LNER Peppercorn "A1" Class 4-6-2
Class | BR | Private | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
A1 | 60114 | 06/08/1948 | KX 37B 37B 35B 36A W |
Kings Cross Copley Hill (Leeds) Copley Hill (Leeds) Grantham Doncaster Withdrawn |
06/08/1948 04/06/1950 30/06/1950 15/02/1953 22/09/1957 26/12/1964 |
26/12/1964 | |
A1 | 60115 | 03/09/1948 | GHD 56C W |
Gateshead Copley Hill (Leeds) Withdrawn |
03/09/1948 20/11/1960 12/11/1962 |
12/11/1962 | |
A1 | 60116 | 08/10/1948 | HTN 52D 52A W |
Heaton Tweedmouth Gateshead Withdrawn |
08/10/1948 09/09/1962 18/10/1964 14/06/1965 |
14/06/1965 | |
A1 | 60117 | 22/10/1948 | GRA 37B 37B 35B 35B 37B 56B 52A 56B W |
Grantham Copley Hill (Leeds) Copley Hill (Leeds) Grantham Grantham Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Gateshead Ardsley Withdrawn |
22/10/1948 04/06/1950 30/06/1950 18/05/1952 14/06/1952 15/02/1953 06/09/1964 06/12/1964 03/01/1965 21/06/1965 |
21/06/1965 | |
A1 | 60118 | 12/11/1948 | COP 56B 55H W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Neville Hill Withdrawn |
12/11/1948 04/11/1962 28/07/1963 04/10/1965 |
04/10/1965 | |
A1 | 60119 | 26/11/1948 | COP 35B 34A 36A W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Grantham Kings Cross Doncaster Withdrawn |
26/11/1948 18/12/1955 15/09/1957 03/08/1958 31/05/1964 |
31/05/1964 | |
A1 | 60120 | 10/12/1948 | KX 37B 37B 50A W |
Kings Cross Copley Hill (Leeds) Copley Hill (Leeds) York (North) Withdrawn |
10/12/1948 04/06/1950 30/06/1950 08/09/1963 20/01/1964 |
20/01/1964 | |
A1 | 60121 | 22/12/1948 | YK W |
York (North) Withdrawn |
22/12/1948 04/10/1965 |
04/10/1965 | |
A1 | 60122 | 24/12/1948 | KX 52A 35B 37B 35B 34A 36A W |
Kings Cross Gateshead Grantham Copley Hill (Leeds) Grantham Kings Cross Doncaster Withdrawn |
24/12/1948 09/09/1951 15/09/1951 18/10/1953 28/08/1955 15/09/1957 05/04/1959 17/12/1962 |
17/12/1962 | |
A1 | 60123 | 10/02/1949 | DON 35B 35B 37B 37B 37A 37A 56C 56B W |
Doncaster Grantham Grantham Copley Hill (Leeds) Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Ardsley Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Withdrawn |
10/02/1949 19/03/1950 25/03/1950 04/06/1950 30/06/1950 09/09/1951 15/09/1951 15/09/1957 01/04/1962 01/10/1962 |
01/10/1962 | |
A1 | 60124 | 23/03/1949 | GHD 52B 50A 51A W |
Gateshead Heaton York (North) Darlington Withdrawn |
23/03/1949 11/09/1960 10/09/1961 22/11/1964 27/03/1966 |
27/03/1966 | |
A1 | 60125 | 22/04/1949 | DON 37B 37B 35B 37B 35B 34A 36A W |
Doncaster Copley Hill (Leeds) Copley Hill (Leeds) Grantham Copley Hill (Leeds) Grantham Kings Cross Doncaster Withdrawn |
22/04/1949 04/06/1950 30/06/1950 15/02/1953 07/06/1953 02/05/1954 16/06/1957 06/01/1958 04/07/1964 |
