GCR/LNER Robinson "D11" Class 4-4-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/1935 | Reallocation | 5507 | NEA | Neasden | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2660 | IMM | Immingham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2661 | NEA | Neasden | IMM | Immingham | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2662 | IMM | Immingham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2663 | IMM | Immingham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2664 | IMM | Immingham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2665 | IMM | Immingham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2666 | IMM | Immingham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2667 | IMM | Immingham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2668 | IMM | Immingham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2669 | IMM | Immingham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2670 | IMM | Immingham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2671 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2672 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2673 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2674 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2675 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2676 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2677 | HAY | Haymarket | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2678 | HAY | Haymarket | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2679 | HAY | Haymarket | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2680 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2681 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2682 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2683 | HAY | Haymarket | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2684 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2685 | HAY | Haymarket | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2686 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2687 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2688 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2689 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2690 | HAY | Haymarket | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2691 | HAY | Haymarket | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2692 | HAY | Haymarket | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2693 | HAY | Haymarket | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2694 | HAY | Haymarket | |||
22/10/1950 | Reallocation | 62662 | IMM | Immingham | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
22/10/1950 | Reallocation | 62666 | IMM | Immingham | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 62662 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 62666 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 62668 | IMM | Immingham | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 62669 | IMM | Immingham | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
02/12/1950 | Reallocation | 62668 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
02/12/1950 | Reallocation | 62669 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 62668 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 62669 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
27/01/1951 | Reallocation | 62664 | IMM | Immingham | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
27/01/1951 | Reallocation | 62667 | IMM | Immingham | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
24/02/1951 | Reallocation | 62660 | IMM | Immingham | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
24/02/1951 | Reallocation | 62661 | IMM | Immingham | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
07/04/1951 | Reallocation | 62661 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 62661 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 62669 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9G | Northwich | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 62677 | HAY | Haymarket | 64B | Haymarket | |
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 62666 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 40B | Immingham | |
14/02/1953 | Reallocation | 62667 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 40B | Immingham | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 62667 | 40B | Immingham | 40F | Boston | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 62692 | HAY | Haymarket | 64F | Bathgate | |
13/06/1953 | Reallocation | 62692 | 64F | Bathgate | 64B | Haymarket | |
25/07/1953 | Reallocation | 62666 | 40B | Immingham | 36B | Mexborough | |
25/07/1953 | Reallocation | 62667 | 40F | Boston | 36B | Mexborough | |
24/10/1953 | Reallocation | 62666 | 36B | Mexborough | 40A | Lincoln | |
24/10/1953 | Reallocation | 62667 | 36B | Mexborough | 40A | Lincoln | |
21/11/1953 | Reallocation | 62660 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 40A | Lincoln | |
21/11/1953 | Reallocation | 62670 | IMM | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
24/07/1954 | Reallocation | 62663 | IMM | Immingham | 40A | Lincoln | |
04/12/1954 | Reallocation | 62665 | IMM | Immingham | 9G | Northwich | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 62661 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9G | Northwich | |
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 62664 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9G | Northwich | |
08/10/1955 | Reallocation | 62662 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9G | Northwich | |
25/05/1956 | Reallocation | 62670 | 40B | Immingham | 40A | Lincoln | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 62660 | 40A | Lincoln | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 62663 | 40A | Lincoln | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 62666 | 40A | Lincoln | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 62667 | 40A | Lincoln | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 62670 | 40A | Lincoln | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/05/1957 | Reallocation | 62677 | 64B | Haymarket | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
11/05/1957 | Reallocation | 62678 | HAY | Haymarket | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
11/05/1957 | Reallocation | 62679 | HAY | Haymarket | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 62663 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 62661 | 9G | Northwich | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 62662 | 9G | Northwich | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 62664 | 9G | Northwich | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 62665 | 9G | Northwich | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 62668 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 62669 | 9G | Northwich | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
10/09/1958 | Condemned | 62679 | 62A | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
17/09/1958 | Condemned | 62683 | HAY | Haymarket | COND | ||
03/03/1959 | Condemned | 62678 | 62A | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
08/05/1959 | Condemned | 62665 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
13/06/1959 | Reallocation | 62661 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |
04/07/1959 | Reallocation | 62677 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | |
15/07/1959 | Condemned | 62673 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
26/08/1959 | Condemned | 62677 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
29/10/1959 | Condemned | 62675 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
29/10/1959 | Condemned | 62676 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
29/10/1959 | Condemned | 62684 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
16/11/1959 | Condemned | 62692 | 64B | Haymarket | COND | ||
16/11/1959 | Condemned | 62694 | HAY | Haymarket | COND | ||
13/02/1960 | Reallocation | 62689 | EFD | Eastfield | 64A | St Margarets | |
13/02/1960 | Reallocation | 62693 | HAY | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
23/05/1960 | Condemned | 62663 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
02/07/1960 | Reallocation | 62689 | 64A | St Margarets | 65A | Eastfield | |
02/07/1960 | Reallocation | 62693 | 64A | St Margarets | 64B | Haymarket | |
08/08/1960 | Condemned | 62662 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
08/08/1960 | Condemned | 62664 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
12/08/1960 | Condemned | 62667 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
12/08/1960 | Condemned | 62669 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
11/1960 | Condemned | 62660 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
15/11/1960 | Condemned | 62670 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
17/11/1960 | Condemned | 62668 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
18/11/1960 | Condemned | 62661 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
05/12/1960 | Condemned | 62666 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
11/05/1961 | Condemned | 62671 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
13/07/1961 | Condemned | 62681 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
13/07/1961 | Condemned | 62689 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
13/07/1961 | Condemned | 62690 | HAY | Haymarket | COND | ||
19/07/1961 | Condemned | 62674 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
28/07/1961 | Condemned | 62686 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
28/07/1961 | Condemned | 62688 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
29/07/1961 | Condemned | 62682 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
02/08/1961 | Condemned | 62687 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
08/09/1961 | Condemned | 62672 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
08/09/1961 | Condemned | 62680 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
20/11/1961 | Condemned | 62691 | HAY | Haymarket | COND | ||
20/11/1961 | Condemned | 62693 | 64B | Haymarket | COND | ||
15/01/1962 | Condemned | 62685 | HAY | Haymarket | COND |