Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 765 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 765 Week
» 19666 Month
» 19666 Year
» 1685042 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "B4" Class 4-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
30/09/1921 Reallocation 1099     GOR Gorton  
15/04/1922 Reallocation 1104     SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
19/05/1922 Reallocation 1101     SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
19/05/1922 Reallocation 102     SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
19/05/1922 Reallocation 1103     SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
06/10/1922 Reallocation 1098     SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
27/10/1922 Reallocation 1097     SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
08/12/1922 Reallocation 1095     SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
08/12/1922 Reallocation 1096     SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
08/12/1922 Reallocation 1100     SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
06/1923 Reallocation 1101 SHF Sheffield Neepsend MAR March  
06/1923 Reallocation 102 SHF Sheffield Neepsend MAR March  
06/1923 Reallocation 1104 SHF Sheffield Neepsend MAR March  
04/06/1923 Reallocation 1100 SHF Sheffield Neepsend MAR March  
10/1923 Reallocation 1100 MAR March MEX Mexborough  
10/1923 Reallocation 1101 MAR March MEX Mexborough  
10/1923 Reallocation 1104 MAR March MEX Mexborough  
01/1924 Reallocation 1095 SHF Sheffield Neepsend MEX Mexborough  
01/1924 Reallocation 1097 SHF Sheffield Neepsend MEX Mexborough  
01/1924 Reallocation 1098 SHF Sheffield Neepsend MEX Mexborough  
22/03/1924 Reallocation 1101 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
28/03/1924 Reallocation 1097 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
02/06/1924 Reallocation 1095 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
02/06/1924 Reallocation 1098 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
02/06/1924 Reallocation 1100 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
12/08/1924 Reallocation 6104 MEX Mexborough SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
19/11/1924 Reallocation 6100 DON Doncaster COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
01/1925 Reallocation 6099 GOR Gorton SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
01/1925 Reallocation 102 MAR March SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
03/01/1925 Reallocation 6097 DON Doncaster ARD Ardsley  
10/01/1925 Reallocation 6098 DON Doncaster COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
19/02/1925 Reallocation 1095 DON Doncaster GOR Gorton  
23/04/1925 Reallocation 1101 DON Doncaster GOR Gorton  
27/04/1925 Reallocation 6102 SHF Sheffield Neepsend NWE New England  
16/05/1925 Reallocation 6095 GOR Gorton NWE New England  
27/05/1925 Reallocation 6103 SHF Sheffield Neepsend COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
27/05/1925 Reallocation 6104 SHF Sheffield Neepsend COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
29/05/1925 Reallocation 6096 SHF Sheffield Neepsend NWE New England  
29/05/1925 Reallocation 6101 GOR Gorton COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
30/05/1925 Reallocation 6099 SHF Sheffield Neepsend NWE New England  
26/10/1925 Reallocation 6102 NWE New England COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
02/01/1926 Reallocation 6099 NWE New England ARD Ardsley  
19/01/1926 Reallocation 6095 NWE New England COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
20/01/1926 Reallocation 6096 NWE New England COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
21/09/1932 Reallocation 6103 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) DON Doncaster  
23/09/1932 Reallocation 6097 ARD Ardsley DON Doncaster  
24/10/1932 Reallocation 6095 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) NEA Neasden  
15/12/1932 Reallocation 6095 NEA Neasden IMM Immingham  
25/01/1933 Reallocation 6097 DON Doncaster MEX Mexborough  
30/01/1933 Reallocation 6103 DON Doncaster MEX Mexborough  
08/03/1933 Reallocation 6097 MEX Mexborough COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
16/03/1933 Reallocation 6103 MEX Mexborough IMM Immingham  
18/03/1933 Reallocation 6101 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) IMM Immingham  
09/05/1933 Reallocation 6095 IMM Immingham MAR March  
09/05/1933 Reallocation 6104 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) MAR March  
