Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 378 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1447 Week
» 1447 Month
» 68309 Year
» 1733685 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "B3" Class 4-6-0


Class GCR LNER (1924 Tmp) LNER (1924) LNER (1946 1st) LNER (1946 2nd) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
B3/1 1169 1169 6169 1480 1494   11/1917 GOR
IMM
KX
MEX
COP
KX
GOR
COP
KX
COP
GOR
NEA
GOR
NEA
IMM
NEA
IMM
GOR
IMM
WFD
COP
GOR
NEA
IMM
LIN
W
Gorton
Immingham
Kings Cross
Mexborough
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Kings Cross
Gorton
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Kings Cross
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Gorton
Neasden
Gorton
Neasden
Immingham
Neasden
Immingham
Gorton
Immingham
Woodford Halse
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Gorton
Neasden
Immingham
Lincoln
Withdrawn
11/1917
01/1923
08/1923
11/1923
15/05/1924
11/08/1925
27/09/1925
10/10/1925
12/12/1925
02/1927
21/04/1927
24/10/1927
07/11/1928
02/03/1929
15/05/1930
20/03/1933
17/06/1933
18/09/1933
11/12/1935
21/07/1939
12/07/1942
24/12/1942
24/12/1944
16/04/1945
01/06/1947
06/12/1947
06/12/1947
B3/1 1164 1164 6164 1481 1495   06/1920 GOR
IMM
KX
COP
KX
COP
KX
GOR
IMM
NEA
GOR
IMM
WFD
COP
WFD
GOR
NEA
IMM
W
Gorton
Immingham
Kings Cross
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Kings Cross
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Kings Cross
Gorton
Immingham
Neasden
Gorton
Immingham
Woodford Halse
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Woodford Halse
Gorton
Neasden
Immingham
Withdrawn
06/1920
22/10/1920
15/02/1924
05/08/1924
23/07/1925
05/10/1925
08/11/1925
23/02/1927
12/12/1928
06/12/1930
05/12/1934
13/04/1935
24/07/1939
03/04/1942
19/07/1942
21/11/1942
13/02/1943
28/06/1947
27/09/1947
27/09/1947
B3/1 1165   6165 1482 1496   07/1920 GOR
KX
COP
KX
GOR
IMM
NEA
IMM
NEA
GOR
IMM
NEA
IMM
WFD
COP
GOR
NEA
IMM
LIN
W
Gorton
Kings Cross
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Kings Cross
Gorton
Immingham
Neasden
Immingham
Neasden
Gorton
Immingham
Neasden
Immingham
Woodford Halse
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Gorton
Neasden
Immingham
Lincoln
Withdrawn
07/1920
11/08/1923
06/10/1925
27/11/1925
28/03/1927
15/12/1928
14/11/1931
03/06/1932
21/04/1933
06/12/1934
21/02/1935
07/12/1935
28/11/1938
25/07/1939
25/03/1942
21/11/1942
24/12/1944
16/04/1945
01/06/1947
31/12/1947
31/12/1947
B3/3 1166   6166 1483 1497 61497 08/1920 GOR
DON
KX
GOR
COP
KX
COP
KX
GOR
NEA
GOR
NEA
GOR
NEA
GOR
NEA
IMM
W
Gorton
Doncaster
Kings Cross
Gorton
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Kings Cross
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Kings Cross
Gorton
Neasden
Gorton
Neasden
Gorton
Neasden
Gorton
Neasden
Immingham
Withdrawn
08/1920
20/07/1923
26/07/1923
13/02/1924
30/06/1924
12/11/1924
04/10/1925
27/11/1925
12/02/1927
23/10/1927
09/10/1928
05/11/1928
11/03/1933
12/12/1935
08/10/1943
01/11/1945
14/07/1947
14/04/1949
14/04/1949
B3/2 1167 1167 6167 1484 1498   09/1920 GOR
KX
IMM
KX
COP
KX
GOR
NEA
IMM
NEA
GOR
IMM
NEA
IMM
W
Gorton
Kings Cross
Immingham
Kings Cross
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Kings Cross
Gorton
Neasden
Immingham
Neasden
Gorton
Immingham
Neasden
Immingham
Withdrawn
09/1920
02/08/1923
12/1923
05/08/1924
05/08/1925
12/12/1925
07/03/1927
14/06/1929
16/07/1931
16/12/1932
01/02/1935
01/03/1935
29/11/1938
26/06/1947
31/12/1947
31/12/1947
B3/2 1168   6168 1485 1499   10/1920 GOR
IMM
KX
COP
GOR
IMM
NEA
GOR
NEA
GOR
NEA
GOR
NEA
W
Gorton
Immingham
Kings Cross
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Gorton
Immingham
Neasden
Gorton
Neasden
Gorton
Neasden
Gorton
Neasden
Withdrawn
10/1920
04/1922
06/04/1924
27/04/1925
16/04/1927
14/05/1927
20/07/1928
14/06/1929
05/02/1930
21/02/1930
03/03/1930
21/03/1933
12/03/1936
28/09/1946
28/09/1946