04/07/1964 | |
A1 | 60126 | 27/04/1949 | HTN 50A W |
Heaton York (North) Withdrawn |
27/04/1949 10/09/1961 18/01/1965 |
18/01/1965 | |
A1 | 60127 | 13/05/1949 | HTN 52D 52A W |
Heaton Tweedmouth Gateshead Withdrawn |
13/05/1949 09/09/1962 18/10/1964 14/06/1965 |
14/06/1965 | |
A1 | 60128 | 19/05/1949 | COP 34A 34A 35B 35B 34A 36A W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Kings Cross Kings Cross Grantham Grantham Kings Cross Doncaster Withdrawn |
19/05/1949 04/06/1950 30/06/1950 09/09/1951 15/09/1951 15/09/1957 05/04/1959 10/01/1965 |
10/01/1965 | |
A1 | 60129 | 15/06/1949 | YK GHD GHD 52B 52D 52A 50A W |
York (North) Gateshead Gateshead Heaton Tweedmouth Gateshead York (North) Withdrawn |
15/06/1949 04/09/1949 10/09/1949 11/09/1960 09/09/1962 06/12/1964 11/07/1965 11/10/1965 |
11/10/1965 | |
A1 | 60130 | 28/09/1948 | DON KX KX 35B 35B 37A 56C 56B W |
Doncaster Kings Cross Kings Cross Grantham Grantham Ardsley Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Withdrawn |
28/09/1948 17/10/1948 23/10/1948 09/09/1951 15/09/1951 15/02/1953 15/09/1957 06/09/1964 04/10/1965 |
04/10/1965 | |
A1 | 60131 | 05/10/1948 | KX 35B 35B 37B 56B 55H W |
Kings Cross Grantham Grantham Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Neville Hill Withdrawn |
05/10/1948 09/09/1951 15/09/1951 15/02/1953 01/04/1962 28/07/1963 04/10/1965 |
04/10/1965 | |
A1 | 60132 | 18/10/1948 | GHD 52B 52D 52A W |
Gateshead Heaton Tweedmouth Gateshead Withdrawn |
18/10/1948 15/05/1960 09/09/1962 06/12/1964 14/06/1965 |
14/06/1965 | |
A1 | 60133 | 30/10/1948 | GRA 37B 37B 37A W |
Grantham Copley Hill (Leeds) Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Withdrawn |
30/10/1948 04/06/1950 30/06/1950 06/09/1954 21/06/1965 |
21/06/1965 | |
A1 | 60134 | 05/11/1948 | COP 56B 55H W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Neville Hill Withdrawn |
05/11/1948 01/04/1962 28/07/1963 04/10/1965 |
04/10/1965 | |
A1 | 60135 | 18/11/1948 | GHD 56C 56B W |
Gateshead Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Withdrawn |
18/11/1948 20/11/1960 01/04/1962 12/11/1962 |
12/11/1962 | |
A1 | 60136 | 26/11/1948 | COP 34A 35B 35B 34A 36A 34A 36A W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Kings Cross Grantham Grantham Kings Cross Doncaster Kings Cross Doncaster Withdrawn |
26/11/1948 21/05/1950 09/09/1951 15/09/1951 07/04/1957 06/04/1958 03/08/1958 05/04/1959 22/05/1963 |
22/05/1963 | |
A1 | 60137 | 03/12/1948 | GHD 52B 52D W |
Gateshead Heaton Tweedmouth Withdrawn |
03/12/1948 15/05/1960 09/09/1962 29/10/1962 |
29/10/1962 | |
A1 | 60138 | 10/12/1948 | YK W |
York (North) Withdrawn |
10/12/1948 04/10/1965 |
04/10/1965 | |
A1 | 60139 | 23/12/1948 | KX 37B 37B 35B 34A 36A W |
