NER/LNER Raven "B16" Class 4-6-0
NER | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR (Interim) | BR | BR (Orig) | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
843 | 1403 | 61472 | 61403 | 12/1919 | Heaton | 20/04/1964 | Hull Dairycoates | 44.33 | Cut | Drapers (Hull) | 09/11/1964 | 44.93 | ||
847 | 1407 | 61476 | 61407 | 03/1920 | York (North) | 16/09/1963 | Mirfield | 43.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Darlington) | 12/1963 | 43.78 | ||
921 | 1417 | 61417 | 10/1920 | York (North) | 03/09/1962 | York (North) | 41.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Darlington) | 12/1962 | 42.19 | |||
922 | 1418 | 61418 | 11/1920 | Heaton | 29/06/1964 | Hull Dairycoates | 43.58 | Cut | Drapers (Hull) | 12/10/1964 | 43.94 | |||
924 | 1420 | 61420 | 12/1920 | Tweedmouth | 23/09/1963 | Hull Dairycoates | 42.75 | Cut | Drapers (Hull) | 02/02/1964 | 43.16 | |||
2363 | 1434 | 61434 | 11/1922 | Gateshead | 29/06/1964 | York (North) | 41.58 | Cut | Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) | 09/1964 | 41.86 | |||
2368 | 1439 | 61439 | 19/02/1923 | York (North) | 20/08/1962 | York (North) | 39.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Darlington) | 11/1962 | 39.76 | |||
2373 | 1444 | 61444 | 04/05/1923 | York (North) | 29/06/1964 | Hull Dairycoates | 41.08 | Cut | Drapers (Hull) | 28/09/1964 | 41.43 | |||
2378 | 1449 | 61449 | 29/06/1923 | York (North) | 03/07/1963 | Mirfield | 40.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Darlington) | 09/1963 | 40.24 | |||
2382 | 1453 | 61453 | 31/08/1923 | York (North) | 17/06/1963 | Hull Dairycoates | 39.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Darlington) | 07/1963 | 39.90 | |||
1371 | 1454 | 61454 | 29/09/1923 | York (North) | 29/06/1964 | York (North) | 40.75 | Cut | Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) | 09/1964 | 40.99 | |||
1378 | 1461 | 61461 | 15/11/1923 | Tweedmouth | 16/09/1963 | Mirfield | 39.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Darlington) | 12/1963 | 40.11 | |||
1380 | 1463 | 61463 | 29/11/1923 | Neville Hill | 29/06/1964 | Hull Dairycoates | 40.58 | Cut | Drapers (Hull) | 21/09/1964 | 40.84 | |||
1384 | 1467 | E1467 | 61467 | 01/01/1924 | Tweedmouth | 08/06/1964 | Hull Dairycoates | 40.42 | Cut | Drapers (Hull) | 26/10/1964 | 40.85 | ||
1385 | 1468 | 61468 | 01/01/1924 | Heaton | 16/09/1963 | Mirfield | 39.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Darlington) | 02/1964 | 40.15 |