LNER Hill "D16" Class 4-4-0
GER | LNER (1924) | LNER (1942) | LNER (Amend) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1900 | 8900 | 7770 | 2500 | 03/1900 | 02/1933 from D15 |
05/1947 | 47.17 | ||||||||
1899 | 8899 | 7769 | 2510 | 62510 | 07/1900 | 09/1943 from D15 |
07/10/1957 | Kings Lynn | 57.25 | 57.38 | |||||
1880 | 8880 | 7750 | 2511 | 62511 | 04/1901 | 09/1942 from D15 |
17/12/1959 | Norwich Thorpe | 58.67 | 58.79 | |||||
1882 | 8882 | 7752 | 2513 | 62513 | 05/1901 | 09/1942 from D15 |
03/11/1958 | Cambridge | 57.5 | 57.62 | |||||
1883 | 8883 | 7753 | 2514 | 62514 | 05/1901 | 05/1943 from D15 |
11/03/1957 | Kings Lynn | 55.83 | 56.12 | |||||
1884 | 8884 | 7754 | 2515 | 62515 | 05/1901 | 01/1943 from D15 |
01/04/1958 | Melton Constable | 56.92 | 57.12 | |||||
1885 | 8885 | 7755 | 2516 | 62516 | 05/1901 | 07/1937 from D15 |
18/08/1957 | Kings Lynn | 56.25 | 56.38 | |||||
1886 | 8886 | 7756 | 2517 | 62517 | 06/1901 | 04/1940 from D15 |
28/09/1959 | March | 58.25 | 58.46 | |||||
1887 | 8887 | 7757 | 2518 | 62518 | 06/1901 | 08/1943 from D15 |
13/10/1958 | Kings Lynn | 57.33 | 57.54 | |||||
1888 | 8888 | 7758 | 2519 | 62519 | 06/1901 | 06/1939 from D15 |
01/01/1957 | Melton Constable | 55.58 | 55.79 | |||||
1870 | 8870 | 7740 | 2521 | 62521 | 03/1902 | 05/1935 from D15 |
10/02/1958 | Kings Lynn | 55.92 | 56.12 | |||||
1871 | 8871 | 7741 | 2522 | 62522 | 03/1902 | 05/1938 from D15 |
04/08/1958 | Cambridge | 56.42 | 56.62 | |||||
1872 | 8872 | 7742 | 2523 | 62523 | 03/1902 | 05/1940 from D15 |
27/08/1956 | Norwich Thorpe | 54.42 | 54.96 | |||||
1873 | 8873 | 7743 | 2524 | 62524 | 03/1902 | 06/1939 from D15 |
10/03/1960 | Norwich Thorpe | 58 | 58.21 | |||||
1874 | 8874 | 7744 | 2525 | 62525 | 03/1902 | 06/1938 from D15 |
19/09/1955 | Cambridge | 53.5 | ||||||
1875 | 8875 | 7745 | 2526 | 62526 | 04/1902 | 08/1937 from D15 |
21/05/1957 | March | 55.08 | 55.46 | |||||
1876 | 8876 | 7746 | 2527 | 62527 | 04/1902 | 03/1935 from D15 |
07/07/1952 | Cambridge | 50.25 | ||||||
1878 | 8878 | 7748 | 2529 | 62529 | 05/1902 | 05/1935 from D15 |
23/11/1959 | March | 57.5 | 57.71 | |||||
1879 | 8879 | 7749 | 2530 | 62530 | 05/1902 | 04/1938 from D15 |
22/09/1958 | March | 56.33 | 56.54 | |||||
1860 | 8860 | 7730 | 2531 | 62531 | 05/1903 | 06/1934 from D15 |
21/03/1955 | Cambridge | 51.83 | ||||||
1861 | 8861 | 7731 | 2532 | 62532 | 05/1903 | 04/1936 from D15 |
12/11/1956 | Cambridge | 53.5 | ||||||
1862 | 8862 | 7732 | 2533 | 62533 | 05/1903 | 06/1940 from D15 |
23/09/1957 | Melton Constable | 54.33 | 54.62 | |||||
1863 | 8863 | 7733 | 2534 | 62534 | 06/1903 | 04/1935 from D15 |
11/11/1958 | Cambridge | 55.42 | 55.71 | |||||
1864 | 8864 | 7734 | 2535 | 62535 | 06/1903 | 10/1936 from D15 |
25/11/1957 | Lincoln | 54.42 | 54.62 | |||||
1865 | 8865 | 7735 | 2536 | 62536 | 09/1903 | 07/1936 from D15 |