Kings Cross Copley Hill (Leeds) Copley Hill (Leeds) Grantham Kings Cross Doncaster Withdrawn |
23/12/1948 15/07/1951 28/07/1951 18/12/1955 07/04/1957 05/04/1959 07/06/1964 |
07/06/1964 | |
A1 | 60140 | 24/12/1948 | YK KX KX 50A 50A W |
York (North) Kings Cross Kings Cross York (North) York (North) Withdrawn |
24/12/1948 09/10/1949 15/10/1949 04/06/1950 30/06/1950 11/01/1965 |
11/01/1965 | |
A1 | 60141 | 31/12/1948 | YK KX KX 37B 50A W |
York (North) Kings Cross Kings Cross Copley Hill (Leeds) York (North) Withdrawn |
31/12/1948 09/10/1949 15/10/1949 21/05/1950 08/09/1963 05/10/1964 |
05/10/1964 | |
A1 | 60142 | 02/02/1949 | GHD 52B 52D 52A W |
Gateshead Heaton Tweedmouth Gateshead Withdrawn |
02/02/1949 11/09/1960 09/09/1962 25/10/1964 14/06/1965 |
14/06/1965 | |
A1 | 60143 | 22/02/1949 | GHD 52B 52D 50A W |
Gateshead Heaton Tweedmouth York (North) Withdrawn |
22/02/1949 15/05/1960 09/09/1962 08/09/1963 06/05/1964 |
06/05/1964 | |
A1 | 60144 | 02/03/1949 | DON COP COP 34A 34A 37B 37B 37A 37A 35B 34A 36A W |
Doncaster Copley Hill (Leeds) Copley Hill (Leeds) Kings Cross Kings Cross Copley Hill (Leeds) Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Ardsley Grantham Kings Cross Doncaster Withdrawn |
02/03/1949 18/12/1949 24/12/1949 04/06/1950 30/06/1950 15/07/1951 28/07/1951 09/09/1951 15/09/1951 15/02/1953 15/09/1957 10/11/1957 30/04/1963 |
30/04/1963 | |
A1 | 60145 | 23/03/1949 | GHD 56C 50A 51A 50A W |
Gateshead Copley Hill (Leeds) York (North) Darlington York (North) (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
23/03/1949 20/11/1960 08/09/1963 02/01/1966 27/03/1966 17/04/1966 19/06/1966 |
19/06/1966 | |
A1 | 60146 | 11/04/1949 | DON 37B 50A 55H 50A W |
Doncaster Copley Hill (Leeds) York (North) Neville Hill York (North) Withdrawn |
11/04/1949 30/04/1950 04/06/1950 28/07/1963 13/10/1963 04/10/1965 |
04/10/1965 | |
A1 | 60147 | 13/04/1949 | GHD 52B 52D 50A W |
Gateshead Heaton Tweedmouth York (North) Withdrawn |
13/04/1949 11/09/1960 09/09/1962 08/09/1963 28/08/1964 |
28/08/1964 | |
A1 | 60148 | 25/05/1949 | GRA 34A 34A 35B 35B 37B 35B 37B 56B 52A 56B W |
Grantham Kings Cross Kings Cross Grantham Grantham Copley Hill (Leeds) Grantham Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Gateshead Ardsley Withdrawn |
25/05/1949 04/06/1950 30/06/1950 09/09/1951 15/09/1951 18/10/1953 02/05/1954 28/08/1955 06/09/1964 06/12/1964 03/01/1965 21/06/1965 |
21/06/1965 | |
A1 | 60149 | 31/05/1949 | GRA KX KX 35B 35B 34A 35B 35B 34A 36A W |
Grantham Kings Cross Kings Cross Grantham Grantham Kings Cross Grantham Grantham Kings Cross Doncaster Withdrawn |
31/05/1949 10/10/1949 15/10/1949 19/03/1950 25/03/1950 19/04/1950 09/09/1951 15/09/1951 16/09/1956 28/09/1958 07/06/1964 |
