Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 373 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4865 Week
» 29699 Month
» 64031 Year
» 1729407 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "B18" Class 4-6-0


Company Old Number Company New Number Subtype Date Information
GCR 196 renumbered to LNER 196C Tmp   10/11/1923  
GCR 195 renumbered to LNER 5195 1924   26/07/1924  
LNER 196C renumbered to LNER 5196 1924   18/04/1925  
LNER 5196 renumbered to LNER 1480 1946   29/09/1946  
LNER 5195 renumbered to LNER 1479 1946   20/10/1946