Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 723 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19634 Week
» 84588 Month
» 287252 Year
» 3314105 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LNER Gresley "B17" Class 4-6-0
LNER (1924) |
LNER (1946) |
BR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Rebuilt To |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
2859
|
1659
|
61659
|
11/06/1936 |
|
14/03/1960 |
|
|
23.75 |
|
|
|
23.78 |
2870
|
1670
|
61670
|
13/05/1937 |
|
04/04/1960 |
|
|
22.92 |
|
|
|
22.94 |