25/07/1955 | Spital Bridge | 51.83 | 55.62 | |||||
1866 | 8866 | 7736 | 09/1903 | 03/1933 from D15 |
09/1945 | 42 | |||||||||
1868 | 8868 | 7738 | 2539 | 62539 | 10/1903 | 07/1940 from D15 |
28/10/1957 | Cambridge | 54 | 54.21 | |||||
1869 | 8869 | 7739 | 2540 | 62540 | 11/1903 | 06/1934 from D15 |
24/08/1959 | Norwich Thorpe | 55.75 | 55.87 | |||||
1850 | 8850 | 7720 | 2541 | 62541 | 12/1903 | 07/1939 from D15 |
17/10/1955 | Cambridge | 51.83 | ||||||
1851 | 8851 | 7721 | 2542 | 62542 | 12/1903 | 06/1927 from D15 |
15/10/1956 | March | 52.83 | ||||||
1852 | 8852 | 7722 | 2543 | 62543 | 12/1903 | 02/1928 from D15 |
13/10/1958 | March | 54.83 | 55.04 | |||||
1853 | 8853 | 7723 | 2544 | 62544 | 12/1903 | 05/1926 from D15 |
24/11/1959 | Norwich Thorpe | 55.92 | 56.12 | |||||
1854 | 8854 | 7724 | 2545 | 62545 | 01/1904 | 03/1933 from D15 |
22/09/1958 | Kings Lynn | 54.67 | 54.95 | |||||
1855 | 8855 | 7725 | 2546 | 62546 | 02/1904 | 01/1934 from D15 |
18/06/1957 | Yarmouth South Town | 53.33 | 53.62 | |||||
1857 | 8857 | 7727 | 2548 | 62548 | 03/1904 | 07/1939 from D15 |
08/10/1957 | March | 53.58 | 53.71 | |||||
1858 | 8858 | 7728 | 2549 | 62549 | 03/1904 | 03/1938 from D15 |
12/12/1955 | Cambridge | 51.75 | ||||||
1859 | 8859 | 7729 | 2550 | 04/1904 | 05/1934 from D15 |
11/1946 | 42.58 | ||||||||
1840 | 8840 | 7710 | 2551 | 62551 | 11/1906 | 03/1935 from D15 |
16/07/1956 | Spital Bridge | 49.67 | ||||||
1841 | 8841 | 7711 | 2552 | 62552 | 11/1906 | 01/1929 from D15 |
25/10/1955 | Ipswich | 48.92 | ||||||
1842 | 8842 | 7712 | 2553 | 62553 | 11/1906 | 09/1930 from D15 |
01/01/1957 | Cambridge | 50.17 | 50.36 | |||||
1843 | 8843 | 7713 | 2554 | 62554 | 11/1906 | 07/1927 from D15 |
28/11/1955 | Norwich Thorpe | 49 | ||||||
1844 | 8844 | 7714 | 2555 | 62555 | 11/1906 | 03/1939 from D15 |
24/03/1958 | Norwich Thorpe | 51.33 | 51.45 | |||||
1845 | 8845 | 7715 | 2556 | 62556 | 11/1906 | 05/1929 from D15 |
01/01/1957 | Norwich Thorpe | 50.17 | 50.29 | |||||
1846 | 8846 | 7716 | 2557 | 62557 | 12/1906 | 12/1924 from D15 |
31/10/1955 | Cambridge | 48.83 | ||||||
1847 | 8847 | 7717 | 2558 | 62558 | 12/1906 | 07/1926 from D15 |
06/05/1957 | Kings Lynn | 50.42 | 50.62 | |||||
1848 | 8848 | 7718 | 2559 | 62559 | 01/1907 | 01/1933 from D15 |
12/12/1955 | Kings Lynn | 48.92 | ||||||
1849 | 8849 | 7719 | 2560 | 62560 | 01/1907 | 04/1933 from D15 |
24/09/1948 | Ipswich | 41.67 | ||||||
1830 | 8830 | 7700 | 2561 | 62561 | 03/1908 | 03/1940 from D15 |
10/02/1958 | Melton Constable | 49.92 | 50.12 | |||||
1831 | 8831 | 7701 | 2562 | 62562 | 03/1908 | 04/1928 from D15 |
22/10/1957 | March | 49.58 | 49.70 | |||||
1832 | 8832 | 7702 | 2563 | 62563 | 03/1908 | 07/1936 from D15 |
06/08/1948 | Inverness | 40.42 | ||||||
1833 | 8833 | 7703 | 2564 | 62564 | 04/1908 | 01/1930 from D15 |
24/03/1958 | Lincoln | 49.92 | 50.03 | |||||
