D16 |
1900
|
8900
|
7770
|
2500
|
|
|
03/1900 |
05/1947 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
02/1933 |
D16 |
1899
|
8899
|
(7769)
|
2510
|
|
62510
|
07/1900 |
07/10/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
09/1943 |
D16 |
1880
|
8880
|
(7750)
|
2511
|
|
62511
|
04/1901 |
17/12/1959 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
09/1942 |
D16 |
1882
|
8882
|
(7752)
|
2513
|
|
62513
|
05/1901 |
03/11/1958 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
09/1942 |
D16 |
1883
|
8883
|
(7753)
|
2514
|
|
62514
|
05/1901 |
11/03/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
05/1943 |
D16 |
1884
|
8884
|
(7754)
|
2515
|
|
62515
|
05/1901 |
01/04/1958 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
01/1943 |
D16 |
1885
|
8885
|
(7755)
|
2516
|
|
62516
|
05/1901 |
18/08/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
07/1937 |
D16 |
1886
|
8886
|
(7756)
|
2517
|
|
62517
|
06/1901 |
28/09/1959 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
04/1940 |
D16 |
1887
|
8887
|
(7757)
|
2518
|
|
62518
|
06/1901 |
13/10/1958 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
08/1943 |
D16 |
1888
|
8888
|
(7758)
|
2519
|
|
62519
|
06/1901 |
01/01/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
06/1939 |
D16 |
1870
|
8870
|
7740
|
2521
|
|
62521
|
03/1902 |
10/02/1958 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
05/1935 |
D16 |
1871
|
8871
|
(7741)
|
2522
|
|
62522
|
03/1902 |
04/08/1958 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
05/1938 |
D16 |
1872
|
8872
|
(7742)
|
2523
|
|
62523
|
03/1902 |
27/08/1956 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
05/1940 |
D16 |
1873
|
8873
|
(7743)
|
2524
|
|
62524
|
03/1902 |
10/03/1960 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
06/1939 |
D16 |
1874
|
8874
|
(7744)
|
2525
|
|
62525
|
03/1902 |
19/09/1955 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
06/1938 |
D16 |
1875
|
8875
|
(7745)
|
2526
|
|
62526
|
04/1902 |
21/05/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
08/1937 |
D16 |
1876
|
8876
|
(7746)
|
2527
|
|
62527
|
04/1902 |
07/07/1952 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
03/1935 |
D16 |
1878
|
8878
|
(7748)
|
2529
|
|
62529
|
05/1902 |
23/11/1959 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
05/1935 |
D16 |
1879
|
8879
|
(7749)
|
2530
|
|
62530
|
05/1902 |
22/09/1958 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
04/1938 |
D16 |
1860
|
8860
|
(7730)
|
2531
|
|
62531
|
05/1903 |
21/03/1955 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
06/1934 |
D16 |
1861
|
8861
|
(7731)
|
2532
|
|
62532
|
05/1903 |
12/11/1956 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
04/1936 |
D16 |
1862
|
8862
|
(7732)
|
2533
|
|
62533
|
05/1903 |
23/09/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
06/1940 |
D16 |
1863
|
8863
|
(7733)
|
2534
|
|
62534
|
06/1903 |
11/11/1958 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
04/1935 |
D16 |
1864
|
8864
|
(7734)
|
2535
|
|
62535
|
06/1903 |
25/11/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
10/1936 |
D16 |
1865
|
8865
|
(7735)
|
2536
|
|
62536
|
09/1903 |
25/07/1955 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
07/1936 |
D16 |
1866
|
8866
|
(7736)
|
|
|
|
09/1903 |
09/1945 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
03/1933 |
D16 |
1868
|
8868
|
(7738)
|
2539
|
|
62539
|
10/1903 |
28/10/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
07/1940 |
D16 |
1869
|
8869
|
(7739)
|
2540
|
|
62540
|
11/1903 |
24/08/1959 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
06/1934 |
D16 |
1850
|
8850
|
(7720)
|
2541
|
|
62541
|
12/1903 |
17/10/1955 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
07/1939 |
D16 |
1851
|
8851
|
(7721)
|
2542
|
|
62542
|
12/1903 |
15/10/1956 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
06/1938 |
D16 |
1852
|
8852
|
(7722)
|
2543
|
|
62543
|
12/1903 |
13/10/1958 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
02/1949 |
D16 |
1853
|
8853
|
(7723)
|
2544
|
|
62544
|
12/1903 |
24/11/1959 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
03/1947 |
D16 |
1854
|
8854
|
(7724)
|
2545
|
|
62545
|
01/1904 |
22/09/1958 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
03/1933 |
D16 |
1855
|
8855
|
(7725)
|
2546
|
|
62546
|
02/1904 |
18/06/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
01/1934 |
D16 |
1856
|
8856
|
(7726)
|
2547
|
|
62547
|
03/1904 |
02/1951 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
08/1928 |
D16 |
1857
|
8857
|
7727
|
2548
|
|
62548
|
03/1904 |
08/10/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
07/1939 |
D16 |
1858
|
8858
|
