LNER Gresley "B17" Class 4-6-0
Class | Number | Built | Name | Name Date | Notes | Removed | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
B17 | 2800 | 07/12/1928 | SANDRINGHAM | 07/12/1928 | 28/07/1958 | 28/07/1958 | |
B17 | 2801 | 05/12/1928 | HOLKHAM | 05/12/1928 | 13/01/1958 | 13/01/1958 | |
B17 | 2802 | 11/1928 | WALSINGHAM | 11/1928 | 13/01/1958 | 13/01/1958 | |
B17 | 2803 | 13/12/1928 | FRAMLINGHAM | 13/12/1928 | 08/09/1958 | 08/09/1958 | |
B17 | 2804 | 13/12/1928 | ELVEDEN | 13/12/1928 | 24/08/1953 | 24/08/1953 | |
B17 | 2805 | 17/12/1928 | LINCOLNSHIRE REGIMENT | 17/12/1928 | 15/05/1958 | 15/05/1958 | |
B17 | 2806 | 19/12/1928 | AUDLEY END | 19/12/1928 | 01/09/1958 | 01/09/1958 | |
B17 | 2807 | 21/12/1928 | BLICKLING | 21/12/1928 | 14/01/1960 | 14/01/1960 | |
B17 | 2808 | 26/12/1928 | GUNTON | 26/12/1928 | 14/03/1960 | 14/03/1960 | |
B17 | 2809 | 27/12/1928 | QUIDENHAM | 27/12/1928 | 23/06/1958 | 23/06/1958 | |
B17 | 2810 | 22/08/1930 | HONINGHAM HALL | 22/08/1930 | 11/01/1960 | 11/01/1960 | |
B17 | 2811 | 22/08/1930 | RAYNHAM HALL | 22/08/1930 | 14/10/1959 | 14/10/1959 | |
B17 | 2812 | 22/10/1930 | HOUGHTON HALL | 22/10/1930 | 29/09/1959 | 29/09/1959 | |
B17 | 2813 | 22/10/1930 | WOODBASTWICK HALL | 22/10/1930 | 18/12/1959 | 18/12/1959 | |
B17 | 2814 | 23/10/1930 | CASTLE HEDINGHAM | 23/10/1930 | 08/06/1959 | 08/06/1959 | |
B17 | 2815 | 29/10/1930 | CULFORD HALL | 29/10/1930 | 09/02/1959 | 09/02/1959 | |
B17 | 2816 | 10/1930 | FALLODON | 10/1930 | 07/09/1959 | 07/09/1959 | |
B17 | 2817 | 10/1930 | FORD CASTLE | 10/1930 | 11/08/1958 | 11/08/1958 | |
B17 | 2818 | 05/11/1930 | WYNYARD PARK | 05/11/1930 | 23/01/1960 | 23/01/1960 | |
B17 | 2819 | 08/11/1930 | WELBECK ABBEY | 08/11/1930 | 19/09/1958 | 19/09/1958 | |
B17 | 2820 | 12/11/1930 | CLUMBER | 12/11/1930 | 25/01/1960 | 25/01/1960 | |
B17 | 2821 | 21/11/1930 | HATFIELD HOUSE | 21/11/1930 | 10/11/1958 | 10/11/1958 | |
B17 | 2822 | 30/01/1931 | ALNWICK CASTLE | 30/01/1931 | 27/09/1958 | 27/09/1958 | |
B17 | 2823 | 03/02/1931 | LAMBTON CASTLE | 03/02/1931 | 31/07/1959 | 31/07/1959 | |
B17 | 2824 | 09/02/1931 | LUMLEY CASTLE | 09/02/1931 | 16/03/1953 | 16/03/1953 | |
B17 | 2825 | 16/02/1931 | RABY CASTLE | 16/02/1931 | 03/12/1959 | 03/12/1959 | |
B17 | 2826 | 04/03/1931 | BRANCEPETH CASTLE | 04/03/1931 | 11/01/1960 | 11/01/1960 | |
B17 | 2827 | 18/03/1931 | ASKE HALL | 18/03/1931 | 17/07/1959 | 17/07/1959 | |
B17 | 2828 | 23/03/1931 | HAREWOOD HOUSE | 23/03/1931 | 15/09/1952 | 15/09/1952 | |
B17 | 2829 | 08/04/1931 | NAWORTH CASTLE | 08/04/1931 | 25/09/1959 | 25/09/1959 | |
B17 | 2830 | 28/04/1931 | TOTTENHAM HOTSPUR | 28/04/1931 | 19/08/1958 | 19/08/1958 | |
B17 | 2831 | 01/05/1931 | SERLBY HALL | 01/05/1931 | 10/04/1959 | 10/04/1959 | |
B17 | 2832 | 12/05/1931 | ROYAL SOVEREIGN (1958) | 12/05/1931 | 02/02/1959 | 02/02/1959 | |
B17 | 2833 | 28/05/1931 | KIMBOLTON CASTLE | 28/05/1931 | 30/09/1959 | 30/09/1959 | |
B17 | 2834 | 17/06/1931 | HINCHINGBROOKE | 17/06/1931 | 04/08/1958 | 04/08/1958 | |
B17 | 2835 | 02/07/1931 | MILTON | 02/07/1931 | 29/01/1959 | 29/01/1959 | |