03/06/1933 Reallocation 6103 IMM Immingham MAR March  
24/08/1933 Reallocation 6101 IMM Immingham COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
01/1935 Reallocation 6099 ARD Ardsley COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
08/07/1935 Reallocation 6103 MAR March LIN Lincoln  
09/1935 Reallocation 6095 MAR March LIN Lincoln  
03/10/1935 Reallocation 6104 MAR March LIN Lincoln  
06/07/1937 Reallocation 6104 LIN Lincoln IMM Immingham  
07/07/1937 Reallocation 6095 LIN Lincoln IMM Immingham  
02/09/1937 Reallocation 6095 IMM Immingham LIN Lincoln  
03/09/1937 Reallocation 6104 IMM Immingham LIN Lincoln  
26/06/1939 Reallocation 6103 LIN Lincoln RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
08/07/1939 Reallocation 6096 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) LIN Lincoln  
12/08/1939 Reallocation 6097 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) LIN Lincoln  
28/10/1939 Reallocation 6095 98W   GOR Gorton  
29/10/1939 Reallocation 6095 GOR Gorton LIN Lincoln  
25/01/1940 Reallocation 6098 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) ARD Ardsley  
25/01/1940 Reallocation 6099 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) GOR Gorton  
25/01/1940 Reallocation 6100 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) ARD Ardsley  
25/01/1940 Reallocation 6101 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) ARD Ardsley  
25/01/1940 Reallocation 6102 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) GOR Gorton  
28/02/1940 Reallocation 6102 GOR Gorton ARD Ardsley  
15/03/1940 Reallocation 6103 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) LIN Lincoln  
27/04/1940 Reallocation 6099 GOR Gorton ARD Ardsley  
11/07/1941 Reallocation 6101 ARD Ardsley BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
19/10/1941 Reallocation 6100 ARD Ardsley COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
09/08/1942 Reallocation 6096 LIN Lincoln LNG Langwith Junction  
16/08/1942 Reallocation 6095 LIN Lincoln LNG Langwith Junction  
16/08/1942 Reallocation 6096 LNG Langwith Junction LIN Lincoln  
06/09/1942 Reallocation 6100 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) ARD Ardsley  
21/11/1942 Reallocation 6095 LNG Langwith Junction DON Doncaster  
21/11/1942 Reallocation 6099 ARD Ardsley DON Doncaster  
29/11/1942 Reallocation 6095 DON Doncaster LNG Langwith Junction  
29/11/1942 Reallocation 6103 LIN Lincoln DON Doncaster  
10/12/1942 Reallocation 6101 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
20/02/1943 Reallocation 6095 LNG Langwith Junction ARD Ardsley  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 6101 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) ARD Ardsley  
30/06/1943 Reallocation 6101 ARD Ardsley BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
07/07/1943 Reallocation 6101 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street ARD Ardsley  
10/02/1944 Condemned 6095 ARD Ardsley   COND  
25/06/1945 Reallocation 6099 DON Doncaster COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
25/06/1945 Reallocation 6103 DON Doncaster COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
02/12/1945 Reallocation 6099 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
02/12/1945 Reallocation 6101 ARD Ardsley BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
02/12/1945 Reallocation 6102 ARD Ardsley BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
19/05/1946 Reallocation 1494 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street ARD Ardsley  
19/05/1946 Reallocation 1496 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street ARD Ardsley  
19/05/1946 Reallocation 1497 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street ARD Ardsley  
03/11/1946 Reallocation 1493 ARD Ardsley COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
16/02/1947 Reallocation 1483 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) ARD Ardsley  
16/02/1947 Reallocation 1488 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) ARD Ardsley  
04/07/1947 Condemned 1481 LIN Lincoln   COND  
04/07/1947 Condemned 1489 LIN Lincoln   COND  
11/07/1947 Reallocation 1482 LIN Lincoln ARD Ardsley  
07/10/1947 Condemned 1486 ARD Ardsley   COND  
20/11/1947 Condemned 1484 ARD Ardsley   COND  
10/12/1947 Condemned 1487 ARD Ardsley   COND  
07/10/1948 Condemned 61488 ARD Ardsley   COND  
04/06/1949 Condemned 61485 ARD Ardsley   COND  
26/09/1949 Condemned 61483 ARD Ardsley   COND  
24/11/1950 Condemned 61482 ARD Ardsley   COND