62.38
51285 29/10/1958 Cambridge 62.38
51286 05/11/1958 Cambridge 62.36
51287 05/11/1958 Cambridge 62.36
51288 12/11/1958 Cambridge 62.34
51289 23/11/1958 Lincoln 62.31
51290 23/11/1958 Lincoln 62.31
51291 29/11/1958 Lincoln 62.29
51292 06/12/1958 Lincoln 62.27
51293 06/12/1958 Lincoln 62.27
51294 13/12/1958 Lincoln 21/12/1986 Ayr 28 62.25
51295 18/12/1958 Lincoln 62.24
51296 31/12/1958 Cambridge 62.20
51297 05/01/1959 Lincoln 62.19
51298 05/01/1959 Cambridge 28/09/1986 Lincoln 27.67 62.19
51299 15/01/1959 Cambridge 10/05/1987 Lincoln 28.33 62.16
51300 21/01/1959 Lincoln 62.15
51301 29/01/1959 Lincoln 62.12
51471 09/02/1959 Lincoln 62.09
51472 09/02/1959 Lincoln 28/09/1986 Lincoln 27.58 62.09
51473 14/02/1959 Kittybrewster 25/11/1982 Millerhill 23.75 62.08
51474 21/02/1959 Kittybrewster 62.06
51475 21/02/1959 Kittybrewster 25/11/1982 Millerhill 23.75 62.06
51476 16/03/1959 Kittybrewster 25/11/1982 Millerhill 23.67 62.00
51477 16/03/1959 Kittybrewster 25/11/1982 Millerhill 23.67 62.00
51478 16/03/1959 Kittybrewster 12/04/1987 Lincoln 28.08 62.00
51479 16/03/1959 Kittybrewster 62.00
51480 16/03/1959 Kittybrewster 62.00
51481 20/03/1959 Kittybrewster 61.99
51482 01/04/1959 Kittybrewster 61.95
51483 01/04/1959 Kittybrewster 25/11/1982 Millerhill 23.58 61.95
51484 01/04/1959 Kittybrewster 61.95
51485 08/04/1959 Kittybrewster 61.93
51486 20/04/1959 Kittybrewster 61.90
51487 20/04/1959 Kittybrewster 61.90
51488 20/04/1959 Kittybrewster 02/12/1967 8.67 61.90
51489 05/05/1959 Kittybrewster 61.86
51490
51491
51492
51493
51494