LNER Hill "D16" Class 4-4-0
GER | LNER (1924) | LNER (1942) | LNER (Amend) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1851 | 8851 | 7721 | 2542 | 62542 | 12/1903 | 06/1927 from D15 |
15/10/1956 | March | 52.83 | ||||||
1852 | 8852 | 7722 | 2543 | 62543 | 12/1903 | 02/1928 from D15 |
13/10/1958 | March | 54.83 | 55.04 | |||||
1853 | 8853 | 7723 | 2544 | 62544 | 12/1903 | 05/1926 from D15 |
24/11/1959 | Norwich Thorpe | 55.92 | 56.12 | |||||
1856 | 8856 | 7726 | 2547 | 62547 | 03/1904 | 05/1927 from D15 |
02/1951 | March | 46.92 | ||||||
1841 | 8841 | 7711 | 2552 | 62552 | 11/1906 | 01/1929 from D15 |
25/10/1955 | Ipswich | 48.92 | ||||||
1842 | 8842 | 7712 | 2553 | 62553 | 11/1906 | 09/1930 from D15 |
01/01/1957 | Cambridge | 50.17 | 50.36 | |||||
1843 | 8843 | 7713 | 2554 | 62554 | 11/1906 | 07/1927 from D15 |
28/11/1955 | Norwich Thorpe | 49 | ||||||
1845 | 8845 | 7715 | 2556 | 62556 | 11/1906 | 05/1929 from D15 |
01/01/1957 | Norwich Thorpe | 50.17 | 50.29 | |||||
1846 | 8846 | 7716 | 2557 | 62557 | 12/1906 | 12/1924 from D15 |
31/10/1955 | Cambridge | 48.83 | ||||||
1847 | 8847 | 7717 | 2558 | 62558 | 12/1906 | 07/1926 from D15 |
06/05/1957 | Kings Lynn | 50.42 | 50.62 | |||||
1831 | 8831 | 7701 | 2562 | 62562 | 03/1908 | 04/1928 from D15 |
22/10/1957 | March | 49.58 | 49.70 | |||||
1833 | 8833 | 7703 | 2564 | 62564 | 04/1908 | 01/1930 from D15 |
24/03/1958 | Lincoln | 49.92 | 50.03 | |||||
1834 | 8834 | 7704 | 2565 | 62565 | 04/1908 | 03/1929 from D15 |
01/01/1957 | Kings Lynn | 48.75 | 48.87 | |||||
1838 | 8838 | 7708 | 2569 | 62569 | 07/1908 | 11/1929 from D15 |
26/11/1956 | Kings Lynn | 48.33 | ||||||
1839 | 8839 | 7709 | 2570 | 62570 | 07/1908 | 04/1928 from D15 |
24/11/1959 | March | 51.33 | 51.54 | |||||
1822 | 8822 | 7692 | 2573 | 62573 | 09/1909 | 06/1930 from D15 |
24/10/1955 | Kings Lynn | 46.08 | 46.20 | |||||
1826 | 8826 | 7696 | 2577 | 62577 | 12/1909 | 04/1929 from D15 |
10/1956 | Norwich Thorpe | 46.83 | ||||||
1827 | 8827 | 7697 | 2578 | 62578 | 12/1909 | 07/1927 from D15 |
21/10/1957 | Melton Constable | 47.83 | 47.95 | |||||
1829 | 8829 | 7699 | 2580 | 62580 | 12/1909 | 02/1930 from D15 |
09/06/1958 | Kings Lynn | 48.5 | 48.61 | |||||
1813 | 8813 | 7683 | 2584 | 62584 | 04/1910 | 04/1926 from D15 |
23/12/1957 | Kings Lynn | 47.67 | 47.87 | |||||
1818 | 8818 | 7688 | 2589 | 62589 | 06/1910 | 06/1923 from D15 |
18/05/1959 | March | 48.92 | 49.28 | |||||
1819 | 8819 | 7689 | 2590 | 62590 | 06/1910 | 01/1928 from D15 |
28/01/1952 | Ipswich | 41.58 | ||||||
1800 | 8800 | 7670 | 2591 | 62591 | 07/1910 | 07/1927 from D15 |
17/04/1950 | Yarmouth South Town | 39.75 | ||||||
1801 | 8801 | 7671 | 2592 | 62592 | 07/1910 | 04/1929 from D15 |
01/04/1958 | Kings Lynn | 47.75 | 48.03 | |||||
1805 | 8805 | 7672 | 2596 | 62596 | 09/1910 | 03/1923 from D15 |
28/10/1957 | Norwich Thorpe | 47.08 | 47.20 | |||||
1790 | 8790 | 7660 | 2601 | 62601 | 02/1911 | 04/1929 from D15 |
01/01/1957 | Kings Lynn | 45.92 | 46.03 | |||||
1792 | 8792 | 7662 | 2603 | 62603 | 03/1911 | 03/1928 from D15 |
03/09/1951 | Cambridge | 40.5 | ||||||
1794 | 8794 | 7664 | 2605 | 62605 | 05/1911 | 02/1929 from D15 |
06/06/1957 | March | 46.08 | 46.28 | |||||
1795 | 8795 | 7665 | 8795 | 2606 | 62606 | 07/1911 | 04/1931 from D15 |
28/09/1959 | Kings Lynn | 48.17 | 48.37 | ||||
1796 | 8796 | 7666 | 2607 | 62607 | 07/1911 | 12/1928 from D15 |
28/11/1955 | Cambridge | 44.33 | 44.45 | |||||
1780 | 8780 | 7650 | 2611 | 62611 | 06/1923 | 01/01/1957 | Yarmouth South Town | 33.58 | 33.70 | ||||||
1781 | 8781 | 7651 | 2612 | 62612 | 06/1923 | 24/11/1959 | Kirkby in Ashfield | 36.42 | 36.61 | ||||||
1782 | 8782 | 7652 | 2613 | 62613 | 06/1923 | 25/10/1960 | March | 37.33 | 37.53 | ||||||
1783 | 8783 | 7653 | 2614 | 62614 | 07/1923 | 18/08/1958 | Kings Lynn | 35.08 | 35.53 | ||||||
1784 | 8784 | 7654 | 2615 | 62615 | 07/1923 | 13/10/1958 | March | 35.25 | 35.44 | ||||||
1785 | 8785 | 7655 | 2616 | 62616 | 07/1923 | 23/02/1953 | Cambridge | 29.58 | |||||||
1786 | 8786 | 7656 | 8786 | 2617 | 62617 | 08/1923 | 20/05/1957 | Melton Constable | 33.75 | 34.11 | |||||
1787 | 8787 | 7657 | 2618 | 62618 | 08/1923 | 23/11/1959 | March | 36.25 | 36.36 | ||||||
1788 | 8788 | 7658 | 2619 | 62619 | 09/1923 | 07/10/1957 | Norwich Thorpe | 34.08 | 34.44 | ||||||
1789 | 8789 | 7659 | 2620 | 62620 | 09/1923 | 10/10/1955 | Melton Constable | 32.08 |