Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 680 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 680 Week
» 19581 Month
» 19581 Year
» 1684957 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "B4" Class 4-6-0


GCR LNER (1923 Int) LNER (1924) LNER (1946 1st) LNER (1946 2nd) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
1096 6096 1491 1481 06/1906 04/07/1947 Lincoln 41.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1097 6097 1492 1482 61482 06/1906 24/11/1950 Ardsley 44.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 01/1951 44.62 IMMINGHAM
1099 6099 1494 1484 06/1906 20/11/1947 Ardsley 41.42 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
102 6102 1497 1487 06/1906 10/12/1947 Ardsley 41.5 Cut Carriage Works (Dukinfield)