07/06/1964 | |
A1 | 60150 | 15/06/1949 | HTN GHD GHD 50A W |
Heaton Gateshead Gateshead York (North) Withdrawn |
15/06/1949 10/07/1949 16/07/1949 20/11/1960 05/10/1964 |
05/10/1964 | |
A1 | 60151 | 30/06/1949 | GHD 52B 52D 52A 50A W |
Gateshead Heaton Tweedmouth Gateshead York (North) Withdrawn |
30/06/1949 15/05/1960 09/09/1962 18/10/1964 11/07/1965 24/11/1965 |
24/11/1965 | |
A1 | 60152 | 08/07/1949 | 64B 66A 66A 64B 64B 66A 64B 64A 50A W |
Haymarket Polmadie Polmadie Haymarket Haymarket Polmadie Haymarket St Margarets York (North) Withdrawn |
08/07/1949 14/01/1951 31/01/1951 11/03/1951 31/03/1951 28/12/1952 29/06/1953 09/09/1963 06/09/1964 21/06/1965 |
21/06/1965 | |
A1 | 60153 | 26/08/1949 | YK W |
York (North) Withdrawn |
26/08/1949 02/11/1962 |
02/11/1962 | |
A1 | 60154 | 23/09/1949 | GHD 50A 55H W |
Gateshead York (North) Neville Hill Withdrawn |
23/09/1949 20/11/1960 28/07/1963 04/10/1965 |
04/10/1965 | |
A1 | 60155 | 29/09/1949 | GHD 52B 52D 50A W |
Gateshead Heaton Tweedmouth York (North) Withdrawn |
29/09/1949 11/09/1960 09/09/1962 04/11/1962 04/10/1965 |
04/10/1965 | |
A1 | 60156 | 19/10/1949 | KX 35B 35B 34A 36A 50A W |
Kings Cross Grantham Grantham Kings Cross Doncaster York (North) Withdrawn |
19/10/1949 09/09/1951 15/09/1951 16/09/1956 05/04/1959 26/01/1964 10/05/1965 |
10/05/1965 | |
A1 | 60157 | 03/11/1949 | KX 35B 35B 34A 36A W |
Kings Cross Grantham Grantham Kings Cross Doncaster Withdrawn |
03/11/1949 09/09/1951 15/09/1951 16/09/1956 05/04/1959 10/01/1965 |
10/01/1965 | |
A1 | 60158 | 17/11/1949 | KX 35B 35B 37B 35B 34A 36A W |
Kings Cross Grantham Grantham Copley Hill (Leeds) Grantham Kings Cross Doncaster Withdrawn |
17/11/1949 09/09/1951 15/09/1951 07/06/1953 02/05/1954 16/06/1957 28/09/1958 26/12/1964 |
26/12/1964 | |
A1 | 60159 | 24/11/1949 | 64B 64A W |
Haymarket St Margarets Withdrawn |
24/11/1949 09/09/1963 14/10/1963 |
14/10/1963 | |
A1 | 60160 | 02/12/1949 | 64B 66A 66A 64B 64B 66A 66A 64B 64B 64A W |
Haymarket Polmadie Polmadie Haymarket Haymarket Polmadie Polmadie Haymarket Haymarket St Margarets Withdrawn |
02/12/1949 14/01/1951 31/01/1951 04/03/1951 31/03/1951 16/04/1951 06/10/1951 22/02/1952 23/02/1952 09/09/1963 12/12/1963 |
12/12/1963 | |
A1 | 60161 | 19/12/1949 | 64B 66A 66A 64B 64B 66A 66A 64B 64A W |
Haymarket Polmadie Polmadie Haymarket Haymarket Polmadie Polmadie Haymarket St Margarets Withdrawn |
19/12/1949 14/01/1951 31/01/1951 11/03/1951 31/03/1951 16/09/1951 06/10/1951 29/06/1953 09/09/1963 14/10/1963 |
14/10/1963 | |
A1 | 60162 | 23/12/1949 | 64B 64A W |
Haymarket St Margarets Withdrawn |
23/12/1949 09/09/1963 28/10/1963 |
28/10/1963 | |
A1 | 60163 | 2005 |