1834 | 8834 | 7704 | 2565 | 62565 | 04/1908 | 03/1929 from D15 |
01/01/1957 | Kings Lynn | 48.75 | 48.87 | |||||
1835 | 8835 | 7705 | 2566 | 62566 | 05/1908 | 01/1939 from D15 |
02/12/1958 | Kings Lynn | 50.58 | 50.62 | |||||
1836 | 8836 | 7706 | 2567 | 62567 | 05/1908 | 10/1937 from D15 |
17/12/1956 | Cambridge | 48.58 | ||||||
1837 | 8837 | 7707 | 2568 | 62568 | 06/1908 | 05/1933 from D15 |
28/04/1958 | Lincoln | 49.83 | 50.12 | |||||
1838 | 8838 | 7708 | 2569 | 62569 | 07/1908 | 11/1929 from D15 |
26/11/1956 | Kings Lynn | 48.33 | ||||||
1839 | 8839 | 7709 | 2570 | 62570 | 07/1908 | 04/1928 from D15 |
24/11/1959 | March | 51.33 | 51.54 | |||||
1820 | 8820 | 7690 | 2571 | 62571 | 06/1909 | 05/1939 from D15 |
01/01/1959 | Lincoln | 49.58 | 49.70 | |||||
1821 | 8821 | 7691 | 2572 | 62572 | 06/1909 | 05/1933 from D15 |
28/07/1958 | March | 49.08 | 49.53 | |||||
1822 | 8822 | 7692 | 2573 | 62573 | 09/1909 | 06/1930 from D15 |
24/10/1955 | Kings Lynn | 46.08 | 46.20 | |||||
1823 | 8823 | 7693 | 2574 | 62574 | 11/1909 | 04/1938 from D15 |
05/12/1955 | Cambridge | 46.08 | ||||||
1824 | 8824 | 7694 | 2575 | 62575 | 11/1909 | 02/1940 from D15 |
29/05/1957 | Kings Lynn | 47.5 | 47.78 | |||||
1825 | 8825 | 7695 | 2576 | 62576 | 11/1909 | 03/1937 from D15 |
09/09/1957 | Cambridge | 47.83 | 47.95 | |||||
1826 | 8826 | 7696 | 2577 | 62577 | 12/1909 | 04/1929 from D15 |
10/1956 | Norwich Thorpe | 46.83 | ||||||
1827 | 8827 | 7697 | 2578 | 62578 | 12/1909 | 07/1927 from D15 |
21/10/1957 | Melton Constable | 47.83 | 47.95 | |||||
1828 | 8828 | 7698 | 2579 | 62579 | 12/1909 | 03/1934 from D15 |
07/03/1955 | Kings Lynn | 45.25 | ||||||
1829 | 8829 | 7699 | 2580 | 62580 | 12/1909 | 02/1930 from D15 |
09/06/1958 | Kings Lynn | 48.5 | 48.61 | |||||
1810 | 8810 | 7680 | 2581 | 62581 | 03/1910 | 07/1936 from D15 |
09/03/1953 | Norwich Thorpe | 43 | ||||||
1811 | 8811 | 7681 | 2582 | 62582 | 03/1910 | 12/1939 from D15 |
01/01/1959 | Cambridge | 48.83 | 49.12 | |||||
1812 | 8812 | 7682 | 2583 | 62583 | 03/1910 | 06/1936 from D15 |
23/11/1948 | Inverness | 38.67 | ||||||
1813 | 8813 | 7683 | 2584 | 62584 | 04/1910 | 04/1926 from D15 |
23/12/1957 | Kings Lynn | 47.67 | 47.87 | |||||
1814 | 8814 | 7684 | 2585 | 62585 | 04/1910 | 02/1935 from D15 |
11/04/1955 | Cambridge | 45 | 45.11 | |||||
1815 | 8815 | 7685 | 2586 | 62586 | 05/1910 | 08/1939 from D15 |
05/03/1958 | Norwich Thorpe | 47.83 | 47.95 | |||||
1816 | 8816 | 7686 | 2587 | 62587 | 06/1910 | 03/1934 from D15 |
17/12/1956 | Grantham | 46.5 | ||||||
1817 | 8817 | 7687 | 2588 | 62588 | 06/1910 | 07/1934 from D15 |
13/10/1958 | Cambridge | 48.33 | 49.53 | |||||
1818 | 8818 | 7688 | 2589 | 62589 | 06/1910 | 06/1923 from D15 |
18/05/1959 | March | 48.92 | 49.28 | |||||
1801 | 8801 | 7671 | 2592 | 62592 | 07/1910 | 04/1929 from D15 |
01/04/1958 | Kings Lynn | 47.75 | 48.03 | |||||
