Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 705 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14111 Week
» 67127 Month
» 186654 Year
» 3213507 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GNR/LNER Ivatt "D2" Class 4-4-0
Class |
GNR |
LNER (1924) |
LNER (1946) |
BR |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
D2 |
1327
|
4327
|
2156
|
(62156)
|
10/1898 |
01/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
02/1935 |
D2 |
1328
|
4328
|
|
|
10/1898 |
10/1937 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
06/1935 |
D2 |
1330
|
4330
|
(2158)
|
|
11/1898 |
03/1946 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
05/1935 |
D2 |
1332
|
4332
|
2160
|
(62160)
|
11/1898 |
16/10/1948 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
03/1930 |
D2 |
1334
|
4334
|
|
|
11/1898 |
09/1936 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
05/1928 |
D2 |
1337
|
4337
|
2163
|
(62163)
|
10/1899 |
16/10/1948 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
03/1935 |
D2 |
1338
|
4338
|
(2164)
|
|
10/1899 |
02/1946 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
02/1935 |
D2 |
1339
|
4339
|
2165
|
(62165)
|
10/1899 |
03/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
11/1929 |
D2 |
1361
|
4361
|
2167
|
(62167)
|
11/1899 |
02/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
11/1929 |
D2 |
1363
|
4363
|
|
|
10/1899 |
06/1939 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
05/1936 |
D2 |
1365
|
4365
|
2169
|
(62169)
|
11/1899 |
02/07/1948 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
03/1935 |
D2 |
1367
|
4367
|
|
|
10/1900 |
06/1939 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
10/1935 |
D2 |
1377
|
4377
|
2177
|
(62177)
|
01/1901 |
10/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
01/1935 |
D2 |
1378
|
4378
|
|
|
01/1901 |
06/1937 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
02/1928 |
D2 |
1379
|
4379
|
2178
|
|
01/1901 |
07/1947 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
02/1935 |
D2 |
1381
|
4381
|
2180
|
(62180)
|
01/1901 |
05/1950 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
04/1914 |
D2 |
1382
|
4382
|
|
|
11/1900 |
05/1937 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
03/1930 |
D2 |
1387
|
4387
|
2184
|
|
02/1903 |
12/1947 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
10/1935 |
D2 |
1391
|
4391
|
|
|
06/1903 |
08/1938 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
05/1935 |
D2 |
1392
|
4392
|
2187
|
(62187)
|
04/1903 |
01/10/1948 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
11/1929 |
D2 |
1394
|
4394
|
2189
|
(62189)
|
05/1903 |
25/11/1948 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
03/1936 |
D2 |
1399
|
4399
|
(2192)
|
|
10/1907 |
05/1946 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
05/1928 |
D2 |
48
|
|
2199
|
(62199)
|
06/1909 |
07/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
10/1935 |
D2 |
50
|
|
2201
|
|
06/1909 |
07/1947 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
07/1937 |