Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 58 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4973 Week
» 16210 Month
» 249130 Year
» 1914506 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Hill "D16" Class 4-4-0


GER LNER (1924) LNER (1942) LNER (Amend) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Rebuilt From Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1853 8853 7723 2544 62544 12/1903 05/1926
from D15
24/11/1959 Norwich Thorpe 55.92 56.12
1846 8846 7716 2557 62557 12/1906 12/1924
from D15
31/10/1955 Cambridge 48.83
1847 8847 7717 2558 62558 12/1906 07/1926
from D15
06/05/1957 Kings Lynn 50.42 50.62
1818 8818 7688 2589 62589 06/1910 03/1947
from D15
18/05/1959 March 48.92 49.28
1805 8805 7672 2596 62596 09/1910 03/1947
from D15
28/10/1957 Norwich Thorpe 47.08 47.20
1780 8780 7650 2611 62611 06/1923 01/01/1957 Yarmouth South Town 33.58 33.70
1781 8781 7651 2612 62612 06/1923 24/11/1959 Kirkby in Ashfield 36.42 36.61
1782 8782 7652 2613 62613 06/1923 25/10/1960 March 37.33 37.53
1783 8783 7653 2614 62614 07/1923 18/08/1958 Kings Lynn 35.08 35.53
1784 8784 7654 2615 62615 07/1923 13/10/1958 March 35.25 35.44
1785 8785 7655 2616 62616 07/1923 23/02/1953 Cambridge 29.58
1786 8786 7656 8786 2617 62617 08/1923 20/05/1957 Melton Constable 33.75 34.11
1787 8787 7657 2618 62618 08/1923 23/11/1959 March 36.25 36.36
1788 8788 7658 2619 62619 09/1923 07/10/1957 Norwich Thorpe 34.08 34.44
1789 8789 7659 2620 62620 09/1923 10/10/1955 Melton Constable 32.08