Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 103 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1172 Week
» 1172 Month
» 68034 Year
» 1733410 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

105


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
50785
50786
50787
50788
50789
50790
50791
50792
50793
50794
50795
50796
50797
50798
50799 22/02/1969 Derby
50800
50801
50802
50803
50804
50805
50806
50807
50808 07/10/1961
50809
50810
50811 19/04/1969 Newton Heath
50812
50813 25/05/1969 Norwich Thorpe
50814
50815
50816 25/05/1969 Norwich Thorpe
50817 31/01/1970 Newton Heath