Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2680 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16086 Week
» 69102 Month
» 188629 Year
» 3215482 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GCR/LNER Robinson "A5" Class 4-6-2T
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
GCR |
452 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
452C |
1924 |
|
29/09/1923 |
|
GCR |
169 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
169C |
1924 |
|
03/10/1923 |
|
GCR |
449 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5449 |
1924 |
|
26/01/1924 |
|
GCR |
166 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5166 |
1924 |
|
09/02/1924 |
|
GCR |
129 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5129 |
1924 |
|
16/02/1924 |
|
GCR |
373 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5373 |
1924 |
|
31/05/1924 |
|
GCR |
170 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5170 |
1924 |
|
07/06/1924 |
|
LNER |
158 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
158C |
1924 |
|
20/06/1924 |
|
GCR |
128 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5128 |
1924 |
|
28/06/1924 |
|
GCR |
168 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5168 |
1924 |
|
28/06/1924 |
|
GCR |
23 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5023 |
1924 |
|
04/10/1924 |
|
GCR |
167 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5167 |
1924 |
|
11/10/1924 |
|
GCR |
165 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5165 |
1924 |
|
18/10/1924 |
|
LNER |
3 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5003 |
1924 |
|
18/10/1924 |
|
GCR |
451 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5451 |
1924 |
|
13/12/1924 |
|
GCR |
371 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5371 |
1924 |
|
27/12/1924 |
|
GCR |
374 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5374 |
1924 |
|
27/12/1924 |
|
GCR |
411 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5411 |
1924 |
|
21/02/1925 |
|
GCR |
447 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5447 |
1924 |
|
28/03/1925 |
|
LNER |
7 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5007 |
1924 |
|
28/03/1925 |
|
GCR |
372 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5372 |
1924 |
|
02/05/1925 |
|
LNER |
45 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5045 |
1924 |
|
30/05/1925 |
|
LNER |
6 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5006 |
1924 |
|
30/05/1925 |
|
LNER |
88 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5088 |
1924 |
|
13/06/1925 |
|
LNER |
46 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5046 |
1924 |
|
20/06/1925 |
|
GCR |
24 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5024 |
1924 |
|
27/06/1925 |
|
LNER |
30 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5030 |
1924 |
|
11/07/1925 |
|
LNER |
156 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5156 |
1924 |
|
05/09/1925 |
|
LNER |
158C |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5158 |
1924 |
|
19/09/1925 |
|
LNER |
154 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5154 |
1924 |
|
14/11/1925 |
|
GCR |
450 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5450 |
1924 |
|
31/12/1925 |
|
LNER |
452C |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5452 |
1924 |
|
30/01/1926 |
|
GCR |
448 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5448 |
1924 |
|
13/02/1926 |
|
LNER |
169C |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5169 |
1924 |
|
03/04/1926 |
|
LNER |
1784 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9841 |
1946 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
5154 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9827 |
1946 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
5156 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9828 |
1946 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
5158 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9829 |
1946 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
1738 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9832 |
1946 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
5088 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9826 |
1946 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
5165 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9800 |
1946 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
5166 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9801 |
1946 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
5167 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9802 |
1946 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
5168 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9803 |
1946 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
5169 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9804 |
1946 |
|
31/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
5170 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9805 |
1946 |
|
31/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
1782 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9840 |
1946 |
|
13/04/1946 |
|
LNER |
5373 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9817 |
1946 |
|
04/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
5411 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9819 |
1946 |
|
04/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
1712 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9830 |
1946 |
|
25/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
5448 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9808 |
1946 |
|
01/06/1946 |
|
LNER |
5128 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9813 |
1946 |
|
22/06/1946 |
|
LNER |
1750 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9833 |
1946 |
|
07/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
1756 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9834 |
1946 |
|
07/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
1790 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9842 |
1946 |
|
07/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
1719 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9831 |
1946 |
|
20/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5003 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9820 |
1946 |
|
21/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5006 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9821 |
1946 |
|
21/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5007 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9822 |
1946 |
|
21/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5045 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9824 |
1946 |
|
21/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5046 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9825 |
1946 |
|
21/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5023 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9806 |
1946 |
|