B17 | 2836 | 16/07/1931 | HARLAXTON MANOR | 16/07/1931 | 21/10/1959 | 21/10/1959 | |
B17 | 2837 | 01/03/1933 | THORPE HALL | 01/03/1933 | 24/09/1959 | 24/09/1959 | |
B17 | 2838 | 02/03/1933 | MELTON HALL | 02/03/1933 | 17/03/1958 | 17/03/1958 | |
B17 | 2839 | 11/05/1933 | NORWICH CITY | 11/05/1933 | 18/05/1959 | 18/05/1959 | |
B17 | 2840 | 18/05/1933 | SOMERLEYTON HALL | 18/05/1933 | 15/11/1958 | 15/11/1958 | |
B17 | 2841 | 25/05/1933 | GAYTON HALL | 25/05/1933 | 28/01/1960 | 28/01/1960 | |
B17 | 2842 | 05/1933 | KILVERSTONE HALL | 05/1933 | 15/09/1958 | 15/09/1958 | |
B17 | 2843 | 03/05/1935 | CHAMPION LODGE | 03/05/1935 | 14/07/1958 | 14/07/1958 | |
B17 | 2844 | 09/05/1935 | EARLHAM HALL | 09/05/1935 | 25/11/1959 | 25/11/1959 | |
B17 | 2845 | 14/06/1935 | THE SUFFOLK REGIMENT | 14/06/1935 | 26/02/1959 | 26/02/1959 | |
B17 | 2846 | 23/08/1935 | GILWELL PARK | 23/08/1935 | 09/01/1959 | 09/01/1959 | |
B17 | 2847 | 10/09/1935 | HELMINGHAM HALL | 10/09/1935 | 18/11/1959 | 18/11/1959 | |
B17 | 2848 | 03/03/1936 | ARSENAL | 03/03/1936 | 01/12/1958 | 01/12/1958 | |
B17 | 2849 | 09/03/1936 | SHEFFIELD UNITED | 09/03/1936 | 10/02/1958 | 10/02/1958 | |
B17 | 2850 | 09/03/1936 | GRIMSBY TOWN | 09/03/1936 | 03/09/1958 | 03/09/1958 | |
B17 | 2851 | 30/03/1936 | DERBY COUNTY | 30/03/1936 | 14/08/1959 | 14/08/1959 | |
B17 | 2852 | 02/04/1936 | DARLINGTON | 02/04/1936 | 17/09/1959 | 17/09/1959 | |
B17 | 2853 | 06/04/1936 | HUDDERSFIELD TOWN | 06/04/1936 | 25/01/1960 | 25/01/1960 | |
B17 | 2854 | 17/04/1936 | SUNDERLAND | 17/04/1936 | 06/11/1959 | 06/11/1959 | |
B17 | 2855 | 29/04/1936 | MIDDLESBROUGH | 29/04/1936 | 09/04/1959 | 09/04/1959 | |
B17 | 2856 | 06/05/1936 | LEEDS UNITED | 06/05/1936 | 27/01/1960 | 27/01/1960 | |
B17 | 2857 | 15/05/1936 | DONCASTER ROVERS | 15/05/1936 | 03/06/1960 | 03/06/1960 | |
B17 | 2858 | 28/05/1936 | THE ESSEX REGIMENT | 28/05/1936 | 03/12/1959 | 03/12/1959 | |
B17 | 2859 | 11/06/1936 | EAST ANGLIAN | 11/06/1936 | 14/03/1960 | 14/03/1960 | |
B17 | 2860 | 19/06/1936 | HULL CITY | 19/06/1936 | 02/06/1960 | 02/06/1960 | |
B17 | 2861 | 06/1936 | SHEFFIELD WEDNESDAY | 06/1936 | 23/07/1959 | 23/07/1959 | |
B17 | 2862 | 13/01/1937 | MANCHESTER UNITED | 13/01/1937 | 01/12/1959 | 01/12/1959 | |
B17 | 2863 | 04/02/1937 | EVERTON | 04/02/1937 | 20/02/1960 | 20/02/1960 | |
B17 | 2864 | 15/01/1937 | LIVERPOOL | 15/01/1937 | 01/06/1960 | 01/06/1960 | |
B17 | 2865 | 26/01/1937 | LEICESTER CITY | 26/01/1937 | 16/04/1959 | 16/04/1959 | |
B17 | 2866 | 15/02/1937 | NOTTINGHAM FOREST | 15/02/1937 | 07/03/1960 | 07/03/1960 | |
B17 | 2867 | 15/04/1937 | BRADFORD | 15/04/1937 | 23/06/1958 | 23/06/1958 | |
B17 | 2868 | 28/04/1937 | BRADFORD CITY | 28/04/1937 | 22/08/1960 | 22/08/1960 | |
B17 | 2869 | 06/05/1937 | BARNSLEY | 06/05/1937 | 26/09/1958 | 26/09/1958 | |
B17 | 2870 | 13/05/1937 | CITY OF LONDON | 13/05/1937 | 04/04/1960 | 04/04/1960 | |
B17 | 2871 | 11/06/1937 | ROYAL SOVEREIGN | 11/06/1937 | 22/09/1958 | 22/09/1958 | |
B17 | 2872 | 19/07/1937 | WEST HAM UNITED | 19/07/1937 | 09/03/1960 | 09/03/1960 |