Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3053 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16459 Week
» 69475 Month
» 189002 Year
» 3215855 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LNER Hill "D16" Class 4-4-0
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
GER |
1780 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8780 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1781 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8781 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1782 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8782 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1783 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8783 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1784 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8784 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1785 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8785 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1786 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8786 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1787 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8787 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1788 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8788 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1789 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8789 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1790 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8790 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1791 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8791 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1792 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8792 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1793 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8793 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1794 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8794 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1795 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8795 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1796 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8796 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1797 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8797 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1798 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8798 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1799 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8799 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1800 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8800 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1801 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8801 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1802 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8802 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1803 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8803 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1804 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8804 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1805 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8805 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1806 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8806 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1807 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8807 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1808 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8808 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1809 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8809 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1810 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8810 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1811 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8811 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1812 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8812 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1813 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8813 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1814 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8814 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1815 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8815 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1816 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8816 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1817 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8817 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1818 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8818 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1819 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8819 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1820 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8820 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1821 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8821 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1822 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8822 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1823 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8823 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1824 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8824 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1825 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8825 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1826 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8826 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1827 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8827 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1828 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8828 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1829 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8829 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1830 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8830 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1831 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8831 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1832 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8832 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1833 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8833 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1834 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8834 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1835 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8835 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1836 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8836 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1837 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8837 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1838 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8838 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1839 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8839 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1840 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8840 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1841 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8841 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1842 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8842 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1843 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8843 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1844 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8844 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1845 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8845 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1846 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8846 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1847 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8847 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1848 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8848 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1849 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8849 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1850 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8850 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1851 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8851 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1852 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8852 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1853 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8853 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1854 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8854 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1855 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8855 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1856 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8856 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1857 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8857 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1858 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8858 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1859 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8859 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1860 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8860 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1861 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8861 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1862 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8862 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1863 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8863 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1864 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8864 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1865 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8865 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1866 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8866 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1868 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8868 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1869 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8869 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1870 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8870 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1871 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8871 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1872 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8872 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1873 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8873 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1874 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8874 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1875 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8875 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1876 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8876 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1878 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8878 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1879 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8879 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1880 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8880 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1882 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8882 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1883 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8883 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1884 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8884 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1885 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8885 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1886 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8886 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1887 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8887 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1888 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8888 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1899 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8899 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
1900 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8900 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
LNER |
8786 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7656 |
1942 |
m/e |
11/1942 |
|
LNER |
8837 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7707 |
1942 |
m/e |
11/1942 |
|
LNER |
8838 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7708 |
1942 |
m/e |
11/1942 |
|
LNER |
8795 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7665 |
1942 |
m/e |
12/1942 |
|
LNER |
8822 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7692 |
1942 |
m/e |
12/1942 |
|
LNER |
8825 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7695 |
1942 |
m/e |
12/1942 |
|
LNER |
8842 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7712 |
1942 |
m/e |
12/1942 |
|
LNER |
8857 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7727 |
1942 |
m/e |
12/1942 |
|
LNER |
8870 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7740 |
1942 |
m/e |
12/1942 |
|
LNER |
8900 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7770 |
1942 |
m/e |
12/1942 |
|
LNER |
8858 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7728 |
1942 |
m/e |
01/1943 |
|
LNER |
7665 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8795 |
Amend |
m/e |
07/1944 |
|
LNER |
7656 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8786 |
Amend |
m/e |
08/1944 |
|
LNER |
7728 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2549 |
1946 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
|
LNER |
8874 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2525 |
1946 |
on |
16/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
7740 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2521 |
1946 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
7712 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2553 |
1946 |
on |
23/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
7708 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2569 |
1946 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
7692 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2573 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7695 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2576 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7707 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2568 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7770 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2500 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
8803 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2594 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7727 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2548 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
8851 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2542 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
8807 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2598 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
8840 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2551 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
8848 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2559 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
8850 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2541 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
8856 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2547 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
8860 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2531 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
8868 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2539 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
8869 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2540 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
8871 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2522 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
8872 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2523 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
8873 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2524 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
8876 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2527 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
8878 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2529 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
8879 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2530 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
8882 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2513 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
8883 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2514 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
8885 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2516 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
8887 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2518 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
8888 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2519 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
8808 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2599 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
8831 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2562 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
8841 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2552 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
8854 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2545 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
8875 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2526 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
8884 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2515 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
8886 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2517 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
8798 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2609 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
8800 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2591 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
