Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 533 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 533 Week
» 27154 Month
» 27154 Year
» 1692530 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "B9" Class 4-6-0


Class GCR LNER (1923 Int) LNER (1924) LNER (1946 1st) LNER (1946 2nd) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
B9 1105   6105 1342 1469 61469 09/1906 LIN
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
19D
TFD
19D
W
Lincoln
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Heaton Mersey
Trafford Park (LNER)
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
05/1919
08/10/1925
24/11/1927
19/03/1930
04/06/1930
30/05/1932
04/03/1933
13/07/1934
17/03/1937
05/08/1938
30/09/1938
11/10/1941
22/04/1945
06/05/1945
02/04/1949
02/04/1949
B9 1106   6106 1343 1470 61470 09/1906 GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
LIV
W
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Brunswick
Withdrawn
19/08/1921
07/06/1926
08/08/1928
27/08/1928
04/06/1930
09/09/1930
29/08/1932
27/10/1932
11/10/1933
17/06/1935
19/01/1937
13/10/1937
27/09/1939
06/04/1941
21/09/1941
11/03/1945
19/11/1948
19/11/1948
B9 1107 1107 6107 1344 1471   09/1906 LIN
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
19D
W
Lincoln
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
19/05/1922
20/04/1925
18/03/1930
09/09/1930
06/01/1932
14/07/1933
19/06/1936
13/10/1937
06/04/1941
21/09/1941
08/11/1941
20/11/1947
20/11/1947
B9 1108   6108 1345 1472   09/1906 LIN
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
W
Lincoln
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Withdrawn
19/05/1922
10/02/1927
08/08/1928
24/08/1928
24/11/1930
11/07/1932
29/08/1932
27/10/1932
03/11/1932
02/02/1935
19/07/1935
01/09/1936
04/03/1937
02/06/1947
02/06/1947
B9 1109   6109 1346 1473   09/1906 GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
W
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Withdrawn
19/08/1921
15/04/1929
25/10/1929
11/07/1932
23/03/1934
21/06/1941
31/12/1947
31/12/1947
B9 1110   6110 1347 1474   10/1906 GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
W
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Withdrawn
19/08/1921
01/1929
15/04/1929
13/08/1929
06/01/1932
30/04/1932
03/11/1932
23/03/1934
01/04/1936
27/09/1939
21/09/1941
22/03/1942
07/10/1947
07/10/1947
B9 1111   6111 1348 1475 61475 10/1906 LIN
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR

GOR
19D
GOR
LIV
19D
W
Lincoln
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton

Gorton (Re-instd)
Heaton Mersey
Gorton
Brunswick
Heaton Mersey
Withdrawn
10/1916
12/11/1926
28/11/1927
13/08/1929
25/10/1929
30/04/1932
02/02/1935
19/06/1936
05/08/1938
30/09/1938
07/07/1939
11/09/1939
07/12/1939
08/11/1941
09/05/1943
18/07/1943
16/05/1949
16/05/1949
B9 1112   6112 1349 1476 61476 10/1906 LIN
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
LIV
GOR
TFD
W
Lincoln
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Brunswick
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Withdrawn
04/1922
26/05/1927
28/05/1932
04/03/1933
31/05/1940
06/11/1942
27/06/1943
31/07/1943
13/08/1944
19/08/1948
19/08/1948
B9 1113   6113 1350 1477   10/1906 GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
W
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Withdrawn
19/08/1921
14/07/1933
19/07/1935
31/03/1936
04/03/1937
13/04/1940
25/08/1947
25/08/1947
B9 1114   6114 1351 1478   10/1906 GOR
TFD
GOR
TFD
GOR
LIV
W
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Gorton
Brunswick
Withdrawn
10/02/1920
18/07/1934
17/06/1935
13/04/1940
06/11/1942
26/08/1945
10/12/1947
10/12/1947