Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 955 Today
» 1177 Yesterday
» 3261 Week
» 28095 Month
» 62427 Year
» 1727803 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "B3" Class 4-6-0


Class Number Built Name Name Date Notes Removed Date Withdrawn
B3 1169 11/1917 LORD FARINGDON 11/1917   06/12/1947
B3 1164 06/1920 EARL BEATTY 06/1920   27/09/1947
B3 1165 07/1920 VALOUR 07/1920   31/12/1947
B3 1166 08/1920 EARL HAIG 08/1920   09/10/1943 14/04/1949
B3 1167 09/1920 LLOYD GEORGE 09/1920   08/1923 31/12/1947
B3 1168 10/1920 LORD STUART OF WORTLEY 10/1920   28/09/1946