Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 130 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4622 Week
» 29456 Month
» 63788 Year
» 1729164 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "B8" Class 4-6-0


Class Number Built Name Name Date Notes Removed Date Withdrawn
B8 4 06/1913 GLENALMOND 06/1913   28/11/1947
B8 439 07/1914 SUTTON NELTHORPE 07/1914   14/08/1947
B8 446 11/1914 EARL ROBERTS OF KANDAHAR 11/1914   23/04/1949
B8 279 12/1914 EARL KITCHENER OF KHARTOUM 12/1914   13/08/1948