27/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
1760 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9835 |
1946 |
|
11/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
1766 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9836 |
1946 |
|
11/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
1767 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9837 |
1946 |
|
11/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
1768 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9838 |
1946 |
|
11/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
1771 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9839 |
1946 |
|
11/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5024 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9807 |
1946 |
|
11/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5129 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9814 |
1946 |
|
11/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5372 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9816 |
1946 |
|
11/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5374 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9818 |
1946 |
|
11/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5449 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9809 |
1946 |
|
18/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5450 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9810 |
1946 |
|
18/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5451 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9811 |
1946 |
|
18/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5452 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9812 |
1946 |
|
18/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5030 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9823 |
1946 |
|
31/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5371 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9815 |
1946 |
|
21/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
9808 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E9808 |
BR Tmp |
|
17/01/1948 |
|
LNER |
9835 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E9835 |
BR Tmp |
|
13/02/1948 |
|
LNER |
9838 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E9838 |
BR Tmp |
|
20/02/1948 |
|
LNER |
9813 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E9813 |
BR Tmp |
|
28/02/1948 |
|
LNER |
9803 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E9803 |
BR Tmp |
|
06/03/1948 |
|
LNER |
9816 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E9816 |
BR Tmp |
|
06/03/1948 |
|
LNER |
9804 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69804 |
|
|
03/04/1948 |
|
LNER |
9841 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69841 |
|
|
07/04/1948 |
|
LNER |
9834 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69834 |
|
|
09/04/1948 |
|
LNER |
9827 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69827 |
|
|
10/04/1948 |
|
LNER |
9811 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69811 |
|
|
24/04/1948 |
|
LNER |
9830 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69830 |
|
|
07/05/1948 |
|
LNER |
9840 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69840 |
|
|
07/05/1948 |
|
LNER |
9836 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69836 |
|
|
14/05/1948 |
|
LNER |
9826 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69826 |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
|
LNER |
9837 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69837 |
|
|
28/05/1948 |
|
LNER |
9833 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69833 |
|
|
04/06/1948 |
|
LNER |
9802 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69802 |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
|
LNER |
9828 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69828 |
|
|
03/07/1948 |
|
LNER |
9814 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69814 |
|
|
24/07/1948 |
|
LNER |
9815 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69815 |
|
|
31/07/1948 |
|
BR |
E9813 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69813 |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
|
LNER |
9832 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69832 |
|
|
27/08/1948 |
|
LNER |
9831 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69831 |
|
|
10/09/1948 |
|
LNER |
9829 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69829 |
|
|
18/09/1948 |
|
LNER |
9809 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69809 |
|
|
25/09/1948 |
|
LNER |
9820 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69820 |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
9818 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69818 |
|
|
16/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
9823 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69823 |
|
|
23/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
9824 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69824 |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
|
LNER |
9801 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69801 |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
|
LNER |
9810 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69810 |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
|
LNER |
9842 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69842 |
|
|
23/12/1948 |
|
LNER |
9825 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69825 |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
|
LNER |
9805 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69805 |
|
|
05/02/1949 |
|
LNER |
9821 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69821 |
|
|
05/02/1949 |
|
BR |
E9838 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69838 |
|
|
03/03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9800 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69800 |
|
|
05/03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9806 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69806 |
|
|
05/03/1949 |
|
BR |
E9835 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69835 |
|
|
07/04/1949 |
|
LNER |
9839 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69839 |
|
|
14/04/1949 |
|
BR |
E9803 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69803 |
|
|
29/04/1949 |
|
LNER |
9807 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69807 |
|
|
06/05/1949 |
|
LNER |
9822 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69822 |
|
|
14/07/1949 |
|
LNER |
9819 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69819 |
|
|
02/09/1949 |
|
BR |
E9808 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69808 |
|
|
06/12/1949 |
|
LNER |
9812 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69812 |
|
|
11/01/1950 |
|
LNER |
9817 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69817 |
|
w/e |
04/11/1950 |
|
BR |
E9816 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69816 |
|
|
02/11/1951 |
|