GCR/LNER Robinson "B3" Class 4-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/1917 | To Service | 1169 | NEW | GOR | Gorton | ||
06/1920 | To Service | 1164 | NEW | GOR | Gorton | ||
07/1920 | To Service | 1165 | NEW | GOR | Gorton | ||
08/1920 | To Service | 1166 | NEW | GOR | Gorton | ||
09/1920 | To Service | 1167 | NEW | GOR | Gorton | ||
10/1920 | To Service | 1168 | NEW | GOR | Gorton | ||
22/10/1920 | Reallocation | 1164 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
04/1922 | Reallocation | 1168 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
01/1923 | Reallocation | 1169 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
20/07/1923 | Reallocation | 1166 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
26/07/1923 | Reallocation | 1166 | DON | Doncaster | KX | Kings Cross | |
08/1923 | Reallocation | 1169 | IMM | Immingham | KX | Kings Cross | |
02/08/1923 | Reallocation | 1167 | GOR | Gorton | KX | Kings Cross | |
11/08/1923 | Reallocation | 1165 | GOR | Gorton | KX | Kings Cross | |
11/1923 | Reallocation | 1169 | KX | Kings Cross | MEX | Mexborough | |
12/1923 | Reallocation | 1167 | KX | Kings Cross | IMM | Immingham | |
13/02/1924 | Reallocation | 1166 | KX | Kings Cross | GOR | Gorton | |
15/02/1924 | Reallocation | 1164 | IMM | Immingham | KX | Kings Cross | |
06/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6168 | IMM | Immingham | KX | Kings Cross | |
15/05/1924 | Reallocation | 1169 | MEX | Mexborough | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
30/06/1924 | Reallocation | 6166 | GOR | Gorton | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
05/08/1924 | Reallocation | 1164 | KX | Kings Cross | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
05/08/1924 | Reallocation | 6167 | IMM | Immingham | KX | Kings Cross | |
12/11/1924 | Reallocation | 6166 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | KX | Kings Cross | |
27/04/1925 | Reallocation | 6168 | KX | Kings Cross | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
23/07/1925 | Reallocation | 6164 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | KX | Kings Cross | |
05/08/1925 | Reallocation | 6167 | KX | Kings Cross | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
11/08/1925 | Reallocation | 6169 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | KX | Kings Cross | |
27/09/1925 | Reallocation | 6169 | KX | Kings Cross | GOR | Gorton | |
04/10/1925 | Reallocation | 6166 | KX | Kings Cross | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
05/10/1925 | Reallocation | 6164 | KX | Kings Cross | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
06/10/1925 | Reallocation | 6165 | KX | Kings Cross | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
10/10/1925 | Reallocation | 6169 | GOR | Gorton | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
08/11/1925 | Reallocation | 6164 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | KX | Kings Cross | |
27/11/1925 | Reallocation | 6165 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | KX | Kings Cross | |
27/11/1925 | Reallocation | 6166 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | KX | Kings Cross | |
12/12/1925 | Reallocation | 6169 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | KX | Kings Cross | |
12/12/1925 | Reallocation | 6167 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | KX | Kings Cross | |
02/1927 | Reallocation | 6169 | KX | Kings Cross | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
12/02/1927 | Reallocation | 6166 | KX | Kings Cross | GOR | Gorton | |
23/02/1927 | Reallocation | 6164 | KX | Kings Cross | GOR | Gorton | |
07/03/1927 | Reallocation | 6167 | KX | Kings Cross | GOR | Gorton | |
28/03/1927 | Reallocation | 6165 | KX | Kings Cross | GOR | Gorton | |
16/04/1927 | Reallocation | 6168 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | GOR | Gorton | |
21/04/1927 | Reallocation | 6169 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | GOR | Gorton | |
14/05/1927 | Reallocation | 6168 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
23/10/1927 | Reallocation | 6166 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
24/10/1927 | Reallocation | 6169 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
20/07/1928 | Reallocation | 6168 | IMM | Immingham | NEA | Neasden | |
09/10/1928 | Reallocation | 6166 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
05/11/1928 | Reallocation | 6166 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
07/11/1928 | Reallocation | 6169 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
12/12/1928 | Reallocation | 6164 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
15/12/1928 | Reallocation | 6165 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
