Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 585 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 5056 Week
» 16102 Month
» 16102 Year
» 1681478 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "B9" Class 4-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
10/1916 Reallocation 1111     LIN Lincoln  
05/1919 Reallocation 1105     LIN Lincoln  
10/02/1920 Reallocation 1114     GOR Gorton  
19/08/1921 Reallocation 1106     GOR Gorton  
19/08/1921 Reallocation 1109     GOR Gorton  
19/08/1921 Reallocation 1110     GOR Gorton  
19/08/1921 Reallocation 1113     GOR Gorton  
04/1922 Reallocation 1112     LIN Lincoln  
19/05/1922 Reallocation 1107     LIN Lincoln  
19/05/1922 Reallocation 1108     LIN Lincoln  
20/04/1925 Reallocation 1107 LIN Lincoln GOR Gorton  
08/10/1925 Reallocation 6105 LIN Lincoln GOR Gorton  
07/06/1926 Reallocation 6106 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
12/11/1926 Reallocation 6111 LIN Lincoln GOR Gorton  
10/02/1927 Reallocation 6108 LIN Lincoln GOR Gorton  
26/05/1927 Reallocation 6112 LIN Lincoln GOR Gorton  
24/11/1927 Reallocation 6105 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
28/11/1927 Reallocation 6111 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
08/08/1928 Reallocation 6106 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
08/08/1928 Reallocation 6108 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
24/08/1928 Reallocation 6108 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
27/08/1928 Reallocation 6106 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
01/1929 Reallocation 6110 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
15/04/1929 Reallocation 6109 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
15/04/1929 Reallocation 6110 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
13/08/1929 Reallocation 6110 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
13/08/1929 Reallocation 6111 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
25/10/1929 Reallocation 6109 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
25/10/1929 Reallocation 6111 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
18/03/1930 Reallocation 6107 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
19/03/1930 Reallocation 6105 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
04/06/1930 Reallocation 6105 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
04/06/1930 Reallocation 6106 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
09/09/1930 Reallocation 6106 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
09/09/1930 Reallocation 6107 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
24/11/1930 Reallocation 6108 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
06/01/1932 Reallocation 6107 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
06/01/1932 Reallocation 6110 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
30/04/1932 Reallocation 6110 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
30/04/1932 Reallocation 6111 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
28/05/1932 Reallocation 6112 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
30/05/1932 Reallocation 6105 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
11/07/1932 Reallocation 6108 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
11/07/1932 Reallocation 6109 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
29/08/1932 Reallocation 6106 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
29/08/1932 Reallocation 6108 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
27/10/1932 Reallocation 6106 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
27/10/1932 Reallocation 6108 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
03/11/1932 Reallocation 6108 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
03/11/1932 Reallocation 6110 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
04/03/1933 Reallocation 6105 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
04/03/1933 Reallocation 6112 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
14/07/1933 Reallocation 6107 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
14/07/1933 Reallocation 6113 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
11/10/1933 Reallocation 6106 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
23/03/1934 Reallocation 6109 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
23/03/1934 Reallocation 6110 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
13/07/1934 Reallocation 6105 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
18/07/1934 Reallocation 6114 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
02/02/1935 Reallocation 6108 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
02/02/1935 Reallocation 6111 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
17/06/1935 Reallocation 6106 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
17/06/1935 Reallocation 6114 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
19/07/1935 Reallocation 6108 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
19/07/1935 Reallocation 6113 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
31/03/1936 Reallocation 6113 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
01/04/1936 Reallocation 6110 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
19/06/1936 Reallocation 6107 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
19/06/1936 Reallocation 6111 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
01/09/1936 Reallocation 6108 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
19/01/1937 Reallocation 6106 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
04/03/1937 Reallocation 6108 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
04/03/1937 Reallocation 6113 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
17/03/1937 Reallocation 6105 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
13/10/1937 Reallocation 6106 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
13/10/1937 Reallocation 6107 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
05/08/1938 Reallocation 6105 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
05/08/1938 Reallocation 6111 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
30/09/1938 Reallocation 6105 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
30/09/1938 Reallocation 6111 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
11/09/1939 Reallocation 6111 98W   GOR Gorton  
27/09/1939 Reallocation 6106 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
27/09/1939 Reallocation 6110 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
07/12/1939 Reallocation 6111 GOR Gorton 19D Heaton Mersey  
13/04/1940 Reallocation 6113 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
13/04/1940 Reallocation 6114 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
31/05/1940 Reallocation 6112 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
06/04/1941 Reallocation 6106 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
06/04/1941 Reallocation 6107 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
21/06/1941 Reallocation 6109 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
21/09/1941 Reallocation 6106 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
21/09/1941 Reallocation 6107 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
21/09/1941 Reallocation 6110 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
11/10/1941 Reallocation 6105 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) 19D Heaton Mersey  
08/11/1941 Reallocation 6107 GOR Gorton 19D Heaton Mersey  
08/11/1941 Reallocation 6111 19D Heaton Mersey GOR Gorton  
22/03/1942 Reallocation 6110 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
06/11/1942 Reallocation 6112 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
06/11/1942 Reallocation 6114 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) GOR Gorton  
09/05/1943 Reallocation 6111 GOR Gorton LIV Brunswick  
27/06/1943 Reallocation 6112 GOR Gorton LIV Brunswick  
18/07/1943 Reallocation 6111 LIV Brunswick 19D Heaton Mersey  
31/07/1943 Reallocation 6112 LIV Brunswick GOR Gorton  
13/08/1944 Reallocation 6112 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
11/03/1945 Reallocation 6106 GOR Gorton LIV Brunswick  
22/04/1945 Reallocation 6105 19D Heaton Mersey TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
06/05/1945 Reallocation 6105 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) 19D Heaton Mersey  
26/08/1945 Reallocation 6114 GOR Gorton LIV Brunswick  
02/06/1947 Condemned 1472 TFD Trafford Park (LNER)   COND  
25/08/1947 Condemned 1477 TFD Trafford Park (LNER)   COND  
07/10/1947 Condemned 1474 TFD Trafford Park (LNER)   COND  
20/11/1947 Condemned 1471 19D Heaton Mersey   COND  
10/12/1947 Condemned 1478 LIV Brunswick   COND  
31/12/1947 Condemned 1473 TFD Trafford Park (LNER)   COND  
19/08/1948 Condemned 61476 TFD Trafford Park (LNER)   COND  
19/11/1948 Condemned 61470 LIV Brunswick   COND  
02/04/1949 Condemned 61469 19D Heaton Mersey   COND  
16/05/1949 Condemned 61475 19D Heaton Mersey   COND