Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 144 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2309 Week
» 2309 Month
» 69171 Year
» 1734547 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "B8" Class 4-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
22/07/1921 Reallocation 445     GOR Gorton  
03/02/1922 Reallocation 4     ANN Annesley  
03/02/1922 Reallocation 446     ANN Annesley  
03/02/1922 Reallocation 279     ANN Annesley  
17/02/1922 Reallocation 440     ANN Annesley  
24/02/1922 Reallocation 443     GOR Gorton  
24/02/1922 Reallocation 444     GOR Gorton  
29/09/1922 Reallocation 439     GOR Gorton  
06/10/1922 Reallocation 441     ANN Annesley  
27/11/1922 Reallocation 442     GOR Gorton  
17/12/1922 Reallocation 280     GOR Gorton  
03/11/1923 Reallocation 441 ANN Annesley MAR March  
03/11/1923 Reallocation 443 GOR Gorton MAR March  
03/11/1923 Reallocation 444 GOR Gorton MAR March  
03/11/1923 Reallocation 446 ANN Annesley MAR March  
25/06/1924 Reallocation 441 MAR March ANN Annesley  
19/07/1924 Reallocation 440 ANN Annesley LEI Leicester (G.C.)  
19/07/1924 Reallocation 279 ANN Annesley LEI Leicester (G.C.)  
04/10/1924 Reallocation 5280 GOR Gorton MAR March  
06/10/1924 Reallocation 279 LEI Leicester (G.C.) ANN Annesley  
10/10/1924 Reallocation 5442 GOR Gorton MAR March  
10/10/1924 Reallocation 5445 GOR Gorton MAR March  
13/10/1924 Reallocation 443 MAR March GOR Gorton  
13/10/1924 Reallocation 444 MAR March GOR Gorton  
14/11/1924 Reallocation 440 LEI Leicester (G.C.) ANN Annesley  
06/12/1924 Reallocation 5446 MAR March GOR Gorton  
24/01/1925 Reallocation 5443 GOR Gorton ANN Annesley  
02/03/1925 Reallocation 5446 GOR Gorton LEI Leicester (G.C.)  
08/06/1925 Reallocation 5444 GOR Gorton MAR March  
08/06/1925 Reallocation 5446 LEI Leicester (G.C.) GOR Gorton  
08/06/1925 Reallocation 279 ANN Annesley GOR Gorton  
09/06/1925 Reallocation 441 ANN Annesley GOR Gorton  
25/07/1925 Reallocation 5440 ANN Annesley MAR March  
01/08/1925 Reallocation 5004 ANN Annesley MAR March  
27/03/1926 Reallocation 5441 GOR Gorton CLK Colwick  
27/03/1926 Reallocation 5443 ANN Annesley CLK Colwick  
29/03/1926 Reallocation 5439 GOR Gorton CLK Colwick  
29/03/1926 Reallocation 5446 GOR Gorton CLK Colwick  
31/03/1926 Reallocation 5279 GOR Gorton CLK Colwick  
20/05/1926 Reallocation 5445 MAR March GOR Gorton  
21/05/1926 Reallocation 5440 MAR March GOR Gorton  
21/05/1926 Reallocation 5280 MAR March GOR Gorton  
22/05/1926 Reallocation 5442 MAR March GOR Gorton  
29/05/1926 Reallocation 5004 MAR March GOR Gorton  
06/06/1926 Reallocation 5446 CLK Colwick ANN Annesley  
09/06/1926 Reallocation 5004 GOR Gorton CLK Colwick  
10/06/1926 Reallocation 5280 GOR Gorton CLK Colwick  
16/06/1926 Reallocation 5444 MAR March GOR Gorton  
09/07/1926 Reallocation 5442 GOR Gorton CLK Colwick  
08/11/1926 Reallocation 5004 CLK Colwick ANN Annesley  
08/11/1926 Reallocation 5279 CLK Colwick ANN Annesley  
31/03/1927 Reallocation 5280 CLK Colwick ANN Annesley  
16/06/1927 Reallocation 5444 GOR Gorton CLK Colwick  
12/10/1927 Reallocation 5440 GOR Gorton CLK Colwick  
12/10/1927 Reallocation 5444 CLK Colwick ANN Annesley  
16/01/1928 Reallocation 5004 ANN Annesley CLK Colwick  
06/03/1928 Reallocation 5279 ANN Annesley CLK Colwick  
02/04/1928 Reallocation 5444 ANN Annesley CLK Colwick  
02/04/1928 Reallocation 5280 ANN Annesley CLK Colwick  
08/06/1928 Reallocation 5445 GOR Gorton WFD Woodford Halse  
08/06/1928 Reallocation 5280 CLK Colwick WFD Woodford Halse  
13/07/1928 Reallocation 5445 WFD Woodford Halse MAR March  
13/07/1928 Reallocation 5280 WFD Woodford Halse MAR March  
15/10/1928 Reallocation 5442 CLK Colwick ANN Annesley  
14/11/1928 Reallocation 5445 MAR March CLK Colwick  
17/11/1928 Reallocation 5280 MAR March ANN Annesley  
04/01/1933 Reallocation 5440 CLK Colwick ANN Annesley  
09/10/1933 Reallocation 5279 CLK Colwick ANN Annesley  
15/06/1943 Reallocation 5444 CLK Colwick ANN Annesley  
09/08/1943 Reallocation 5441 CLK Colwick ANN Annesley  
09/08/1943 Reallocation 5443 CLK Colwick ANN Annesley  
10/08/1943 Reallocation 5439 CLK Colwick ANN Annesley  
15/08/1943 Reallocation 5004 CLK Colwick ANN Annesley  
15/08/1943 Reallocation 5445 CLK Colwick ANN Annesley  
25/03/1947 Condemned 1359 ANN Annesley   COND  
27/04/1947 Reallocation 1349 ANN Annesley SHF Sheffield Darnall  
27/04/1947 Reallocation 1350 ANN Annesley SHF Sheffield Darnall  
27/04/1947 Reallocation 1351 ANN Annesley SHF Sheffield Darnall  
27/04/1947 Reallocation 1353 ANN Annesley SHF Sheffield Darnall  
27/04/1947 Reallocation 1354 ANN Annesley SHF Sheffield Darnall  
27/04/1947 Reallocation 1355 ANN Annesley SHF Sheffield Darnall  
27/04/1947 Reallocation 1356 ANN Annesley SHF Sheffield Darnall  
27/04/1947 Reallocation 1358 ANN Annesley SHF Sheffield Darnall  
05/05/1947 Reallocation 1357 ANN Annesley SHF Sheffield Darnall  
06/05/1947 Condemned 1352 ANN Annesley   COND  
14/08/1947 Condemned 1350 SHF Sheffield Darnall   COND  
14/08/1947 Condemned 1356 SHF Sheffield Darnall   COND  
23/10/1947 Condemned 1351 SHF Sheffield Darnall   COND  
28/11/1947 Condemned 1349 SHF Sheffield Darnall   COND  
15/03/1948 Condemned 61354 SHF Sheffield Darnall   COND  
13/08/1948 Condemned 61358 SHF Sheffield Darnall   COND  
02/09/1948 Condemned 61355 SHF Sheffield Darnall   COND  
24/03/1949 Condemned 61353 SHF Sheffield Darnall   COND  
23/04/1949 Condemned 61357 SHF Sheffield Darnall   COND