Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 783 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 783 Week
» 19684 Month
» 19684 Year
» 1685060 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "B4" Class 4-6-0


Company Old Number Company New Number Subtype Date Information
GCR 1103 renumbered to LNER 1103C 1923 Int   04/08/1923  
GCR 1096 renumbered to LNER 6096 1924   26/04/1924  
GCR 1099 renumbered to LNER 6099 1924   26/04/1924  
GCR 1104 renumbered to LNER 6104 1924   26/07/1924  
GCR 1100 renumbered to LNER 6100 1924   08/11/1924  
LNER 1103C renumbered to LNER 6103 1924   29/11/1924  
GCR 1097 renumbered to LNER 6097 1924   27/12/1924  
GCR 1098 renumbered to LNER 6098 1924   03/01/1925  
GCR 102 renumbered to LNER 6102 1924   07/02/1925  
GCR 1095 renumbered to LNER 6095 1924   21/02/1925  
GCR 1101 renumbered to LNER 6101 1924   25/04/1925  
LNER 6099 renumbered to LNER 1484 1946 2nd   31/08/1946  
LNER 6096 renumbered to LNER 1481 1946 2nd   07/09/1946  
LNER 6100 renumbered to LNER 1485 1946 2nd   22/09/1946  
LNER 6103 renumbered to LNER 1488 1946 2nd   17/11/1946  
LNER 6101 renumbered to LNER 1486 1946 2nd   01/12/1946  
LNER 6097 renumbered to LNER 1482 1946 2nd   12/01/1947  
LNER 6098 renumbered to LNER 1483 1946 2nd   12/01/1947  
LNER 6102 renumbered to LNER 1487 1946 2nd   12/01/1947  
LNER 6104 renumbered to LNER 1489 1946 2nd   12/01/1947