Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 264 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 1105 Week
» 15041 Month
» 142484 Year
» 1807860 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "B18" Class 4-6-0


Class GCR LNER (Tmp) LNER (1924) LNER (1946 1st) LNER (1946) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
B18 195   5195 1470 1479 12/1903 GOR
IMM
WFD
CLK
LEI
CLK
LEI
NEA
CLK
ANN
W
Gorton
Immingham
Woodford Halse
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Neasden
Colwick
Annesley
Withdrawn
12/1903
27/04/1923
28/04/1926
03/03/1940
05/04/1943
04/07/1943
16/01/1944
20/10/1946
26/06/1947
21/09/1947
31/12/1947
31/12/1947
B18 196 196C 5196 1471 1480 01/1904 IMM
WFD
NEA
WFD
CLK
LEI
CLK
NEA
CLK
ANN
W
Immingham
Woodford Halse
Neasden
Woodford Halse
Colwick
Leicester (G.C.)
Colwick
Neasden
Colwick
Annesley
Withdrawn
01/1904
27/04/1926
31/03/1928
23/04/1928
03/03/1940
26/05/1940
05/05/1946
20/10/1946
26/06/1947
21/09/1947
31/12/1947
31/12/1947