BR
Database
Complete BR Locomotive Database 1948-1997
Home
Guestbook
Contact
Links
Preferences
Menu
Locomotives
Build Dates
Withdrawals
Names
Snapshots
Regional
Locomotives
Workings
ReClassifications
Pilot Scheme
Prototypes
Preservation
Diesels
Electrics
Steam
Classes
Steam
Standards
GWR
1850-1947
Barry
Brecon & Merthyr Junction
Burry Port & Gwendraeth Valley
Cambrian
Cardiff
Midland & South Western Junction
Powlesland & Mason
Port Talbot
Rhymney
Swansea Harbour Trust
Taff Vale
Vale of Rheidol
SR
1923-1947
London South Western
London, Brighton & South Coast
South Eastern & Chatham
LNER
LNER Designs 1923-1947
Great Central
Great Eastern
Great Northern
Great North of Scotland
Hull and Barnsley
Midland and Great Northern
North British
North Eastern
LMS
LMS Designs 1923-1947
Caledonian
Furness
Glasgow & South Western
Highland
London & North Western
London, Tilbury & Southend
Lancashire & Yorkshire
Maryport & Carlisle
Midland
North Staffordshire
Somerset & Dorset
ex WD
by Wheels
2 Driver Tank Engines
2-2-4T
2 Driver Tender Engines
2-2-2
4 Coupled Tank Engines
0-4-0T
0-4-0ST
0-4-2T
0-4-2ST
0-4-4T
2-4-0T
2-4-0WT
2-4-2T
4-4-0T
4-4-2T
4-4-4T
4 Coupled Tender Engines
0-4-0
0-4-2
0-4-4
2-4-0
2-4-2
4-4-0
4-4-2
4-4-4
6 Coupled Tank Engines
0-6-0T
0-6-0PT
0-6-0ST
0-6-2T
0-6-2ST
0-6-4T
2-6-0T
2-6-2T
2-6-4T
4-6-0T
4-6-2T
4-6-4T
6 Coupled Tender Engines
0-6-0
0-6-2
0-6-4
2-6-0
2-6-2
2-6-4
4-6-0
4-6-2
4-6-4
8 Coupled Tank Engines
0-8-0T
0-8-2T
0-8-4T
2-8-0T
2-8-2T
8 Coupled Tender Engines
0-8-0
0-8-2
0-8-4
2-8-0
2-8-2
10 Coupled Tank Engines
0-10-0T
10 Coupled Tender Engines
0-10-0
2-10-0
Special
0-6-6-0T
2-6-6-2T
2-8-8-2T
Diesel
Shunters
Type 1
Type 2
Type 3
Type 4
Type 5
Electric
25KV A.C
1500V D.C
750V D.C
Multiple Units
Steam Railmotors
GWR Railmotors
LNER Railmotors
LMS Railmotors
Diesel Multiple Units
GWR Railcars
LNER Railcars
1st Generation DMU's
2nd Generation DMU's
DEMU's
Pullman
HST
Electric Multiple Units
25KV A.C
1500V D.C
750V D.C
Sites
Depots
Builders
Locomotive Works
Scrapyards
People
Chief Mechanical Engineers
Management
Miscellaneous
Companies
British Railways
GWR & Constituents
Taff Vale
Rhymney
Cambrian
Barry
Cardiff Railway
SR & Constituents
LSWR
LBSCR
SECR
LNER & Constituents
GER
GCR
GNR
MGNR
NER
NBR
GNSR
ex LMS
MR
LNWR
LYR
LTSR
S&DJR
G&SWR
CR
HR
Timelines
Line Closures
Workings
Events
News Stories
Miscellaneous
Reports
Wheel Arrangements
Background Images
On This Day ...
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.
?
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 405 Today
» 5773 Yesterday
» 11331 Week
» 104565 Month
» 564506 Year
» 5003943 Total
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(
Free MySQL Counter
)
D2/7 0-6-0
Summary
Gallery
Fleet
Alloc
Names
Cycle
Snap
Mods
Stats
Hist
Day2Day
Preservation
Date
Event
Number
From
Depot From
To
Depot To
Usage
31/12/1955
To Service
11116
NEW
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
17/01/1956
To Service
11117
NEW
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
25/01/1956
To Service
11118
NEW
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
31/01/1956
To Service
11119
NEW
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
22/02/1956
To Service
11120
NEW
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
27/03/1956
To Service
11144
NEW
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
12/04/1956
To Service
11145
NEW
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
30/04/1956
To Service
11146
NEW
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
25/05/1956
Reallocation
11117
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
40B
Immingham
31/05/1956
To Service
11147
NEW
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
18/06/1956
To Service
11148
NEW
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
25/04/1959
Reallocation
2508
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
17A
Derby
01/08/1959
Reallocation
2508
17A
Derby
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
07/07/1962
Reallocation
2502
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
17A
Derby
25/08/1962
Reallocation
2502
17A
Derby
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
31/12/1966
Reallocation
2505
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
12C
Barrow in Furness
07/01/1967
Reallocation
2504
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
12C
Barrow in Furness
14/01/1967
Reallocation
2506
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
12C
Barrow in Furness
21/01/1967
Reallocation
2500
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
10A
Carnforth
21/01/1967
Reallocation
2501
40B
Immingham
12C
Barrow in Furness
21/01/1967
Reallocation
2502
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
10A
Carnforth
21/01/1967
Reallocation
2503
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
10A
Carnforth
21/01/1967
Reallocation
2507
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
12C
Barrow in Furness
18/02/1967
Condemned
2501
12C
Barrow in Furness
COND
18/03/1967
Condemned
2504
12C
Barrow in Furness
COND
25/03/1967
Condemned
2507
12C
Barrow in Furness
COND
22/04/1967
Reallocation
2500
10A
Carnforth
12C
Barrow in Furness
22/04/1967
Reallocation
2502
10A
Carnforth
12C
Barrow in Furness
22/04/1967
Reallocation
2503
10A
Carnforth
12C
Barrow in Furness
13/05/1967
Condemned
2500
12C
Barrow in Furness
COND
13/05/1967
Condemned
2508
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
COND
05/08/1967
Condemned
2503
12C
Barrow in Furness
COND
05/08/1967
Condemned
2509
6C
Birkenhead Mollington Street
COND
19/08/1967
Condemned
2505
12C
Barrow in Furness
COND
07/10/1967
Condemned
2502
12C
Barrow in Furness
COND
25/11/1967
Condemned
2506
12C
Barrow in Furness
COND