02/03/1929 | Reallocation | 6169 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
14/06/1929 | Reallocation | 6167 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
14/06/1929 | Reallocation | 6168 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
05/02/1930 | Reallocation | 6168 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
21/02/1930 | Reallocation | 6168 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
03/03/1930 | Reallocation | 6168 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
15/05/1930 | Reallocation | 6169 | NEA | Neasden | IMM | Immingham | |
06/12/1930 | Reallocation | 6164 | IMM | Immingham | NEA | Neasden | |
16/07/1931 | Reallocation | 6167 | NEA | Neasden | IMM | Immingham | |
14/11/1931 | Reallocation | 6165 | IMM | Immingham | NEA | Neasden | |
03/06/1932 | Reallocation | 6165 | NEA | Neasden | IMM | Immingham | |
16/12/1932 | Reallocation | 6167 | IMM | Immingham | NEA | Neasden | |
11/03/1933 | Reallocation | 6166 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
20/03/1933 | Reallocation | 6169 | IMM | Immingham | NEA | Neasden | |
21/03/1933 | Reallocation | 6168 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
21/04/1933 | Reallocation | 6165 | IMM | Immingham | NEA | Neasden | |
17/06/1933 | Reallocation | 6169 | NEA | Neasden | IMM | Immingham | |
18/09/1933 | Reallocation | 6169 | IMM | Immingham | GOR | Gorton | |
05/12/1934 | Reallocation | 6164 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
06/12/1934 | Reallocation | 6165 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
01/02/1935 | Reallocation | 6167 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
21/02/1935 | Reallocation | 6165 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
01/03/1935 | Reallocation | 6167 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
13/04/1935 | Reallocation | 6164 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
07/12/1935 | Reallocation | 6165 | IMM | Immingham | NEA | Neasden | |
11/12/1935 | Reallocation | 6169 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
12/12/1935 | Reallocation | 6166 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
12/03/1936 | Reallocation | 6168 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
28/11/1938 | Reallocation | 6165 | NEA | Neasden | IMM | Immingham | |
29/11/1938 | Reallocation | 6167 | IMM | Immingham | NEA | Neasden | |
21/07/1939 | Reallocation | 6169 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
24/07/1939 | Reallocation | 6164 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
25/07/1939 | Reallocation | 6165 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
25/03/1942 | Reallocation | 6165 | WFD | Woodford Halse | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
03/04/1942 | Reallocation | 6164 | WFD | Woodford Halse | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
12/07/1942 | Reallocation | 6169 | WFD | Woodford Halse | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
19/07/1942 | Reallocation | 6164 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
21/11/1942 | Reallocation | 6164 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
21/11/1942 | Reallocation | 6165 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | GOR | Gorton | |
24/12/1942 | Reallocation | 6169 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | GOR | Gorton | |
13/02/1943 | Reallocation | 6164 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
08/10/1943 | Reallocation | 6166 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
24/12/1944 | Reallocation | 6169 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
24/12/1944 | Reallocation | 6165 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
16/04/1945 | Reallocation | 6169 | NEA | Neasden | IMM | Immingham | |
16/04/1945 | Reallocation | 6165 | NEA | Neasden | IMM | Immingham | |
01/11/1945 | Reallocation | 6166 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
28/09/1946 | Condemned | 1485 | NEA | Neasden | COND | ||
28/09/1946 | Condemned | 1499 | NEA | Neasden | COND | ||
01/06/1947 | Reallocation | 1494 | IMM | Immingham | LIN | Lincoln | |
01/06/1947 | Reallocation | 1496 | IMM | Immingham | LIN | Lincoln | |
26/06/1947 | Reallocation | 1498 | NEA | Neasden | IMM | Immingham | |
28/06/1947 | Reallocation | 1495 | NEA | Neasden | IMM | Immingham | |
14/07/1947 | Reallocation | 1497 | NEA | Neasden | IMM | Immingham | |
27/09/1947 | Condemned | 1495 | IMM | Immingham | COND | ||
06/12/1947 | Condemned | 1494 | LIN | Lincoln | COND | ||
31/12/1947 | Condemned | 1496 | LIN | Lincoln | COND | ||
31/12/1947 | Condemned | 1498 | IMM | Immingham | COND | ||
14/04/1949 | Condemned | 61497 | IMM | Immingham | COND |