Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 68 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4414 Week
» 4414 Month
» 71276 Year
» 1736652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "B4" Class 4-6-0


Class GCR LNER (1923 Int) LNER (1924) LNER (1946 1st) LNER (1946 2nd) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
B4/2 1095   6095 1490     06/1906 SHF
MEX
DON
GOR
NWE
COP
NEA
IMM
MAR
LIN
IMM
LIN

GOR
LIN
LNG
DON
LNG
ARD
W
Sheffield Neepsend
Mexborough
Doncaster
Gorton
New England
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Neasden
Immingham
March
Lincoln
Immingham
Lincoln

Gorton (Re-instd)
Lincoln
Langwith Junction
Doncaster
Langwith Junction
Ardsley
Withdrawn
08/12/1922
01/1924
02/06/1924
19/02/1925
16/05/1925
19/01/1926
24/10/1932
15/12/1932
09/05/1933
09/1935
07/07/1937
02/09/1937
03/07/1939
28/10/1939
29/10/1939
16/08/1942
21/11/1942
29/11/1942
20/02/1943
10/02/1944
10/02/1944
B4/2 1096   6096 1491 1481   06/1906 SHF
NWE
COP
LIN
LNG
LIN
W
Sheffield Neepsend
New England
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Lincoln
Langwith Junction
Lincoln
Withdrawn
08/12/1922
29/05/1925
20/01/1926
08/07/1939
09/08/1942
16/08/1942
04/07/1947
04/07/1947
B4/2 1097   6097 1492 1482 61482 06/1906 SHF
MEX
DON
ARD
DON
MEX
COP
LIN
ARD
W
Sheffield Neepsend
Mexborough
Doncaster
Ardsley
Doncaster
Mexborough
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Lincoln
Ardsley
Withdrawn
27/10/1922
01/1924
28/03/1924
03/01/1925
23/09/1932
25/01/1933
08/03/1933
12/08/1939
11/07/1947
24/11/1950
24/11/1950
B4/2 1098   6098 1493 1483 61483 06/1906 SHF
MEX
DON
COP
ARD
COP
ARD
W
Sheffield Neepsend
Mexborough
Doncaster
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Withdrawn
06/10/1922
01/1924
02/06/1924
10/01/1925
25/01/1940
03/11/1946
16/02/1947
26/09/1949
26/09/1949
B4/2 1099   6099 1494 1484   06/1906 GOR
SHF
NWE
ARD
COP
GOR
ARD
DON
COP
BFD
ARD
W
Gorton
Sheffield Neepsend
New England
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Gorton
Ardsley
Doncaster
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
Withdrawn
30/09/1921
01/1925
30/05/1925
02/01/1926
01/1935
25/01/1940
27/04/1940
21/11/1942
25/06/1945
02/12/1945
19/05/1946
20/11/1947
20/11/1947
B4/2 1100   6100 1495 1485 61485 06/1906 SHF
MAR
MEX
DON
COP
ARD
COP
ARD
W
Sheffield Neepsend
March
Mexborough
Doncaster
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Withdrawn
08/12/1922
04/06/1923
10/1923
02/06/1924
19/11/1924
25/01/1940
19/10/1941
06/09/1942
04/06/1949
04/06/1949
B4/1 1101   6101 1496 1486   06/1906 SHF
MAR
MEX
DON
GOR
COP
IMM
COP
ARD
BFD
COP
ARD
BFD
ARD
BFD
ARD
W
Sheffield Neepsend
March
Mexborough
Doncaster
Gorton
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Immingham
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
Withdrawn
19/05/1922
06/1923
10/1923
22/03/1924
23/04/1925
29/05/1925
18/03/1933
24/08/1933
25/01/1940
11/07/1941
10/12/1942
28/03/1943
30/06/1943
07/07/1943
02/12/1945
19/05/1946
07/10/1947
07/10/1947
B4/4 102   6102 1497 1487   06/1906 SHF
MAR
SHF
NWE
COP
GOR
ARD
BFD
ARD
W
Sheffield Neepsend
March
Sheffield Neepsend
New England
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Gorton
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
Withdrawn
19/05/1922
06/1923
01/1925
27/04/1925
26/10/1925
25/01/1940
28/02/1940
02/12/1945
19/05/1946
10/12/1947
10/12/1947
B4/2 1103 1103 6103 1498 1488 61488 07/1906 SHF
COP
DON
MEX
IMM
MAR
LIN
RET
LIN
DON
COP
ARD
W
Sheffield Neepsend
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Doncaster
Mexborough
Immingham
March
Lincoln
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Lincoln
Doncaster
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Withdrawn
19/05/1922
27/05/1925
21/09/1932
30/01/1933
16/03/1933
03/06/1933
08/07/1935
26/06/1939
15/03/1940
29/11/1942
25/06/1945
16/02/1947
07/10/1948
07/10/1948
B4/1 1104   6104 1499 1489   07/1906 SHF
MAR
MEX
SHF
COP
MAR
LIN
IMM
LIN
W
Sheffield Neepsend
March
Mexborough
Sheffield Neepsend
Copley Hill (Leeds)
March
Lincoln
Immingham
Lincoln
Withdrawn
15/04/1922
06/1923
10/1923
12/08/1924
27/05/1925
09/05/1933
03/10/1935
06/07/1937
03/09/1937
04/07/1947
04/07/1947