1802 | 8802 | 7672 | 2593 | 62593 | 08/1910 | 04/1933 from D15 |
07/10/1957 | Norwich Thorpe | 47.17 | 47.28 | |||||
1803 | 8803 | 7673 | 2594 | 62594 | 08/1910 | 04/1937 from D15 |
03/1949 | 38.58 | |||||||
1804 | 8804 | 7674 | 2595 | 08/1910 | 03/1934 from D15 |
11/1946 | 36.25 | ||||||||
1805 | 8805 | 7672 | 2596 | 62596 | 09/1910 | 03/1923 from D15 |
28/10/1957 | Norwich Thorpe | 47.08 | 47.20 | |||||
1806 | 8806 | 7673 | 2597 | 62597 | 09/1910 | 01/1940 from D15 |
04/01/1960 | Kirkby in Ashfield | 49.33 | 49.37 | |||||
1807 | 8807 | 7677 | 2598 | 62598 | 10/1910 | 01/1942 from D15 |
12/05/1952 | Norwich Thorpe | 41.58 | ||||||
1808 | 8808 | 7678 | 2599 | 62599 | 10/1910 | 06/1937 from D15 |
15/09/1958 | Lincoln | 47.92 | 48.28 | |||||
1809 | 8809 | 7679 | 2600 | 62600 | 11/1910 | 06/1933 from D15 |
12/06/1948 | Inverness | 37.58 | ||||||
1790 | 8790 | 7660 | 2601 | 62601 | 02/1911 | 04/1929 from D15 |
01/01/1957 | Kings Lynn | 45.92 | 46.03 | |||||
1791 | 8791 | 7661 | 2602 | 62602 | 03/1911 | 02/1937 from D15 |
23/09/1948 | Corkerhill | 37.5 | ||||||
1793 | 8793 | 7663 | 2604 | 62604 | 04/1911 | 07/1937 from D15 |
05/02/1960 | Lowestoft | 48.83 | 48.95 | |||||
1794 | 8794 | 7664 | 2605 | 62605 | 05/1911 | 02/1929 from D15 |
06/06/1957 | March | 46.08 | 46.28 | |||||
1795 | 8795 | 7665 | 8795 | 2606 | 62606 | 07/1911 | 04/1931 from D15 |
28/09/1959 | Kings Lynn | 48.17 | 48.37 | ||||
1796 | 8796 | 7666 | 2607 | 62607 | 07/1911 | 12/1928 from D15 |
28/11/1955 | Cambridge | 44.33 | 44.45 | |||||
1797 | 8797 | 7667 | 2608 | 62608 | 07/1911 | 07/1937 from D15 |
01/01/1957 | Cambridge | 45.5 | 45.62 | |||||
1798 | 8798 | 7668 | 2609 | 62609 | 08/1911 | 04/1934 from D15 |
04/02/1957 | Kirkby in Ashfield | 45.5 | 45.54 | |||||
1799 | 8799 | 7669 | 2610 | 62610 | 08/1911 | 02/1940 from D15 |
01/01/1959 | Kings Lynn | 47.42 | 47.54 | |||||
1780 | 8780 | 7650 | 2611 | 62611 | 06/1923 | 01/01/1957 | Yarmouth South Town | 33.58 | 33.70 | ||||||
1781 | 8781 | 7651 | 2612 | 62612 | 06/1923 | 24/11/1959 | Kirkby in Ashfield | 36.42 | 36.61 | ||||||
1782 | 8782 | 7652 | 2613 | 62613 | 06/1923 | 25/10/1960 | March | 37.33 | 37.53 | ||||||
1783 | 8783 | 7653 | 2614 | 62614 | 07/1923 | 18/08/1958 | Kings Lynn | 35.08 | 35.53 | ||||||
1784 | 8784 | 7654 | 2615 | 62615 | 07/1923 | 13/10/1958 | March | 35.25 | 35.44 | ||||||
1785 | 8785 | 7655 | 2616 | 62616 | 07/1923 | 23/02/1953 | Cambridge | 29.58 | |||||||
1786 | 8786 | 7656 | 8786 | 2617 | 62617 | 08/1923 | 20/05/1957 | Melton Constable | 33.75 | 34.11 | |||||
1787 | 8787 | 7657 | 2618 | 62618 | 08/1923 | 23/11/1959 | March | 36.25 | 36.36 | ||||||
1788 | 8788 | 7658 | 2619 | 62619 | 09/1923 | 07/10/1957 | Norwich Thorpe | 34.08 | 34.44 | ||||||
1789 | 8789 | 7659 | 2620 | 62620 | 09/1923 | 10/10/1955 | Melton Constable | 32.08 |