Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 4135 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17541 Week
» 70557 Month
» 190084 Year
» 3216937 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LNER Gresley "B17" Class 4-6-0
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
LNER |
2839 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1639 |
1946 |
|
1946 |
|
LNER |
2825 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1625 |
1946 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
2868 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1668 |
1946 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
2872 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1672 |
1946 |
on |
25/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
2866 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1666 |
1946 |
on |
07/02/1946 |
|
LNER |
2811 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1611 |
1946 |
on |
08/02/1946 |
|
LNER |
2808 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1608 |
1946 |
on |
09/02/1946 |
|
LNER |
2817 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1617 |
1946 |
on |
09/02/1946 |
|
LNER |
2869 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1669 |
1946 |
on |
25/02/1946 |
|
LNER |
2804 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1604 |
1946 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
|
LNER |
2870 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1670 |
1946 |
on |
04/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
2826 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1626 |
1946 |
on |
21/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
2821 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1621 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
2824 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1624 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
2820 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1620 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
2834 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1634 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
2837 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1637 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
2862 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1662 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
2863 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1663 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
2864 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1664 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
2800 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1600 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
2823 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1623 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
2805 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1605 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
2809 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1609 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
2812 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1612 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
2819 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1619 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
2827 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1627 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
2830 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1630 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
2838 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1638 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
2840 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1640 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
2841 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1641 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
2851 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1651 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
2867 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1667 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
2801 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1601 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
2802 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1602 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
2806 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1606 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
2810 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1610 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
2828 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1628 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
2831 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1631 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
2833 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1633 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
2835 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1635 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
2842 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1642 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
2843 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1643 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
2845 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1645 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
2822 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1622 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
2836 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1636 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
2857 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1657 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
2859 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1659 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
2861 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1661 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
2865 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1665 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
2818 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1618 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
2829 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1629 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
2849 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1649 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
2850 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1650 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
2853 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1653 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
2854 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1654 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
2855 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1655 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
2807 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1607 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
2813 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1613 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
2844 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1644 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
2846 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1646 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
2848 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1648 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
2852 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1652 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
2858 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1658 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
2847 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1647 |
1946 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
|
LNER |
2856 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1656 |
1946 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
|
LNER |
2860 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1660 |
1946 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
|
LNER |
1623 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61623 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
1654 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61654 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
1659 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61659 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
1661 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61661 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
2816 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61616 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LNER |
1600 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61600 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
1608 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61608 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
1622 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61622 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
1666 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61666 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
2815 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61615 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LNER |
1604 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61604 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
1621 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61621 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
1649 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61649 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
1653 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61653 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
1658 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61658 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
1617 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61617 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LNER |
2832 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61632 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LNER |
1657 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61657 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
1665 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61665 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
1619 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61619 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
1633 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61633 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
1638 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61638 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
1643 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61643 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
1670 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61670 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
1634 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61634 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
1637 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61637 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
2871 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61671 |
|
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
|
LNER |
1631 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61631 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
1650 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61650 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
1655 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61655 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
1620 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61620 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
1627 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61627 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
1601 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61601 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
1624 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61624 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
1628 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61628 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
1630 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61630 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
1646 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61646 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
2814 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61614 |
|
4w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
LNER |
1612 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61612 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
1629 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61629 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
1635 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61635 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
1640 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61640 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
1642 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61642 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
1651 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61651 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
1660 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61660 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
1672 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61672 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
2803 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61603 |
|
4w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
LNER |
1625 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61625 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
1641 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61641 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
1609 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61609 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
1618 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61618 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
1645 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61645 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
1647 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61647 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
1644 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61644 |
|
4w/e |
26/03/1949 |
|
LNER |
1605 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61605 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
1611 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61611 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
1648 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61648 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
1652 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61652 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
1602 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61602 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
1668 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61668 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
1607 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61607 |
|
w/e |
30/07/1949 |
|
LNER |
1613 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61613 |
|
m/e |
08/1949 |
|
LNER |
1662 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61662 |
|
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
LNER |
1667 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61667 |
|
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
LNER |
1669 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61669 |
|
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
LNER |
1626 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61626 |
|
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
LNER |
1663 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61663 |
|
m/e |
11/1949 |
|
LNER |
1606 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61606 |
|
m/e |
03/1950 |
|
LNER |
1664 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61664 |
|
m/e |
03/1950 |
|
LNER |
1610 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61610 |
|
m/e |
05/1950 |
|
LNER |
1636 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61636 |
|
m/e |
05/1950 |
|
LNER |
1639 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61639 |
|
w/e |
06/05/1950 |
|
LNER |
1656 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61656 |
|
m/e |
08/1950 |
|