GCR/LNER Robinson "C14" Class 4-4-2T
GCR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1120 | 6120 | 7440 | 67440 | 05/1907 | 04/07/1957 | 50.17 | 50.29 | |||||
1121 | 6121 | 7441 | 67441 | 05/1907 | 05/08/1957 | 50.25 | 50.37 | |||||
1122 | 6122 | 7442 | 67442 | 05/1907 | 30/11/1957 | 50.5 | 51.20 | |||||
1123 | 6123 | 7443 | 67443 | 05/1907 | 24/06/1957 | 50.08 | 50.20 | |||||
1124 | 6124 | 7444 | 67444 | 05/1907 | 03/07/1957 | 50.17 | 50.20 | |||||
1125 | 6125 | 7445 | 67445 | 05/1907 | 22/12/1959 | 52.58 | 52.71 | |||||
1126 | 6126 | 7446 | 67446 | 06/1907 | 27/05/1957 | 49.92 | 50.04 | |||||
1127 | 6127 | 7447 | 67447 | 06/1907 | 02/12/1958 | 51.5 | 51.87 | |||||
1128 | 6128 | 7448 | 67448 | 06/1907 | 18/06/1959 | 52 | 52.29 | |||||
1129 | 6129 | 7449 | 67449 | 06/1907 | 07/12/1957 | 50.5 | 51.12 | |||||
1130 | 6130 | 7450 | 67450 | 06/1907 | 23/01/1960 | 52.58 | 52.71 | |||||
1131 | 6131 | 7451 | 67451 | 06/1907 | 21/01/1957 | 49.58 | 51.12 |