GCR/LNER Robinson "B8" Class 4-6-0
Class | GCR | LNER (1923 Int) | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946 1st) | LNER (1946 2nd) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
B8 | 4 | 5004 | 1331 | 1349 | 06/1913 | ANN MAR GOR CLK ANN CLK ANN SHF W |
Annesley March Gorton Colwick Annesley Colwick Annesley Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
03/02/1922 01/08/1925 29/05/1926 09/06/1926 08/11/1926 16/01/1928 15/08/1943 27/04/1947 28/11/1947 |
28/11/1947 | ||
B8 | 439 | 439 | 5439 | 1332 | 1350 | 07/1914 | GOR CLK ANN SHF W |
Gorton Colwick Annesley Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
29/09/1922 29/03/1926 10/08/1943 27/04/1947 14/08/1947 |
14/08/1947 | |
B8 | 440 | 5440 | 1333 | 1351 | 08/1914 | ANN LEI ANN MAR GOR CLK ANN SHF W |
Annesley Leicester (G.C.) Annesley March Gorton Colwick Annesley Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
17/02/1922 19/07/1924 14/11/1924 25/07/1925 21/05/1926 12/10/1927 04/01/1933 27/04/1947 23/10/1947 |
23/10/1947 | ||
B8 | 441 | 441 | 5441 | 1334 | 1352 | 09/1914 | ANN MAR ANN GOR CLK ANN W |
Annesley March Annesley Gorton Colwick Annesley Withdrawn |
06/10/1922 03/11/1923 25/06/1924 09/06/1925 27/03/1926 09/08/1943 06/05/1947 |
06/05/1947 | |
B8 | 442 | 5442 | 1335 | 1353 | 61353 | 09/1914 | GOR MAR GOR CLK ANN SHF W |
Gorton March Gorton Colwick Annesley Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
27/11/1922 10/10/1924 22/05/1926 09/07/1926 15/10/1928 27/04/1947 24/03/1949 |
24/03/1949 | |
B8 | 443 | 5443 | 1336 | 1354 | 61354 | 10/1914 | GOR MAR GOR ANN CLK ANN SHF W |
Gorton March Gorton Annesley Colwick Annesley Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
24/02/1922 03/11/1923 13/10/1924 24/01/1925 27/03/1926 09/08/1943 27/04/1947 15/03/1948 |
15/03/1948 | |
B8 | 444 | 444 | 5444 | 1337 | 1355 | 61355 | 10/1914 | GOR MAR GOR MAR GOR CLK ANN CLK ANN SHF W |
Gorton March Gorton March Gorton Colwick Annesley Colwick Annesley Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
24/02/1922 03/11/1923 13/10/1924 08/06/1925 16/06/1926 16/06/1927 12/10/1927 02/04/1928 15/06/1943 27/04/1947 02/09/1948 |
02/09/1948 |
B8 | 445 | 5445 | 1338 | 1356 | 11/1914 | GOR MAR GOR WFD MAR CLK ANN SHF W |
Gorton March Gorton Woodford Halse March Colwick Annesley Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
22/07/1921 10/10/1924 20/05/1926 08/06/1928 13/07/1928 14/11/1928 15/08/1943 27/04/1947 14/08/1947 |
14/08/1947 | ||
B8 | 446 | 5446 | 1339 | 1357 | 61357 | 11/1914 | ANN MAR GOR LEI GOR CLK ANN SHF W |
Annesley March Gorton Leicester (G.C.) Gorton Colwick Annesley Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
03/02/1922 03/11/1923 06/12/1924 02/03/1925 08/06/1925 29/03/1926 06/06/1926 05/05/1947 23/04/1949 |
23/04/1949 | |
B8 | 279 | 279 | 5279 | 1340 | 1358 | 61358 | 12/1914 | ANN LEI ANN GOR CLK ANN CLK ANN SHF W |
Annesley Leicester (G.C.) Annesley Gorton Colwick Annesley Colwick Annesley Sheffield Darnall Withdrawn |
03/02/1922 19/07/1924 06/10/1924 08/06/1925 31/03/1926 08/11/1926 06/03/1928 09/10/1933 27/04/1947 13/08/1948 |
13/08/1948 |
B8 | 280 | 5280 | 1341 | 1359 | 01/1915 | GOR MAR GOR CLK ANN CLK WFD MAR ANN W |
Gorton March Gorton Colwick Annesley Colwick Woodford Halse March Annesley Withdrawn |
17/12/1922 04/10/1924 21/05/1926 10/06/1926 31/03/1927 02/04/1928 08/06/1928 13/07/1928 17/11/1928 25/03/1947 |
25/03/1947 |