7728
|
2549
|
|
62549
|
03/1904 |
12/12/1955 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
03/1938 |
D16 |
1859
|
8859
|
(7729)
|
2550
|
|
|
04/1904 |
11/1946 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
05/1934 |
D16 |
1840
|
8840
|
(7710)
|
2551
|
|
62551
|
11/1906 |
16/07/1956 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
03/1935 |
D16 |
1841
|
8841
|
(7711)
|
2552
|
|
62552
|
11/1906 |
25/10/1955 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
02/1949 |
D16 |
1842
|
8842
|
7712
|
2553
|
|
62553
|
11/1906 |
01/01/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
09/1949 |
D16 |
1843
|
8843
|
(7713)
|
2554
|
|
62554
|
11/1906 |
28/11/1955 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
11/1938 |
D16 |
1844
|
8844
|
(7714)
|
2555
|
|
62555
|
11/1906 |
24/03/1958 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
03/1939 |
D16 |
1845
|
8845
|
(7715)
|
2556
|
|
62556
|
11/1906 |
01/01/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
04/1946 |
D16 |
1846
|
8846
|
(7716)
|
2557
|
|
62557
|
12/1906 |
31/10/1955 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
04/1944 |
D16 |
1847
|
8847
|
(7717)
|
2558
|
|
62558
|
12/1906 |
06/05/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
09/1948 |
D16 |
1848
|
8848
|
(7718)
|
2559
|
|
62559
|
01/1907 |
12/12/1955 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
01/1933 |
D16 |
1849
|
8849
|
(7719)
|
2560
|
|
(62560)
|
01/1907 |
24/09/1948 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
04/1933 |
D16 |
1830
|
8830
|
(7700)
|
2561
|
|
62561
|
03/1908 |
10/02/1958 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
03/1940 |
D16 |
1831
|
8831
|
(7701)
|
2562
|
|
62562
|
03/1908 |
22/10/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
02/1946 |
D16 |
1832
|
8832
|
(7702)
|
2563
|
|
(62563)
|
03/1908 |
06/08/1948 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
07/1936 |
D16 |
1833
|
8833
|
(7703)
|
2564
|
|
62564
|
04/1908 |
24/03/1958 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
01/1948 |
D16 |
1834
|
8834
|
(7704)
|
2565
|
|
62565
|
04/1908 |
01/01/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
06/1945 |
D16 |
1835
|
8835
|
(7705)
|
2566
|
|
62566
|
05/1908 |
02/12/1958 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
01/1939 |
D16 |
1836
|
8836
|
(7706)
|
2567
|
|
62567
|
05/1908 |
17/12/1956 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
10/1937 |
D16 |
1837
|
8837
|
7707
|
2568
|
|
62568
|
06/1908 |
28/04/1958 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
05/1933 |
D16 |
1838
|
8838
|
7708
|
2569
|
|
62569
|
07/1908 |
26/11/1956 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
05/1948 |
D16 |
1839
|
8839
|
(7709)
|
2570
|
|
62570
|
07/1908 |
24/11/1959 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
09/1949 |
D16 |
1820
|
8820
|
(7690)
|
2571
|
|
62571
|
06/1909 |
01/01/1959 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
05/1939 |
D16 |
1821
|
8821
|
(7691)
|
2572
|
|
62572
|
06/1909 |
28/07/1958 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
05/1933 |
D16 |
1822
|
8822
|
7692
|
2573
|
|
62573
|
09/1909 |
24/10/1955 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
03/1947 |
D16 |
1823
|
8823
|
(7693)
|
2574
|
|
62574
|
11/1909 |
05/12/1955 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
04/1938 |
D16 |
1824
|
8824
|
(7694)
|
2575
|
|
62575
|
11/1909 |
29/05/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
02/1940 |
D16 |
1825
|
8825
|
7695
|
2576
|
|
62576
|
11/1909 |
09/09/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
03/1937 |
D16 |
1826
|
8826
|
(7696)
|
2577
|
|
62577
|
12/1909 |
10/1956 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
05/1949 |
D16 |
1827
|
8827
|
(7697)
|
2578
|
|
62578
|
12/1909 |
21/10/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
09/1944 |
D16 |
1828
|
8828
|
(7698)
|
2579
|
|
62579
|
12/1909 |
07/03/1955 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
03/1934 |
D16 |
1829
|
8829
|
(7699)
|
2580
|
|
62580
|
12/1909 |
09/06/1958 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
04/1948 |
D16 |
1810
|
8810
|
(7680)
|
2581
|
|
62581
|
03/1910 |
09/03/1953 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
07/1936 |
D16 |
1811
|
8811
|
(7681)
|
2582
|
|
62582
|
03/1910 |
01/01/1959 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
12/1939 |
D16 |
1812
|
8812
|
(7682)
|
2583
|
|
(62583)
|
03/1910 |
23/11/1948 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
06/1936 |
D16 |
1813
|
8813
|
(7683)
|
2584
|
|
62584
|
04/1910 |
23/12/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
09/1947 |
D16 |
1814
|
8814
|
