Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 61 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5592 Week
» 30426 Month
» 64758 Year
» 1730134 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "B3" Class 4-6-0


Company Old Number Company New Number Subtype Date Information
GCR 1169 renumbered to LNER 1169C 1924 Tmp   25/08/1923  
GCR 1167 renumbered to LNER 1167C 1924 Tmp m/e 09/1923  
GCR 1164 renumbered to LNER 1164C 1924 Tmp   15/12/1923  
GCR 1168 renumbered to LNER 6168 1924   01/03/1924  
GCR 1166 renumbered to LNER 6166 1924   07/06/1924  
LNER 1167C renumbered to LNER 6167 1924   05/07/1924  
GCR 1165 renumbered to LNER 6165 1924   31/01/1925  
LNER 1169C renumbered to LNER 6169 1924   27/06/1925  
LNER 1164C renumbered to LNER 6164 1924   11/07/1925  
LNER 6165 renumbered to LNER 1496 1946 2nd   01/09/1946  
LNER 6169 renumbered to LNER 1494 1946 2nd   01/09/1946  
LNER 6167 renumbered to LNER 1498 1946 2nd   21/09/1946  
LNER 6166 renumbered to LNER 1497 1946 2nd   28/09/1946  
LNER 6164 renumbered to LNER 1495 1946 2nd   07/10/1946  
LNER 1497 renumbered to BR 61497     24/04/1948