8801 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2592 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
8802 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2593 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
8809 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2600 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
8810 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2581 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
8812 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2583 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
8813 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2584 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
8814 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2585 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
8815 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2586 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
8816 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2587 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
8817 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2588 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
8818 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2589 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
8819 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2590 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
8834 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2565 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
8845 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2556 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
8852 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2543 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
8855 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2546 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
8859 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2550 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
8861 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2532 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
8789 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2620 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
8790 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2601 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
8791 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2602 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
8794 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2605 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
8797 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2608 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
8806 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2597 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
8811 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2582 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
8820 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2571 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
8830 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2561 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
8832 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2563 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
8833 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2564 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
8835 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2566 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
8836 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2567 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
8843 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2554 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
8844 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2555 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
8864 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2535 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
8781 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2612 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8782 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2613 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8783 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2614 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8784 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2615 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8785 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2616 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8786 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2617 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8787 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2618 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8788 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2619 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8792 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2603 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8793 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2604 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8795 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2606 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8799 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2610 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8804 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2595 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8805 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2596 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8821 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2572 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8823 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2574 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8824 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2575 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8826 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2577 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8827 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2578 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8828 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2579 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8839 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2570 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8847 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2558 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8853 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2544 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8862 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2533 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8865 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2536 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8880 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2511 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8899 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2510 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
8780 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2611 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
8796 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2607 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
8829 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2580 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
8846 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2557 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
8849 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2560 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
8863 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2534 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
2536 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62536 |
|
m/e |
03/1948 |
|
LNER |
2568 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62568 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
2574 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62574 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
2578 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62578 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
2580 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62580 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
2609 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62609 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
2523 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62523 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
2543 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62543 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
2553 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62553 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
2555 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62555 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
2556 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62556 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
2562 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62562 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
2569 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62569 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
2587 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62587 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
2603 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62603 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
2547 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62547 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
2548 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62548 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
2576 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62576 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
2579 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62579 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
2604 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62604 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
2526 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62526 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
2532 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62532 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
2544 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62544 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
2527 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62527 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
2531 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62531 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
2535 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62535 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
2581 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62581 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
2588 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62588 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
2515 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62515 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
2558 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62558 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
2571 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62571 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
2617 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62617 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
2530 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62530 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
2542 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62542 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
2546 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62546 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
2566 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62566 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
2605 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62605 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
2540 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62540 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
2616 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62616 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
2518 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62518 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
2534 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62534 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
2575 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62575 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
2611 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62611 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
2613 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62613 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
2514 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62514 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
2517 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62517 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
2607 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62607 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
2510 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62510 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
2516 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62516 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
2545 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62545 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
2549 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62549 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
2552 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62552 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
2561 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62561 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
2589 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62589 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
2519 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62519 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
2559 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62559 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
2615 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62615 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
2522 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62522 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
2539 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62539 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
2541 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62541 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
2551 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62551 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
2567 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62567 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
2573 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62573 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
2591 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62591 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
2596 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62596 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
2612 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62612 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
2511 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62511 |
|
m/e |
05/1949 |
|
LNER |
2525 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62525 |
|
m/e |
05/1949 |
|
LNER |
2577 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62577 |
|
m/e |
05/1949 |
|
LNER |
2585 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62585 |
|
m/e |
05/1949 |
|
LNER |
2533 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62533 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
2554 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62554 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
2557 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62557 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
2598 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62598 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
2521 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62521 |
|
m/e |
08/1949 |
|
LNER |
2565 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62565 |
|
m/e |
08/1949 |
|
LNER |
2572 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62572 |
|
m/e |
08/1949 |
|
LNER |
2608 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62608 |
|
m/e |
08/1949 |
|
LNER |
2570 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62570 |
|
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
LNER |
2590 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62590 |
|
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
LNER |
2513 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62513 |
|
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
LNER |
2618 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62618 |
|
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
LNER |
2592 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62592 |
|
m/e |
11/1949 |
|
LNER |
2599 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62599 |
|
m/e |
11/1949 |
|
LNER |
2614 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62614 |
|
m/e |
11/1949 |
|
LNER |
2620 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62620 |
|
m/e |
11/1949 |
|
LNER |
2610 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62610 |
|
m/e |
12/1949 |
|
LNER |
2582 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62582 |
|
m/e |
01/1950 |
|
LNER |
2593 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62593 |
|
m/e |
01/1950 |
|
LNER |
2597 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62597 |
|
m/e |
01/1950 |
|
LNER |
2564 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62564 |
|
m/e |
02/1950 |
|
LNER |
2529 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62529 |
|
m/e |
04/1950 |
|
LNER |
2584 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62584 |
|
m/e |
04/1950 |
|
LNER |
2601 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62601 |
|
m/e |
04/1950 |
|
LNER |
2606 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62606 |
|
m/e |
06/1950 |
|
LNER |
2586 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62586 |
|
m/e |
08/1950 |
|
LNER |
2619 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62619 |
|
m/e |
10/1950 |
|
LNER |
2524 |
renumbered to |
BR |
62524 |
|
w/e |
30/12/1950 |
|