(7684)
|
2585
|
|
62585
|
04/1910 |
11/04/1955 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
02/1935 |
D16 |
1815
|
8815
|
(7685)
|
2586
|
|
62586
|
05/1910 |
05/03/1958 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
08/1939 |
D16 |
1816
|
8816
|
(7686)
|
2587
|
|
62587
|
06/1910 |
17/12/1956 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
03/1934 |
D16 |
1817
|
8817
|
(7687)
|
2588
|
|
62588
|
06/1910 |
13/10/1958 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
07/1934 |
D16 |
1818
|
8818
|
(7688)
|
2589
|
|
62589
|
06/1910 |
18/05/1959 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
03/1947 |
D16 |
1819
|
8819
|
(7689)
|
2590
|
|
62590
|
06/1910 |
28/01/1952 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
01/1928 |
D16 |
1800
|
8800
|
(7670)
|
2591
|
|
62591
|
07/1910 |
17/04/1950 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
07/1928 |
D16 |
1801
|
8801
|
(7671)
|
2592
|
|
62592
|
07/1910 |
01/04/1958 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
06/1945 |
D16 |
1802
|
8802
|
(7672)
|
2593
|
|
62593
|
08/1910 |
07/10/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
04/1933 |
D16 |
1803
|
8803
|
(7673)
|
2594
|
|
(62594)
|
08/1910 |
03/1949 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
04/1937 |
D16 |
1804
|
8804
|
(7674)
|
2595
|
|
|
08/1910 |
11/1946 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
03/1934 |
D16 |
1805
|
8805
|
(7672)
|
2596
|
|
62596
|
09/1910 |
28/10/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
03/1947 |
D16 |
1806
|
8806
|
(7673)
|
2597
|
|
62597
|
09/1910 |
04/01/1960 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
01/1940 |
D16 |
1807
|
8807
|
(7677)
|
2598
|
|
62598
|
10/1910 |
12/05/1952 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
01/1942 |
D16 |
1808
|
8808
|
(7678)
|
2599
|
|
62599
|
10/1910 |
15/09/1958 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
06/1937 |
D16 |
1809
|
8809
|
(7679)
|
2600
|
|
(62600)
|
11/1910 |
12/06/1948 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
06/1933 |
D16 |
1790
|
8790
|
(7660)
|
2601
|
|
62601
|
02/1911 |
01/01/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
09/1944 |
D16 |
1791
|
8791
|
(7661)
|
2602
|
|
(62602)
|
03/1911 |
23/09/1948 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
02/1937 |
D16 |
1792
|
8792
|
(7662)
|
2603
|
|
62603
|
03/1911 |
03/09/1951 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
09/1928 |
D16 |
1793
|
8793
|
(7663)
|
2604
|
|
62604
|
04/1911 |
05/02/1960 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
07/1937 |
D16 |
1794
|
8794
|
(7664)
|
2605
|
|
62605
|
05/1911 |
06/06/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
03/1940 |
D16 |
1795
|
8795
|
7665
|
2606
|
8795
|
62606
|
07/1911 |
28/09/1959 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
03/1946 |
D16 |
1796
|
8796
|
(7666)
|
2607
|
|
62607
|
07/1911 |
28/11/1955 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
12/1946 |
D16 |
1797
|
8797
|
(7667)
|
2608
|
|
62608
|
07/1911 |
01/01/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
07/1937 |
D16 |
1798
|
8798
|
(7668)
|
2609
|
|
62609
|
08/1911 |
04/02/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
04/1934 |
D16 |
1799
|
8799
|
(7669)
|
2610
|
|
62610
|
08/1911 |
01/01/1959 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
02/1940 |
D16 |
1780
|
8780
|
(7650)
|
2611
|
|
62611
|
06/1923 |
01/01/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
09/1944 |
D16 |
1781
|
8781
|
(7651)
|
2612
|
|
62612
|
06/1923 |
24/11/1959 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
04/1949 |
D16 |
1782
|
8782
|
(7652)
|
2613
|
|
62613
|
06/1923 |
25/10/1960 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
12/1948 |
D16 |
1783
|
8783
|
(7653)
|
2614
|
|
62614
|
07/1923 |
18/08/1958 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
12/1939 |
D16 |
1784
|
8784
|
(7654)
|
2615
|
|
62615
|
07/1923 |
13/10/1958 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
04/1947 |
D16 |
1785
|
8785
|
(7655)
|
2616
|
|
62616
|
07/1923 |
23/02/1953 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
05/1944 |
D16 |
1786
|
8786
|
7656
|
2617
|
8786
|
62617
|
08/1923 |
20/05/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
01/1945 |
D16 |
1787
|
8787
|
(7657)
|
2618
|
|
62618
|
08/1923 |
23/11/1959 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
08/1944 |
D16 |
1788
|
8788
|
(7658)
|
2619
|
|
62619
|
09/1923 |
07/10/1957 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
12/1938 |
D16 |
1789
|
8789
|
(7659)
|
2620
|
|
62620
|
09/1923 |
10/10/1955 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
03/1948 |